Sylvia Sanchez, et al v. DC, et al
Defendant / Appellee: District of Columbia and D.C. Public Schools
Plaintiff / Appellant: Z.B., a minor, by and through his mother Sylvia Sanchez and Sylvia Sanchez
Case Number: 19-7048
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1799169] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 09/30/2019. APPELLEE Brief due on 10/30/2019. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 11/20/2019. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 11/27/2019. Final Briefs due 12/11/2019. [19-7048] [Entered: 07/25/2019 05:41 PM]
June 27, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1794930] filed by D.C. Public Schools and DC [Service Date: 06/27/2019 ] [19-7048] (Lebsack, Sonya) [Entered: 06/27/2019 04:44 PM]
June 27, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1794929] filed by Sonya L. Lebsack and co-counsel Loren L. AliKhan and Caroline S. Van Zile on behalf of Appellees D.C. Public Schools and DC. [19-7048] (Lebsack, Sonya) [Entered: 06/27/2019 04:41 PM]
June 27, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1794927] filed by Sylvia Sanchez and Z.B. [Service Date: 06/27/2019 ] [19-7048] (Robinson, Chesseley) [Entered: 06/27/2019 04:33 PM]
June 27, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1794910] to record [ # 1794908-2 ], statement [ # 1794904-2 ], statement [ # 1794900-2 ], notice [ # 1794894-2 ], report [ # 1794893-2 ] filed by Sylvia Sanchez and Z.B.. [19-7048] (Robinson, Chesseley) [Entered: 06/27/2019 03:53 PM]
June 27, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1794908] submitted by Sylvia Sanchez and Z.B. [19-7048] (Robinson, Chesseley) [Entered: 06/27/2019 03:51 PM]
June 27, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES and STATMENT OF INTENT TO UTILIZE DEFERRED JOINT APPENDIX [1794904] filed by Sylvia Sanchez and Z.B. [Service Date: 06/27/2019 ] [19-7048] (Robinson, Chesseley) [Entered: 06/27/2019 03:49 PM]
June 27, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1794900] filed by Sylvia Sanchez and Z.B. [Service Date: 06/27/2019 ] [19-7048] (Robinson, Chesseley) [Entered: 06/27/2019 03:40 PM]
June 27, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1794894] filed by Chesseley Robinson on behalf of Appellants Sylvia Sanchez and Z.B.. [19-7048] (Robinson, Chesseley) [Entered: 06/27/2019 03:28 PM]
June 27, 2019 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1794893] filed by Sylvia Sanchez [Service Date: 06/27/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-7048] (Robinson, Chesseley) [Entered: 06/27/2019 03:25 PM]
May 28, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1789820] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/27/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/27/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/27/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/27/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/27/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/27/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/27/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/27/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/12/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/27/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/27/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/27/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/12/2019 [19-7048] [Entered: 05/28/2019 03:39 PM]
May 28, 2019 LETTER [1789818] sent regarding attorney membership to Chesseley Alexander Robinson, III for Sylvia Sanchez and Z.B.. Application for Admission due 06/27/2019. [19-7048] [Entered: 05/28/2019 03:35 PM]
May 28, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1789814] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-00087-CKK filed by Sylvia Sanchez and Z.B.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7048. [19-7048] [Entered: 05/28/2019 03:25 PM]
May 28, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-7048] [Entered: 05/28/2019 03:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sylvia Sanchez, et al v. DC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: District of Columbia
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Represented By: Sonya Ludmilla Lebsack
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: D.C. Public Schools
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Represented By: Sonya Ludmilla Lebsack
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Z.B., a minor, by and through his mother Sylvia Sanchez
Represented By: Chesseley Alexander Robinson III
Represented By: Chesseley Alexander Robinson Esquire III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sylvia Sanchez
Represented By: Chesseley Alexander Robinson III
Represented By: Chesseley Alexander Robinson Esquire III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?