Phillips Morales, et al v. Intelsat Global Services Corp., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Francis Wood-Parker, Helga I. Burrell-Sahl, Dorothy Fields, Jane P. Kinzie, Bambi Prigel, Deborah K. Cooper, Sharon A. Riccardi, Nedda Krowitz, Luis Francesco T. Perrone, Paul P. Tan, Fernando van Reigersberg, Ruth C. Labardee, David Roy Neil Connick, John Tierney, Douglas Shannon, Phillips S. Morales, Frank A. L. Subaran, Martin P. Brown, Jr., Lan N. Nguyen, All Plaintiffs, Heida Kristjansdottir, Alfred Cammarata, Norman Williams, Patricia Acosta, Hugh Lewis, Timothy R. Thompson, Melvin R. Chamberlin, David Koff, Victor J. Slabinski, Ruth Kupperschlag, Bob Ames, David Brown, Aaron B. Coleman, Thomas Black, Luciano Fasano, Alma L. Fagan, Gian Piero Forcina, Rita T. Gray, John E. Gray, James R. Owens, Antonio Russo, David J. Kennedy, Erland Magnusson, Gerald Joy-Pak Lo, Karla Costella, William Lee, Graciela Kelinsky, Magdy Battikha, Sebastian Lasher, Caryl J. Stalick, Irwin Rowe, Richard Magee, Fernando P. Orlandi, Malcolm Chaires, Maria V. Ross, David Rees, Reginald Westlake, Matgaret A. Stevenson, Simon Bennett, Virginia Aribe, Prakash M. Nadkarni, Alan Olson, Wade Krueger, Hemlut Wild, Laurence V. Wood, Jr., Robert Peters, Omar Atia, Carmen M. Nelson, Gomaa E. A. Abutaleb and Charles N. Tull
Defendant / Appellee: Intelsat Global Service Corp., now known as Intelsat Global Service LLC, Intelsat, Ltd., now known as Intelsat S.A., Kathleen S. Alexander, Administrator and Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan
Case Number: 19-7041
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 REPLY [1794203] filed by Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan, Intelsat Global Service Corp. and Intelsat, Ltd. to response [ # 1793015-2 ], [ # 1793015-3 ] [Service Date: 06/24/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1922 words. [19-7041] (Calandra, John) [Entered: 06/24/2019 03:03 PM]
June 21, 2019 APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1793812] filed by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 06/21/2019 ] Length of Brief: 2,989 words. [19-7002] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 06/21/2019 08:28 AM]
June 17, 2019 REPLY [1793015] filed by All Plaintiffs in 19-7041 to response and RESPONSE filed to Cross Motion [ # 1792249-2 ] [Service Date: 06/17/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,873 words. [19-7041, 19-7002]--[Edited 06/18/2019 by DJR--MODIFIED EVENT] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 06/17/2019 09:39 AM]
June 11, 2019 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1792249] to motion certificate of appealability [ # 1788131-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1788131-3 ] combined with a MOTION to dismiss case filed by Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan, Intelsat Global Service Corp. and Intelsat, Ltd. [Service Date: 06/11/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 5022. [19-7041] (Calandra, John) [Entered: 06/11/2019 06:12 PM]
June 6, 2019 APPELLEE BRIEF [1791528] filed by Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan, Intelsat Global Service Corp. and Intelsat, Ltd. [Service Date: 06/06/2019 ] Length of Brief: 12,993 words. [19-7002] (Calandra, John) [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:54 PM]
June 6, 2019 AMENDED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791527] filed by John J. Calandra and co-counsel Lisa A. Gerson; Michael S. Nadel on behalf of Appellees Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan, Intelsat Global Service Corp. and Intelsat, Ltd. in 19-7002, 19-7041. [19-7002, 19-7041] (Calandra, John) [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:52 PM]
May 20, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1788640] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1788440-2 ]; directing response to motion to consolidate [ # 1788168-2 ] Response due on 06/11/2019 [19-7041] [Entered: 05/20/2019 04:53 PM]
May 19, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1788440] to extend time to file response to 06/11/2019 filed by Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan, Intelsat Global Service Corp. and Intelsat, Ltd. Length Certification: This document contains 166 words.. [19-7041] (Nadel, Michael) [Entered: 05/19/2019 09:49 PM]
May 19, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1788439] filed by Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan, Intelsat Global Service Corp. and Intelsat, Ltd. in 19-7041 [Service Date: 05/19/2019 ] [19-7041, 19-7002] (Nadel, Michael) [Entered: 05/19/2019 09:43 PM]
May 19, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1788438] filed by Michael S. Nadel on behalf of Appellees Intelsat, Ltd. and Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan in 19-7041, Appellee Intelsat Global Service Corp. in 19-7002. [19-7041, 19-7002] (Nadel, Michael) [Entered: 05/19/2019 09:41 PM]
May 17, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1788227] filed by Lawrence P. Postol on behalf of Appellant All Plaintiffs. [19-7041] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/17/2019 09:16 AM]
May 17, 2019 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1788226] filed by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 05/17/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [19-7041] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/17/2019 09:15 AM]
May 17, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1788225] filed by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 05/17/2019 ] [19-7041] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/17/2019 09:14 AM]
May 16, 2019 MOTION [1788168] to consolidate cases filed by All Plaintiffs (Service Date: 05/16/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail) Length Certification: 7 pages. [19-7041] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/16/2019 02:55 PM]
May 16, 2019 MOTION [1788131] to consolidate cases filed by All Plaintiffs (Service Date: 05/16/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail) Length Certification: 5 pages. [19-7041]--[Edited 05/17/2019 by JAD] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/16/2019 01:05 PM]
May 16, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1788128] filed by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 05/16/2019 ] [19-7041] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/16/2019 01:00 PM]
May 16, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1788126] filed by appellants [Service Date: 05/16/2019 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [19-7041]--[Edited 05/16/2019 by AY] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/16/2019 01:00 PM]
May 16, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1788125] filed by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 05/16/2019 ] [19-7041] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/16/2019 12:58 PM]
May 8, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1786957] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/24/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/07/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/07/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/07/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/24/2019 [19-7041] [Entered: 05/08/2019 04:29 PM]
