Lee Memorial Hospital, et al v. Alex Azar, II
Plaintiff / Appellant: Lee Memorial Hospital, University of Colorado Health at Memorial Hospital, formerly known as Memorial Health System Colorado Springs, Gulf Coast Medical Center, Cape Coral Hospital, Halifax Community Health System, also known as Halifax Medical Center, Charleston Area Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Valley View Hospital, Boulder Community Hospital, 14cv553, Denver Health Medical Center, 14cv553, Parkview Medical Center, 14cv553, Sarasota Memorial Hospital, Good Samaritan Hospital, 14cv553, McKee Medical Center, West Virginia University Hospital, North Colorado Medical Center, Billings Clinic Hospital, 14cv553 and Banner Gateway Medical Center
Plaintiff / Appellee: Allina Health, 13cv775 ; 13cv776, for the benefit of Abbott Northwestern Hospital, for the benefit of Mercy Hospital, for the benefit of Owatonna Hospital, for the benefit of St. Francis Regional Medical Center, for the benefit of Buffalo Hospital, f, Banner Health, for the benefit of North Colorado Medical Center, for the benefit of Banner Gateway Medical Center, for the benefit of Banner Good Samaritan Medical Center, for the benefit of Banner Thunderbird Medical Center, for the benefit of Banne, Billings Clinic and Lee Memorial Health System, for the benefit of Lee Memorial Hospital, for the benefit of Cape Coral Hospital, for the benefit of Gulf Coast Medical Center
Defendant / Appellee: Alex Michael Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 20-5085
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 SUPPLEMENT [1845576] to record [ # 1842039-2 ] filed by Banner Gateway Medical Center, Billings Clinic Hospital, Boulder Community Hospital, Cape Coral Hospital, Charleston Area Medical Center, Denver Health Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Good Samaritan Hospital, Gulf Coast Medical Center, Halifax Community Health System, Lee Memorial Hospital, McKee Medical Center, North Colorado Medical Center, Parkview Medical Center, Sarasota Memorial Hospital, University of Colorado Health at Memorial Hospital, Valley View Hospital and West Virginia University Hospital [Service Date: 06/03/2020 ] [20-5085] (Bradley, Keith) [Entered: 06/03/2020 03:27 PM]
May 11, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1842193] filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II [Service Date: 05/11/2020 ] [20-5085] (Shultz, Benjamin) [Entered: 05/11/2020 02:18 PM]
May 8, 2020 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1842039] submitted by Allina Health, Banner Health, Billings Clinic, Lee Memorial Health System and Banner Gateway Medical Center, Billings Clinic Hospital, Boulder Community Hospital, Cape Coral Hospital, Charleston Area Medical Center, Denver Health Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Good Samaritan Hospital, Gulf Coast Medical Center, Halifax Community Health System, Lee Memorial Hospital, McKee Medical Center, North Colorado Medical Center, Parkview Medical Center, Sarasota Memorial Hospital, University of Colorado Health at Memorial Hospital, Valley View Hospital and West Virginia University Hospital [Service Date: 05/08/2020 ] [20-5085] (Bradley, Keith) [Entered: 05/08/2020 05:56 PM]
May 8, 2020 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1842038] filed by Banner Gateway Medical Center, Billings Clinic Hospital, Boulder Community Hospital, Cape Coral Hospital, Charleston Area Medical Center, Denver Health Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Good Samaritan Hospital, Gulf Coast Medical Center, Halifax Community Health System, Lee Memorial Hospital, McKee Medical Center, North Colorado Medical Center, Parkview Medical Center, Sarasota Memorial Hospital, University of Colorado Health at Memorial Hospital, Valley View Hospital and West Virginia University Hospital [Service Date: 05/08/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-5085] (Bradley, Keith) [Entered: 05/08/2020 05:55 PM]
May 8, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1842037] filed by Allina Health, Banner Health, Billings Clinic, Lee Memorial Health System and Banner Gateway Medical Center, Billings Clinic Hospital, Boulder Community Hospital, Cape Coral Hospital, Charleston Area Medical Center, Denver Health Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Good Samaritan Hospital, Gulf Coast Medical Center, Halifax Community Health System, Lee Memorial Hospital, McKee Medical Center, North Colorado Medical Center, Parkview Medical Center, Sarasota Memorial Hospital, University of Colorado Health at Memorial Hospital, Valley View Hospital and West Virginia University Hospital [Service Date: 05/08/2020 ] [20-5085] (Bradley, Keith) [Entered: 05/08/2020 05:53 PM]
May 8, 2020 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1842036] filed by Allina Health, Banner Health, Billings Clinic, Lee Memorial Health System and Banner Gateway Medical Center, Billings Clinic Hospital, Boulder Community Hospital, Cape Coral Hospital, Charleston Area Medical Center, Denver Health Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Good Samaritan Hospital, Gulf Coast Medical Center, Halifax Community Health System, Lee Memorial Hospital, McKee Medical Center, North Colorado Medical Center, Parkview Medical Center, Sarasota Memorial Hospital, University of Colorado Health at Memorial Hospital, Valley View Hospital and West Virginia University Hospital [Service Date: 05/08/2020 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [20-5085] (Bradley, Keith) [Entered: 05/08/2020 05:51 PM]
May 8, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1842034] filed by Keith Bradley on behalf of Appellees Allina Health, Banner Health, Billings Clinic, Lee Memorial Health System and Appellants Banner Gateway Medical Center, Billings Clinic Hospital, Boulder Community Hospital, Cape Coral Hospital, Charleston Area Medical Center, Denver Health Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Good Samaritan Hospital, Gulf Coast Medical Center, Halifax Community Health System, Lee Memorial Hospital, McKee Medical Center, North Colorado Medical Center, Parkview Medical Center, Sarasota Memorial Hospital, University of Colorado Health at Memorial Hospital, Valley View Hospital and West Virginia University Hospital. [20-5085] (Bradley, Keith) [Entered: 05/08/2020 05:49 PM]
