Shands Jacksonville Medical, et al v. Alex Azar, II
Plaintiff / Appellee: Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc., doing business as UFHealth Shands Hospital, San Joaquin Community Hospital, 14cv1477, doing business as Adventist Health/San Joaquin Community Hospital, Northeast Georgia Medical Center, 14cv503, Albany Memorial Hospital, 14-cv-536, Westchester County Health Corporation, 14cv503, Long Beach Memorial Medical Center, 15-cv-01601, doing business as Long Beach Memorial Medical Center, doing business as MemorialCare Long Beach Medical Center & MemorialCare Miller Children's and Women's Hospital Long Beach, AHMC Monterey Park Hospital LP, 14cv1477, doing business as Monterey Park Hospital, Flower Mound Hospital Partners, LLC, 15-cv-01793, doing business as Texas Health Presbyterian Hospital Flower Mound, AHMC San Gabriel Valley Medical Center LP, 14cv1477, doing business as San Gabriel Valley Medical Center, Adirondack Health Services, Inc., 14-cv-536 ; 15-cv-01150, doing business as Glens Falls Hospital, Metroplex Adventist Hospital, Inc., doing business as Metroplex Adventist Hospital, 15cv192, Adventist Bolingbrook Hospital, 15cv192, Saddleback Memorial Medical Center, 15-cv-01601, American Hospital Association, 14cv607, Aurora Health Care Southern Lakes, Inc., 14cv1477, doing business as Aurora Memorial Hospital of Burlington, doing business as Aurora Lakeland Medical Center, doing business as Aurora Medical Center - Kenosha, doing business as Aurora Medical Center, Adventist Health System-Sunbelt, Inc., doing business as Central Texas Medical Center, Florida Hospital Orlando, and Florida Hospital Heartland Medical Center, 15cv192, Delnor-Community Hospital, 14cv1477, doing business as Delnor Hospital, Bay Area Medical Center, Inc., 17-39, Memorial Hospital, Inc., doing business as Manchester Memorial Hospital, 15cv192, Oakbend Medical Center, 14cv503, Emory-Adventist, Inc., 15cv192, doing business as Emory-Adventist Hospital, Midland County Hospital District, 14cv503, doing business as Midland Memorial Hospital, Alta Los Angeles Hospitals, Inc., 14-cv-536, doing business as Los Angeles Community Hospital, Sonora Community Hospital, 14cv1477, doing business as Sonora Regional Medical Center, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, 14cv503, Jellico Community Hospital, doing business as Littleton Adventist Hospital, 15cv192, AHMC Whittier Hospital Medical Center LP, 14cv1477, doing business as Whittier Hospital Medical Center, Aurora Health Care Central, Inc., 14cv1477, doing business as Aurora Sheboygan Memorial Medical Center, Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc., doing business as Takoma Regional Hospital, 15cv192, Asante Rouge Valley Medical Center, 16-cv-01543, Tarpon Springs Hospital Foundation, Inc., doing business as Florida Hospital North Pinellas, 15cv192, Ahmc Monterey Park Hospital LP, 17-39, doing business as Monterey Park Hospital, Florida Hospital Zephyrhills, Inc., doing business as Florida Hospital Zephyrhills, 15cv192, Castle Medical Center, 14cv1477, Wake Forest Baptist Medical Center, 14cv607, Feather River Hospital, 14cv1477, doing business as Adventist Health/feather River Hospital, Memorial Hospital Flagler, Inc., doing business as Florida Hospital Flagler, 15cv192, Central Valley General Hospital, 14cv1477, Aurora Health Care Central, Inc., 17-39, doing business as Aurora Sheboygan Memorial Medical Center, New Jersey Hospital Association, 14cv607, Banner Health, 14cv607, Physicians Medical Center, LLC, 15-cv-01793, doing business as Texas Health Center for Diagnostics and Surgery, Portercare Adventist Health System, doing business as Porter Adventist Hospital, Castle Rock Adventist Hospital, Parker Adventist Hospital and Avista Adventist Hospital, 15cv192, Allina Health System, 14-cv-536, doing business as Mercy Hospital, doing business as Abbott Northwestern Hospital, doing business as Buffalo Hospital, doing business as Cambridge Medical Center, doing business as Owatonna Hospital, doing business as, Southwest Volusia Healthcare Corporation, doing business as Florida Hospital Fish Memorial, 15cv192, Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services, 14cv1477, doing business as Simi Valley Hospital, CAMC Teays Valley Hospital, Inc., 15cv192, SwedishAmerican Hospital, 14cv503, Fayette Regional Health System, 14cv503, doing business as Uniontown Hospital, Dignity Health, 14-cv-536, doing business as Arroyo Grande Community Hospital, doing business as California Hospital Medical Center, doing business as Catholic Healthcare West, doing business as Dominican Hospital, doing business as French Hospital M, Healthcare Association of New York, 14cv607, Aurora Medical Center Grafton, LLC, 17-39, doing business as Aurora Medical Center Grafton, Floyd Healthcare Management, Inc., 14cv503, doing business as Floyd Medical Center, Alhambra Hospital Medical Center Lp, 14cv1477, doing business as Alhambra Hospital Medical Center, Alegent Creighton Health, 14-cv-536, doing business as Alegent Creighton Health Midlands Hospital, doing business as Alegent Creighton Health Lakeside Hospital, Mercy Hospital, Iowa City, Iowa, 14cv503, AHMC Garfield Medical Center LP, 14cv1477, doing business as Greater El Monte Community Hospital, Memorial Health Systems, Inc., doing business as Florida Hospital Memorial Medical Center, 15cv192, Medical Center of Central Georgia, Inc., 14cv503, Charleston Area Medical Center, Inc., 15cv192, Alegent Health - Immanuel Medical Center, 14-cv-536, Aurora