Richard Blumenthal, et al v. Donald Trump
Plaintiff / Appellee: Amy Klobuchar, Jeff Merkley, Cory A. Booker, Ron Wyden, Richard J. Durbin, Eric Swalwell, Chris Murphy, Patrick J. Leahy, Zoe Lofgren, Ted Deutch, Steve Cohen, Kamala D. Harris, Tim Kaine, Sheila Jackson Lee, Chris Van Hollen, Jerrold Nadler, James E. Clyburn, Michael F. Bennet, Sheldon Whitehouse, Henry C. Hank Johnson, Brian Schatz, Ted Lieu, Karen Bass, David N. Cicilline, Tom Carper, Edward J. Markey, Tammy Duckworth, Elizabeth Warren, Bernard Sanders, Kirsten E. Gillibrand, Benjamin L. Cardin, Patty Murray, Mazie K. Hirono, Hakeem Jeffries, Christopher A. Coons, Richard Blumenthal, Catherine Cortez Masto, Linda T. Sanchez, Jamie Raskin, Maria Cantwell, Steny H. Hoyer, Tom Udall, Martin Heinrich, Nancy Pelosi, Jack Reed and Cedric L. Richmond
Defendant / Appellant: Donald J. Trump, in his official capacity as President of the United States of America
Amicus Curiae: Leonard I. Garth, Judge, Scholar, Rutgers Law School, Frank Greenberg, Tom Harkin, (D-IA), Karole Green, Professor of Law, Washington University in St. Louis School of Law, Cary Coglianese, Lee Hamilton, (D-IN), Frank Edmund Deale, Svetlana Wachtell, Professor of Constitutional Law and Civil Liberties, New York University School of Law, Madeleine K. Albright, Wendy Parmet, Matthews University Distinguished Professor of Law and Professor of Public Policy and Urban Affairs, Northeastern University School of Law, Peter Smith, (R-VT), Richard A. Horvitz, Andrew Rothman, Associate Professor of Law, Rutgers Law School, Seth Davis, Brian Wolfman, Lawrence Ashe, Professor of Law, Georgia State University College of Law, Marilyn Glynn, Former OGE Acting Director and General Counsel (career), Joseph Solomon, Distinguished Professor, New York Law School, Christoph Henkel, Professor of Law, Mississippi College School of Law, Matthew D. Adler, Jed Shugerman, Legal historian and Professor, Prem Kumar, Paul R. Verkuil, Senior Fellow at the Center for American Progress and President Emeritus of the College of William & Mary, Mary-Beth Moylan, Associate Dean for Academic Affairs and Experiential Learning, University of the Pacific, McGeorge School of Law, Jack Rakove, Legal historian and Professor, Richard Heppner, Assistant Professor, Duquesne University School of Law, Herbert M. Wachtell, Professor of Constitutional Law and Civil Liberties, New York University School of Law, Jesse Egbert, Professor, Clark D. Cunningham, Professor, John F. Kerry, Bathsheba N. Crocker, Laurence H. Tribe, Lumen Mulligan, Research Professor of Law, University of Kansas School of Law, Barbara Boxer, (D-CA), George Miller, (D-CA), Dick Zimmer, (R-NJ), Michael Darr Barnes, (D-MD), Jesse Herbert Choper, Distinguished Professor of Law, University of California, Berkeley School of Law, Mark Udall, (D-CO), Simon Stern, Legal historian and Professor, Niskanen Center, Joan E. Steinman, Suzy George, Jonathan S. Masur, James Gray Pope, Distinguished Professor of Law & Sidney Reitman Scholar, Rutgers Law School, Richard Thomas, Former Associate General Counsel, OGE; Former Ethics Counsel, Department of Health & Human Services, Bernice J. Greenberg, Gautham Rao, Legal historian and Professor, Edward B. Shils, Trevor Potter, Mark Rahdert, Professor of Law, Temple University James E. Beasley School of Law, Michael C. Dorf, Bob Carr, (D-MI), Maxwell Stearns, Venable, Baetjer & Howard Professor of Law, University of Maryland Carey School of Law, John Mikhail, Legal historian and Professor, Jeffrey Prescott, Lawrence Reynolds, Former Assistant General Counsel for the Department of Housing & Urban Development with responsibility for ethics (career; also served at the Department of Labor in career ethics capacity), Chuck Hagel, James B. Steinberg, William Luneberg, Professor of Law, Emeritus, University of Pittsburgh School of Law, Joan E. Steinman, University Distinguished Professor Emerita, Chicago-Kent College of Law, Wendy Sherman, Trip Rothschild, Former Associate General Counsel at the Nuclear Regulatory Commission, Donald B. Ayer, Daniel Feldman, Brad Miller, (D-NC), Gary Hart, (D-CO), Diana Sclar, Professor of Law and Allan Axelrod Scholar, Rutgers Law School, John P. Wilson, Leslie Wilcox, Former Associate General Counsel for OGE (career), and principal author of the Standards of Ethical Conduct for Employees of the Executive Branch (5 CFR Part 2635), Philip Sharp, (D-IN), Earl B. Shurtz, Research Professor of Law, University of Kansas School of Law, Republican Women for Progress, Heather A. Higginbottom, Tom Coleman, (R-MO), Perry Dane, Professor of Law, Rutgers Law