Kevin Mccarthy, et al v. Nancy Pelosi, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Nancy Pelosi, The Honorable, in her official capacity as Speaker of the House of Representatives and Member of the United States House of Representatives for the California 12th Congressional District, Cheryl L. Johnson, The Honorable, in her official capacity as Clerk of the United States House of Representatives and Paul D. Irving, in his official capacity as Sergeant-at-Arms of the United States House of Representatives
Plaintiff / Appellant: David S. Schweikert, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Arizona 6th Congressional District, Kevin Owen Mccarthy, The Honorable, in his official capacity as House Minority Leader and Member of the United States House of Representatives for the California 23rd Congressional District, James Shipley Swayze, Michael Jonathan Cloud, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Texas 27th Congressional District, Gregory Joseph Pence, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Indiana 6th Congressional District, Michael Ray Turner, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Ohio 10th Congressional District, Thomas Miller McClintock, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the California 4th Congressional District, Elizabeth Cheney, The Honorable, in her official capacity as House Republican Conference Chair and Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Wyoming Congressional District, Stephen Joseph Scalise, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Minority Whip and Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Louisiana 1st Congressional District, Lorine Spratt, Clayton D. Campbell, Rodney Lee Davis, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Ranking Member of the House Committee on Administration and Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Illinois 13th Congressional District, Douglas Lee Lamalfa, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the California 1st Congressional District, Debra Kay Lesko, The Honorable, in her official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Arizona 8th Congressional District, Lee Michael Zeldin, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the New York 1st Congressional District, Howard Griffith, The Honorable, "Morgan", in his official capacity as a Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Virginia 9th Congressional District, George Edward Bell Holding, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the North Carolina 2nd Congressional District, Jeffrey Darren Duncan, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the South Carolina 3rd Congressional District, Robert Joseph Wittman, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Virginia 1st Congressional District, Christopher Douglas Stewart, The Honorable, "Chris", in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Utah 2nd Congressional District, Thomas Jeffrey Cole, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Ranking Member of the House Committee on Rules and Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Oklahoma 4th Congressional District, William Leslie Johnson, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Ohio 6th Congressional District, Kenneth Michael Conaway, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Texas 11th Congressional District, Gregory Francis Murphy, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Texas 5th Congressional District, Scott Gordon Perry, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Pennsylvania 10th Congressional District, Mickie J. Niland, Earl Leroy Carter, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Georgia 1st Congressional District, Mark Edward Green, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Tennessee 7th Congressional District, Jody Brownlow Hice, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Georgia 10th Congressional District, James Daniel Jordan, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Ranking Member of the House Committee on the Judiciary and Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Ohio 4th Congressional District, Norvell Granger, The Honorable, in her official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Texas 12th Congressional District, Lance Carter Gooden, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Virginia 