Raed Jarrar v. NLRB
Petitioner: Raed Jarrar
Respondent: National Labor Relations Board
Case Number: 20-1067
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1834168] filed by Ruth Burdick on behalf of Respondent NLRB. [20-1067] (Burdick, Ruth) [Entered: 03/18/2020 04:23 PM]
March 18, 2020 CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1834099] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7017 3040 0001 1261 0898] of order [ # 1834091-6 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 04/17/2020 from Raed Jarrar. [20-1067] [Entered: 03/18/2020 01:14 PM]
March 18, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1834091] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 04/17/2020. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 04/17/2020. PETITIONER statement of issues due 04/17/2020. PETITIONER underlying decision due 04/17/2020. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 04/17/2020. PETITIONER procedural motions due 04/17/2020. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 05/04/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 04/17/2020. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 04/17/2020. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 05/04/2020. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 05/04/2020. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to petitioner by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [20-1067] [Entered: 03/18/2020 12:53 PM]
March 18, 2020 CERTIFIED COPY [1834075] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1834062-2 ] [20-1067] [Entered: 03/18/2020 12:35 PM]
March 10, 2020 MOTION [1834069] to permit pro se electronic filing status filed by Raed Jarrar (Service Date: 03/10/2020 by US Mail) Length Certification: 2 pages. [20-1067] [Entered: 03/18/2020 12:29 PM]
March 9, 2020 PETITION FOR REVIEW [1834062] of a decision by federal agency filed by Raed Jarrar [Service Date: 03/09/2020 ] Disclosure Statement: Not Applicable to this Party; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [20-1067] [Entered: 03/18/2020 12:25 PM]
March 9, 2020 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [20-1067] [Entered: 03/18/2020 12:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Raed Jarrar v. NLRB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raed Jarrar
Represented By: Raed Jarrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: National Labor Relations Board
Represented By: David S. Habenstreit
Represented By: Ruth E. Burdick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?