Jan Hamilton v. Marcus Stevens, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Betsey Rackley, Henry Courtney, Margaret Costan, Jeff Smith, Paul Gambral, Harry Volz, Latisha Goodwin, 3rd District Detective, Karl A. Racine, Attorney General for DC, Joseph Gonzales, Chad Thorley, Becky Reic, Dana Harris, United States of America, Krista, Elizabeth Keeling, Kathy Carmen, John Korsimo, Jennifer Lee, Rich Schaberg, Leslie Parsons, Commander of Detective Division, Bob Szabo, David Schertler, Molly Peacock, Shelika Brooks, 3rd District Detective, Emilio Martinez, Kristin Hawley, Valarie Scott, Executive Asst. Attorney General for DC, Martha Miller, Peter Newsham, Chief of Police, DC, Ted Jackson, Jane Matz, David Edelstein, DC Detective, Andre Wright, Capt. of Detectives of DC, Mary Travers, (Puffin), Rufus Peckhim, Member, Christ Episcopal Church, Marcus Stevens, DC Detective, District 2, DC Police and Tim Cole
Plaintiff / Appellant: Jan B. Hamilton
Case Number: 19-5153
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 MOTION [1799303] for summary affirmance (Response to Motion served by hand due on 08/05/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 08/05/2019) filed by USA (Service Date: 07/26/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail) Length Certification: 2,516 Words. [19-5153] (Hair, Christopher) [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:07 PM]
July 25, 2019 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged motion for summary affirmance [ # 1798409-2 ] is filed [19-5153] [Entered: 07/25/2019 02:30 PM]
July 25, 2019 CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1799048] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7017 3380 000 3149 6912] of order [ # 1798944-4 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 08/26/2019 from Jan B. Hamilton. [19-5153] [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:25 PM]
July 25, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1798944] filed denying without prejudice motion to permit pro se electronic filing [ # 1794652-2 ]; dismissing as moot motion to extend deadlines set by 05/29/2019 order [ # 1794648-2 ]; appellant is relieved of obligation to file remaining submissions; granting motion to extend time [ # 1796759-2 ], granting motion to extend time [ # 1796494-2 ]; The Clerk is directed to file motion for summary affirmance [ # 1798409-2 ]; directing DC APPELLEE response to motion for summary reversal [ # 1795627-2 ] Response due on 07/29/2019. APPELLANT reply, if any, to responses due 08/12/2019; DC APPELLEE dispositive motion due 07/29/2019; directing response to motion for summary affirmance [ # 1798409-2 ] APPELLANT Response due on 08/12/2019. Appellant's failure to respond to dispositive motion shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5153] [Entered: 07/25/2019 10:52 AM]
July 22, 2019 MOTION [1798409] for summary affirmance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 08/01/2019) lodged by Kathy Carmen, Tim Cole, Margaret Costan, Henry Courtney, Paul Gambral, Dana Harris, Kristin Hawley, Ted Jackson, Elizabeth Keeling, John Korsimo, Jennifer Lee, Jane Matz, Martha Miller, Molly Peacock, Rufus Peckhim, Betsey Rackley, Becky Reic, Rich Schaberg, Bob Szabo, Chad Thorley, Mary Travers and Harry Volz (Service Date: 07/22/2019 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2145 words. [19-5153]--[Edited 07/23/2019 by AH--MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED] (Rosenthal, John) [Entered: 07/22/2019 05:13 PM]
July 18, 2019 LETTER [1797861] do not intend to respond to Appellant's July 15, 2019 Motion filed by Rufus Peckhim, Kristin Hawley, Tim Cole, Elizabeth Keeling, Jennifer Lee, Kathy Carmen, Margaret Costan, Betsey Rackley, Rich Schaberg, Henry Courtney, Paul Gambral, Dana Harris, Ted Jackson, John Korsimo, Jane Matz, Molly Peacock, Bob Szabo, Mary Travers, Harry Volz, Martha Miller, Becky Reic and Chad Thorley [Service Date: 07/18/2019 ] [19-5153] (Rosenthal, John) [Entered: 07/18/2019 12:27 PM]
July 15, 2019 MOTION [1797496] to support summary judgment filed by Jan B. Hamilton (Service Date: 07/12/2019 by Email, US Mail) Length Certification: 6 pages. [19-5153] [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:35 PM]
July 11, 2019 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1796871] to motion [ # 1795627-2 ] filed by Rufus Peckhim, Kristin Hawley, Tim Cole, Elizabeth Keeling, Jennifer Lee, Kathy Carmen, Margaret Costan, Betsey Rackley, Rich Schaberg, Henry Courtney, Paul Gambral, Dana Harris, Ted Jackson, John Korsimo, Jane Matz, Molly Peacock, Bob Szabo, Mary Travers, Harry Volz, Martha Miller, Becky Reic and Chad Thorley [Service Date: 07/11/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Length Certification: 1391 words. [19-5153] (Rosenthal, John) [Entered: 07/11/2019 05:24 PM]