9th Congressional District, Charles Eugene Roy, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Texas 21st Congressional District, Gary James Palmer, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Alabama 6th Congressional District, Andrew Steven Biggs, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Chairman of the House Freedom Caucus and Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Arizona 5th Congressional District, Glen Clay Higgins, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Louisiana 3rd Congressional District, Michael Clifton Burgess, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Texas 26th Congressional District, Russell Mark Fulcher, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Idaho 1st Congressional District, William Gregory Steube, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Florida 17th Congressional District, Andrew Peter Harris, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Maryland 1st Congressional District, Warren Earl Davidson, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Ohio 8th Congressional District, Vincent Spano, The Honorable, "Ross" in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Florida 5th Congressional District, Brad Robert Wenstrup, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Ohio 2nd Congressional District, Michael Dennis Rogers, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Alabama 3rd Congressional District, Bradley Roberts Byrne, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Alabama 1st Congressional District, Barry Loudermilk, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Georgia 11th Congressional District, Guy Lorin Reschenthaler, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Pennsylvania 14th Congressional District, Frederick B. Keller, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Pennsylvania 12th Congressional District, Ronald Jack Wright, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Texas 6th Congressional District, Paul Cook, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the California 8th Congressional District, Glenn William Thompson, Jr., The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Pennsylvania 15th Congressional District, James Michael Johnson, in his official capacity as Ranking Member of the House Subcommittee on the Constitution Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties, Chairman of the Republican Study Committee, and Member of the United States House of Representatives fo, Theodore Scott Yoho, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Florida 3rd Congressional District and Isabel Albarado Rubio
Amicus Curiae: Individual Rights Foundation, Reason Foundation and Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Case Number: 20-5240
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1865401] filed by Andrew Steven Biggs, Michael Clifton Burgess, Bradley Roberts Byrne, Clayton D. Campbell, Earl Leroy Carter, Elizabeth Cheney, Michael Jonathan Cloud, Thomas Jeffrey Cole, Kenneth Michael Conaway, Paul Cook, Warren Earl Davidson, Rodney Lee Davis, Jeffrey Darren Duncan, Russell Mark Fulcher, Lance Carter Gooden, Norvell Granger, Mark Edward Green, Howard Griffith, Andrew Peter Harris, Jody Brownlow Hice, Glen Clay Higgins, George Edward Bell Holding, James Michael Johnson, William Leslie Johnson, James Daniel Jordan, Frederick B. Keller, Douglas Lee Lamalfa, Debra Kay Lesko, Barry Loudermilk, Kevin Owen McCarthy, Thomas Miller McClintock, Gregory Francis Murphy, Mickie J. Niland, Gary James Palmer, Gregory Joseph Pence, Scott Gordon Perry, Guy Lorin Reschenthaler, Michael Dennis Rogers, Charles Eugene Roy, Isabel Albarado Rubio, Stephen Joseph Scalise, David S. Schweikert, Vincent Spano, Lorine Spratt, William Gregory Steube, Christopher Douglas Stewart, James Shipley Swayze, Glenn William Thompson, Jr., Michael Ray Turner, Brad Robert Wenstrup, Robert Joseph Wittman, Ronald Jack Wright, Theodore Scott Yoho and Lee Michael Zeldin [Service Date: 10/07/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,395 Words. [20-5240] (Cooper, Charles) [Entered: 10/07/2020 06:52 PM]
October 7, 2020 NOTICE [1865338] to withdraw attorney Adam A. Grogg who represented Paul D. Irving, Cheryl L. Johnson and Nancy Pelosi in 20-5240 filed by Paul D. Irving, Cheryl L. Johnson and Nancy Pelosi [Service Date: 10/07/2020 ] [20-5240] (Grogg, Adam) [Entered: 10/07/2020 02:40 PM]