Health Care Metro, Inc., 14cv1477, doing business as Aurora West Allis Medical Center, State University of Iowa, 14cv503, doing business as University of Iowa Hospitals and Clinics, Rockwall Regional Center, LLC, 15-cv-01793, doing business as Texas Health Presbyterian Hospital Rockwall, Gwinnett Hospital System Inc., 14cv503, Atlanticare Regional Medical Center, Inc., 14-cv-536, Carilion Medical Center, 15cv192, Carilion New River Valley Medical Center, 15cv192, Lubbock County Hospital District, 14cv503, doing business as University Medical Center, Alegent Creighton Health Creighton University Medical Center, LLC, 14-cv-536, Alton Memorial Hospital, 14-cv-536, Carilion Franklin Memorial Hospital, 15cv192, Aurora Health Care North, Inc., 14cv1477, doing business as Aurora Medical Center Manitowoc County, Community Hospital of Brazosport, 14cv503, doing business as Brazosport Regional Health System, Baycare Aurora, LLC, 14cv1477, doing business as Aurora Baycare Medical Center, Hanford Community Hospital, 14cv1477, doing business as Adventist Medical Center - Reedley, Memorial Hospital-West Volusia, Inc., doing business as Florida Hospital Deland, 15cv192, Adventist Hinsdale Hospital, 15cv192, Board of Trustees of North Kansas City Hospital, 14cv503, doing business as North Kansas City Hospital, Gundersen Lutheran Medical Center, Inc., 14cv503, Southlake Specialty Hospital, LLC, 15-cv-01793, doing business as Texas Health Harris Methodist Hospital Southlake, Walla Walla General Hospital, 14cv1477, doing business as Adventist Health/Walla General Hospital, IHC Health Services, Inc., doing business as Alta View Hospital, American Fork Hospital, Bear River Valley Hospital, Dixie Regional Medical Center, Intermountain Medical Center, LDS Hospital, Logan Regional Hospital, Mckay-Dee Hospital, and Park City, Alegent Health - Bergan Mercy Health System, 14-cv-536, doing business as Alegent Health Bergan Mercy Medical Center, doing business as Mercy Hospital, Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc., doing business as UF Health Jacksonville, White Memorial Medical Center, 14cv1477, doing business as White Memorial Medical Center, Hospital and Healthsystem Association of Pennsylvania, 14cv607, Bakersfield Heart Hospital, 14cv976, Portland Adventist Medical Center, 14cv1477, doing business as Adventist Medical Center - Portland, Orange Coast Memorial Medical Center, 15-cv-01601, Copley Memorial Hospital, 14cv503, University Community Hospital, Inc., doing business as Florida Hospital Carrollwood, and Florida Hospital Tampa, 15cv192, Martin Health System, 14cv503, doing business as Martin Memorial Medical Center, West Allis Memorial Hospital, Inc., 14cv1477, doing business as Aurora West Allis Medical Center, Aurora Medical Center of Washington County, Inc., 14cv1477, doing business as Aurora Medical Center Washington County, Riverside Medical Center, 14cv503, Parkview Medical Center, Inc., 14cv503, Reedley Community Hospital, 14cv1477, Einstein Healthcare Network, 14cv607, Ukiah Adventist Hospital, 14cv1477, doing business as Ukiah Valley Medical Center, Aurora Medical Center Of Oshkosh, Inc., 14cv1477, doing business as Aurora Medical Center Grafton, Fletcher Hospital, Inc., doing business as Park Ridge Community Hospital, 15cv192, Athens Regional Medical Center Inc, 14cv503, Adventist Health System Georgia, Inc., doing business as Gordon Hospital, 15cv192, AHMC Anaheim Regional Medical Center LP, 14cv1477, doing business as AHMC Anaheim Regional Medical Center LP, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, 16-cv-01543, Carilion Tazewell Community Hospital, 15cv192, Shawnee Mission Medical Center, Inc., doing business as Shawnee Mission Medical Center, 15cv192, Henry Ford Health System, doing business as Henry Ford Hospital, Henry Ford Wyandotte Hospital, Henry Ford Macomb Hospital, and Henry Ford West Bloomfield Hospital, 15cv192, Chattanooga Hamiliton County Hospital Authority, 14cv503, doing business as Erlanger Medical Center, West Allis Memorial Hospital, Inc., 14cv1477, Bakersfield Memorial Hospital, 14-cv-536, St. Helena Hospital, 14cv1477, doing business as St. Helena Hospital Napa Valley, Mount Sinai Hospital, 14cv607, Central Dupage Hospital Association, 14cv1477, doing business as Central Dupage Hospital, Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, 14cv503, doing business as University of Virginia Medical Center, Regional Medical Center of Orangeburg and Calhoun Counties, 14cv503, Glendale Adventist Medical Center, 14cv1477, doing business as Adventist Health/Glendale Adventist Medical Center, Florida Hospital Waterman, Inc., doing business as Florida Hospital Waterman, 15cv192, Adventist Glenoaks Hospital, 15cv192, Pasco-Pinellas Hillsborough Community Health System, Inc., doing business as Florida Hospital Wesley Chapel, 15cv192, Greater New York Hospital Association, 14cv607, Texas Health Huguley, Inc., doing business as Texas Health Huguley Hospital, 15cv192 and University Medical Center At Lafayette, 15-cv-01800
