Teresita Canuto v. Troy Alexander, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Richard V. Spencer, Secretary of Navy, Woodman-Sylvan Properties, Inc., Bank of America N.A., Kevin K. McAleenan, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, George Pickett, OSM/Command Sergeant Major (U.S. Army Reserve), Mark T. Esper, Secretary of Army, Channing Phillips, United States District Attorney of the District of Columbia, Troy Alexander, Ltc.- Batallion Commander (U.S. Army Reserve), Patrick M. Shanahan, Acting Secretary of Defense, William Pelham Barr, Attorney General of the United States, Cirrus Asset Management, Inc., (Merdian Pointe), Donald J. Trump, Commander in Chief of Army and Navy, Matthew P. Donovan, Acting Secretary of Air Force, Mark T. Esper, Secretary of Defense, Jessie Kong Liu, United States District Attorney of the District of Columbia and Ryan D. McCarthy, Acting Secretary of Army
Plaintiff / Appellant: Teresita A. Canuto
Case Number: 19-5186
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 REPLY [1802635] filed by Teresita A. Canuto to response and RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION filed to Cross Motion [ # 1801662-2 ], [ # 1799969-2 ], [ # 1799969-3 ], [ # 1796998-2 ] [Service Date: 08/16/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 12 pages. [19-5186] [Entered: 08/16/2019 05:04 PM]
August 13, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1801799] filed considering response [ # 1801680-2 ]; granting motion to extend time [ # 1799859-2 ], granting motion to extend time [ # 1801128-2 ]; directing response by federal appellees to motion for summary reversal [ # 1800748-2 ] Response due on 09/17/2019, combined with Federal APPELLEE dispositive motion, if any, due 09/17/2019 [19-5186] [Entered: 08/13/2019 09:36 AM]
August 12, 2019 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1801662] to motion [ # 1800748-2 ] combined with a MOTION for summary affirmance filed by Woodman-Sylvan Properties, Inc. [Service Date: 08/12/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Length Certification: This document complies with the type-volume limit of Fed. R. App. P.27(d)(2)(A) because, excluding the parts of the document exempted by Fed. R. App. P. 32(f), this document contains less than 5200 words. This document complies with the requirement. [19-5186] (Howard, Anne) [Entered: 08/12/2019 02:32 PM]
August 9, 2019 NOTICE [1801861] regarding case status filed by Teresita A. Canuto [Service Date: 08/04/2019 ] [19-5186] [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:28 AM]
August 8, 2019 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1801185] to motion for summary reversal [ # 1800748-2 ] filed by Cirrus Asset Management, Inc. [Service Date: 08/08/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 5,200 words. [19-5186] (Sarner, Craig) [Entered: 08/08/2019 08:55 AM]
August 7, 2019 NOTICE [1801717] regarding case status filed by Teresita A. Canuto [Service Date: 08/04/2019 ] [19-5186] [Entered: 08/12/2019 03:33 PM]
August 7, 2019 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1801680] to motion to extend time, Styled as Motion for Summary Judgment Against Federal Defendants-Appellees [ # 1799859-2 ] filed by Teresita A. Canuto [Service Date: 08/04/2019 by US Mail] Length Certification: 7 pages. [19-5186] [Entered: 08/12/2019 02:42 PM]
August 7, 2019 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1801130] to motion for summary reversal [ # 1800748-2 ] filed by Cirrus Asset Management, Inc. [Service Date: 08/07/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 5200 words. [19-5186] (Sarner, Craig) [Entered: 08/07/2019 03:38 PM]
August 7, 2019 MOTION [1801128] to extend time to file response to 09/17/2019 filed by William Pelham Barr, Matthew P. Donovan, Mark T. Esper, Jessie Kong Liu, Kevin K. McAleenan, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump and Ryan D. McCarthy (Service Date: 08/07/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 435. [19-5186] (Yee, Marsha) [Entered: 08/07/2019 03:28 PM]
August 7, 2019 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1801011] to motion for summary reversal [ # 1800748-2 ] filed by Bank of America N.A. [Service Date: 08/07/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Length Certification: 428. [19-5186] (Ross, David) [Entered: 08/07/2019 10:24 AM]
August 1, 2019 MOTION [1800748] for summary reversal styled as "motion for summary judgment," (Response to Motion served by mail due on 08/12/2019) filed by Teresita A. Canuto (Service Date: 07/29/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 47 Pages. [19-5186] [Entered: 08/05/2019 04:34 PM]
August 1, 2019 SUPPLEMENT [1800192] to motion [ # 1799969-2 ], motion [ # 1799969-3 ] filed by Bank of America N.A. [19-5186] (Ross, David) [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:41 AM]
July 31, 2019 REPLY [1800052] filed by Cirrus Asset Management, Inc. to response [ # 1799306-2 ] [Service Date: 07/31/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: Less than 5200 words. [19-5186] (Sarner, Craig) [Entered: 07/31/2019 04:02 PM]
