Competitive Enterprise Inst., et al v. NHTSA, et al
Petitioner: Anthony Kreucher, Marc Scribner, Competitive Enterprise Institute, James Leedy and Walter M. Kreucher
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency, National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, Andrew Wheeler, in his official capacity as Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency and James C. Owens, in his official capacity as Acting Administrator, National Highway Traffic Safety Administration
Case Number: 20-1145
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1842006] filed by Jonathan D. Brightbill, Principal Deputy Assistant Attorney General and co-counsel Chloe H. Kolman; Daniel R. Dertke on behalf of Respondents EPA, NHTSA, James C. Owens and Andrew Wheeler. [20-1145] (Kolman, Chloe) [Entered: 05/08/2020 03:45 PM]
May 6, 2020 CERTIFIED COPY [1841601] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1841600-2 ] [20-1145] [Entered: 05/06/2020 04:32 PM]
May 1, 2020 PETITION FOR REVIEW [1841600] of a decision by federal agency filed by Competitive Enterprise Institute, Anthony Kreucher, Walter M. Kreucher, James Leedy and Marc Scribner [Service Date: 05/01/2020 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [20-1145] [Entered: 05/06/2020 04:26 PM]
May 1, 2020 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [20-1145] [Entered: 05/06/2020 04:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Competitive Enterprise Inst., et al v. NHTSA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Kreucher
Represented By: Sam Kazman
Represented By: Devin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marc Scribner
Represented By: Sam Kazman
Represented By: Devin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Competitive Enterprise Institute
Represented By: Sam Kazman
Represented By: Devin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Leedy
Represented By: Sam Kazman
Represented By: Devin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Walter M. Kreucher
Represented By: Sam Kazman
Represented By: Devin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: National Highway Traffic Safety Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrew Wheeler, in his official capacity as Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James C. Owens, in his official capacity as Acting Administrator, National Highway Traffic Safety Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?