Gerald Perry v. United States Supreme Court, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Gerald Allen Perry
Defendant / Appellee: United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, United States Supreme Court and United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division
Case Number: 19-5350
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 NOTICE [1826747] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court is granted [Case Number 19-5350: IFP] [19-5350] [Entered: 02/03/2020 01:17 PM]
January 15, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1824195] filed referring supplement to the motion ifp in district court [ # 1824190-2 ] to the district court for consideration, continuing to hold case in abeyance. The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order and the original supplement to the district court. [19-5350] [Entered: 01/15/2020 10:10 AM]
January 6, 2020 RECEIPT [1823328] received from Gerald Perry [signed for on 12/17/2019] for documents [ # 1819849-2 ] sent to Appellant Gerald Allen Perry [19-5350] [Entered: 01/09/2020 12:04 PM]
December 30, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1821948] filed referring motion ifp in district court [ # 1821943-2 ] to the district court for consideration., holding case in abeyance. Case 19-5350 held in abeyance pending decision in 1:19cv637-UNA from U.S. District Court; The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order and the original motion to the district court. [19-5350] [Entered: 12/30/2019 12:40 PM]
December 27, 2019 SUPPLEMENT [1824190] to motion ifp in district court [ # 1821943-2 ] filed by Gerald Allen Perry [Service Date: 01/15/2020 ] [19-5350] [Entered: 01/15/2020 09:54 AM]
December 27, 2019 MOTION [1821943] leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court filed by Gerald Allen Perry [Service Date: 12/30/2019 ] Length Certification: 10 pages. [19-5350] [Entered: 12/30/2019 12:30 PM]
December 27, 2019 PRISONER CONSENT TO COLLECTION [1821908] filed by Gerald Allen Perry [19-5350] [Entered: 12/30/2019 11:21 AM]
December 27, 2019 PRISONER TRUST ACCOUNT REPORT [1821906] filed by Gerald Allen Perry (not signed and no ledger sheets attached) [19-5350] [Entered: 12/30/2019 11:21 AM]
December 11, 2019 LETTER [1819849] sent to warden sending Clerk order [ # 1819847-5 ], sending Clerk order [ # 1819846-6 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 01/10/2020. [19-5350] [Entered: 12/11/2019 03:44 PM]
December 11, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1819847] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 02/10/2020. APPENDIX due 02/10/2020. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5350] [Entered: 12/11/2019 03:40 PM]
December 11, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1819846] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 01/10/2020. Directing party to file ifp prisoner submissions: APPELLANT prisoner trust account report due 01/10/2020. APPELLANT consent to collection form due 01/10/2020. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5350] [Entered: 12/11/2019 03:30 PM]
December 11, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1819842] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-00637-UNA filed by Gerald Allen Perry. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5350. [19-5350] [Entered: 12/11/2019 03:25 PM]
December 11, 2019 US PRISONER CASE docketed. [19-5350] [Entered: 12/11/2019 03:20 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gerald Perry v. United States Supreme Court, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gerald Allen Perry
Represented By: Gerald Allen Perry
Represented By: Warden (Huntsville Ellis Unit)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Supreme Court
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?