School, J. W. Verret, Jim Leach, (R-IA), Robert S. Stevens, Matt Olsen, Jon D. Michaels, Professor of Law, University of California, Los Angeles School of Law, Dan Fox, Former Office of Government Ethics (OGE) General Counsel and Acting Director (career; also served at the Department of Defense in career legal capacity), Harvey Wilcox, Former Navy Deputy General Counsel (career) and Designated Agency Ethics Official, Steve Bartlett, (R-TX), Karl Manheim, Loyola Law School, Los Angeles, Sandra Rierson, Associate Professor of Law, Thomas Jefferson School of Law, Thomas Green, Professor of Law, Washington University in St. Louis School of Law, Henry A. Waxman, (D-CA), Vikram Singh, Amy Comstock Rick, Former Director of the OGE; former Associate Counsel to President Clinton for ethics (originally career ethics official at Department of Education), Charles Doskow, Dean Emeritus & Professor of Law, University of La Verne Collegeof Law, Erwin Chemerinsky, Dean, University of California, Berkeley School of Law, Matthew I. Hall, Associate Professor of Law, University of Georgia School of Law, Arthur Wolf, Professor of Law and Director, Institute for Legislative and Governmental Affairs, Western New England University School of Law, Edward Purcell, Distinguished Professor, New York Law School, Harold H. Bruff, Rosenbaum Professor of Law Emeritus at the University of Colorado School of Law, Mickey Edwards, (R-OK), Joshua A. Geltzer, Bob Inglis, (R-SC), Helen Hershkoff, Professor of Constitutional Law and Civil Liberties, New York University School of Law, Bruce Andrews, Christopher Shays, (R-CT), Kathy Ashe, Jeff Bingaman, (D-NM), Gregory P. Magarian, Professor of Law, Washington University in St. Louis School of Law, Ronald Chen, University Professor, Distinguished Professor of Law, Rutgers Law School, Karen Kucik, Former ethics official for DOJ, Department of Commerce, and Department of Health & Human Services (career), William Burns, Antony Blinken, Frank Edmund Deale, Associate Professor of Law, City University of New York School of Law, Peter L. Strauss, Betts Professor of Law Emeritus at Columbia Law School, Peter M. Shane, Jacob E. Davis Chair and Jacob E. Davis II in Law at the Ohio State Universitys Moritz College of Law, James C. OBrien, Heather Elliott, Alumni, Class of '36 Professor of Law, University of Alabama School of Law, Jonathan Finer, Aziz Zahirul Huq, Eric J. Segall, Professor of Law, Georgia State University College of Law, Daniel Farber, John F. Preis, Donald L. Doernberg, Professor of Law, Emeritus, Pace University School of Law, and Adjunct Professor of Law, University of the Pacific, McGeorge School of Law, Eric P. Schwartz and Daniel Benjamin
Not Yet Classified: Seth Barrett Tillman, Scholar and Judicial Education Project
Case Number: 19-5237
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 7, 2020 Summary Blumenthal v. Trump

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1813420] filed by Jean M. Zachariasiewicz and co-counsel Anthony J. May on behalf of Amici Curiae for Appellee Matthew D. Adler, Cary Coglianese, Seth Davis, Mr. Frank Edmund Deale, Michael C. Dorf, Daniel Farber, Mr. Aziz Zahirul Huq, Jonathan S. Masur, John F. Preis, Joan E. Steinman and Brian Wolfman. [19-5237] (Zachariasiewicz, Jean) [Entered: 10/30/2019 08:48 PM]
October 30, 2019 CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1813390] filed by Administrative Law, Constitutional Law, and Federal Courts Scholars [Service Date: 10/30/2019 ] Length of Brief: 6,168 Words. [19-5237]--[Edited 10/30/2019 by DJR--MODIFIED PARTY FILER] (Zachariasiewicz, Jean) [Entered: 10/30/2019 03:51 PM]
October 30, 2019 CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1813357] filed by Niskanen Center, Republican Women for Progress, Donald B. Ayer, Trevor Potter, Mr. Laurence H. Tribe and J. W. Verret [Service Date: 10/30/2019 ] Length of Brief: 3,601 Words. [19-5237] (Wrabley, Colin) [Entered: 10/30/2019 02:09 PM]
October 29, 2019 NOTICE [1813227] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Matthew D. Adler, Cary Coglianese, Seth Davis, Frank Deale, Michael C. Dorf, Daniel Farber, Aziz Huq, Jonathan S. Masur, John F. Preis, Joan Steinman, Brian Wolfman [Service Date: 10/29/2019 ] [19-5237]--[Edited 10/30/2019 by DJR--MODIFIED PARTY FILER] (May, Anthony) [Entered: 10/29/2019 09:25 PM]
October 29, 2019 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1813222] filed by John Mikhail, Jack Rakove, Gautham Rao, Jed Shugerman and Simon Stern [Service Date: 10/29/2019 ] Length of Brief: 6,481 words. [19-5237] (Lai, Erica) [Entered: 10/29/2019 06:59 PM]
