CREW v. GSA

Defendant / Appellant: General Services Administration
Plaintiff / Appellee: Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington
Case Number: 19-5134
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1791974] filed by GSA [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-5134] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:55 PM]
June 10, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1791973] filed by GSA [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-5134] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:53 PM]
June 10, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1791972] filed by GSA [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5134] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:51 PM]
June 10, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1791971] submitted by GSA [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5134] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:49 PM]
June 10, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791969] filed by Melanie D. Hendry and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellant GSA. [19-5134] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:41 PM]
June 10, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1791968] filed by GSA [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5134] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:39 PM]
June 10, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1791966] filed by GSA [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] [19-5134] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:37 PM]
June 6, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1791523] filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington [Service Date: 06/06/2019 ] [19-5134] (Rappaport, Adam) [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:38 PM]
June 6, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791521] filed by Anne L. Weismann and co-counsel Laura C. Beckerman on behalf of Appellee Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington. [19-5134] (Rappaport, Adam) [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:34 PM]
May 24, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1789428] filed by Thomas Pulham and co-counsel Sharon Swingle on behalf of Appellant GSA. [19-5134] (Pulham, Thomas) [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:55 PM]
May 9, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1787190] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/10/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/24/2019. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/10/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/10/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/10/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/24/2019 [19-5134] [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:25 PM]
May 9, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1787187] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-00377-CRC filed by GSA. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5134. [19-5134] [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:17 PM]
May 9, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5134] [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:15 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CREW v. GSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: General Services Administration
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Represented By: Melanie Dyani Hendry
Represented By: Thomas Gary Pulham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington
Represented By: Anne Louise Weismann
Represented By: Laura C. Beckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?