September 30, 2020 APPELLEE BRIEF [1864219] filed by Paul D. Irving, Cheryl L. Johnson and Nancy Pelosi [Service Date: 09/30/2020 ] Length of Brief: 12,791 words. [20-5240] (Letter, Douglas) [Entered: 09/30/2020 06:33 PM]
September 17, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1862122] filed scheduling oral argument on Monday, 11/02/2020. [20-5240] [Entered: 09/17/2020 03:39 PM]
September 9, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1860522] filed by Paul D. Irving, Cheryl L. Johnson and Nancy Pelosi [Service Date: 09/09/2020 ] [20-5240] (Letter, Douglas) [Entered: 09/09/2020 01:22 PM]
September 7, 2020 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1860112] filed by Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, et al. [Service Date: 09/07/2020 ] Length of Brief: 2,455 Words. [20-5240]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 09/08/2020 by LMC] (Caso, Anthony) [Entered: 09/07/2020 10:39 PM]
August 31, 2020 JOINT APPENDIX [1859196] filed by Andrew Steven Biggs, Michael Clifton Burgess, Bradley Roberts Byrne, Clayton D. Campbell, Earl Leroy Carter, Elizabeth Cheney, Michael Jonathan Cloud, Thomas Jeffrey Cole, Kenneth Michael Conaway, Paul Cook, Warren Earl Davidson, Rodney Lee Davis, Jeffrey Darren Duncan, Russell Mark Fulcher, Lance Carter Gooden, Norvell Granger, Mark Edward Green, Howard Griffith, Andrew Peter Harris, Jody Brownlow Hice, Glen Clay Higgins, George Edward Bell Holding, James Michael Johnson, William Leslie Johnson, James Daniel Jordan, Frederick B. Keller, Douglas Lee Lamalfa, Debra Kay Lesko, Barry Loudermilk, Kevin Owen McCarthy, Thomas Miller McClintock, Gregory Francis Murphy, Mickie J. Niland, Gary James Palmer, Gregory Joseph Pence, Scott Gordon Perry, Guy Lorin Reschenthaler, Michael Dennis Rogers, Charles Eugene Roy, Isabel Albarado Rubio, Stephen Joseph Scalise, David S. Schweikert, Vincent Spano, Lorine Spratt, William Gregory Steube, Christopher Douglas Stewart, James Shipley Swayze, Glenn William Thompson, Jr., Michael Ray Turner, Brad Robert Wenstrup, Robert Joseph Wittman, Ronald Jack Wright, Theodore Scott Yoho and Lee Michael Zeldin. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 08/31/2020 ] [20-5240] (Cooper, Charles) [Entered: 08/31/2020 08:59 PM]
August 31, 2020 APPELLANT BRIEF [1859195] filed by Andrew Steven Biggs, Michael Clifton Burgess, Bradley Roberts Byrne, Clayton D. Campbell, Earl Leroy Carter, Elizabeth Cheney, Michael Jonathan Cloud, Thomas Jeffrey Cole, Kenneth Michael Conaway, Paul Cook, Warren Earl Davidson, Rodney Lee Davis, Jeffrey Darren Duncan, Russell Mark Fulcher, Lance Carter Gooden, Norvell Granger, Mark Edward Green, Howard Griffith, Andrew Peter Harris, Jody Brownlow Hice, Glen Clay Higgins, George Edward Bell Holding, James Michael Johnson, William Leslie Johnson, James Daniel Jordan, Frederick B. Keller, Douglas Lee Lamalfa, Debra Kay Lesko, Barry Loudermilk, Kevin Owen McCarthy, Thomas Miller McClintock, Gregory Francis Murphy, Mickie J. Niland, Gary James Palmer, Gregory Joseph Pence, Scott Gordon Perry, Guy Lorin Reschenthaler, Michael Dennis Rogers, Charles Eugene Roy, Isabel Albarado Rubio, Stephen Joseph Scalise, David S. Schweikert, Vincent Spano, Lorine Spratt, William Gregory Steube, Christopher Douglas Stewart, James Shipley Swayze, Glenn William Thompson, Jr., Michael Ray Turner, Brad Robert Wenstrup, Robert Joseph Wittman, Ronald Jack Wright, Theodore Scott Yoho and Lee Michael Zeldin [Service Date: 08/31/2020 ] Length of Brief: 12,991 words. [20-5240] (Cooper, Charles) [Entered: 08/31/2020 08:54 PM]
August 31, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1859153] filed by Charles J. Cooper and co-counsel Steven J. Lindsay, Elliot S. Berke on behalf of Appellants Andrew Steven Biggs, Michael Clifton Burgess, Bradley Roberts Byrne, Clayton D. Campbell, Earl Leroy Carter, Elizabeth Cheney, Michael Jonathan Cloud, Thomas Jeffrey Cole, Kenneth Michael Conaway, Paul Cook, Warren Earl Davidson, Rodney Lee Davis, Jeffrey Darren Duncan, Russell Mark Fulcher, Lance Carter Gooden, Norvell Granger, Mark Edward Green, Howard Griffith, Andrew Peter Harris, Jody Brownlow Hice, Glen Clay Higgins, George Edward Bell Holding, James Michael Johnson, William Leslie Johnson, James Daniel Jordan, Frederick B. Keller, Douglas Lee Lamalfa, Debra Kay Lesko, Barry Loudermilk, Kevin Owen McCarthy, Thomas Miller McClintock, Gregory Francis Murphy, Mickie J. Niland, Gary James Palmer, Gregory Joseph Pence, Scott Gordon Perry, Guy Lorin Reschenthaler, Michael Dennis Rogers, Charles Eugene Roy, Isabel Albarado Rubio, Stephen Joseph Scalise, David S. Schweikert, Vincent Spano, Lorine Spratt, William Gregory Steube, Christopher Douglas Stewart, James Shipley Swayze, Glenn William Thompson, Jr., Michael Ray Turner, Brad Robert Wenstrup, Robert Joseph Wittman, Ronald Jack Wright, Theodore Scott Yoho and Lee Michael Zeldin. [20-5240] (Cooper, Charles) [Entered: 08/31/2020 05:18 PM]