October 29, 2019 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1813207] filed by Former National Security Officials [Service Date: 10/29/2019 ] Length of Brief: 5,289 words. [19-5237]--[Edited 10/30/2019 by DJR--MODIFIED PARTY FILER] (Koh, Harold) [Entered: 10/29/2019 06:23 PM]
October 29, 2019 NOTICE [1813206] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Former National Security Officials [Service Date: 10/29/2019 ] [19-5237]--[Edited 10/30/2019 by DJR--MODIFIED PARTY FILER] (Koh, Harold) [Entered: 10/29/2019 06:20 PM]
October 29, 2019 AMENDED AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1813195] filed by Jean Zachariasiewicz [Service Date: 10/29/2019 ] Length of Brief: 6,168 Words. [19-5237] (Zachariasiewicz, Jean) [Entered: 10/29/2019 05:33 PM]
October 29, 2019 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1813191] filed by Harold H. Bruff, Peter M. Shane, Mr. Peter L. Strauss and Paul R. Verkuil [Service Date: 10/29/2019 ] Length of Brief: 5,170 words. [19-5237]--[Edited 10/30/2019 by DJR--MODIFIED PARTY FILER] (Mapes, Katharine) [Entered: 10/29/2019 05:03 PM]
October 29, 2019 CONSENT AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1813190] filed by The Niskanen Center, Republican Women for Progress, Donald B. Ayer, Trevor Potter, Laurence Tribe, and J.W. Verret [Service Date: 10/29/2019 ] Length of Brief: 3,601 Words. [19-5237] (Wrabley, Colin) [Entered: 10/29/2019 05:02 PM]
October 29, 2019 CONSENT NOTICE [1813186] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by The Niskanen Center, Republican Women for Progress, Donald B. Ayer, Trevor Potter, Laurence Tribe, and J.W. Verret [Service Date: 10/29/2019 ] [19-5237]--[Edited 10/30/2019 by DJR--MODIFIED PARTY FILER] (Wrabley, Colin) [Entered: 10/29/2019 04:51 PM]
October 29, 2019 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1813185] filed by Zachariasiewicz, Jean [Service Date: 10/29/2019 ] Length of Brief: 6,168 Words. [19-5237] (Zachariasiewicz, Jean) [Entered: 10/29/2019 04:48 PM]
October 29, 2019 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1813121] filed by Former Government Ethics Officers Don Fox, Marilyn Glynn, Karen Kucik, Lawrence D. Reynolds, Amy Comstock Rick, Trip Rothschild, Richard M. Thomas, Harvey Wilcox, Leslie Wilcox [Service Date: 10/29/2019 ] Length of Brief: 5,391 words. [19-5237]--[Edited 10/30/2019 by DJR--MODIFIED PARTY FILER] (Singh, Tejinder) [Entered: 10/29/2019 02:28 PM]
October 29, 2019 NOTICE [1813118] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Former Government Ethics Officers Don Fox, Marilyn Glynn, Karen Kucik, Lawrence D. Reynolds, Amy Comstock Rick, Trip Rothschild, Richard M. Thomas, Harvey Wilcox, and Leslie Wilcox [Service Date: 10/29/2019 ] [19-5237]--[Edited 10/30/2019 by DJR--MODIFIED PARTY FILER] (Singh, Tejinder) [Entered: 10/29/2019 02:22 PM]
October 29, 2019 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1812988] filed by Scholars of Standing, Federal Jurisdiction, and Constitutional Law (listed in Appendix A of Brief) [Service Date: 10/29/2019 ] Length of Brief: 6,427 Words. [19-5237]--[Edited 10/30/2019 by DJR--MODIFIED PARTY FILER] (Deutsch, Ruthanne) [Entered: 10/29/2019 09:42 AM]
October 28, 2019 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1812974] filed by Bipartisan Former Members of Congress [Service Date: 10/28/2019 ] Length of Brief: 6,486 words. [19-5237]]--[Edited 10/30/2019 by DJR--MODIFIED PARTY FILER] (Dellinger, Walter) [Entered: 10/28/2019 10:06 PM]
October 28, 2019 NOTICE [1812973] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Bipartisan Former Members of Congress [Service Date: 10/28/2019 ] [19-5237]--[Edited 10/30/2019 by DJR--MODIFIED PARTY FILER] (Dellinger, Walter) [Entered: 10/28/2019 09:41 PM]
October 28, 2019 NOTICE [1812965] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Scholars of Standing, Federal Jurisdiction, and Constitutional Law [Service Date: 10/28/2019 ] [19-5237]--[Edited 10/30/2019 by DJR--MODIFIED PARTY FILER] (Deutsch, Ruthanne) [Entered: 10/28/2019 07:56 PM]
October 28, 2019 NOTICE [1812860] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Simon Stern, Gautham Rao, Jack Rakove, John Mikhail and Jed Shugerman [Service Date: 10/28/2019 ] [19-5237]--[Edited 10/28/2019 by DJR--MODIFIED PARTY FILER] (Lai, Erica) [Entered: 10/28/2019 02:41 PM]