July 31, 2019 MOTION [1800040] to strike the brief filed by Cirrus Asset Management, Inc. (Service Date: 07/31/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: Less than 5200 words. [19-5186] (Sarner, Craig) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:28 PM]
July 31, 2019 MOTION [1799969] for summary affirmance (Response to Motion served by hand due on 08/12/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 08/12/2019), for sanctions filed by Bank of America N.A. (Service Date: 07/31/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail) Length Certification: 1,912. [19-5186] (Ross, David) [Entered: 07/31/2019 12:30 PM]
July 30, 2019 MOTION [1799859] to extend time to file motion to 09/17/2019 filed by William Pelham Barr, Mark T. Esper, Jessie Kong Liu, Kevin K. McAleenan, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, Matthew P. Donovan and Ryan D. McCarthy (Service Date: 07/30/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail) Length Certification: 439. [19-5186] (Yee, Marsha) [Entered: 07/30/2019 06:13 PM]
July 26, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1799281] filed by Anne K. Howard, Esquire on behalf of Appellee Woodman-Sylvan Properties, Inc.. [19-5186] (Howard, Anne) [Entered: 07/26/2019 01:12 PM]
July 24, 2019 AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX [1799310] filed by Teresita A. Canuto. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date:07/21/2019 ] [19-5186] [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:31 PM]
July 24, 2019 AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL APPELLANT BRIEF [1799308] filed by Teresita A. Canuto [Service Date: 07/21/2019 ] Length of Brief: 47 Pages. [19-5186] [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:24 PM]
July 24, 2019 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1799306] to motion for summary affirmance [ # 1796998-2 ] filed by Teresita A. Canuto [Service Date: 07/22/2019 by US Mail] Length Certification: 29 Pages. [19-5186] [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:11 PM]
July 22, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1798438] filed by William Pelham Barr, Matthew P. Donovan, Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Channing Phillips, Patrick M. Shanahan, Richard V. Spencer and Donald J. Trump [Service Date: 07/22/2019 ] [19-5186] (Yee, Marsha) [Entered: 07/22/2019 06:35 PM]
July 22, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1798437] filed by Marsha W. Yee and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellees William Pelham Barr, Matthew P. Donovan, Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Channing Phillips, Patrick M. Shanahan, Richard V. Spencer and Donald J. Trump. [19-5186] (Yee, Marsha) [Entered: 07/22/2019 06:34 PM]
July 19, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1798009] filed by Bank of America N.A. [Service Date: 07/19/2019 ] [19-5186] (Ross, David) [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:53 AM]
July 19, 2019 STATEMENT [1798004] with Disclosure Listing filed by Bank of America N.A. [Service Date: 07/19/2019 ] [19-5186] (Ross, David) [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:51 AM]
July 19, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1797998] filed by David M. Ross on behalf of Appellee Bank of America N.A.. [19-5186] (Ross, David) [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:44 AM]
July 17, 2019 NOTICE [1798135] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for payment of docketing fee [Case Number 19-5186: Fee Paid] [19-5186] [Entered: 07/19/2019 03:28 PM]
July 17, 2019 CORRECTED APPENDIX [1798123] filed by Teresita A. Canuto. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 07/14/2019 ] [19-5186] [Entered: 07/19/2019 03:00 PM]
July 12, 2019 MOTION [1796998] for summary affirmance (Response to Motion served by hand due on 07/22/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/22/2019) filed by Cirrus Asset Management, Inc. (Service Date: 07/12/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 3213 Words. [19-5186] (Sarner, Craig) [Entered: 07/12/2019 03:40 PM]
July 11, 2019 MOTION [1796845] for summary affirmance (Response to Motion served by hand due on 07/22/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/22/2019) filed by Cirrus Asset Management, Inc. (Service Date: 07/11/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 3213 Words. [19-5186] (Sarner, Craig) [Entered: 07/11/2019 03:57 PM]
July 11, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1796840] filed by Cirrus Asset Management, Inc. [Service Date: 07/11/2019 ] [19-5186] (Sarner, Craig) [Entered: 07/11/2019 03:51 PM]
July 11, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1796837] filed by Craig L. Sarner on behalf of Appellee Cirrus Asset Management, Inc.. [19-5186] (Sarner, Craig) [Entered: 07/11/2019 03:49 PM]
July 10, 2019 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1796590] received from Teresita Canuto [signed for on 07/05/2019] for order [1794017-2] sent to Appellant Teresita A. Canuto [19-5186] [Entered: 07/10/2019 11:50 AM]