Plaintiff / Appellant: Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, 14cv1477, doing business as Dekalb Regional Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, 14cv1477, doing business as Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Lafayette General Medical Center, 15-cv-01800, Longmont United Hospital, 15-cv-01800, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, 14cv1477, doing business as Forrest City Medical Center, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., 14cv1477, doing business as Crestwood Medical Center, Willis-Knighton Medical Center, 15-cv-01800, Parma Community General Hospital, 15-cv-01800, Foley Hospital Corporation, 14cv1477, Indian River Memorial Hospital, 15-cv-01800, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, 14cv1477, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, 15-cv-01800, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., 14cv1477, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center, 15-cv-01800, Denver Health, 15-cv-01800, Bullhead City Hospital Corporation, 14cv1477, doing business as Western Arizona Regional Medical Center, Asante Three Rivers Medical Center, 16-cv-00032, Payson Hospital Corporation, 14cv1477, doing business as Payson Regional Medical Center, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, 15-cv-01800, doing business as Bayfront Health St. Petersburg, Shannon Medical Center, 16-cv-00032, MCSA, LLC, 15-cv-01800, doing business as Medical Center of South Arkansas, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, 16-cv-00032, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., 15-cv-01800, doing business as Harris Hospital, American Legion Hospital, 15-cv-01800, EMH Elyria Medical Center, 15-cv-01800, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, 16-cv-00032, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., 15-cv-01800, doing business as Lodi Memorial Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, 15-cv-01800, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, 14cv1477, doing business as Oro Valley Hospital, Van Buren HMA, LLC, 14cv1477, doing business as Summit Medical Center, Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, 14cv1477, doing business as Northwest Medical Center - Springdale, UH Regional Hospitals, 15-cv-01800, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, 15-cv-01800, Asante Rouge Valley Medical Center, 16-cv-00032, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, 14cv1477, doing business as Mat-Su Regional Medical Center, Northwest Hospital, LLC, 14cv1477, doing business as Northwest Medical Center, Affinity Hospital, LLC, 14cv1477, doing business as Trinity Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, 15-cv-01800, Greenville Hospital Corporation, 14cv1477, doing business as L.V. Stabler Memorial Hospital, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, 15-cv-01800, doing business as Bayfront Health Punta Gorda, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, 15-cv-01800, Antelope Valley Hospital, 15-cv-01800, Anniston Hma, LLC, 14cv1477, doing business as Stringfellow Memorial Hospital, Centre Hospital Corporation, 14cv1477, doing business as Cherokee Medical Center, Triad of Alabama, LLC, 14cv1477 and Fort Smith Hma, LLC, 15-cv-01800, doing business as Sparks Regional Medical Center
Defendant / Appellee: Alex Michael Azar, II, Secretary of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 19-5227
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1812123] filed granting appellee's unopposed motion to amend the briefing schedule [ # 1811377-2 ], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLEE Brief due on 12/16/2019. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 01/16/2020. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 01/23/2020. Final Briefs due 02/06/2020. [19-5087, 19-5227] [Entered: 10/23/2019 11:50 AM]
October 18, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1811377] to extend time to file brief to 12/16/2019 filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II in 19-5087, 19-5227 [Service Date: 10/18/2019 ] Length Certification: 531 words. [19-5087, 19-5227] (Pulham, Thomas) [Entered: 10/18/2019 11:34 AM]
September 30, 2019 SEPARATE STATUTORY ADDENDUM [1808708] filed by Adirondack Health Services, Inc., Adventist Bolingbrook Hospital, Adventist Glenoaks Hospital, Adventist Health System Georgia, Inc., Adventist Health System-Sunbelt, Inc., Adventist Hinsdale Hospital, AHMC Anaheim Regional Medical Center LP, AHMC Garfield Medical Center LP, AHMC Monterey Park Hospital LP, Ahmc Monterey Park Hospital LP, AHMC San Gabriel Valley Medical Center LP, AHMC Whittier Hospital Medical Center LP, Albany Memorial Hospital, Alegent Creighton Health, Alegent Creighton Health Creighton University Medical Center, LLC, Alegent Health - Bergan Mercy Health System, Alegent Health - Immanuel Medical Center, Alhambra Hospital Medical Center Lp, Allina Health System, Alta Los Angeles Hospitals, Inc., Alton Memorial Hospital, American Hospital Association, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Rouge Valley Medical Center, Athens Regional Medical Center Inc, Atlanticare Regional Medical Center, Inc., Aurora Health Care Central, Inc., Aurora Health Care Central, Inc., Aurora Health Care Metro, Inc., Aurora Health Care North, Inc., Aurora Health Care Southern Lakes, Inc., Aurora Medical Center Grafton, LLC, Aurora Medical Center Of Oshkosh, Inc., Aurora Medical Center of Washington County, Inc., Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II, Bakersfield Heart Hospital, Bakersfield Memorial Hospital, Banner Health, Bay Area Medical Center, Inc., Baycare Aurora, LLC, Board of Trustees of North Kansas City Hospital, CAMC Teays Valley Hospital, Inc., Carilion Franklin Memorial Hospital, Carilion Medical Center, Carilion New River Valley Medical Center, Carilion Tazewell Community Hospital, Castle Medical Center, Central Dupage Hospital Association, Central Valley General Hospital, Charleston Area