Jean Francis v. Patrick Pizzella
Plaintiff / Appellant: Jean D. Francis
Defendant / Appellee: R. Alexander Acosta, Secretary of Labor and Patrick Pizzella, Acting Secretary of Labor
Case Number: 19-5162
Filed: May 31, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1797859] filed considering notice of non-opposition [ # 1797784-2 ]; granting motion to extend time [ # 1795623-2 ]; APPELLANT docketing statement, certificate as to parties, statement of issues, underlying decision, deferred appendix statement, notice of appearance, transcript status report due 08/08/2019. APPELLANT, APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/08/2019. APPELLANT, APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/22/2019. appellant's failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution [19-5162] [Entered: 07/18/2019 12:19 PM]
July 17, 2019 NOTICE [1797784] of Non-Opposition filed by R. Alexander Acosta [Service Date: 07/17/2019 ] [19-5162] (Cohen, Jason) [Entered: 07/17/2019 07:23 PM]
July 8, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1796062] filed by R. Alexander Acosta [Service Date: 07/08/2019 ] [19-5162] (Cohen, Jason) [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:38 AM]
July 8, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1796050] filed by Jason T. Cohen and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellee R. Alexander Acosta. [19-5162] (Cohen, Jason) [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:21 AM]
July 1, 2019 MOTION [1795623] to extend time to file initial submissions filed by Jean D. Francis (Service Date: 07/01/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 2 pages. [19-5162] [Entered: 07/03/2019 09:56 AM]
June 13, 2019 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1793032] received from Jean D. Francis [signed for on 06/10/2019] for order [1791460-2] sent to Appellant Jean D. Francis [19-5162] [Entered: 06/17/2019 10:11 AM]
June 7, 2019 NOTICE [1791722] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court to supplement record Appeal fees received [19-5162] [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:57 PM]
June 6, 2019 CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1791460] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7017 3380 0000 3149 6837] of order [ # 1791454-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 07/08/2019 from Jean D. Francis. [19-5162] [Entered: 06/06/2019 01:45 PM]
June 6, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1791454] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/08/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/22/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/08/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/08/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/08/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/22/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5162] [Entered: 06/06/2019 01:41 PM]
May 31, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1790664] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:16-cv-00763-RMC filed by Jean D. Francis. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5162. [19-5162] [Entered: 06/03/2019 12:44 PM]
May 31, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5162] [Entered: 06/03/2019 12:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jean Francis v. Patrick Pizzella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jean D. Francis
Represented By: Jean D. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. Alexander Acosta, Secretary of Labor
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Patrick Pizzella, Acting Secretary of Labor
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Jason Todd Cohen Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?