October 22, 2019 APPELLEE BRIEF [1812039] filed by Karen Bass, Michael F. Bennet, Mr. Richard Blumenthal, Cory A. Booker, Maria Cantwell, Benjamin L. Cardin, Tom Carper, Mr. David N. Cicilline, James E. Clyburn, Steve Cohen, Christopher A. Coons, Catherine Cortez Masto, Ted Deutch, Tammy Duckworth, Richard J. Durbin, Kirsten E. Gillibrand, Kamala D. Harris, Martin Heinrich, Mazie K. Hirono, Steny H. Hoyer, Sheila Jackson Lee, Hakeem Jeffries, Henry C. Hank Johnson, Tim Kaine, Amy Klobuchar, Patrick J. Leahy, Ted Lieu, Zoe Lofgren, Edward J. Markey, Jeff Merkley, Chris Murphy, Patty Murray, Jerrold Nadler, Nancy Pelosi, Jamie Raskin, Jack Reed, Cedric L. Richmond, Linda T. Sanchez, Bernard Sanders, Brian Schatz, Eric Swalwell, Tom Udall, Chris Van Hollen, Elizabeth Warren, Mr. Sheldon Whitehouse and Ron Wyden [Service Date: 10/22/2019 ] Length of Brief: 12,995 words. [19-5237] (Gorod, Brianne) [Entered: 10/22/2019 04:36 PM]
October 22, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1811864] filed scheduling oral argument on Monday, 12/09/2019. [19-5237] [Entered: 10/22/2019 10:20 AM]
October 8, 2019 AMICUS BRIEF [1810059] filed by Clark D. Cunningham and Jesse Egbert [Service Date: 10/08/2019 ] Length of Brief: 6,465 words. [19-5237]--[Edited 10/09/2019 by DJR--MODIFIED PARTY FILER] (Dinerstein, Robert) [Entered: 10/08/2019 04:32 PM]
October 8, 2019 NOTICE [1810058] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Clark D. Cunningham and Jesse Egbert [Service Date: 10/08/2019 ] [19-5237]--[Edited 10/09/2019 by DJR--MODIFIED PARTY FILER] (Dinerstein, Robert) [Entered: 10/08/2019 04:30 PM]
October 8, 2019 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1810043] lodged by Judicial Education Project and Seth Barrett Tillman [Service Date: 10/08/2019 ] Length of Brief: 3,558 words. [19-5237]--[Edited 10/09/2019 by DJR--MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED] (Ray, Robert) [Entered: 10/08/2019 03:36 PM]
October 8, 2019 LETTER [1809979] sent regarding attorney membership to Carrie Severino for Judicial Education Project. Application for Admission due 11/07/2019. [19-5237] [Entered: 10/08/2019 12:21 PM]
October 7, 2019 MOTION [1809824] to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Judicial Education Project and Seth Barrett Tillman [Service Date: 10/07/2019 ] [19-5237]--[Edited 10/08/2019 by DJR--MODIFIED PARTY FILER] (Ray, Robert) [Entered: 10/07/2019 05:56 PM]
October 1, 2019 JOINT APPENDIX [1808862] filed by Donald J. Trump. [Volumes: 2] [Service Date: 10/01/2019 ] [19-5237] (Totaro, Martin) [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:15 PM]
October 1, 2019 APPELLANT BRIEF [1808858] filed by Donald J. Trump [Service Date: 10/01/2019 ] Length of Brief: 11,469 words. [19-5237] (Totaro, Martin) [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:10 PM]
September 9, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1805579] filed considering the joint motion to establish briefing schedule [ # 1805324-2 ], setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 10/01/2019. APPENDIX due 10/01/2019. APPELLEE Brief due on 10/22/2019. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 11/05/2019 [19-5237] [Entered: 09/09/2019 12:40 PM]
September 6, 2019 JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1805324] to establish briefing schedule filed by Donald J. Trump Length Certification: 41. [19-5237] (Revesz, Joshua) [Entered: 09/06/2019 11:44 AM]
September 5, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1805141] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-01154-EGS filed by Donald J. Trump. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5237. [19-5237] [Entered: 09/05/2019 01:33 PM]
September 5, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5237] [Entered: 09/05/2019 01:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Blumenthal, et al v. Donald Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Amy Klobuchar
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jeff Merkley
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Cory A. Booker
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ron Wyden
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Richard J. Durbin
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Eric Swalwell
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Chris Murphy
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Patrick J. Leahy
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Zoe Lofgren
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ted Deutch
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Steve Cohen
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kamala D. Harris
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tim Kaine
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sheila Jackson Lee
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Chris Van Hollen