Medical Center, Inc., Chattanooga Hamiliton County Hospital Authority, Community Hospital of Brazosport, Copley Memorial Hospital, Delnor-Community Hospital, Dignity Health, Einstein Healthcare Network, Emory-Adventist, Inc., Fayette Regional Health System, Feather River Hospital, Fletcher Hospital, Inc., Florida Hospital Waterman, Inc., Florida Hospital Zephyrhills, Inc., Flower Mound Hospital Partners, LLC, Floyd Healthcare Management, Inc., Glendale Adventist Medical Center, Greater New York Hospital Association, Gundersen Lutheran Medical Center, Inc., Gwinnett Hospital System Inc., Hanford Community Hospital, Healthcare Association of New York, Henry Ford Health System, Hospital and Healthsystem Association of Pennsylvania, IHC Health Services, Inc., Jellico Community Hospital, Long Beach Memorial Medical Center, Lubbock County Hospital District, Martin Health System, Medical Center of Central Georgia, Inc., Memorial Health Systems, Inc., Memorial Hospital Flagler, Inc., Memorial Hospital, Inc., Memorial Hospital-West Volusia, Inc., Mercy Hospital, Iowa City, Iowa, Metroplex Adventist Hospital, Inc., Midland County Hospital District, Mount Sinai Hospital, New Jersey Hospital Association, Northeast Georgia Medical Center, Oakbend Medical Center, Orange Coast Memorial Medical Center, Parkview Medical Center, Inc., Pasco-Pinellas Hillsborough Community Health System, Inc., Physicians Medical Center, LLC, Portercare Adventist Health System, Portland Adventist Medical Center, Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, Reedley Community Hospital, Regional Medical Center of Orangeburg and Calhoun Counties, Riverside Medical Center, Rockwall Regional Center, LLC, Saddleback Memorial Medical Center, San Joaquin Community Hospital, Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc., Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc., Shawnee Mission Medical Center, Inc., Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services, Sonora Community Hospital, Southlake Specialty Hospital, LLC, Southwest Volusia Healthcare Corporation, St. Helena Hospital, State University of Iowa, SwedishAmerican Hospital, Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc., Tarpon Springs Hospital Foundation, Inc., Texas Health Huguley, Inc., Ukiah Adventist Hospital, University Community Hospital, Inc., University Medical Center At Lafayette, University of Kansas Hospital Authority, Wake Forest Baptist Medical Center, Walla Walla General Hospital, West Allis Memorial Hospital, Inc., West Allis Memorial Hospital, Inc., Westchester County Health Corporation, White Memorial Medical Center and Affinity Hospital, LLC, American Legion Hospital, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Rouge Valley Medical Center, Asante Three Rivers Medical Center, Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC, Bullhead City Hospital Corporation, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center and Willis-Knighton Medical Center to Appellant/Petitioner brief [ # 1808707-2 ] [Service Date:09/30/2019 ] [19-5087] (Rubin, Lori) [Entered: 09/30/2019 06:39 PM]
September 30, 2019 APPELLANT BRIEF [1808707] filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, American Legion Hospital, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Rouge Valley Medical Center, Asante Three Rivers Medical Center, Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC, Bullhead City Hospital Corporation, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, MCSA, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center and Willis-Knighton Medical Center [Service Date: 09/30/2019 ] Length of Brief: 11,500 words. [19-5087] (Rubin, Lori) [Entered: 09/30/2019 06:34 PM]
August 30, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1804401] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 09/30/2019. APPELLEES Brief(s) due on 10/30/2019. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 11/20/2019. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 11/27/2019. Final Briefs due 12/11/2019. [19-5087, 19-5227] [Entered: 08/30/2019 12:28 PM]
August 28, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1804115] filed consolidating cases 19-5227 (Consolidation started 08/28/2019) with 19-5087 [19-5087, 19-5227] [Entered: 08/28/2019 04:32 PM]
August 28, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1804112] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:14-cv-00263-RDM filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, American Legion Hospital, Anniston Hma, LLC, Antelope Valley Hospital, Asante Ashland Community Hospital, Asante Rouge Valley Medical Center, Asante Three Rivers Medical Center, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Bullhead City Hospital Corporation, Centre Hospital Corporation, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Denver Health, EMH Elyria Medical Center, Foley Hospital Corporation, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Fort Smith Hma, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Greenville Hospital Corporation, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Longmont United Hospital, Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, MCSA, LLC, Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, Parma Community General Hospital, Payson Hospital Corporation, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Shannon Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, Triad of Alabama, LLC, UH Regional Hospitals, University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, University Hospitals Case Medical Center, University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, Van Buren HMA, LLC, Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center and Willis-Knighton Medical Center. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5227. [19-5227] [Entered: 08/28/2019 04:30 PM]
