In re: Navy Chaplaincy
Defendant / Appellee: Richard V. Spencer, Secretary of the U.S. Navy, John B. Nowell, Vice Admiral, Chief of Naval Personnel, United States Navy, Secretary of the Navy, Brent W. Scott, Rear Admiral, Chief of Chaplains and Deputy Chief of Chaplains
Plaintiff / Appellant: David L. Gibson, William C. Blair, David S. Wilder, Thomas G. Klappert, 06-1696, Joseph E. Dufour, 06-1696, Rafael J. Quiles, Rick P. Bradley, 06-1696, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Jairo Marino, 06-1696, Armando Torralva, 06-1696, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, 06-1696, Frank Klapach, 06-1696, Gregory R. De Marco, Furniss Harkness, Samuel David Kirk, 06-1696, Patrick T. Doney, 06-1696, Richard F. Hamme, 00-0566, George P. Byrum, Jan C. Kohlmann, 06-1696, David Mitchell, 06-1696, Martha Carson, Andrew Calhoun, 06-1696, Richard L. Arnold, John Gordy, 06-1696, Chris Xenakis, 06-1696, Gary Paul Stewart, 06-1696, Frank Johnson, 06-1696, Lloyd Scott, 06-1696, George W. Linzey, Timothy J. Demy, 06-1696, Thomas R. Watson, 06-1696, Larry Farrell, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., 06-1696, James Looby, 06-1696, Denise Y. Merritt, Timothy D. Nall, Robert L. Hendricks, 06-1696, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Lavelle, Alan Garner, 06-1696, Thomas Rush, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., 06-1696, Wilson W. Wineman, 06-1696, Michael A. Wright, Gary Heinke, 06-1696, Mary Helen Spalding, William A. Hatch, Jr., 06-1696, Michael Belt, Daniel E. Roysden, James M. Weibling, Laurence W. Jones, 06-1696, Glenn Thyrion, 06-1696, Barby Earl Wilson and Allen Lancaster, 06-1696
Plaintiff / Appellee: Associated Gospel Churches, John Witherspoon, Chaplaincy of Full Gospel Churches, Robert Duane Purser, Lieutenant Commander, Mark R. Johnston and Robert H. Adair
In Re: In re: Navy Chaplaincy
Case Number: 19-5206
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 NOTICE [1805002] Appellants Will Not File a Dispositive Motion filed by Associated Gospel Churches in 19-5204, Richard L. Arnold, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright and Chris Xenakis in 19-5206 [Service Date: 09/04/2019 ] [19-5204, 19-5206] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 09/04/2019 05:00 PM]
September 2, 2019 REPLY [1804526] filed by Associated Gospel Churches in 19-5204, Richard L. Arnold, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright and Chris Xenakis in 19-5206 to response [ # 1803677-2 ] [Service Date: 09/02/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1921 words. [19-5204, 19-5206] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 09/02/2019 11:56 PM]
August 26, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1803764] for motion for other relief [ # 1803535-2 ] filed by Associated Gospel Churches in 19-5204, Richard L. Arnold, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright and Chris Xenakis in 19-5206. [19-5204, 19-5206] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 08/26/2019 07:38 PM]
August 26, 2019 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1803677] to motion [ # 1803535-2 ] filed by Deputy Chief of Chaplains, John B. Nowell, Brent W. Scott, Secretary of the Navy, Richard V. Spencer and United States Navy in 19-5204, 19-5206 [Service Date: 08/26/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 499. [19-5204, 19-5206] (Soni, Sushma) [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:00 PM]
August 23, 2019 MOTION [1803535] Procedural Motion to Separate Associated Gospel Churches appeal from remaining 54 Navy chaplains filed by Associated Gospel Churches in 19-5204, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Andrew Calhoun, Richard L. Arnold, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright and Chris Xenakis in 19-5206 (Service Date: 08/23/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 7 pages (including Certificateof Service). [19-5204, 19-5206] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 08/23/2019 11:56 PM]
August 23, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT AND STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1803534] filed by Associated Gospel Churches and Denise Y. Merritt and Daniel E. Roysden in 19-5204, Richard L. Arnold, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright and Chris Xenakis in 19-5206 [Service Date: 08/23/2019 ] [19-5204, 19-5206]--[Edited 08/26/2019 by LMF] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 08/23/2019 11:32 PM]
August 23, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1803524] filed by United States Navy, Richard V. Spencer, Secretary of the Navy, Brent W. Scott, John B. Nowell and Deputy Chief of Chaplains in 19-5204, 19-5206 [Service Date: 08/23/2019 ] [19-5204, 19-5206] (Soni, Sushma) [Entered: 08/23/2019 06:41 PM]
August 23, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES, DEFERRED APPENDIX STATEMENT, UNDERLYING DECISION AND TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1803511] filed by Richard L. Arnold, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, George P. Byrum, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Larry Farrell, David L. Gibson, Furniss Harkness, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, Denise Y. Merritt, Timothy D. Nall, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Mary Helen Spalding, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Michael A. Wright, All Gibson Plaintiffs and Associated Gospel Churches [Service Date: 08/23/2019 ] [19-5204]--[Edited 08/26/2019 by LMF] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 08/23/2019 04:54 PM]
August 1, 2019 LETTER [1800342] Correct ECM Party/attorney list and Party filer menu to reflect Notice of Appeal filed by Associated Gospel Churches in 19-5204, Richard L. Arnold, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright, Chris Xenakis and Ray A. Bailey in 19-5206 [Service Date: 08/01/2019 ] [19-5204, 19-5206] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 08/01/2019 06:43 PM]
July 30, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1799864] filed by Arthur A. Schulcz Sr. on behalf of Appellants Richard L. Arnold, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright and Chris Xenakis in 19-5206. [19-5206, 19-5204] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:35 PM]
July 30, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1799858] filed by Arthur A. Schulcz Sr. on behalf of Appellant Associated Gospel Churches. [19-5204] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 07/30/2019 06:03 PM]
July 25, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1799179] filed by Sushma Soni and co-counsel Marleigh Dover on behalf of Appellees Deputy Chief of Chaplains, John B. Nowell, Brent W. Scott, Secretary of the Navy, Richard V. Spencer and United States Navy in 19-5204, 19-5206. [19-5204, 19-5206] (Soni, Sushma) [Entered: 07/25/2019 07:27 PM]