August 27, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1858663] filed by Charles J. Cooper and co-counsel J. Joel Alicea on behalf of Appellants Andrew Steven Biggs, Michael Clifton Burgess, Bradley Roberts Byrne, Clayton D. Campbell, Earl Leroy Carter, Elizabeth Cheney, Michael Jonathan Cloud, Thomas Jeffrey Cole, Kenneth Michael Conaway, Paul Cook, Warren Earl Davidson, Rodney Lee Davis, Jeffrey Darren Duncan, Russell Mark Fulcher, Lance Carter Gooden, Norvell Granger, Mark Edward Green, Howard Griffith, Andrew Peter Harris, Jody Brownlow Hice, Glen Clay Higgins, George Edward Bell Holding, James Michael Johnson, William Leslie Johnson, James Daniel Jordan, Frederick B. Keller, Douglas Lee Lamalfa, Debra Kay Lesko, Barry Loudermilk, Kevin Owen McCarthy, Thomas Miller McClintock, Gregory Francis Murphy, Mickie J. Niland, Gary James Palmer, Gregory Joseph Pence, Scott Gordon Perry, Guy Lorin Reschenthaler, Michael Dennis Rogers, Charles Eugene Roy, Isabel Albarado Rubio, Stephen Joseph Scalise, David S. Schweikert, Vincent Spano, Lorine Spratt, William Gregory Steube, Christopher Douglas Stewart, James Shipley Swayze, Glenn William Thompson, Jr., Michael Ray Turner, Brad Robert Wenstrup, Robert Joseph Wittman, Ronald Jack Wright, Theodore Scott Yoho and Lee Michael Zeldin. [20-5240] (Cooper, Charles) [Entered: 08/27/2020 02:24 PM]
August 27, 2020 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1858657] filed by Andrew Steven Biggs, Michael Clifton Burgess, Bradley Roberts Byrne, Clayton D. Campbell, Earl Leroy Carter, Elizabeth Cheney, Michael Jonathan Cloud, Thomas Jeffrey Cole, Kenneth Michael Conaway, Paul Cook, Warren Earl Davidson, Rodney Lee Davis, Jeffrey Darren Duncan, Russell Mark Fulcher, Lance Carter Gooden, Norvell Granger, Mark Edward Green, Howard Griffith, Andrew Peter Harris, Jody Brownlow Hice, Glen Clay Higgins, George Edward Bell Holding, James Michael Johnson, William Leslie Johnson, James Daniel Jordan, Frederick B. Keller, Douglas Lee Lamalfa, Debra Kay Lesko, Barry Loudermilk, Kevin Owen McCarthy, Thomas Miller McClintock, Gregory Francis Murphy, Mickie J. Niland, Gary James Palmer, Gregory Joseph Pence, Scott Gordon Perry, Guy Lorin Reschenthaler, Michael Dennis Rogers, Charles Eugene Roy, Isabel Albarado Rubio, Stephen Joseph Scalise, David S. Schweikert, Vincent Spano, Lorine Spratt, William Gregory Steube, Christopher Douglas Stewart, James Shipley Swayze, Glenn William Thompson, Jr., Michael Ray Turner, Brad Robert Wenstrup, Robert Joseph Wittman, Ronald Jack Wright, Theodore Scott Yoho and Lee Michael Zeldin [Service Date: 08/27/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [20-5240] (Cooper, Charles) [Entered: 08/27/2020 02:21 PM]
August 27, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1858656] filed by Andrew Steven Biggs, Michael Clifton Burgess, Bradley Roberts Byrne, Clayton D. Campbell, Earl Leroy Carter, Elizabeth Cheney, Michael Jonathan Cloud, Thomas Jeffrey Cole, Kenneth Michael Conaway, Paul Cook, Warren Earl Davidson, Rodney Lee Davis, Jeffrey Darren Duncan, Russell Mark Fulcher, Lance Carter Gooden, Norvell Granger, Mark Edward Green, Howard Griffith, Andrew Peter Harris, Jody Brownlow Hice, Glen Clay Higgins, George Edward Bell Holding, James Michael Johnson, William Leslie Johnson, James Daniel Jordan, Frederick B. Keller, Douglas Lee Lamalfa, Debra Kay Lesko, Barry Loudermilk, Kevin Owen McCarthy, Thomas Miller McClintock, Gregory Francis Murphy, Mickie J. Niland, Gary James Palmer, Gregory Joseph Pence, Scott Gordon Perry, Guy Lorin Reschenthaler, Michael Dennis Rogers, Charles Eugene Roy, Isabel Albarado Rubio, Stephen Joseph Scalise, David S. Schweikert, Vincent Spano, Lorine Spratt, William Gregory Steube, Christopher Douglas Stewart, James Shipley Swayze, Glenn William Thompson, Jr., Michael Ray Turner, Brad Robert Wenstrup, Robert Joseph Wittman, Ronald Jack Wright, Theodore Scott Yoho and Lee Michael Zeldin [Service Date: 08/27/2020 ] [20-5240] (Cooper, Charles) [Entered: 08/27/2020 02:17 PM]