August 28, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5227] [Entered: 08/28/2019 04:24 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shands Jacksonville Medical, et al v. Alex Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc., doing business as UFHealth Shands Hospital
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: San Joaquin Community Hospital, 14cv1477, doing business as Adventist Health/San Joaquin Community Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Northeast Georgia Medical Center, 14cv503
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Albany Memorial Hospital, 14-cv-536
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Westchester County Health Corporation, 14cv503
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Long Beach Memorial Medical Center, 15-cv-01601, doing business as Long Beach Memorial Medical Center, doing business as MemorialCare Long Beach Medical Center & MemorialCare Miller Children's and Women's Hospital Long Beach
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AHMC Monterey Park Hospital LP, 14cv1477, doing business as Monterey Park Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Flower Mound Hospital Partners, LLC, 15-cv-01793, doing business as Texas Health Presbyterian Hospital Flower Mound
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AHMC San Gabriel Valley Medical Center LP, 14cv1477, doing business as San Gabriel Valley Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Adirondack Health Services, Inc., 14-cv-536 ; 15-cv-01150, doing business as Glens Falls Hospital
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Metroplex Adventist Hospital, Inc., doing business as Metroplex Adventist Hospital, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Adventist Bolingbrook Hospital, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Saddleback Memorial Medical Center, 15-cv-01601
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: American Hospital Association, 14cv607
Represented By: Dominic Francis Perella Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Aurora Health Care Southern Lakes, Inc., 14cv1477, doing business as Aurora Memorial Hospital of Burlington, doing business as Aurora Lakeland Medical Center, doing business as Aurora Medical Center - Kenosha, doing business as Aurora Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Adventist Health System-Sunbelt, Inc., doing business as Central Texas Medical Center, Florida Hospital Orlando, and Florida Hospital Heartland Medical Center, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Delnor-Community Hospital, 14cv1477, doing business as Delnor Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Bay Area Medical Center, Inc., 17-39
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Memorial Hospital, Inc., doing business as Manchester Memorial Hospital, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Oakbend Medical Center, 14cv503
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Emory-Adventist, Inc., 15cv192, doing business as Emory-Adventist Hospital
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Midland County Hospital District, 14cv503, doing business as Midland Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Alta Los Angeles Hospitals, Inc., 14-cv-536, doing business as Los Angeles Community Hospital
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sonora Community Hospital, 14cv1477, doing business as Sonora Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: University of Kansas Hospital Authority, 14cv503
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jellico Community Hospital, doing business as Littleton Adventist Hospital, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AHMC Whittier Hospital Medical Center LP, 14cv1477, doing business as Whittier Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Aurora Health Care Central, Inc., 14cv1477, doing business as Aurora Sheboygan Memorial Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc., doing business as Takoma Regional Hospital, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Asante Rouge Valley Medical Center, 16-cv-01543
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tarpon Springs Hospital Foundation, Inc., doing business as Florida Hospital North Pinellas, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ahmc Monterey Park Hospital LP, 17-39, doing business as Monterey Park Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Florida Hospital Zephyrhills, Inc., doing business as Florida Hospital Zephyrhills, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Castle Medical Center, 14cv1477
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Wake Forest Baptist Medical Center, 14cv607
Represented By: Dominic Francis Perella Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Feather River Hospital, 14cv1477, doing business as Adventist Health/feather River Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Memorial Hospital Flagler, Inc., doing business as Florida Hospital Flagler, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Central Valley General Hospital, 14cv1477