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jerrold Nadler
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James E. Clyburn
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael F. Bennet
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sheldon Whitehouse
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Henry C. Hank Johnson
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Brian Schatz
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ted Lieu
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Karen Bass
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: David N. Cicilline
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tom Carper
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Edward J. Markey
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tammy Duckworth
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Elizabeth Warren
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Bernard Sanders
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kirsten E. Gillibrand
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Benjamin L. Cardin
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Patty Murray
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mazie K. Hirono
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Hakeem Jeffries
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Christopher A. Coons
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Richard Blumenthal
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Catherine Cortez Masto
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Linda T. Sanchez
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jamie Raskin
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Maria Cantwell
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Steny H. Hoyer
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tom Udall
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Martin Heinrich
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Nancy Pelosi
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jack Reed
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Cedric L. Richmond
Represented By: Brianne Gorod
Represented By: Brian Rene Frazelle
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Donald J. Trump, in his official capacity as President of the United States of America
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Represented By: Mark Reiling Freeman
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Martin Vincent Totaro
Represented By: Hashim M. Mooppan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Leonard I. Garth, Judge, Scholar, Rutgers Law School
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Frank Greenberg
Represented By: Jean M. Zachariasiewicz Esquire
Represented By: Anthony May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tom Harkin, (D-IA)
Represented By: Walter Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Karole Green, Professor of Law, Washington University in St. Louis School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Cary Coglianese
Represented By: Jean M. Zachariasiewicz Esquire
Represented By: Anthony May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lee Hamilton, (D-IN)
Represented By: Walter Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Frank Edmund Deale
Represented By: Jean M. Zachariasiewicz Esquire
Represented By: Anthony May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Svetlana Wachtell, Professor of Constitutional Law and Civil Liberties, New York University School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Madeleine K. Albright
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Wendy Parmet, Matthews University Distinguished Professor of Law and Professor of Public Policy and Urban Affairs, Northeastern University School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Peter Smith, (R-VT)
Represented By: Walter Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Richard A. Horvitz
Represented By: Jean M. Zachariasiewicz Esquire
Represented By: Anthony May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Andrew Rothman, Associate Professor of Law, Rutgers Law School
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Seth Davis
Represented By: Jean M. Zachariasiewicz Esquire
Represented By: Anthony May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brian Wolfman
Represented By: Jean M. Zachariasiewicz Esquire
Represented By: Anthony May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lawrence Ashe, Professor of Law, Georgia State University College of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Marilyn Glynn, Former OGE Acting Director and General Counsel (career)
