Franklin Smith v. Kevin Dailey, et al
Defendant / Appellee: William Baggs, A.T.F., Barlow, Sergeant, Tulsa County Jail, Peter J. Mantoni, Officer of Virgnia Beach, Mark S. Davis, U.S. District Judge, Kevin Stan Dailey, Chief Engineer, IBM, Bryant, Corporal, Scott F. Hallawer, Attorney, Rodney J. Heggy, Prosecutor, Jamie, Deputy Clerk, United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia, Virginia Beach City Jail Defendants, All defendants in Virginia Beach City Jail in the appeal reversed by the 4th Circuit, Case No. 18-7252, Stacy Bowein, Officer, Oklahoma City, Ronald McDavis, Samantha L. Zarek, Probation Officer, Department of Corrections, Bernard M. Jones, U.S. Magistrate Judge, Monique Rentie, Deputy, Case No.: 4:18-cv-046, Harold W. Clarke, Director of Virginia Department of Corrections, Robert S. Mueller, III, F.B.I., Ms. Coleman, Placement Officer, Virginia Department of Corrections, Leslee Fathallah, Deputy Circuit Executive, Tenth Circuit, Molayia Black, Sergeant, Tulsa County Jail, Jennifer Williams, Clinical Supervisor, Impact Mental Health Services, Terence Kern, U.S. District Judge, Northern District of Oklahoma, Angie, Uber Driver, Straight, Sergeant, Tulsa County Jail, James Harris, Evan Way, Attorney, Kristin Paulding, Attorney, Brenda Dain, Private Investigator, Ambre C. Gooch, Attorney, Andre Rosenberg, Prosecutor of Virginia Beach, Chiquita Loving, House Owner, David Baisden, Captain, William R. O'Brien, Sentencing Judge, Judge of Virginia Beach Circuit State Court and Lawrence, Sergeant
Plaintiff / Appellant: Franklin C. Smith
Case Number: 19-5363
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 FIRST CLASS MAIL RETURNED [1829916] marked "return to sender - no such number - unable to forward". Mail had been sent to Party Franklin C. Smith. [19-5363] [Entered: 02/24/2020 04:51 PM]
February 12, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1828246] filed considering Clerk order ifp motion or docket fee [ # 1823817-2 ], dismissing case for lack of prosecution, withholding issuance of the mandate. [19-5363] [Entered: 02/12/2020 12:27 PM]
February 11, 2020 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED [1828109] marked "Return to sender; no such number; unable to forward". Certified Mail [1823830-2] had been sent to Party Franklin C. Smith. [19-5363] [Entered: 02/11/2020 03:03 PM]
February 3, 2020 FIRST CLASS MAIL RETURNED [1827340] marked "Return to sender; no such number; unable to forward". Mail [1823830-2] had been sent to Party Franklin C. Smith. [19-5363] [Entered: 02/06/2020 11:46 AM]
January 13, 2020 CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1823830] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7019 0700 0000 5269 2208] of order [ # 1823817-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 02/12/2020 from Franklin C. Smith. [19-5363] [Entered: 01/13/2020 01:20 PM]
January 13, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1823817] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 02/12/2020. Directing party to file ifp prisoner submissions: APPELLANT released prisoner trust account report due 02/12/2020. APPELLANT consent to collection form due 02/12/2020. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5363] [Entered: 01/13/2020 12:29 PM]
January 8, 2020 RECEIPT [1823576] received from for documents [ # 1822011-2 ] sent to Appellant Franklin C. Smith [Per Warden:released on January 3, 2020 time served] [19-5363] [Entered: 01/10/2020 01:36 PM]
December 30, 2019 LETTER [1822011] sent to warden sending Clerk order [ # 1822001-6 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 01/29/2020. [19-5363] [Entered: 12/30/2019 03:10 PM]
December 30, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1822001] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 01/29/2020. Directing party to file ifp prisoner submissions: APPELLANT prisoner trust account report due 01/29/2020. APPELLANT consent to collection form due 01/29/2020. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5363] [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:54 PM]
December 30, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1821989] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-01636-UNA filed by Franklin C. Smith. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5363. [19-5363] [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:29 PM]
December 30, 2019 US PRISONER CASE docketed. [19-5363] [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:20 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Franklin Smith v. Kevin Dailey, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William Baggs, A.T.F.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Barlow, Sergeant, Tulsa County Jail
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Peter J. Mantoni, Officer of Virgnia Beach
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mark S. Davis, U.S. District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kevin Stan Dailey, Chief Engineer, IBM
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bryant, Corporal
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scott F. Hallawer, Attorney
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rodney J. Heggy, Prosecutor
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jamie, Deputy Clerk, United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Virginia Beach City Jail Defendants, All defendants in Virginia Beach City Jail in the appeal reversed by the 4th Circuit, Case No. 18-7252
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stacy Bowein, Officer, Oklahoma City
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ronald McDavis
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Samantha L. Zarek, Probation Officer, Department of Corrections
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bernard M. Jones, U.S. Magistrate Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Monique Rentie, Deputy, Case No.: 4:18-cv-046
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Harold W. Clarke, Director of Virginia Department of Corrections
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert S. Mueller, III, F.B.I.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ms. Coleman, Placement Officer, Virginia Department of Corrections
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Leslee Fathallah, Deputy Circuit Executive, Tenth Circuit
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Molayia Black, Sergeant, Tulsa County Jail
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jennifer Williams, Clinical Supervisor, Impact Mental Health Services
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Terence Kern, U.S. District Judge, Northern District of Oklahoma
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Angie, Uber Driver
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Straight, Sergeant, Tulsa County Jail
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James Harris
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Evan Way, Attorney
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kristin Paulding, Attorney
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brenda Dain, Private Investigator
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ambre C. Gooch, Attorney
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andre Rosenberg, Prosecutor of Virginia Beach
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chiquita Loving, House Owner
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Baisden, Captain
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William R. O'Brien, Sentencing Judge, Judge of Virginia Beach Circuit State Court
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lawrence, Sergeant
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Franklin C. Smith
Represented By: Franklin C. Smith
Represented By: Warden (Virginia Beach)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?