Ricardo Calderon Lopez v. Melissa Blalock, et al

Defendant / Appellee: Scott S. Harris and Melissa Blalock
Plaintiff / Appellant: Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez, doing business as Starlight Consulting Services
Case Number: 19-5155
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED [1797398] marked "RTS - Unclaimed". Certified Mail [1789710-2] had been sent to Party Mr. Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez. [19-5155] [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:47 PM]
June 20, 2019 APPENDIX [1793785] filed by Mr. Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez. [Volume 3] [Service Date:06/20/2019 ] [19-5155]--[Edited 06/21/2019 by SHA] (Calderon Lopez, Ricardo) [Entered: 06/20/2019 05:21 PM]
June 20, 2019 APPENDIX [1793784] filed by Mr. Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez. [Volume 2] [Service Date:06/20/2019 ] [19-5155]--[Edited 06/21/2019 by SHA] (Calderon Lopez, Ricardo) [Entered: 06/20/2019 05:11 PM]
June 20, 2019 APPENDIX [1793782] filed by Mr. Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez. [Volume 1] [Service Date:06/20/2019 ] [19-5155]--[Edited 06/21/2019 by SHA] (Calderon Lopez, Ricardo) [Entered: 06/20/2019 04:50 PM]
June 20, 2019 APPELLANT BRIEF [1793777] filed by Mr. Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez [Service Date: 06/20/2019 ] Length of Brief: Persuant to FRAP 32(a)(7)(C) and Circuit Rule 32(a), I hereby certify that this opening brief complies with the type-volume llimitation of FRAP 32(a)(7)(B). I hereby certify that this brief complies with the type face requirements of FRAP 32(a)(5).. [19-5155] (Calderon Lopez, Ricardo) [Entered: 06/20/2019 04:20 PM]
June 4, 2019 NOTICE [1791178] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court - motion requesting notice of case (ECF) docket activity [19-5155] [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:24 PM]
May 28, 2019 FIRST CLASS AND CERTIFIED MAIL SENT [1789710] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7017 3380 0000 3149 7001] of order [ # 1789699-5 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 06/27/2019 from Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez. [19-5155] [Entered: 05/28/2019 12:09 PM]
May 28, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1789699] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/17/2019. APPENDIX due 07/17/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5155] [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:58 AM]
May 28, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1789684] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-01111-UNA filed by Mr. Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5155. [19-5155] [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:43 AM]
May 28, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5155] [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:41 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricardo Calderon Lopez v. Melissa Blalock, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scott S. Harris
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Melissa Blalock
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez, doing business as Starlight Consulting Services
Represented By: Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?