July 10, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1796583] to Appellant/Petitioner brief [ # 1796580-2 ], appendix [ # 1796581-2 ], statement [ # 1796560-2 ] filed by Teresita A. Canuto. [19-5186] [Entered: 07/10/2019 11:26 AM]
July 8, 2019 APPENDIX [1796581] filed by Teresita A. Canuto. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 07/05/2019 ] [19-5186] [Entered: 07/10/2019 11:25 AM]
July 8, 2019 APPELLANT BRIEF [1796580] filed by Teresita A. Canuto [Service Date: 07/05/2019 ] Length of Brief: 38 Pages. [19-5186] [Entered: 07/10/2019 11:23 AM]
July 8, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1796560] filed by Teresita A. Canuto [Service Date: 07/05/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-5186] [Entered: 07/10/2019 10:56 AM]
July 8, 2019 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1796557] filed by Teresita A. Canuto [Service Date: 07/05/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-5186] [Entered: 07/10/2019 10:49 AM]
July 8, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1796556] filed by Teresita A. Canuto. [19-5186] [Entered: 07/10/2019 10:47 AM]
July 8, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1796554] filed by Teresita A. Canuto [Service Date: 07/05/2019 ] [19-5186] [Entered: 07/10/2019 10:44 AM]
June 21, 2019 CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1794017] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7017 3380 0000 3149 6868] of order [ # 1794016-2 ], [ # 1794014-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 07/22/2019 from Teresita A. Canuto. [19-5186] [Entered: 06/21/2019 03:43 PM]
June 21, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1794016] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/22/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/22/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/22/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/22/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/22/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 07/22/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/22/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/22/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 08/05/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/22/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/22/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/22/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/05/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5186] [Entered: 06/21/2019 03:38 PM]
June 21, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1794014] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 07/22/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5186] [Entered: 06/21/2019 03:35 PM]
June 21, 2019 LETTER [1794007] sent regarding attorney membership to Kevin Patrick Farrell for Bank of America N.A.. Application for Admission due 07/22/2019. [19-5186] [Entered: 06/21/2019 03:28 PM]
June 21, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1794004] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:16-cv-02282-EGS filed by Teresita A. Canuto. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5186. [19-5186] [Entered: 06/21/2019 03:24 PM]
June 21, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5186] [Entered: 06/21/2019 03:23 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teresita Canuto v. Troy Alexander, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Richard V. Spencer, Secretary of Navy
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Woodman-Sylvan Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Kelley Howard
Represented By: Anne Kelley Howard Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Farrell
Represented By: David M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kevin K. McAleenan, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: George Pickett, OSM/Command Sergeant Major (U.S. Army Reserve)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mark T. Esper, Secretary of Army
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Channing Phillips, United States District Attorney of the District of Columbia
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Troy Alexander, Ltc.- Batallion Commander (U.S. Army Reserve)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Patrick M. Shanahan, Acting Secretary of Defense
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William Pelham Barr, Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cirrus Asset Management, Inc., (Merdian Pointe)
Represented By: Craig L. Sarner Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Donald J. Trump, Commander in Chief of Army and Navy
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Matthew P. Donovan, Acting Secretary of Air Force
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mark T. Esper, Secretary of Defense
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jessie Kong Liu, United States District Attorney of the District of Columbia
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ryan D. McCarthy, Acting Secretary of Army
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Teresita A. Canuto
Represented By: Teresita A. Canuto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?