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joseph Solomon, Distinguished Professor, New York Law School
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Christoph Henkel, Professor of Law, Mississippi College School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Matthew D. Adler
Represented By: Jean M. Zachariasiewicz Esquire
Represented By: Anthony May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jed Shugerman, Legal historian and Professor
Represented By: Erica Lai
Represented By: Danielle Morello
Represented By: Melissa H. Maxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Prem Kumar
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Paul R. Verkuil, Senior Fellow at the Center for American Progress and President Emeritus of the College of William & Mary
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Bayne Esquire
Represented By: Katharine Minkel Mapes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mary-Beth Moylan, Associate Dean for Academic Affairs and Experiential Learning, University of the Pacific, McGeorge School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jack Rakove, Legal historian and Professor
Represented By: Erica Lai
Represented By: Danielle Morello
Represented By: Melissa H. Maxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Richard Heppner, Assistant Professor, Duquesne University School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Herbert M. Wachtell, Professor of Constitutional Law and Civil Liberties, New York University School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jesse Egbert, Professor
Represented By: Robert D. Dinerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Clark D. Cunningham, Professor
Represented By: Robert D. Dinerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John F. Kerry
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bathsheba N. Crocker
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Laurence H. Tribe
Represented By: M. Patrick Yingling
Represented By: Colin Emmet Wrabley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lumen Mulligan, Research Professor of Law, University of Kansas School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Barbara Boxer, (D-CA)
Represented By: Walter Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: George Miller, (D-CA)
Represented By: Walter Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dick Zimmer, (R-NJ)
Represented By: Walter Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael Darr Barnes, (D-MD)
Represented By: Walter Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jesse Herbert Choper, Distinguished Professor of Law, University of California, Berkeley School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mark Udall, (D-CO)
Represented By: Walter Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Simon Stern, Legal historian and Professor
Represented By: Erica Lai
Represented By: Danielle Morello
Represented By: Melissa H. Maxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Niskanen Center
Represented By: M. Patrick Yingling
Represented By: Colin Emmet Wrabley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joan E. Steinman
Represented By: Jean M. Zachariasiewicz Esquire
Represented By: Anthony May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Suzy George
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jonathan S. Masur
Represented By: Jean M. Zachariasiewicz Esquire
Represented By: Anthony May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: James Gray Pope, Distinguished Professor of Law & Sidney Reitman Scholar, Rutgers Law School
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Richard Thomas, Former Associate General Counsel, OGE; Former Ethics Counsel, Department of Health & Human Services
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bernice J. Greenberg
Represented By: Jean M. Zachariasiewicz Esquire
Represented By: Anthony May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gautham Rao, Legal historian and Professor
Represented By: Erica Lai
Represented By: Danielle Morello
Represented By: Melissa H. Maxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Edward B. Shils
Represented By: Jean M. Zachariasiewicz Esquire
Represented By: Anthony May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Trevor Potter
Represented By: M. Patrick Yingling
Represented By: Colin Emmet Wrabley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mark Rahdert, Professor of Law, Temple University James E. Beasley School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael C. Dorf
