John Fitzgerald, et al v. FTA, et al

Defendant / Appellee: United States Department of the Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, Federal Transit Administration and United States Department of Transportation
Plaintiff / Appellant: Christine Real de Azua, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and John M. Fitzgerald
Intervenor Defendant / Appellee: State of Maryland
Case Number: 19-5138
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1796910] filed granting appellants' unopposed motion to establish briefing schedule [ # 1793999-2 ], setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 08/30/2019. APPELLEE Brief due on 09/30/2019. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 10/21/2019. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 10/28/2019. Final Briefs due 11/12/2019. [19-5138] [Entered: 07/12/2019 10:33 AM]
June 21, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1793999] to establish briefing schedule filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua Length Certification: 333 words. [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/21/2019 03:11 PM]
June 13, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1792602] filed by DOI, DOT, FTA and FWS [Service Date: 06/13/2019 ] [19-5138] (McArdle, Kevin) [Entered: 06/13/2019 11:18 AM]
June 12, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1792541] submitted by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua [Service Date: 06/12/2019 ] [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:15 PM]
June 12, 2019 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1792538] filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua [Service Date: 06/12/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:13 PM]
June 12, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1792537] filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua [Service Date: 06/12/2019 ] [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:11 PM]
June 12, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1792535] filed by William N. Lawton and co-counsel William S. Eubanks II on behalf of Appellants John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua. [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:10 PM]
June 12, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1792534] filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua [Service Date: 06/12/2019 ] [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:09 PM]
June 12, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1792532] filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua [Service Date: 06/12/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:08 PM]
June 12, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1792531] filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua [Service Date: 06/12/2019 ] [19-5138] (Lawton, William) [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:07 PM]
June 3, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1790770] filed by Kevin W. McArdle on behalf of Appellees DOI, DOT, FTA and FWS. [19-5138] (McArdle, Kevin) [Entered: 06/03/2019 05:07 PM]
May 14, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1787721] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/13/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/28/2019. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/13/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/13/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/13/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/28/2019 [19-5138] [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:10 AM]
May 14, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1787716] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:14-cv-01471-RJL filed by John M. Fitzgerald, Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail and Christine Real de Azua. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5138. [19-5138] [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:07 AM]
May 14, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5138] [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:06 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Fitzgerald, et al v. FTA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Kevin W. McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Kevin W. McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Federal Transit Administration
Represented By: Kevin W. McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Transportation
Represented By: Kevin W. McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Christine Real de Azua
Represented By: William Nicholson Lawton
Represented By: Eric Robert Glitzenstein Esquire
Represented By: David W. Brown
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Friends of the Capital Crescent Trail
Represented By: William Nicholson Lawton
Represented By: Eric Robert Glitzenstein Esquire
Represented By: David W. Brown
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John M. Fitzgerald
Represented By: William Nicholson Lawton
Represented By: Eric Robert Glitzenstein Esquire
Represented By: David W. Brown
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: State of Maryland
Represented By: Linda DeVuono
Represented By: Albert M. Ferlo Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?