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Aurora Health Care Central, Inc., 17-39, doing business as Aurora Sheboygan Memorial Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: New Jersey Hospital Association, 14cv607
Represented By: Dominic Francis Perella Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Banner Health, 14cv607
Represented By: Dominic Francis Perella Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Physicians Medical Center, LLC, 15-cv-01793, doing business as Texas Health Center for Diagnostics and Surgery
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Portercare Adventist Health System, doing business as Porter Adventist Hospital, Castle Rock Adventist Hospital, Parker Adventist Hospital and Avista Adventist Hospital, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Allina Health System, 14-cv-536, doing business as Mercy Hospital, doing business as Abbott Northwestern Hospital, doing business as Buffalo Hospital, doing business as Cambridge Medical Center, doing business as Owatonna Hospital, doing business as
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Southwest Volusia Healthcare Corporation, doing business as Florida Hospital Fish Memorial, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services, 14cv1477, doing business as Simi Valley Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CAMC Teays Valley Hospital, Inc., 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SwedishAmerican Hospital, 14cv503
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Fayette Regional Health System, 14cv503, doing business as Uniontown Hospital
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Dignity Health, 14-cv-536, doing business as Arroyo Grande Community Hospital, doing business as California Hospital Medical Center, doing business as Catholic Healthcare West, doing business as Dominican Hospital, doing business as French Hospital M
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Healthcare Association of New York, 14cv607
Represented By: Dominic Francis Perella Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Aurora Medical Center Grafton, LLC, 17-39, doing business as Aurora Medical Center Grafton
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Floyd Healthcare Management, Inc., 14cv503, doing business as Floyd Medical Center
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Alhambra Hospital Medical Center Lp, 14cv1477, doing business as Alhambra Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Alegent Creighton Health, 14-cv-536, doing business as Alegent Creighton Health Midlands Hospital, doing business as Alegent Creighton Health Lakeside Hospital
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mercy Hospital, Iowa City, Iowa, 14cv503
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AHMC Garfield Medical Center LP, 14cv1477, doing business as Greater El Monte Community Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Memorial Health Systems, Inc., doing business as Florida Hospital Memorial Medical Center, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Medical Center of Central Georgia, Inc., 14cv503
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Charleston Area Medical Center, Inc., 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Alegent Health - Immanuel Medical Center, 14-cv-536
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Aurora Health Care Metro, Inc., 14cv1477, doing business as Aurora West Allis Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State University of Iowa, 14cv503, doing business as University of Iowa Hospitals and Clinics
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Rockwall Regional Center, LLC, 15-cv-01793, doing business as Texas Health Presbyterian Hospital Rockwall
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Gwinnett Hospital System Inc., 14cv503
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Atlanticare Regional Medical Center, Inc., 14-cv-536
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Carilion Medical Center, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Carilion New River Valley Medical Center, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Lubbock County Hospital District, 14cv503, doing business as University Medical Center
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Alegent Creighton Health Creighton University Medical Center, LLC, 14-cv-536
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Alton Memorial Hospital, 14-cv-536
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Carilion Franklin Memorial Hospital, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Aurora Health Care North, Inc., 14cv1477, doing business as Aurora Medical Center Manitowoc County
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Community Hospital of Brazosport, 14cv503, doing business as Brazosport Regional Health System
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Baycare Aurora, LLC, 14cv1477, doing business as Aurora Baycare Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Hanford Community Hospital, 14cv1477, doing business as Adventist Medical Center - Reedley
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Memorial Hospital-West Volusia, Inc., doing business as Florida Hospital Deland, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Adventist Hinsdale Hospital, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Board of Trustees of North Kansas City Hospital, 14cv503, doing business as North Kansas City Hospital
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Gundersen Lutheran Medical Center, Inc., 14cv503