July 24, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1798897] filed consolidating cases 19-5206 (Consolidation started 07/24/2019) with 19-5204; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 08/23/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 08/23/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 08/23/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 08/23/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 08/23/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 08/23/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 08/23/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 08/23/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 09/09/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 08/23/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 08/23/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/23/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 09/09/2019 [19-5204, 19-5206] [Entered: 07/24/2019 05:26 PM]
July 24, 2019 NOTICE [1798861] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court of ERRATA to page 3 of Notice of Appeal. [19-5206] [Entered: 07/24/2019 04:27 PM]
July 24, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1798854] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:07-mc-00269-JDB filed by Richard L. Arnold, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright and Chris Xenakis. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5206. [19-5206] [Entered: 07/24/2019 04:09 PM]
July 24, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5206] [Entered: 07/24/2019 04:08 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Navy Chaplaincy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Richard V. Spencer, Secretary of the U.S. Navy
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Marleigh D. Dover
Represented By: Sushma Soni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John B. Nowell, Vice Admiral, Chief of Naval Personnel
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Marleigh D. Dover
Represented By: Sushma Soni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Navy
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Marleigh D. Dover
Represented By: Sushma Soni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Secretary of the Navy
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Marleigh D. Dover
Represented By: Sushma Soni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brent W. Scott, Rear Admiral, Chief of Chaplains
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Marleigh D. Dover
Represented By: Sushma Soni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deputy Chief of Chaplains
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Marleigh D. Dover
Represented By: Sushma Soni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David L. Gibson
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: William C. Blair
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David S. Wilder
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Thomas G. Klappert, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joseph E. Dufour, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Rafael J. Quiles
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Rick P. Bradley, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cynthia Palmer Prince
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jairo Marino, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Armando Torralva, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Frank Klapach, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gregory R. De Marco
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Furniss Harkness
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Samuel David Kirk, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Patrick T. Doney, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Richard F. Hamme, 00-0566
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: George P. Byrum
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jan C. Kohlmann, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Mitchell, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Martha Carson
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Andrew Calhoun, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Richard L. Arnold
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John Gordy, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Chris Xenakis, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gary Paul Stewart, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Frank Johnson, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lloyd Scott, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: George W. Linzey
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Timothy J. Demy, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Thomas R. Watson, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Larry Farrell
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Walker E. Marsh, Jr., 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James Looby, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Denise Y. Merritt
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Timothy D. Nall
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robert L. Hendricks, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ray A. Bailey
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Lavelle
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alan Garner, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Thomas Rush
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Fred A. Thompson, Jr., 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Wilson W. Wineman, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael A. Wright
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gary Heinke, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mary Helen Spalding
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: William A. Hatch, Jr., 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Belt
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Daniel E. Roysden
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James M. Weibling
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Laurence W. Jones, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Glenn Thyrion, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Barby Earl Wilson
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Allen Lancaster, 06-1696
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Associated Gospel Churches
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: John Witherspoon
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Chaplaincy of Full Gospel Churches
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Robert Duane Purser, Lieutenant Commander
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mark R. Johnston
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Robert H. Adair
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In re: Navy Chaplaincy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?