EIG Energy Fund XIV, L.P., et al v. Petroleo Brasileiro, S.A., et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: EIG Energy Fund XIV-B, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV (Cayman), L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV (Cayman), L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV-A, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV-A, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV-B, L.P. and EIG Management Company, LLC
Defendant / Appellee: Sembcorp Marine Ltd., Keppel Offshore & Marine Ltd., Jurong Shipyard Pte Ltd., Sembcorp Industries Ltd., Odebrecht Participaes e Engenharia S.A., Odebrecht, S.A. and Keppel Corporation Ltd.
Defendant / Appellant: Petroleo Brasileiro, S.A.
Case Number: 19-7101
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1810304] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1810076-2 ]; directing response to motion for summary affirmance [1809106-2] [ # 1809072-2 ] Response due on 10/29/2019 [19-7101] [Entered: 10/10/2019 12:08 PM]
October 9, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1810231] submitted by Petroleo Brasileiro, S.A. [Service Date: 10/09/2019 ] [19-7101] (Druding, Kyle) [Entered: 10/09/2019 07:41 PM]
October 9, 2019 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1810230] filed by Petroleo Brasileiro, S.A. [Service Date: 10/09/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [19-7101] (Druding, Kyle) [Entered: 10/09/2019 07:40 PM]
October 9, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1810229] filed by Petroleo Brasileiro, S.A. [Service Date: 10/09/2019 ] [19-7101] (Druding, Kyle) [Entered: 10/09/2019 07:38 PM]
October 9, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1810228] filed by Petroleo Brasileiro, S.A. [Service Date: 10/09/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-7101] (Druding, Kyle) [Entered: 10/09/2019 07:36 PM]
October 9, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1810227] filed by Petroleo Brasileiro, S.A. [Service Date: 10/09/2019 ] [19-7101] (Druding, Kyle) [Entered: 10/09/2019 07:35 PM]
October 9, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1810226] for motion to extend time [ # 1810076-2 ] filed by Petroleo Brasileiro, S.A.. [19-7101] (Druding, Kyle) [Entered: 10/09/2019 07:33 PM]
October 8, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1810076] to extend time to file response to 10/29/2019 filed by Petroleo Brasileiro, S.A. [Service Date: 10/08/2019 ] Length Certification: 392 Words. [19-7101] (Druding, Kyle) [Entered: 10/08/2019 11:57 PM]
October 8, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1810075] filed by Petroleo Brasileiro, S.A. [Service Date: 10/08/2019 ] [19-7101] (Druding, Kyle) [Entered: 10/08/2019 11:51 PM]
October 8, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1810074] filed by Kyle M. Druding and co-counsel Robert B. Wolinsky on behalf of Appellant Petroleo Brasileiro, S.A.. [19-7101] (Druding, Kyle) [Entered: 10/08/2019 11:30 PM]
October 2, 2019 SEALED MOTION [1809106] for summary affirmance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/18/2019) filed by EIG Energy Fund XIV (Cayman), L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV-A, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV-B, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV (Cayman), L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV-A, L.P. and EIG Energy Fund XV-B, L.P. (Service Date: 10/02/2019 by US Mail) Length Certification: 5,123 words. [19-7101] [Entered: 10/02/2019 04:15 PM]
October 2, 2019 PUBLIC MOTION [1809072] for summary affirmance (Response to Motion served by hand due on 10/15/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/15/2019) filed by EIG Energy Fund XIV (Cayman), L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV-A, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV-B, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV (Cayman), L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV-A, L.P. and EIG Energy Fund XV-B, L.P. (Service Date: 10/02/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 5,123. [19-7101] (Goldman, Daniel) [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:16 PM]
October 2, 2019 NOTICE [1809070] of submission of paper filing filed by EIG Energy Fund XIV (Cayman), L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV-A, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV-B, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV (Cayman), L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV-A, L.P. and EIG Energy Fund XV-B, L.P. [Service Date: 10/02/2019 ] [19-7101] (Goldman, Daniel) [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:14 PM]
October 2, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1809069] filed by Daniel B. Goldman and co-counsel Barry Coburn on behalf of Appellees EIG Energy Fund XIV (Cayman), L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV-A, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XIV-B, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV (Cayman), L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV, L.P., EIG Energy Fund XV-A, L.P. and EIG Energy Fund XV-B, L.P.. [19-7101] (Goldman, Daniel) [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:13 PM]
September 9, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1805604] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 10/09/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 10/09/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 10/09/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 10/09/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 10/09/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 10/09/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 10/09/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 10/09/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 10/24/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 10/09/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 10/09/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 10/09/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 10/24/2019 [19-7101] [Entered: 09/09/2019 01:17 PM]
August 30, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1804602] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:16-cv-00333-APM filed by Petroleo Brasileiro, S.A.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7101. [19-7101] [Entered: 09/03/2019 11:21 AM]
August 30, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-7101] [Entered: 09/03/2019 11:21 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: EIG Energy Fund XIV, L.P., et al v. Petroleo Brasileiro, S.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EIG Energy Fund XIV-B, L.P.
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Represented By: Daniel Goldman
Represented By: Kerri Ann Law Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EIG Energy Fund XV, L.P.
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Represented By: Daniel Goldman
Represented By: Kerri Ann Law Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EIG Energy Fund XIV (Cayman), L.P.
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Represented By: Daniel Goldman
Represented By: Kerri Ann Law Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EIG Energy Fund XIV, L.P.
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Represented By: Daniel Goldman
Represented By: Kerri Ann Law Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EIG Energy Fund XV (Cayman), L.P.
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Represented By: Daniel Goldman
Represented By: Kerri Ann Law Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EIG Energy Fund XIV-A, L.P.
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Represented By: Daniel Goldman
Represented By: Kerri Ann Law Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EIG Energy Fund XV-A, L.P.
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Represented By: Daniel Goldman
Represented By: Kerri Ann Law Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EIG Energy Fund XV-B, L.P.
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Represented By: Daniel Goldman
Represented By: Kerri Ann Law Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EIG Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Barry Coburn
Represented By: Daniel Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sembcorp Marine Ltd.
Represented By: Jonathan Fredrick Cohn Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Keppel Offshore & Marine Ltd.
Represented By: Peter T. Barbur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jurong Shipyard Pte Ltd.
Represented By: Jonathan Fredrick Cohn Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sembcorp Industries Ltd.
Represented By: David William Ogden Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Odebrecht Participaes e Engenharia S.A.
Represented By: William Anthony Burck Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Odebrecht, S.A.
Represented By: William Anthony Burck Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Keppel Corporation Ltd.
Represented By: Peter T. Barbur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Petroleo Brasileiro, S.A.
Represented By: Adam Keith Levin
Represented By: Kyle Druding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?