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Southlake Specialty Hospital, LLC, 15-cv-01793, doing business as Texas Health Harris Methodist Hospital Southlake
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Walla Walla General Hospital, 14cv1477, doing business as Adventist Health/Walla General Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: IHC Health Services, Inc., doing business as Alta View Hospital, American Fork Hospital, Bear River Valley Hospital, Dixie Regional Medical Center, Intermountain Medical Center, LDS Hospital, Logan Regional Hospital, Mckay-Dee Hospital, and Park City
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Alegent Health - Bergan Mercy Health System, 14-cv-536, doing business as Alegent Health Bergan Mercy Medical Center, doing business as Mercy Hospital
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc., doing business as UF Health Jacksonville
Represented By: Stephanie A. Webster
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: White Memorial Medical Center, 14cv1477, doing business as White Memorial Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Hospital and Healthsystem Association of Pennsylvania, 14cv607
Represented By: Dominic Francis Perella Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Bakersfield Heart Hospital, 14cv976
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Portland Adventist Medical Center, 14cv1477, doing business as Adventist Medical Center - Portland
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Orange Coast Memorial Medical Center, 15-cv-01601
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Copley Memorial Hospital, 14cv503
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: University Community Hospital, Inc., doing business as Florida Hospital Carrollwood, and Florida Hospital Tampa, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Martin Health System, 14cv503, doing business as Martin Memorial Medical Center
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: West Allis Memorial Hospital, Inc., 14cv1477, doing business as Aurora West Allis Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Aurora Medical Center of Washington County, Inc., 14cv1477, doing business as Aurora Medical Center Washington County
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Riverside Medical Center, 14cv503
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Parkview Medical Center, Inc., 14cv503
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Reedley Community Hospital, 14cv1477
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Einstein Healthcare Network, 14cv607
Represented By: Dominic Francis Perella Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ukiah Adventist Hospital, 14cv1477, doing business as Ukiah Valley Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Aurora Medical Center Of Oshkosh, Inc., 14cv1477, doing business as Aurora Medical Center Grafton
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Fletcher Hospital, Inc., doing business as Park Ridge Community Hospital, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Athens Regional Medical Center Inc, 14cv503
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Adventist Health System Georgia, Inc., doing business as Gordon Hospital, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AHMC Anaheim Regional Medical Center LP, 14cv1477, doing business as AHMC Anaheim Regional Medical Center LP
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Asante Ashland Community Hospital, 16-cv-01543
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Carilion Tazewell Community Hospital, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Shawnee Mission Medical Center, Inc., doing business as Shawnee Mission Medical Center, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Henry Ford Health System, doing business as Henry Ford Hospital, Henry Ford Wyandotte Hospital, Henry Ford Macomb Hospital, and Henry Ford West Bloomfield Hospital, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Chattanooga Hamiliton County Hospital Authority, 14cv503, doing business as Erlanger Medical Center
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: West Allis Memorial Hospital, Inc., 14cv1477
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Bakersfield Memorial Hospital, 14-cv-536
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: St. Helena Hospital, 14cv1477, doing business as St. Helena Hospital Napa Valley
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mount Sinai Hospital, 14cv607
Represented By: Dominic Francis Perella Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Central Dupage Hospital Association, 14cv1477, doing business as Central Dupage Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, 14cv503, doing business as University of Virginia Medical Center
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Regional Medical Center of Orangeburg and Calhoun Counties, 14cv503
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Glendale Adventist Medical Center, 14cv1477, doing business as Adventist Health/Glendale Adventist Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Florida Hospital Waterman, Inc., doing business as Florida Hospital Waterman, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Adventist Glenoaks Hospital, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Pasco-Pinellas Hillsborough Community Health System, Inc., doing business as Florida Hospital Wesley Chapel, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Greater New York Hospital Association, 14cv607