August 21, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1857764] filed by Michael R. Dreeben and co-counsel Kendall Turner, Samantha M. Goldstein, Alec Schierenbeck, Ephraim A. McDowell, and Anna O. Mohan on behalf of Appellees Paul D. Irving, Cheryl L. Johnson and Nancy Pelosi. [20-5240] (Dreeben, Michael) [Entered: 08/21/2020 03:56 PM]
August 14, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER [1856542] filed setting briefing schedule: BRIEF OF APPELLANTS due 08/31/2020. JOINT APPENDIX due 08/31/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLEES due on 09/30/2020. REPLY BRIEF due 10/07/2020. The Clerk is directed to calendar this case for oral argument on the first appropriate date following the completion of briefing. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND SUBMISSION REQUIREMENTS.) Before Judges: Henderson and Katsas. [20-5240] [Entered: 08/14/2020 10:40 AM]
August 12, 2020 LETTER [1856218] Notice of Expedited Appeal filed by Andrew Steven Biggs, Michael Clifton Burgess, Bradley Roberts Byrne, Clayton D. Campbell, Earl Leroy Carter, Elizabeth Cheney, Michael Jonathan Cloud, Thomas Jeffrey Cole, Kenneth Michael Conaway, Paul Cook, Warren Earl Davidson, Rodney Lee Davis, Jeffrey Darren Duncan, Russell Mark Fulcher, Lance Carter Gooden, Norvell Granger, Mark Edward Green, Howard Griffith, Andrew Peter Harris, Jody Brownlow Hice, Glen Clay Higgins, George Edward Bell Holding, James Michael Johnson, William Leslie Johnson, James Daniel Jordan, Frederick B. Keller, Douglas Lee Lamalfa, Debra Kay Lesko, Barry Loudermilk, Kevin Owen Mccarthy, Thomas Miller McClintock, Gregory Francis Murphy, Mickie J. Niland, Gary James Palmer, Gregory Joseph Pence, Scott Gordon Perry, Guy Lorin Reschenthaler, Michael Dennis Rogers, Charles Eugene Roy, Isabel Albarado Rubio, Stephen Joseph Scalise, David S. Schweikert, Vincent Spano, Lorine Spratt, William Gregory Steube, Christopher Douglas Stewart, James Shipley Swayze, Glenn William Thompson, Jr., Michael Ray Turner, Brad Robert Wenstrup, Robert Joseph Wittman, Ronald Jack Wright, Theodore Scott Yoho and Lee Michael Zeldin [Service Date: 08/12/2020 ] [20-5240] (Cooper, Charles) [Entered: 08/12/2020 11:58 AM]
August 12, 2020 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1856215] to motion to expedite case [ # 1856109-2 ], motion to expedite oral argument [ # 1856109-3 ] filed by Nancy Pelosi, Cheryl L. Johnson and Paul D. Irving [Service Date: 08/12/1985 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,326 words. [20-5240] (Letter, Douglas) [Entered: 08/12/2020 11:51 AM]
August 11, 2020 MOTION [1856109] to expedite case, to expedite oral argument filed by Andrew Steven Biggs, Michael Clifton Burgess, Bradley Roberts Byrne, Clayton D. Campbell, Earl Leroy Carter, Elizabeth Cheney, Michael Jonathan Cloud, Thomas Jeffrey Cole, Kenneth Michael Conaway, Paul Cook, Warren Earl Davidson, Rodney Lee Davis, Jeffrey Darren Duncan, Russell Mark Fulcher, Lance Carter Gooden, Norvell Granger, Mark Edward Green, Howard Griffith, Andrew Peter Harris, Jody Brownlow Hice, Glen Clay Higgins, George Edward Bell Holding, James Michael Johnson, William Leslie Johnson, James Daniel Jordan, Frederick B. Keller, Douglas Lee Lamalfa, Debra Kay Lesko, Barry Loudermilk, Kevin Owen Mccarthy, Thomas Miller McClintock, Gregory Francis Murphy, Mickie J. Niland, Gary James Palmer, Gregory Joseph Pence, Scott Gordon Perry, Guy Lorin Reschenthaler, Michael Dennis Rogers, Charles Eugene Roy, Isabel Albarado Rubio, Stephen Joseph Scalise, David S. Schweikert, Vincent Spano, Lorine Spratt, William Gregory Steube, Christopher Douglas Stewart, James Shipley Swayze, Glenn William Thompson, Jr., Michael Ray Turner, Brad Robert Wenstrup, Robert Joseph Wittman, Ronald Jack Wright, Theodore Scott Yoho and Lee Michael Zeldin (Service Date: 08/11/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 965 words. [20-5240] (Cooper, Charles) [Entered: 08/11/2020 03:38 PM]