July 11, 2019 MOTION [1796759] to extend time to file motion to 07/29/2019 filed by Rufus Peckhim, Kristin Hawley, Tim Cole, Elizabeth Keeling, Jennifer Lee, Kathy Carmen, Margaret Costan, Betsey Rackley, Rich Schaberg, Henry Courtney, Paul Gambral, Dana Harris, Ted Jackson, John Korsimo, Jane Matz, Molly Peacock, Bob Szabo, Mary Travers, Harry Volz, Martha Miller, Becky Reic and Chad Thorley (Service Date: 07/10/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail) Length Certification: 212 words. [19-5153] (Rosenthal, John) [Entered: 07/11/2019 10:41 AM]
July 10, 2019 MOTION [1796575] to extend time to file motion to 07/29/2019 filed by Rufus Peckhim, Kristin Hawley, Tim Cole, Elizabeth Keeling, Jennifer Lee, Kathy Carmen, Margaret Costan, Betsey Rackley, Rich Schaberg, Henry Courtney, Paul Gambral, Dana Harris, Ted Jackson, John Korsimo, Jane Matz, Molly Peacock, Bob Szabo, Mary Travers, Harry Volz, Martha Miller, Becky Reic and Chad Thorley (Service Date: 07/10/2019 by Email, US Mail) Length Certification: 212 words. [19-5153] (Rosenthal, John) [Entered: 07/10/2019 11:19 AM]
July 9, 2019 MOTION [1796494] to extend time to file motion to 07/29/2019 filed by Shelika Brooks, David Edelstein, Latisha Goodwin, Emilio Martinez, Peter Newsham, Leslie Parsons, Karl A. Racine, Valarie Scott, Jeff Smith, Marcus Stevens and Andre Wright (Service Date: 07/09/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail) Length Certification: 246 words. [19-5153] (Preston, Lewis) [Entered: 07/09/2019 06:16 PM]
July 9, 2019 NOTICE [1796349] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court to supplement record amended notice of appeal [19-5153] [Entered: 07/09/2019 11:36 AM]
July 8, 2019 LETTER [1796117] Church Member Appellees do not intend to respond to Appellant's motions filed since June 24, 2019 filed by Rufus Peckhim, Kristin Hawley, Jennifer Lee, Tim Cole, Elizabeth Keeling, Kathy Carmen, Margaret Costan, Betsey Rackley, Rich Schaberg, Henry Courtney, Paul Gambral, Dana Harris, Ted Jackson, John Korsimo, Jane Matz, Molly Peacock, Bob Szabo, Mary Travers, Harry Volz, Martha Miller, Becky Reic and Chad Thorley [Service Date: 07/08/2019 ] [19-5153] (Rosenthal, John) [Entered: 07/08/2019 01:17 PM]
July 3, 2019 NOTICE [1795635] styled as appellants combined... filed by Jan B. Hamilton [Service Date: 06/28/2019 ] [19-5153] [Entered: 07/03/2019 10:14 AM]
July 1, 2019 LETTER [1795354] The District does not intend to file responses to Appellant's June 24 motions unless requested by the Court filed by Shelika Brooks, David Edelstein, Latisha Goodwin, Emilio Martinez, Peter Newsham, Leslie Parsons, Karl A. Racine, Valarie Scott, Jeff Smith, Marcus Stevens and Andre Wright [Service Date: 07/01/2019 ] [19-5153] (Preston, Lewis) [Entered: 07/01/2019 05:12 PM]
June 28, 2019 EXHIBITS [1796478] to motion for summary reversal [ # 1795627-2 ] filed by Jan B. Hamilton [Service Date: 07/09/2019 ] [19-5153] [Entered: 07/09/2019 04:42 PM]
June 28, 2019 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1795636] filed by Jan B. Hamilton [Service Date: 06/28/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [19-5153] [Entered: 07/03/2019 10:16 AM]
June 28, 2019 MOTION [1795631] to appoint counsel filed by Jan B. Hamilton (Service Date: 06/28/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 8 pages. [19-5153] [Entered: 07/03/2019 10:11 AM]
June 28, 2019 SUPPLEMENT [1795630] to motion for other relief [ # 1795628-2 ] filed by Jan B. Hamilton [Service Date: 06/28/2019 ] [19-5153] [Entered: 07/03/2019 10:06 AM]
June 28, 2019 MOTION [1795628] to submit financial statement filed by Jan B. Hamilton (Service Date: 06/28/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 13 pages. [19-5153] [Entered: 07/03/2019 10:02 AM]
June 28, 2019 MOTION [1795627] for summary reversal styled as petition for extraordinary circumstances (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/11/2019) filed by Jan B. Hamilton (Service Date: 06/28/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 26 pages. [19-5153] [Entered: 07/03/2019 10:00 AM]
June 28, 2019 MOTION [1795626] to plead filed by Jan B. Hamilton (Service Date: 06/28/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 5 pages. [19-5153] [Entered: 07/03/2019 09:58 AM]
June 28, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1795151] filed by USA [Service Date: 06/28/2019 ] [19-5153] (Hair, Christopher) [Entered: 06/28/2019 06:22 PM]
