City of Huntington, WV v. HUD, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: City of Huntington, West Virginia
Defendant / Appellant: Benjamin S. Carson, Sr., Secretary, in his Official Capacity and United States Department of Housing & Urban Development
Case Number: 20-5229
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [20-5229] [Entered: 08/26/2020 10:56 AM]
August 26, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1858355] filed granting motion to dismiss case voluntarily [ # 1855643-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to issue the mandate forthwith to the district court. [20-5229] [Entered: 08/26/2020 10:54 AM]
August 7, 2020 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1855643] to dismiss case voluntarily filed by Benjamin S. Carson, Sr. and HUD [Service Date: 08/07/2020 ] Length Certification: 113. [20-5229] (Yee, Marsha) [Entered: 08/07/2020 02:21 PM]
August 7, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1855642] filed by Marsha W. Yee and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellants Benjamin S. Carson, Sr. and HUD. [20-5229] (Yee, Marsha) [Entered: 08/07/2020 02:19 PM]
August 5, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1855131] filed by Daniel Tenny on behalf of Appellants Benjamin S. Carson, Sr. and HUD. [20-5229] (Tenny, Daniel) [Entered: 08/05/2020 11:48 AM]
July 30, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1854337] filed by Charles Carpenter on behalf of Appellee City of Huntington, West Virginia. [20-5229] (Carpenter, Charles) [Entered: 07/30/2020 04:18 PM]
July 30, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1854159] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 08/31/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 08/31/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 08/31/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 08/31/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 08/31/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 08/31/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 08/31/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 08/31/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 09/14/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 08/31/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 08/31/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/31/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 09/14/2020 [20-5229] [Entered: 07/30/2020 07:58 AM]
July 30, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1854157] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-00741-TSC filed by Benjamin S. Carson, Sr. and HUD. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5229. [20-5229] [Entered: 07/30/2020 07:57 AM]
July 30, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5229] [Entered: 07/30/2020 07:56 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: City of Huntington, WV v. HUD, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: City of Huntington, West Virginia
Represented By: Charles H. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Benjamin S. Carson, Sr., Secretary, in his Official Capacity
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: United States Department of Housing & Urban Development
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?