Marc Hall v. John Ashcroft, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Amy Ray, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims., John D. Ashcroft, U.S Attorney at time of injury - Supervisor. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims., Michael B. Mukasey, U.S Attorney at time of injury - Supervisor. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims., Anne M. Tompkins, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims., Loretta E. Lynch, U.S Attorney at time of injury; Supervisor. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims., Marino, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims., Dennis Pfannenschmidt, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims., Craig Randall, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims., Nathanael Byerly, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims., J. Walsh, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims., Eric H. Holder, Jr., U.S Attorney at time of injury - Supervisor. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims., Alberto R. Gonzales, U.S Attorney at time of injury - Supervisor. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims., O'Neil, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims., Ewell, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims., Jeff Sessions, U.S Attorney at time of injury; Supervisor. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims., Diana G. Motz, Appellate Judge 4th Circuit at time of injury. Sued in official capacity for "Injunctive Relief" only., Kelton, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims., Spiegel, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims., William P. Barr, U.S Attorney at time of injury; Supervisor. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims., O'Brien, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims., United States, Employer of all defendants at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims., Gretchen C.F. Shappert, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims. and Office of Attorney General, Office of all Attorney Generals defendants at time of injury. Sued in either capacity.
Plaintiff / Appellant: Marc Pierre Hall
Case Number: 19-5297
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 LETTER [1819170] sent to warden sending Clerk order [ # 1819164-5 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 01/06/2020. [19-5297] [Entered: 12/06/2019 02:30 PM]
December 6, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1819164] filed extending Clerk's order [ # 1813744-2 ], [ # 1813744-3 ]. APPELLANT'S payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court, the consent to collection form, and the prisoner trust account report are now due 01/06/2020. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5297] [Entered: 12/06/2019 02:25 PM]
December 4, 2019 MOTION [1819157] for summary reversal filed by Marc Pierre Hall [Service Date: 12/06/2019 ] Length Certification: 5 Pages. [19-5297] [Entered: 12/06/2019 02:09 PM]
November 14, 2019 NOTICE [1815778] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court - Order on Motion for extension of time denied. [19-5297] [Entered: 11/14/2019 12:04 PM]
November 1, 2019 LETTER [1813751] sent to warden sending Clerk order [ # 1813749-5 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 12/02/2019. [19-5297] [Entered: 11/01/2019 11:48 AM]
November 1, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1813749] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 12/31/2019. APPENDIX due 12/31/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5297] [Entered: 11/01/2019 11:44 AM]
November 1, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1813744] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 12/02/2019 directing party to file ifp prisoner submissions: APPELLANT prisoner trust account report due 12/02/2019. APPELLANT consent to collection form due 12/02/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5297] [Entered: 11/01/2019 11:33 AM]
October 31, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1813734] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-02548-UNA filed by Marc Pierre Hall. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5297. [19-5297] [Entered: 11/01/2019 11:05 AM]
October 31, 2019 US PRISONER CASE docketed. [19-5297] [Entered: 11/01/2019 11:03 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Marc Hall v. John Ashcroft, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Amy Ray, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John D. Ashcroft, U.S Attorney at time of injury - Supervisor. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael B. Mukasey, U.S Attorney at time of injury - Supervisor. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anne M. Tompkins, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Loretta E. Lynch, U.S Attorney at time of injury; Supervisor. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Marino, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dennis Pfannenschmidt, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Craig Randall, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nathanael Byerly, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. Walsh, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Eric H. Holder, Jr., U.S Attorney at time of injury - Supervisor. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alberto R. Gonzales, U.S Attorney at time of injury - Supervisor. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: O'Neil, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ewell, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeff Sessions, U.S Attorney at time of injury; Supervisor. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Diana G. Motz, Appellate Judge 4th Circuit at time of injury. Sued in official capacity for "Injunctive Relief" only.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kelton, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Spiegel, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William P. Barr, U.S Attorney at time of injury; Supervisor. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: O'Brien, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States, Employer of all defendants at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gretchen C.F. Shappert, U.S Attorney at time of injury. Sued in either capacity for future FTCA Claims.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Office of Attorney General, Office of all Attorney Generals defendants at time of injury. Sued in either capacity.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Marc Pierre Hall
Represented By: Marc Pierre Hall
Represented By: Warden (Hazelton USP)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?