Represented By: Jean M. Zachariasiewicz Esquire
Represented By: Anthony May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bob Carr, (D-MI)
Represented By: Walter Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Maxwell Stearns, Venable, Baetjer & Howard Professor of Law, University of Maryland Carey School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John Mikhail, Legal historian and Professor
Represented By: Erica Lai
Represented By: Danielle Morello
Represented By: Melissa H. Maxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jeffrey Prescott
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lawrence Reynolds, Former Assistant General Counsel for the Department of Housing & Urban Development with responsibility for ethics (career; also served at the Department of Labor in career ethics capacity)
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chuck Hagel
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: James B. Steinberg
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: William Luneberg, Professor of Law, Emeritus, University of Pittsburgh School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joan E. Steinman, University Distinguished Professor Emerita, Chicago-Kent College of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Wendy Sherman
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Trip Rothschild, Former Associate General Counsel at the Nuclear Regulatory Commission
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Donald B. Ayer
Represented By: M. Patrick Yingling
Represented By: Colin Emmet Wrabley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Daniel Feldman
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brad Miller, (D-NC)
Represented By: Walter Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gary Hart, (D-CO)
Represented By: Walter Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Diana Sclar, Professor of Law and Allan Axelrod Scholar, Rutgers Law School
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John P. Wilson
Represented By: Jean M. Zachariasiewicz Esquire
Represented By: Anthony May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Leslie Wilcox, Former Associate General Counsel for OGE (career), and principal author of the Standards of Ethical Conduct for Employees of the Executive Branch (5 CFR Part 2635)
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Philip Sharp, (D-IN)
Represented By: Walter Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Earl B. Shurtz, Research Professor of Law, University of Kansas School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Republican Women for Progress
Represented By: M. Patrick Yingling
Represented By: Colin Emmet Wrabley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Heather A. Higginbottom
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tom Coleman, (R-MO)
Represented By: Walter Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Perry Dane, Professor of Law, Rutgers Law School
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: J. W. Verret
Represented By: M. Patrick Yingling
Represented By: Colin Emmet Wrabley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jim Leach, (R-IA)
Represented By: Walter Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Robert S. Stevens
Represented By: Jean M. Zachariasiewicz Esquire
Represented By: Anthony May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Matt Olsen
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jon D. Michaels, Professor of Law, University of California, Los Angeles School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dan Fox, Former Office of Government Ethics (OGE) General Counsel and Acting Director (career; also served at the Department of Defense in career legal capacity)
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Harvey Wilcox, Former Navy Deputy General Counsel (career) and Designated Agency Ethics Official
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Steve Bartlett, (R-TX)
Represented By: Walter Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Karl Manheim, Loyola Law School, Los Angeles
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sandra Rierson, Associate Professor of Law, Thomas Jefferson School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Thomas Green, Professor of Law, Washington University in St. Louis School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Henry A. Waxman, (D-CA)
Represented By: Walter Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Vikram Singh
