Joseph Gilberti v. Federal Reserve System, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Luis Rivera II Trustee, United States Department of the Interior, Moffit Cancer Centers, Sarasota County, Environmental Protection Agency, United States Army Corps of Engineers, Federal Reserve System, Board of Governors, Mitch McConnell, in his capacity as Majority Leader of the U.S. Senate, Southwest Florida Water Management District, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Mosaic Fertilizer, Inc., Peace River Manasota Regional Water Supply Authority, Desoto County, Sarasota County, Barack Hussein Obama, 72 Partners, LLC, Nancy Pelosi, In her capacity for the U.S. House of Representatives, Mosaic Company, Hillsborough County State Attorneys Office, Florida Department of Environmental Protection and Desoto County
Plaintiff / Appellant: Joseph D. Gilberti, an Individual and Licensed Professional Engineer
Case Number: 19-5264
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 MOTION [1817258] for summary affirmance (Response to Motion served by hand due on 12/02/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 12/02/2019) filed by DOI, EPA, Federal Reserve System, FEMA, Mitch McConnell, Barack Hussein Obama, Nancy Pelosi and United States Army Corps of Engineers (Service Date: 11/22/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 840 Words. [19-5264] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 11/22/2019 03:11 PM]
November 22, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1817252] filed by DOI, EPA, Federal Reserve System, FEMA, Mitch McConnell, Barack Hussein Obama, Nancy Pelosi and United States Army Corps of Engineers [Service Date: 11/22/2019 ] [19-5264] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 11/22/2019 03:08 PM]
November 22, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1817251] filed by R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellees DOI, EPA, Federal Reserve System, FEMA, Barack Hussein Obama, Nancy Pelosi, United States Army Corps of Engineers and Mitch McConnell. [19-5264] (Lawrence, R.) [Entered: 11/22/2019 03:07 PM]
November 20, 2019 MOTION [1816780] for summary affirmance (Response to Motion served by hand due on 12/02/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 12/02/2019) filed by Mosaic Company and Mosaic Fertilizer, Inc. (Service Date: 11/20/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail) Length Certification: This document complies with the word limit of Fed. R. App. P. 27(d)(2)(A) because, excluding the parts of the document exempted by Fed. R. App. P. 32(f), this document contains 1,349 words. This document also complies with the typeface requirements of Fed. R. App. P. 32(a)(5) and the type-style requirements of Fed. R. App. P. 32(a)(6) because this document has been prepared in a proportionally spaced typeface using Microsoft Office Word in 14-point Times New Roman font. [19-5264] (Weinstein, David) [Entered: 11/20/2019 02:57 PM]
November 8, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1814990] filed by Mosaic Company and Mosaic Fertilizer, Inc. [Service Date: 11/08/2019 ] [19-5264] (Weinstein, David) [Entered: 11/08/2019 11:42 AM]
November 8, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1814989] filed by David B. Weinstein on behalf of Appellees Mosaic Company and Mosaic Fertilizer, Inc.. [19-5264] (Weinstein, David) [Entered: 11/08/2019 11:39 AM]
November 7, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1814823] filed by Southwest Florida Water Management District [Service Date: 11/07/2019 ] [19-5264] (Fernandez, Elizabeth) [Entered: 11/07/2019 02:00 PM]
November 7, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1814822] filed by Elizabeth M. Fernandez on behalf of Appellee Southwest Florida Water Management District. [19-5264] (Fernandez, Elizabeth) [Entered: 11/07/2019 01:57 PM]
November 6, 2019 NOTICE [1815082] filed by Joseph D. Gilberti [Service Date: 11/04/2019 ] [19-5264] [Entered: 11/08/2019 02:58 PM]
November 6, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE, CERTIFICATE OF PARTIES, DOCKETING STATEMENT, ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, DEFERRED APPENDIX STATEMENT, STATEMENT OF ISSUES AND TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1815080] submitted by Joseph D. Gilberti [Service Date: 11/05/2019 ] [19-5264] [Entered: 11/08/2019 02:53 PM]
November 6, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1814523] filed by Luis Rivera II Trustee [Service Date: 11/06/2019 ] [19-5264] (Tomassi, Marie) [Entered: 11/06/2019 09:37 AM]
November 6, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1814521] filed by Marie Tomassi on behalf of Appellee Luis Rivera II Trustee. [19-5264] (Tomassi, Marie) [Entered: 11/06/2019 09:35 AM]
October 8, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1810024] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 11/07/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 11/07/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 11/07/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 11/07/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 11/07/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 11/07/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 11/07/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 11/07/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 11/22/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 11/07/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 11/07/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 11/07/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 11/22/2019 [19-5264] [Entered: 10/08/2019 02:21 PM]
October 8, 2019 LETTER [1810015] sent regarding attorney membership to Christopher Tumminia for Southwest Florida Water Management District. Application for Admission due 11/07/2019. [19-5264] [Entered: 10/08/2019 01:56 PM]
September 30, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1809089] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-00738-KBJ filed by Joseph D. Gilberti. Case transferred from USCA Fed. Circuit as No. 19-2044. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5264. [19-5264] [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:53 PM]
September 30, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5264] [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph Gilberti v. Federal Reserve System, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Luis Rivera II Trustee
Represented By: Marie Tomassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Moffit Cancer Centers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sarasota County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Federal Reserve System, Board of Governors
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mitch McConnell, in his capacity as Majority Leader of the U.S. Senate
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Southwest Florida Water Management District
Represented By: Christopher Tumminia
Represented By: Elizabeth Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Federal Emergency Management Agency
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mosaic Fertilizer, Inc.
Represented By: David Barnett Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Peace River Manasota Regional Water Supply Authority, Desoto County, Sarasota County
Represented By: Clifford J. Zatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Barack Hussein Obama
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 72 Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nancy Pelosi, In her capacity for the U.S. House of Representatives
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mosaic Company
Represented By: David Barnett Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Hillsborough County State Attorneys Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Florida Department of Environmental Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Desoto County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joseph D. Gilberti, an Individual and Licensed Professional Engineer
Represented By: Joseph D. Gilberti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?