August 11, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1856048] filed by Douglas N. Letter and co-counsel Todd B. Tatelman, Megan Barbero, Josephine Morse, Adam A. Grogg, William E. Havemann, Jonathan B. Schwartz on behalf of Appellees Nancy Pelosi, Cheryl L. Johnson and Paul D. Irving. [20-5240] (Letter, Douglas) [Entered: 08/11/2020 12:41 PM]
August 11, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1856009] filed by Charles J. Cooper and co-counsel Michael W. Kirk, Harold S. Reeves on behalf of Appellants Andrew Steven Biggs, Michael Clifton Burgess, Bradley Roberts Byrne, Clayton D. Campbell, Earl Leroy Carter, Elizabeth Cheney, Michael Jonathan Cloud, Thomas Jeffrey Cole, Kenneth Michael Conaway, Paul Cook, Warren Earl Davidson, Rodney Lee Davis, Jeffrey Darren Duncan, Russell Mark Fulcher, Lance Carter Gooden, Norvell Granger, Mark Edward Green, Howard Griffith, Andrew Peter Harris, Jody Brownlow Hice, Glen Clay Higgins, George Edward Bell Holding, James Michael Johnson, William Leslie Johnson, James Daniel Jordan, Frederick B. Keller, Douglas Lee Lamalfa, Debra Kay Lesko, Barry Loudermilk, Kevin Owen Mccarthy, Thomas Miller McClintock, Gregory Francis Murphy, Mickie J. Niland, Gary James Palmer, Gregory Joseph Pence, Scott Gordon Perry, Guy Lorin Reschenthaler, Michael Dennis Rogers, Charles Eugene Roy, Isabel Albarado Rubio, Stephen Joseph Scalise, David S. Schweikert, Vincent Spano, Lorine Spratt, William Gregory Steube, Christopher Douglas Stewart, James Shipley Swayze, Glenn William Thompson, Jr., Michael Ray Turner, Brad Robert Wenstrup, Robert Joseph Wittman, Ronald Jack Wright, Theodore Scott Yoho and Lee Michael Zeldin. [20-5240] (Cooper, Charles) [Entered: 08/11/2020 10:25 AM]
August 10, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1855867] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 09/09/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 09/09/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 09/09/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 09/09/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 09/09/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 09/09/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 09/09/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 09/09/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 09/24/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 09/09/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 09/09/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 09/09/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 09/24/2020 [20-5240] [Entered: 08/10/2020 02:56 PM]
August 10, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1855811] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-01395-RC filed by Andrew Steven Biggs, Michael Clifton Burgess, Bradley Roberts Byrne, Clayton D. Campbell, Earl Leroy Carter, Elizabeth Cheney, Michael Jonathan Cloud, Thomas Jeffrey Cole, Kenneth Michael Conaway, Paul Cook, Warren Earl Davidson, Rodney Lee Davis, Jeffrey Darren Duncan, Russell Mark Fulcher, Lance Carter Gooden, Norvell Granger, Mark Edward Green, Howard Griffith, Andrew Peter Harris, Jody Brownlow Hice, Glen Clay Higgins, George Edward Bell Holding, James Michael Johnson, William Leslie Johnson, James Daniel Jordan, Frederick B. Keller, Douglas Lee Lamalfa, Debra Kay Lesko, Barry Loudermilk, Thomas Miller McClintock, Kevin Owen Mccarthy, Gregory Francis Murphy, Mickie J. Niland, Gary James Palmer, Gregory Joseph Pence, Scott Gordon Perry, Guy Lorin Reschenthaler, Michael Dennis Rogers, Charles Eugene Roy, Isabel Albarado Rubio, Stephen Joseph Scalise, David S. Schweikert, Vincent Spano, Lorine Spratt, William Gregory Steube, Christopher Douglas Stewart, James Shipley Swayze, Glenn William Thompson, Jr., Michael Ray Turner, Brad Robert Wenstrup, Robert Joseph Wittman, Ronald Jack Wright, Theodore Scott Yoho and Lee Michael Zeldin. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5240. [20-5240] [Entered: 08/10/2020 12:26 PM]
August 10, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5240] [Entered: 08/10/2020 12:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kevin Mccarthy, et al v. Nancy Pelosi, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nancy Pelosi, The Honorable, in her official capacity as Speaker of the House of Representatives and Member of the United States House of Representatives for the California 12th Congressional District
Represented By: William Ernest Havemann