Represented By: Dominic Francis Perella Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Texas Health Huguley, Inc., doing business as Texas Health Huguley Hospital, 15cv192
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: University Medical Center At Lafayette, 15-cv-01800
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, 14cv1477, doing business as Dekalb Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc, 14cv1477, doing business as Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, Llc
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lafayette General Medical Center, 15-cv-01800
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Longmont United Hospital, 15-cv-01800
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, 14cv1477, doing business as Forrest City Medical Center
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., 14cv1477, doing business as Crestwood Medical Center
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Willis-Knighton Medical Center, 15-cv-01800
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Parma Community General Hospital, 15-cv-01800
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Foley Hospital Corporation, 14cv1477
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Indian River Memorial Hospital, 15-cv-01800
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, 14cv1477
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lafayette General Surgical Hospital, 15-cv-01800
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: QHG of Enterprise, Inc., 14cv1477
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Willis-Knighton Bossier Health Center, 15-cv-01800
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Denver Health, 15-cv-01800
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bullhead City Hospital Corporation, 14cv1477, doing business as Western Arizona Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Asante Three Rivers Medical Center, 16-cv-00032
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Payson Hospital Corporation, 14cv1477, doing business as Payson Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, 15-cv-01800, doing business as Bayfront Health St. Petersburg
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shannon Medical Center, 16-cv-00032
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MCSA, LLC, 15-cv-01800, doing business as Medical Center of South Arkansas
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Asante Ashland Community Hospital, 16-cv-00032
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: National Healthcare Of Newport, Inc., 15-cv-01800, doing business as Harris Hospital
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: American Legion Hospital, 15-cv-01800
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EMH Elyria Medical Center, 15-cv-01800
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Palmerton Hospital-Carbon, 16-cv-00032
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., 15-cv-01800, doing business as Lodi Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Louisiana Medical Center and Heart Hospital, 15-cv-01800
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, 14cv1477, doing business as Oro Valley Hospital
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Van Buren HMA, LLC, 14cv1477, doing business as Summit Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, 14cv1477, doing business as Northwest Medical Center - Springdale
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: UH Regional Hospitals, 15-cv-01800
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: University Hospitals Ahuja Medical Center, 15-cv-01800
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Asante Rouge Valley Medical Center, 16-cv-00032
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mat-Su Valley Medical Center, LLC, 14cv1477, doing business as Mat-Su Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Northwest Hospital, LLC, 14cv1477, doing business as Northwest Medical Center
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Affinity Hospital, LLC, 14cv1477, doing business as Trinity Medical Center
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: University Hospitals Case Medical Center, 15-cv-01800
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Greenville Hospital Corporation, 14cv1477, doing business as L.V. Stabler Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, 15-cv-01800, doing business as Bayfront Health Punta Gorda
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: University Hospitals Geauga Medical Center, 15-cv-01800
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Antelope Valley Hospital, 15-cv-01800
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Anniston Hma, LLC, 14cv1477, doing business as Stringfellow Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Centre Hospital Corporation, 14cv1477, doing business as Cherokee Medical Center
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Triad of Alabama, LLC, 14cv1477
Represented By: Lori Allison Rubin
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Fort Smith Hma, LLC, 15-cv-01800, doing business as Sparks Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: Donald H. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alex Michael Azar, II, Secretary of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Thomas Gary Pulham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?