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Amy Comstock Rick, Former Director of the OGE; former Associate Counsel to President Clinton for ethics (originally career ethics official at Department of Education)
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Charles Doskow, Dean Emeritus & Professor of Law, University of La Verne Collegeof Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Erwin Chemerinsky, Dean, University of California, Berkeley School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Matthew I. Hall, Associate Professor of Law, University of Georgia School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Arthur Wolf, Professor of Law and Director, Institute for Legislative and Governmental Affairs, Western New England University School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Edward Purcell, Distinguished Professor, New York Law School
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Harold H. Bruff, Rosenbaum Professor of Law Emeritus at the University of Colorado School of Law
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Bayne Esquire
Represented By: Katharine Minkel Mapes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mickey Edwards, (R-OK)
Represented By: Walter Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joshua A. Geltzer
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bob Inglis, (R-SC)
Represented By: Walter Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Helen Hershkoff, Professor of Constitutional Law and Civil Liberties, New York University School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bruce Andrews
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Christopher Shays, (R-CT)
Represented By: Walter Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kathy Ashe
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jeff Bingaman, (D-NM)
Represented By: Walter Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gregory P. Magarian, Professor of Law, Washington University in St. Louis School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ronald Chen, University Professor, Distinguished Professor of Law, Rutgers Law School
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Karen Kucik, Former ethics official for DOJ, Department of Commerce, and Department of Health & Human Services (career)
Represented By: Tejinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: William Burns
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Antony Blinken
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Frank Edmund Deale, Associate Professor of Law, City University of New York School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Peter L. Strauss, Betts Professor of Law Emeritus at Columbia Law School
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Bayne Esquire
Represented By: Katharine Minkel Mapes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Peter M. Shane, Jacob E. Davis Chair and Jacob E. Davis II in Law at the Ohio State Universitys Moritz College of Law
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Bayne Esquire
Represented By: Katharine Minkel Mapes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: James C. OBrien
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Heather Elliott, Alumni, Class of '36 Professor of Law, University of Alabama School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jonathan Finer
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Aziz Zahirul Huq
Represented By: Jean M. Zachariasiewicz Esquire
Represented By: Anthony May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Eric J. Segall, Professor of Law, Georgia State University College of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Daniel Farber
Represented By: Jean M. Zachariasiewicz Esquire
Represented By: Anthony May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John F. Preis
Represented By: Jean M. Zachariasiewicz Esquire
Represented By: Anthony May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Donald L. Doernberg, Professor of Law, Emeritus, Pace University School of Law, and Adjunct Professor of Law, University of the Pacific, McGeorge School of Law
Represented By: Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
Represented By: Hyland Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Eric P. Schwartz
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Daniel Benjamin
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Seth Barrett Tillman, Scholar
Represented By: Robert William Ray
Represented By: Joshua Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Judicial Education Project
Represented By: Carrie Severino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?