May 8, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1786940] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:04-cv-01044-TSC filed by Gomaa E. A. Abutaleb, Patricia Acosta, All Plaintiffs, Bob Ames, Virginia Aribe, Omar Atia, Magdy Battikha, Simon Bennett, Thomas Black, David Brown, Martin P. Brown, Jr., Helga I. Burrell-Sahl, Alfred Cammarata, Malcolm Chaires, Melvin R. Chamberlin, Aaron B. Coleman, David Roy Neil Connick, Deborah K. Cooper, Karla Costella, Alma L. Fagan, Luc Iano Fasano, Dorothy Fields, Gian Piero Forcina, John E. Gray, Rita T. Gray, Graciela Kelinsky, David J. Kennedy, Jane P. Kinzie, David Koff, Heida Kristjansdottir, Nedda Krowitz, Wade Krueger, Ruth Kupperschlag, Ruth C. Labardee, Sebastian Lasher, William Lee, Hugh Lewis, Gerald Joy-Pak Lo, Richard Magee, Erland Magnusson, Phillips S. Morales, Prakash M. Nadkarni, Carmen M. Nelson, Lan N. Nguyen, Alan Olson, Fernando P. Orlandi, James R. Owens, Luis Francesco T. Perrone, Robert Peters, Bambi Prigel, David Rees, Sharon A. Riccardi, Maria V. Ross, Irwin Rowe, Antonio Russo, Douglas Shannon, Victor J. Slabinski, Caryl J. Stalick, Matgaret A. Stevenson, Frank A. L. Subaran, Paul P. Tan, Timothy R. Thompson, John Tierney, Charles N. Tull, Fernando Van Reigersberg, Reginald Westlake, Hemlut Wild, Norman Williams, Laurence V. Wood, Jr. and Francis Wood-Parker. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7041. [19-7041] [Entered: 05/08/2019 04:11 PM]
May 8, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-7041] [Entered: 05/08/2019 04:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips Morales, et al v. Intelsat Global Services Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Francis Wood-Parker
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Helga I. Burrell-Sahl
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Dorothy Fields
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jane P. Kinzie
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bambi Prigel
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Deborah K. Cooper
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sharon A. Riccardi
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Nedda Krowitz
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Luis Francesco T. Perrone
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Paul P. Tan
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Fernando van Reigersberg
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ruth C. Labardee
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Roy Neil Connick
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John Tierney
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Douglas Shannon
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Phillips S. Morales
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Frank A. L. Subaran
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Martin P. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lan N. Nguyen
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Heida Kristjansdottir
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alfred Cammarata
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Norman Williams
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Patricia Acosta
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hugh Lewis
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Timothy R. Thompson
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Melvin R. Chamberlin
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Koff
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Victor J. Slabinski
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ruth Kupperschlag
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bob Ames
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Brown
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Aaron B. Coleman
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Thomas Black
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Luciano Fasano
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alma L. Fagan
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gian Piero Forcina
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Rita T. Gray
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John E. Gray
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James R. Owens
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Antonio Russo
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David J. Kennedy
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Erland Magnusson
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gerald Joy-Pak Lo
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Karla Costella
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: William Lee
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Graciela Kelinsky
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Magdy Battikha
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sebastian Lasher
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Caryl J. Stalick
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Irwin Rowe
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Richard Magee
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Fernando P. Orlandi
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Malcolm Chaires
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Maria V. Ross
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Rees
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Reginald Westlake
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Matgaret A. Stevenson
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Simon Bennett
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Virginia Aribe
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Prakash M. Nadkarni
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alan Olson
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Wade Krueger
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hemlut Wild
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Laurence V. Wood, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robert Peters
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Omar Atia
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Carmen M. Nelson
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gomaa E. A. Abutaleb
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Charles N. Tull
Represented By: Lawrence Philip Postol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Intelsat Global Service Corp., now known as Intelsat Global Service LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Nadel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Intelsat, Ltd., now known as Intelsat S.A.
Represented By: Michael S. Nadel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kathleen S. Alexander, Administrator
Represented By: Wayne A. Schrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan
Represented By: Michael S. Nadel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?