May 8, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1842032] filed by Allina Health, Banner Health, Billings Clinic, Lee Memorial Health System and Banner Gateway Medical Center, Billings Clinic Hospital, Boulder Community Hospital, Cape Coral Hospital, Charleston Area Medical Center, Denver Health Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Good Samaritan Hospital, Gulf Coast Medical Center, Halifax Community Health System, Lee Memorial Hospital, McKee Medical Center, North Colorado Medical Center, Parkview Medical Center, Sarasota Memorial Hospital, University of Colorado Health at Memorial Hospital, Valley View Hospital and West Virginia University Hospital [Service Date: 05/08/2020 ] [20-5085] (Bradley, Keith) [Entered: 05/08/2020 05:48 PM]
May 8, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1842031] filed by Allina Health, Banner Health, Billings Clinic, Lee Memorial Health System and Banner Gateway Medical Center, Billings Clinic Hospital, Boulder Community Hospital, Cape Coral Hospital, Charleston Area Medical Center, Denver Health Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Good Samaritan Hospital, Gulf Coast Medical Center, Halifax Community Health System, Lee Memorial Hospital, McKee Medical Center, North Colorado Medical Center, Parkview Medical Center, Sarasota Memorial Hospital, University of Colorado Health at Memorial Hospital, Valley View Hospital and West Virginia University Hospital [Service Date: 05/08/2020 ] [20-5085] (Bradley, Keith) [Entered: 05/08/2020 05:46 PM]
April 20, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1838785] filed by Benjamin M. Shultz and co-counsel Michael S. Raab on behalf of Appellee Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II. [20-5085] (Shultz, Benjamin) [Entered: 04/20/2020 10:15 AM]
April 9, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1837446] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/11/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/11/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/11/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/11/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/11/2020. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 05/11/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/11/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/11/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 05/26/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/11/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/11/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/11/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 05/26/2020 [20-5085] [Entered: 04/09/2020 01:12 PM]
April 9, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1837443] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:13-cv-00643-RMC filed by Banner Gateway Medical Center, Billings Clinic Hospital, Boulder Community Hospital, Cape Coral Hospital, Charleston Area Medical Center, Denver Health Medical Center, Good Samaritan Hospital, Good Samaritan Hospital, Gulf Coast Medical Center, Halifax Community Health System, Lee Memorial Hospital, McKee Medical Center, North Colorado Medical Center, Parkview Medical Center, Sarasota Memorial Hospital, University of Colorado Health at Memorial Hospital, Valley View Hospital and West Virginia University Hospital. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5085. [20-5085] [Entered: 04/09/2020 01:07 PM]
April 9, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5085] [Entered: 04/09/2020 01:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lee Memorial Hospital, et al v. Alex Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lee Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: University of Colorado Health at Memorial Hospital, formerly known as Memorial Health System Colorado Springs
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gulf Coast Medical Center
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cape Coral Hospital
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Halifax Community Health System, also known as Halifax Medical Center
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Charleston Area Medical Center
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Good Samaritan Hospital
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Valley View Hospital
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Boulder Community Hospital, 14cv553
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Denver Health Medical Center, 14cv553
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Parkview Medical Center, 14cv553
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sarasota Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Good Samaritan Hospital, 14cv553
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: McKee Medical Center
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: West Virginia University Hospital
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: North Colorado Medical Center
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Billings Clinic Hospital, 14cv553
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Banner Gateway Medical Center
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Allina Health, 13cv775 ; 13cv776, for the benefit of Abbott Northwestern Hospital, for the benefit of Mercy Hospital, for the benefit of Owatonna Hospital, for the benefit of St. Francis Regional Medical Center, for the benefit of Buffalo Hospital, f
Represented By: Stephen Payne Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Banner Health, for the benefit of North Colorado Medical Center, for the benefit of Banner Gateway Medical Center, for the benefit of Banner Good Samaritan Medical Center, for the benefit of Banner Thunderbird Medical Center, for the benefit of Banne
Represented By: Sven Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Billings Clinic
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Lee Memorial Health System, for the benefit of Lee Memorial Hospital, for the benefit of Cape Coral Hospital, for the benefit of Gulf Coast Medical Center
Represented By: Sven Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alex Michael Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Benjamin M. Shultz
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?