June 28, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1795150] to notice [ # 1795079-2 ], certificate [ # 1795083-2 ] filed by Rufus Peckhim, Kristin Hawley, Jennifer Lee, Margaret Costan, Tim Cole, Elizabeth Keeling, Kathy Carmen, Betsey Rackley, Rich Schaberg, Henry Courtney, Paul Gambral, Dana Harris, Ted Jackson, John Korsimo, Jane Matz, Molly Peacock, Bob Szabo, Mary Travers, Harry Volz, Martha Miller, Becky Reic and Chad Thorley. [19-5153] (Rosenthal, John) [Entered: 06/28/2019 06:14 PM]
June 28, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1795149] filed by Christopher C. Hair and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellee USA. [19-5153] (Hair, Christopher) [Entered: 06/28/2019 06:08 PM]
June 28, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1795116] filed by Shelika Brooks, David Edelstein, Latisha Goodwin, Emilio Martinez, Peter Newsham, Leslie Parsons, Karl A. Racine, Valarie Scott, Jeff Smith, Marcus Stevens and Andre Wright [Service Date: 06/28/2019 ] [19-5153] (Preston, Lewis) [Entered: 06/28/2019 04:24 PM]
June 28, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1795100] filed by Lewis T. Preston and co-counsel Caroline S. Van Zile; Loren L. AliKhan on behalf of Appellees Shelika Brooks, David Edelstein, Latisha Goodwin, Emilio Martinez, Peter Newsham, Leslie Parsons, Karl A. Racine, Valarie Scott, Jeff Smith, Marcus Stevens and Andre Wright. [19-5153] (Preston, Lewis) [Entered: 06/28/2019 04:02 PM]
June 28, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1795083] filed by Rufus Peckhim, Kristin Hawley, Jennifer Lee, Margaret Costan, Tim Cole, Elizabeth Keeling, Kathy Carmen, Betsey Rackley, Rich Schaberg, Henry Courtney, Paul Gambral, Dana Harris, Ted Jackson, John Korsimo, Jane Matz, Molly Peacock, Bob Szabo, Mary Travers, Harry Volz, Martha Miller, Becky Reic and Chad Thorley [Service Date: 06/28/2019 ] [19-5153] (Rosenthal, John) [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:32 PM]
June 28, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1795079] filed by John J. Rosenthal on behalf of Appellees Rufus Peckhim, Kristin Hawley, Jennifer Lee, Margaret Costan, Tim Cole, Elizabeth Keeling, Kathy Carmen, Betsey Rackley, Rich Schaberg, Henry Courtney, Paul Gambral, Dana Harris, Ted Jackson, John Korsimo, Jane Matz, Molly Peacock, Bob Szabo, Mary Travers, Harry Volz, Martha Miller, Becky Reic and Chad Thorley. [19-5153] (Rosenthal, John) [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:29 PM]
June 24, 2019 MOTION [1794662] for jury trial filed by Jan B. Hamilton (Service Date: 06/18/2019 by Email, US Mail) Length Certification: 16 pages. [19-5153] [Entered: 06/26/2019 04:03 PM]
June 24, 2019 MOTION [1794661] for mistrial filed by Jan B. Hamilton (Service Date: 06/18/2019 by US Mail, Email) Length Certification: 6 pages. [19-5153] [Entered: 06/26/2019 04:02 PM]
June 24, 2019 MOTION [1794659] to grant use of the law library filed by Jan B. Hamilton (Service Date: 06/18/2019 by Email, US Mail) Length Certification: 5 pages. [19-5153] [Entered: 06/26/2019 04:00 PM]
June 24, 2019 MOTION [1794655] for status conference and request for recusal styled as notice of assignment filed by Jan B. Hamilton (Service Date: 06/18/2019 by Email, US Mail) Length Certification: 6 pages. [19-5153] [Entered: 06/26/2019 03:58 PM]
June 24, 2019 MOTION [1794652] to permit pro se electronic filing status filed by Jan B. Hamilton (Service Date: 06/18/2019 by Email, US Mail) Length Certification: 3 pages. [19-5153] [Entered: 06/26/2019 03:54 PM]
June 24, 2019 MOTION [1794648] to extend time to file initial submissions filed by Jan B. Hamilton (Service Date: 06/18/2019 by US Mail, Email) Length Certification: 5 pages. [19-5153] [Entered: 06/26/2019 03:51 PM]
June 11, 2019 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1792415] received from Jan Hamilton [signed for on 06/05/2019] for order [1789958-2] sent to Appellant Jan B. Hamilton [19-5153] [Entered: 06/12/2019 02:35 PM]
May 29, 2019 CERTIFIED MAIL and FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1789958] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7017 3380 0000 3149 7469] of order [ # 1789957-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 06/28/2019 from Jan B. Hamilton. [19-5153] [Entered: 05/29/2019 11:57 AM]
May 29, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1789957] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/28/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/28/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/28/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/28/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/28/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/28/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/28/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/28/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/15/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/28/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/28/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/28/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/15/2019; directing party to file appointment of counsel motion: APPELLANT motion for appointment of counsel due 06/28/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5153] [Entered: 05/29/2019 11:35 AM]