Represented By: Megan Barbero Esquire
Represented By: Adam A. Grogg
Represented By: Josephine Thacher Morse
Represented By: Todd B. Tatelman
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Samantha Goldstein
Represented By: Michael R. Dreeben
Represented By: Kendall Turner
Represented By: Alec Schierenbeck
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Ephraim A. McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cheryl L. Johnson, The Honorable, in her official capacity as Clerk of the United States House of Representatives
Represented By: William Ernest Havemann
Represented By: Megan Barbero Esquire
Represented By: Adam A. Grogg
Represented By: Josephine Thacher Morse
Represented By: Todd B. Tatelman
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Samantha Goldstein
Represented By: Michael R. Dreeben
Represented By: Kendall Turner
Represented By: Alec Schierenbeck
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Ephraim A. McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Paul D. Irving, in his official capacity as Sergeant-at-Arms of the United States House of Representatives
Represented By: William Ernest Havemann
Represented By: Megan Barbero Esquire
Represented By: Adam A. Grogg
Represented By: Josephine Thacher Morse
Represented By: Todd B. Tatelman
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Samantha Goldstein
Represented By: Michael R. Dreeben
Represented By: Kendall Turner
Represented By: Alec Schierenbeck
Represented By: Anna O. Mohan
Represented By: Ephraim A. McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David S. Schweikert, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Arizona 6th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kevin Owen Mccarthy, The Honorable, in his official capacity as House Minority Leader and Member of the United States House of Representatives for the California 23rd Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James Shipley Swayze
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Jonathan Cloud, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Texas 27th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gregory Joseph Pence, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Indiana 6th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Ray Turner, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Ohio 10th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Thomas Miller McClintock, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the California 4th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Elizabeth Cheney, The Honorable, in her official capacity as House Republican Conference Chair and Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Wyoming Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Stephen Joseph Scalise, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Minority Whip and Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Louisiana 1st Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lorine Spratt
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Clayton D. Campbell
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Rodney Lee Davis, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Ranking Member of the House Committee on Administration and Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Illinois 13th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Douglas Lee Lamalfa, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the California 1st Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Debra Kay Lesko, The Honorable, in her official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Arizona 8th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lee Michael Zeldin, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the New York 1st Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Howard Griffith, The Honorable, "Morgan", in his official capacity as a Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Virginia 9th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: George Edward Bell Holding, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the North Carolina 2nd Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jeffrey Darren Duncan, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the South Carolina 3rd Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robert Joseph Wittman, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Virginia 