Donald Trump, et al v. Mazars USA, LLP
Plaintiff / Appellant: Trump Organization, Inc., Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Corporation, Donald J. Trump, DJT Holdings, LLC and Trump Organization, LLC
Defendant / Appellee: Mazars USA, LLP
Intervenor Defendant / Appellee: Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives
Amicus Curiae: Duane Morley Cox, Constitutional Accountability Center and United States of America
Case Number: 19-5142
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
October 11, 2019 Summary Trump v. Mazars USA, LLP
November 13, 2019 Summary Donald Trump v. Mazars USA, LLP

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 MOTION [1798189] for leave to file letter filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump (Service Date: 07/19/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 202 Words. [19-5142] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 07/19/2019 07:08 PM]
July 16, 2019 LETTER [1797542] regarding oral argument matter [Response to Questions as Directed by the Court at Oral Argument] filed by Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives [Service Date: 07/16/2019 ] [19-5142] (Letter, Douglas) [Entered: 07/16/2019 06:04 PM]
July 15, 2019 PER CURIAM ORDER [1797054] ORDERED, on the courts own motion, that the United States Department of Justice be invited to file a brief amicus curiae, not to exceed 5,200 words, by 4:00 p.m. on Tuesday, August 6, 2019, expressing the views of the United States on this case. The parties may file responses, not to exceed 3,000 words each, by 4:00 p.m. on Tuesday, August 20, 2019. Absent extraordinary circumstances, because of the expedited nature of the proceedings, no extensions of time will be granted by the court. In addition to electronic filing, paper copies of the submissions must be delivered to the court by the time and date due. Before Judges: Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142] [Entered: 07/15/2019 09:40 AM]
July 12, 2019 ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142] [Entered: 07/12/2019 09:38 AM]
July 10, 2019 NOTICE [1796602] sent regarding 7/12/19 public advisory. [19-5142] [Entered: 07/10/2019 12:41 PM]
July 9, 2019 APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1796503] filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump [Service Date: 07/09/2019 ] Length of Brief: 6,468 Words. [19-5142] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 07/09/2019 08:16 PM]
July 3, 2019 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, William S. Consovoy, on behalf of Appellants DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [19-5142] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 07/03/2019 05:20 PM]
July 3, 2019 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Douglas N. Letter, on behalf of Appellee Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [19-5142] (Letter, Douglas) [Entered: 07/03/2019 01:46 PM]
July 3, 2019 PER CURIAM ORDER [1795668] filed allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellants - 30 Minutes, Appellee Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives - 30 Minutes; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 07/05/2019 [19-5142] [Entered: 07/03/2019 11:36 AM]
July 1, 2019 NOTICE [1795361] advising that a brief will not be filed filed by Mazars USA, LLP [Service Date: 07/01/2019 ] [19-5142] (Bernstein, Jerry) [Entered: 07/01/2019 06:39 PM]
July 1, 2019 APPELLEE BRIEF [1795251] filed by Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives [Service Date: 07/01/2019 ] Length of Brief: 10,920 Words. [19-5142] (Letter, Douglas) [Entered: 07/01/2019 12:36 PM]
July 1, 2019 CONSENT AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1795248] filed by Constitutional Accountability Center [Service Date: 07/01/2019 ] Length of Brief: 6,486 words. [19-5142] (Wydra, Elizabeth) [Entered: 07/01/2019 12:05 PM]
July 1, 2019 NOTICE [1795219] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Constitutional Accountability Center [Service Date: 07/01/2019 ] [19-5142] (Wydra, Elizabeth) [Entered: 07/01/2019 11:03 AM]
June 27, 2019 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged amended Amicus brief [ # 1794179-2 ] is filed. [19-5142] [Entered: 06/27/2019 01:25 PM]
June 27, 2019 PER CURIAM ORDER [1794825] filed granting motion to amend amicus brief [ # 1794178-2 ]; The Clerk is directed to file the lodged amended brief [ # 1794179-2 ]. The court will not accept any further amendments to the brief of amicus curiae Cox. Before Judges: Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142] [Entered: 06/27/2019 01:24 PM]
June 20, 2019 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1794179] lodged by Duane Morley Cox [Service Date: 06/17/2019 ] Length of Brief: 5,410 words. [19-5142] [Entered: 06/24/2019 02:37 PM]
June 20, 2019 MOTION [1794178] for leave to amend amicus brief filed by Duane Morley Cox (Service Date: 06/17/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 4 pages. [19-5142] [Entered: 06/24/2019 02:35 PM]
June 10, 2019 APPELLANT BRIEF [1791954] filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump [Service Date: 06/10/2019 ] Length of Brief: 12,799 Words. [19-5142] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:58 PM]
June 10, 2019 JOINT APPENDIX [1791951] filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 05/22/2019 ] [19-5142] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:52 PM]
June 10, 2019 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged Amicus brief [ # 1791159-2 ] is filed [19-5142] [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:27 PM]
June 10, 2019 PER CURIAM ORDER [1791939] filed granting motion of Duane Morley Cox to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1791158-2 ]; The Clerk is directed to file the lodged amicus brief [ # 1791159-2 ] Before Judges: Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142] [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:18 PM]
May 31, 2019 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1791159] filed by Duane Morley Cox [Service Date: 05/24/2019 ] Length of Brief: 24 pages. [19-5142] [Entered: 06/05/2019 01:09 PM]
May 31, 2019 MOTION [1791158] to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Duane Morley Cox [Service Date: 05/24/2019 ] [19-5142] [Entered: 06/05/2019 01:08 PM]
May 23, 2019 PER CURIAM ORDER [1789247] filed considering motion to expedite case [ # 1789081-2 ], setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 06/10/2019. APPENDIX due 06/10/2019. APPELLEE Brief due on 07/01/2019. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 07/09/2019, scheduling oral argument on Friday, 07/12/2019. Before Judges: Tatel, Millett and Rao. [19-5142] [Entered: 05/23/2019 02:49 PM]
May 22, 2019 JOINT MOTION [1789081] to expedite case filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization, LLC and Donald J. Trump (Service Date: 05/22/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email) Length Certification: 281 Words. [19-5142] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 05/22/2019 06:15 PM]
May 21, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1788738] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-01136-APM filed by DJT Holdings, LLC, Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust, Donald J. Trump, Trump Corporation, Trump Old Post Office LLC, Trump Organization, Inc. and Trump Organization, LLC. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5142. [19-5142] [Entered: 05/21/2019 12:18 PM]
May 21, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5142] [Entered: 05/21/2019 12:16 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donald Trump, et al v. Mazars USA, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Trump Organization, Inc.
Represented By: Stefan Charles Passantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Donald J. Trump Revocable Trust
Represented By: Stefan Charles Passantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Trump Old Post Office LLC
Represented By: Stefan Charles Passantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Trump Corporation
Represented By: Stefan Charles Passantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: William Spencer Consovoy
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DJT Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Stefan Charles Passantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Trump Organization, LLC
Represented By: Stefan Charles Passantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mazars USA, LLP
Represented By: Jerry Daniel Bernstein
Represented By: Henry Federick Schuelke III
Represented By: Lawrence H. Wechsler
Represented By: Jerry Daniel Bernstein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives
Represented By: Megan Barbero Esquire
Represented By: Todd B. Tatelman
Represented By: Josephine Thacher Morse
Represented By: Brooks M. Hanner
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Duane Morley Cox
Represented By: Duane Morley Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Constitutional Accountability Center
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Represented By: Ashwin Pradyumna Phatak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United States of America
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?