Statewide Bonding, Inc., et al v. DHS, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Statewide Bonding, Inc., Mike Donovan, Nexus Services, Inc. and Big Marco Insurance and Bonding Services, LLC
Defendant / Appellee: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, ICE, Jody M. Prescott, in his official capacity as Associate Legal Advisor, Office of the Principal Legal Advisor, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, in his individual and official capacity as Deputy Director and Senior Official Performing the Duties of Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), United States of America, William Pelham Barr, in his individual and official capacity as Attorney General of the United States, United States Department of Homeland Security, DHS and Kevin K. McAleenan, in his individual capacity as Acting Secretary of U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS)
Case Number: 19-5178
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1801018] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1800978-2 ]; directing response to motion for summary affirmance [ # 1799615-2 ] Response due on 08/22/2019 [19-5178] [Entered: 08/07/2019 10:36 AM]
August 6, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1800978] to extend time to file response to 08/22/2019 filed by Big Marco Insurance and Bonding Services, LLC, Mike Donovan, Nexus Services, Inc. and Statewide Bonding, Inc. Length Certification: 384 words. [19-5178] (Shoreman, John) [Entered: 08/06/2019 08:47 PM]
July 29, 2019 MOTION [1799615] for summary affirmance (Response to Motion served by hand due on 08/08/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 08/08/2019) filed by William Pelham Barr, DHS, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan, Jody M. Prescott, USA and Ronald D. Vitiello (Service Date: 07/29/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail) Length Certification: 3999. [19-5178] (Campbell, Rhonda) [Entered: 07/29/2019 07:46 PM]
July 17, 2019 STATEMENT [1797782] with Disclosure Listing filed by Big Marco Insurance and Bonding Services, LLC, Mike Donovan, Nexus Services, Inc. and Statewide Bonding, Inc. [Service Date: 07/17/2019 ] [19-5178]--[MODIFIED EVENT--Edited 07/18/2019 by LMC] (Shoreman, John) [Entered: 07/17/2019 07:07 PM]
July 17, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1797777] filed by Big Marco Insurance and Bonding Services, LLC, Mike Donovan, Nexus Services, Inc. and Statewide Bonding, Inc. [Service Date: 07/17/2019 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [19-5178] (Shoreman, John) [Entered: 07/17/2019 06:59 PM]
July 17, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1797745] filed by DHS, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan and USA [Service Date: 07/17/2019 ] [19-5178] (Campbell, Rhonda) [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:12 PM]
July 17, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1797744] filed by Rhonda Campbell on behalf of Appellees DHS, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan and USA. [19-5178] (Campbell, Rhonda) [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:12 PM]
July 15, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1797258] submitted by Big Marco Insurance and Bonding Services, LLC, Mike Donovan, Nexus Services, Inc. and Statewide Bonding, Inc. [Service Date: 07/15/2019 ] [19-5178] (Shoreman, John) [Entered: 07/15/2019 06:15 PM]
July 15, 2019 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1797256] filed by Big Marco Insurance and Bonding Services, LLC, Mike Donovan, Nexus Services, Inc. and Statewide Bonding, Inc. [Service Date: 07/15/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-5178] (Shoreman, John) [Entered: 07/15/2019 06:13 PM]
July 15, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1797254] filed by Big Marco Insurance and Bonding Services, LLC, Mike Donovan, Nexus Services, Inc. and Statewide Bonding, Inc. [Service Date: 07/15/2019 ] [19-5178] (Shoreman, John) [Entered: 07/15/2019 06:12 PM]
July 15, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1797252] filed by Big Marco Insurance and Bonding Services, LLC, Mike Donovan, Nexus Services, Inc. and Statewide Bonding, Inc. [Service Date: 07/15/2019 ] [19-5178] (Shoreman, John) [Entered: 07/15/2019 06:09 PM]
July 15, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1797251] filed by Big Marco Insurance and Bonding Services, LLC, Mike Donovan, Nexus Services, Inc. and Statewide Bonding, Inc. [Service Date: 07/15/2019 ] [19-5178] (Shoreman, John) [Entered: 07/15/2019 06:01 PM]
July 15, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1797250] filed by John M. Shoreman on behalf of Appellants Big Marco Insurance and Bonding Services, LLC, Mike Donovan, Nexus Services, Inc. and Statewide Bonding, Inc.. [19-5178] (Shoreman, John) [Entered: 07/15/2019 06:00 PM]
June 14, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1792845] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/15/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/15/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/15/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/15/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/15/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 07/15/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/15/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/15/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/29/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/15/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/15/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/15/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/29/2019 [19-5178] [Entered: 06/14/2019 12:22 PM]
June 14, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1792841] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-02519-JEB filed by Big Marco Insurance and Bonding Services, LLC, Mike Donovan, Nexus Services, Inc. and Statewide Bonding, Inc.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5178. [19-5178] [Entered: 06/14/2019 12:21 PM]
June 14, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5178] [Entered: 06/14/2019 12:14 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Statewide Bonding, Inc., et al v. DHS, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Statewide Bonding, Inc.
Represented By: John Michael Shoreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mike Donovan
Represented By: John Michael Shoreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Nexus Services, Inc.
Represented By: John Michael Shoreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Big Marco Insurance and Bonding Services, LLC
Represented By: John Michael Shoreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, ICE
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jody M. Prescott, in his official capacity as Associate Legal Advisor, Office of the Principal Legal Advisor, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ronald D. Vitiello, in his individual and official capacity as Deputy Director and Senior Official Performing the Duties of Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE)
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States of America
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William Pelham Barr, in his individual and official capacity as Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Homeland Security, DHS
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kevin K. McAleenan, in his individual capacity as Acting Secretary of U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS)
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Rhonda Lisa Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?