Cheryl Said v. National Railroad Passenger C
Plaintiff / Appellant: Cheryl Renee Said
Defendant / Appellee: National Railroad Passenger Corporation, A District of Columbia Corp.
Case Number: 19-7089
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1808716] filed by Cheryl Renee Said [Service Date: 09/30/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [19-7089] (Emeronye Swift, Charity) [Entered: 09/30/2019 10:20 PM]
September 25, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1807998] filed by Cheryl Renee Said [Service Date: 09/25/2019 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [19-7089] (Emeronye Swift, Charity) [Entered: 09/25/2019 12:58 PM]
September 20, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1807537] submitted by Cheryl Renee Said [Service Date: 09/20/2019 ] [19-7089] (Emeronye Swift, Charity) [Entered: 09/20/2019 09:47 PM]
September 20, 2019 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1807535] filed by Cheryl Renee Said [Service Date: 09/20/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: transcripts needed for the appeal have been ordered, but not all transcripts have been received. Next APPELLANT transcript status report due 10/21/2019. [19-7089]--[Edited 09/23/2019 by LMC] (Emeronye Swift, Charity) [Entered: 09/20/2019 08:46 PM]
September 20, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1807534] filed by Cheryl Renee Said [Service Date: 09/20/2019 ] [19-7089] (Emeronye Swift, Charity) [Entered: 09/20/2019 08:34 PM]
September 20, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1807533] filed by Stephen Christopher Swift and co-counsel Charity Chidinma Emeronye Swift on behalf of Appellant Cheryl Renee Said. [19-7089] (Emeronye Swift, Charity) [Entered: 09/20/2019 08:31 PM]
September 20, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1807532] filed by Cheryl Renee Said [Service Date: 09/20/2019 ] [19-7089] (Emeronye Swift, Charity) [Entered: 09/20/2019 08:23 PM]
September 20, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1807530] filed by Cheryl Renee Said [Service Date: 09/20/2019 ] [19-7089] (Emeronye Swift, Charity) [Entered: 09/20/2019 08:13 PM]
September 20, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1807335] filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation [Service Date: 09/20/2019 ] [19-7089] (Waxman, Joshua) [Entered: 09/20/2019 10:22 AM]
September 20, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1807334] filed by Joshua B. Waxman and co-counsel Eunju Park on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation. [19-7089] (Waxman, Joshua) [Entered: 09/20/2019 10:19 AM]
August 21, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1803151] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 09/20/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 09/20/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 09/20/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 09/20/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 09/20/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 09/20/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 09/20/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 09/20/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 10/07/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 09/20/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 09/20/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 09/20/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 10/07/2019 [19-7089] [Entered: 08/21/2019 03:45 PM]
August 21, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1803148] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:15-cv-01289-RBW filed by Cheryl Renee Said. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7089. [19-7089] [Entered: 08/21/2019 03:39 PM]
August 21, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-7089] [Entered: 08/21/2019 03:38 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Cheryl Said v. National Railroad Passenger C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cheryl Renee Said
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Swift Esquire
Represented By: Charity Chidinma Emeronye Swift Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: National Railroad Passenger Corporation, A District of Columbia Corp.
Represented By: Joshua B. Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?