David Hill v. FBI
Defendant / Appellee: Federal Bureau of Investigation, (FBI)
Plaintiff / Appellant: David E. Hill
Case Number: 19-5156
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 MOTION [1798990] to extend time to file PLRA submission filed by David E. Hill [Service Date: 07/25/2019 ] Length Certification: 1 page. [19-5156] [Entered: 07/25/2019 12:20 PM]
July 1, 2019 RECEIPT [1795540] received from David Hill [signed for on 06/03/2019] for documents [ # 1789695-2 ] sent to Appellant David E. Hill [19-5156] [Entered: 07/02/2019 03:39 PM]
May 28, 2019 LETTER [1789695] sent to warden sending Clerk order order by warden letter [ # 1789694-4 ], sending Clerk order ifp prisoner submission [ # 1789686-3 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 06/27/2019. [19-5156] [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:52 AM]
May 28, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1789694] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/29/2019. APPENDIX due 07/29/2019, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5156] [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:50 AM]
May 28, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1789686] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 06/27/2019; directing party to file ifp prisoner submissions: APPELLANT prisoner trust account report due 06/27/2019. APPELLANT consent to collection form due 06/27/2019, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5156] [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:43 AM]
May 28, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1789676] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-00704-UNA filed by David E. Hill. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5156. [19-5156] [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:38 AM]
May 28, 2019 US PRISONER CASE docketed. [19-5156] [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:38 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Hill v. FBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Federal Bureau of Investigation, (FBI)
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David E. Hill
Represented By: Warden (Florence USP Ad Max)
Represented By: David E. Hill
Represented By: Warden (Oklahoma City)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?