May 28, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1789712] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-01158-CKK filed by Jan B. Hamilton. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5153. [19-5153] [Entered: 05/28/2019 12:16 PM]
May 28, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5153] [Entered: 05/28/2019 12:15 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jan Hamilton v. Marcus Stevens, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Betsey Rackley
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Henry Courtney
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Margaret Costan
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeff Smith
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Represented By: Lewis Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Paul Gambral
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Harry Volz
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Latisha Goodwin, 3rd District Detective
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Represented By: Lewis Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Karl A. Racine, Attorney General for DC
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Represented By: Lewis Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joseph Gonzales
Represented By: David H. Dickieson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chad Thorley
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Becky Reic
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dana Harris
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States of America
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Christopher Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Krista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Elizabeth Keeling
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kathy Carmen
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Korsimo
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jennifer Lee
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rich Schaberg
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Leslie Parsons, Commander of Detective Division
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Represented By: Lewis Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bob Szabo
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Schertler
Represented By: David H. Dickieson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Molly Peacock
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shelika Brooks, 3rd District Detective
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Represented By: Lewis Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Emilio Martinez
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Represented By: Lewis Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kristin Hawley
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Valarie Scott, Executive Asst. Attorney General for DC
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Represented By: Lewis Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Martha Miller
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Peter Newsham, Chief of Police, DC
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Represented By: Lewis Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ted Jackson
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jane Matz
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Edelstein, DC Detective
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Represented By: Lewis Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andre Wright, Capt. of Detectives of DC
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Represented By: Lewis Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mary Travers, (Puffin)
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rufus Peckhim, Member, Christ Episcopal Church
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Marcus Stevens, DC Detective, District 2, DC Police
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Represented By: Lewis Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tim Cole
Represented By: John J. Rosenthal Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jan B. Hamilton
Represented By: Jan B. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?