Kim Keister v. AARP Benefits Commitee, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Kim Keister
Defendant / Appellee: AARP Benefits Committee and Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 19-7145
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1820047] submitted by Kim Keister [19-7145] (Clark, Denise) [Entered: 12/13/2019 12:01 AM]
December 13, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1820046] filed by Kim Keister [Service Date: 12/12/2019 ] [19-7145] (Clark, Denise) [Entered: 12/13/2019 12:00 AM]
December 12, 2019 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1820045] filed by Kim Keister [Service Date: 12/12/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: transcripts needed for the appeal have been ordered, but not all transcripts have been received. Next APPELLANT transcript status report due 01/13/2020. [19-7145]--[Edited 12/13/2019 by SHA] (Clark, Denise) [Entered: 12/12/2019 11:59 PM]
December 12, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1820044] filed by Kim Keister [Service Date: 12/12/2019 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [19-7145] (Clark, Denise) [Entered: 12/12/2019 11:54 PM]
December 12, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1820043] filed by Kim Keister [Service Date: 12/12/2019 ] [19-7145] (Clark, Denise) [Entered: 12/12/2019 11:51 PM]
December 12, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1820042] filed by Denise M. Clark on behalf of Appellant Kim Keister. [19-7145] (Clark, Denise) [Entered: 12/12/2019 11:49 PM]
December 12, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1820041] filed by Kim Keister [Service Date: 12/12/2019 ] [19-7145] (Clark, Denise) [Entered: 12/12/2019 11:46 PM]
December 12, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1820036] filed by AARP Benefits Committee [Service Date: 12/12/2019 ] [19-7145] (Davis, Alison) [Entered: 12/12/2019 06:35 PM]
December 12, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1820035] filed by Alison N. Davis on behalf of Appellee AARP Benefits Committee. [19-7145] (Davis, Alison) [Entered: 12/12/2019 06:34 PM]
December 12, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1819915] filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company [Service Date: 12/12/2019 ] [19-7145] (Downey, Brian) [Entered: 12/12/2019 10:12 AM]
December 12, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1819913] filed by Brian P. Downey and co-counsel Kathleen A. Mullen on behalf of Appellee Aetna Life Insurance Company. [19-7145] (Downey, Brian) [Entered: 12/12/2019 10:09 AM]
November 12, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1815252] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/12/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 12/12/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/12/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/12/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/12/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 12/12/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 12/12/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/12/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 12/27/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 12/12/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 12/12/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/12/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 12/27/2019 [19-7145] [Entered: 11/12/2019 12:35 PM]
November 12, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1815250] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-02385-KBJ filed by Kim Keister. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7145. [19-7145] [Entered: 11/12/2019 12:34 PM]
November 12, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-7145] [Entered: 11/12/2019 12:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kim Keister v. AARP Benefits Commitee, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kim Keister
Represented By: Denise Marie Clark Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AARP Benefits Committee
Represented By: Alison Nadine Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian P. Downey
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?