Ameer Flippin v. Marcus Gray, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Dan Smith, NPS DIRECTOR , in an Official Capacity, David Longly Bernhardt, DOI SECRETARY, in an Official Capacity, United States National Parks Service, Robert Welsted, US PARKS POLICE OFFICER, in an Official Capacity, Lonnie G. Bunch, III, SI SECRETARY, in an Official Capacity, United States Capitol Police, Muriel Bowser, DC MAYOR, in an Official Capacity, Marcus Gray, US PARKS POLICE OFFICER, in an Official Capacity, Kirk Johnson, DIRECTOR , in an Official Capacity, Steven Sund, USCP CHIEF, in an Official Capacity, Department of Interior, Smithsonian Institution, Smithsonian Institution Natural History Museum, Peter Newsham, MPDC CHIEF, in an Official Capacity, Metropolitan Police Department of the District of Columbia, Robert McLean, USPP CHIEF, in an Official Capacity, District of Columbia Government and United States Park Police
Plaintiff / Appellant: Ameer Flippin
Case Number: 19-5315
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 NOTICE [1822414] for judicial notice No. 3 of case law Millbrook v. United States filed by Ameer Flippin [Service Date: 12/20/2019 ] [19-5315] [Entered: 01/02/2020 03:09 PM]
December 20, 2019 NOTICE [1821756] for judicial notice No. 2 of Title 28 filed by Ameer Flippin [Service Date: 12/27/2019 ] [19-5315]--[Edited 01/02/2020 by LMF] [Entered: 12/27/2019 01:11 PM]
December 20, 2019 NOTICE [1821755] for judicial notice No. 1 of Clerical Error in Filing of Notice of Appeal to US Supreme Courtfiled by Ameer Flippin [Service Date: 12/27/2019 ] [19-5315]--[Edited 01/02/2020 by LMF] [Entered: 12/27/2019 01:10 PM]
December 10, 2019 MOTION [1821449] filed by Ameer Flippin styled as Notice of Motion for Class Action Certification (Service Date: 12/10/2019 by Hand Delivery) Length Certification: 5 pages. [19-5315] [Entered: 12/23/2019 04:24 PM]
December 6, 2019 RESPONSE [1819533] to order [ # 1817807-3 ] filed by Ameer Flippin (Service Date: 12/06/2019 by Hand Delivery, US Mail) Length Certification: 8 pages. [19-5315] [Entered: 12/10/2019 11:40 AM]
December 5, 2019 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1819531] received from John Galandi for order [1817808-2] sent to [19-5315] [Entered: 12/10/2019 11:37 AM]
November 26, 2019 FIRST CLASS AND CERTIFIED MAIL SENT [1817808] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7016 3010 0000 2295 2644] of order [ # 1817807-6 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 12/26/2019 from Ameer Flippin. [19-5315] [Entered: 11/26/2019 06:40 PM]
November 26, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1817807] filed vacating order [ # 1816240-4 ]. Directing appellant to show cause why this case shouldn't dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Response to Order due 12/26/2019. The response may not exceed the length limitations established in the order. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5315] [Entered: 11/26/2019 06:35 PM]
November 18, 2019 [THIS ORDER VACATED BY ORDER OF 11/26/19]--CLERK'S ORDER [1816240] filed holding case in abeyance. Case 19-5315 held in abeyance pending decision in 1:19cv2624-BAH from U.S. District Court; The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order to the district court. [19-5315]--[Edited 11/26/2019 by SHA] [Entered: 11/18/2019 11:31 AM]
November 18, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1816235] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-02624-BAH filed by Ameer Flippin. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5315. [19-5315] [Entered: 11/18/2019 11:14 AM]
November 18, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5315] [Entered: 11/18/2019 11:13 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ameer Flippin v. Marcus Gray, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dan Smith, NPS DIRECTOR , in an Official Capacity
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Longly Bernhardt, DOI SECRETARY, in an Official Capacity
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States National Parks Service
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert Welsted, US PARKS POLICE OFFICER, in an Official Capacity
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lonnie G. Bunch, III, SI SECRETARY, in an Official Capacity
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Capitol Police
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Muriel Bowser, DC MAYOR, in an Official Capacity
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Marcus Gray, US PARKS POLICE OFFICER, in an Official Capacity
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kirk Johnson, DIRECTOR , in an Official Capacity
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Steven Sund, USCP CHIEF, in an Official Capacity
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Department of Interior
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Smithsonian Institution
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Smithsonian Institution Natural History Museum
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Peter Newsham, MPDC CHIEF, in an Official Capacity
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Metropolitan Police Department of the District of Columbia
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert McLean, USPP CHIEF, in an Official Capacity
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: District of Columbia Government
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Park Police
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ameer Flippin
Represented By: Ameer Flippin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?