Alder Cruz v. DHS, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Mark A. Morgan, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, in his official capacity, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, Matthew T. Albence, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, in his official capacity and United States Customs and Border Protection
Plaintiff / Appellant: Alder Cruz
Case Number: 19-5359
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1824906] filed by Matthew T. Albence, DHS, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mark A. Morgan and United States Customs and Border Protection [Service Date: 01/21/2020 ] [19-5359] (Ramkumar, Archith) [Entered: 01/21/2020 02:38 PM]
January 21, 2020 NOTICE [1824878] Notice of Unavailability filed by Alder Cruz [Service Date: 01/21/2020 ] [19-5359] (Sheldon, Robert) [Entered: 01/21/2020 01:49 PM]
January 21, 2020 MOTION [1824874] to expedite case filed by Alder Cruz (Service Date: 01/21/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1140 words. [19-5359] (Sheldon, Robert) [Entered: 01/21/2020 01:41 PM]
January 21, 2020 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1824872] submitted by Alder Cruz [Service Date: 01/21/2020 ] [19-5359] (Sheldon, Robert) [Entered: 01/21/2020 01:32 PM]
January 21, 2020 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1824871] filed by Alder Cruz [Service Date: 01/21/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [19-5359] (Sheldon, Robert) [Entered: 01/21/2020 01:30 PM]
January 21, 2020 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1824869] filed by Alder Cruz [Service Date: 01/21/2020 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [19-5359] (Sheldon, Robert) [Entered: 01/21/2020 01:28 PM]
January 21, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1824867] filed by Alder Cruz [Service Date: 01/21/2020 ] [19-5359] (Sheldon, Robert) [Entered: 01/21/2020 01:26 PM]
January 21, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1824866] filed by Alder Cruz [Service Date: 01/21/2020 ] [19-5359] (Sheldon, Robert) [Entered: 01/21/2020 01:24 PM]
January 21, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1824865] filed by Alder Cruz [Service Date: 01/21/2020 ] [19-5359] (Sheldon, Robert) [Entered: 01/21/2020 01:22 PM]
January 16, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1824381] filed by Archith Ramkumar on behalf of Appellees Matthew T. Albence, DHS, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Mark A. Morgan and United States Customs and Border Protection. [19-5359] (Ramkumar, Archith) [Entered: 01/16/2020 11:47 AM]
December 22, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1821247] filed by Robert Sheldon on behalf of Appellant Alder Cruz. [19-5359] (Sheldon, Robert) [Entered: 12/22/2019 01:25 PM]
December 20, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1821195] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 01/21/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 01/21/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 01/21/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 01/21/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 01/21/2020. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 01/21/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 01/21/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 01/21/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 02/03/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 01/21/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 01/21/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 01/21/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 02/03/2020 [19-5359] [Entered: 12/20/2019 03:46 PM]
December 20, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1821193] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-02727-DLF filed by Alder Cruz. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5359. [19-5359] [Entered: 12/20/2019 03:44 PM]
December 20, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5359] [Entered: 12/20/2019 03:42 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Alder Cruz v. DHS, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mark A. Morgan, Acting Commissioner, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, in his official capacity
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Matthew T. Albence, Acting Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, in his official capacity
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alder Cruz
Represented By: Robert Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?