Lesa Karapondo v. DOL, et al
Respondent / Appellee: Greg Knapp, Department of Labor, R. Alexander Acosta, Secretary of the Department of Labor, Fernald Iron and Seed Work Plant, GH, GG, controlling agents of such plants, in the matter of the claim for compensation benefits for Peter Nick Karapondo as a nuclear worker in the Fernald Plant Atomic Weapons uranium enrichment materials and partic and Patrick Pizzella, Acting Secretary of the Department of Labor
Petitioner / Appellant: Lesa Karapondo, as the natural daughter of Peter Nick Karapondo
Case Number: 19-5160
Filed: May 31, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED [1796086] marked "return to sender - unclaimed - unable to forward". Certified Mail [1790802-2] had been sent to Party Lesa Karapondo. [19-5160] [Entered: 07/08/2019 12:13 PM]
July 2, 2019 MOTION [1795479] to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction (Response to Motion served by hand due on 07/12/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/12/2019) filed by R. Alexander Acosta, DOL, Fernald Iron and Seed Work Plant and Greg Knapp (Service Date: 07/02/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 728. [19-5160] (Field, Brian) [Entered: 07/02/2019 01:20 PM]
July 2, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1795475] filed by R. Alexander Acosta, DOL, Fernald Iron and Seed Work Plant and Greg Knapp [Service Date: 07/02/2019 ] [19-5160] (Field, Brian) [Entered: 07/02/2019 01:14 PM]
July 2, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1795473] filed by Brian Field and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellees R. Alexander Acosta, DOL, Fernald Iron and Seed Work Plant and Greg Knapp. [19-5160] (Field, Brian) [Entered: 07/02/2019 01:13 PM]
June 4, 2019 FIRST CLASS MAIL and CERTIFIED MAIL SENT [1790802] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7017 3380 0000 3149 8657] of order [ # 1790801-6 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 07/05/2019 from Lesa Karapondo. [19-5160] [Entered: 06/04/2019 07:47 AM]
June 4, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1790801] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/05/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/05/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/05/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/05/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/05/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/05/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/05/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/19/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/05/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/05/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/05/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/19/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5160] [Entered: 06/04/2019 07:41 AM]
May 31, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1790346] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-00091-TSC filed by Lesa Karapondo. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5160. [19-5160] [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:10 AM]
May 31, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5160] [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:10 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lesa Karapondo v. DOL, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Greg Knapp
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Brian J. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Department of Labor
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Brian J. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: R. Alexander Acosta, Secretary of the Department of Labor
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Fernald Iron and Seed Work Plant, GH, GG, controlling agents of such plants, in the matter of the claim for compensation benefits for Peter Nick Karapondo as a nuclear worker in the Fernald Plant Atomic Weapons uranium enrichment materials and partic
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Brian J. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Patrick Pizzella, Acting Secretary of the Department of Labor
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Brian J. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Lesa Karapondo, as the natural daughter of Peter Nick Karapondo
Represented By: Lesa Karapondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?