1st Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Christopher Douglas Stewart, The Honorable, "Chris", in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Utah 2nd Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Thomas Jeffrey Cole, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Ranking Member of the House Committee on Rules and Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Oklahoma 4th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: William Leslie Johnson, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Ohio 6th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kenneth Michael Conaway, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Texas 11th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gregory Francis Murphy, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Texas 5th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Scott Gordon Perry, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Pennsylvania 10th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mickie J. Niland
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Earl Leroy Carter, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Georgia 1st Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mark Edward Green, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Tennessee 7th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jody Brownlow Hice, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Georgia 10th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James Daniel Jordan, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Ranking Member of the House Committee on the Judiciary and Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Ohio 4th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Norvell Granger, The Honorable, in her official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Texas 12th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lance Carter Gooden, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Virginia 9th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Charles Eugene Roy, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Texas 21st Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gary James Palmer, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Alabama 6th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Andrew Steven Biggs, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Chairman of the House Freedom Caucus and Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Arizona 5th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Glen Clay Higgins, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Louisiana 3rd Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Clifton Burgess, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Texas 26th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Russell Mark Fulcher, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Idaho 1st Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: William Gregory Steube, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Florida 17th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Andrew Peter Harris, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Maryland 1st Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Warren Earl Davidson, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Ohio 8th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Vincent Spano, The Honorable, "Ross" in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Florida 5th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brad Robert Wenstrup, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Ohio 2nd Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Dennis Rogers, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Alabama 3rd Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bradley Roberts Byrne, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Alabama 1st Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Barry Loudermilk, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Georgia 11th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Guy Lorin Reschenthaler, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Pennsylvania 14th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Frederick B. Keller, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Pennsylvania 12th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ronald Jack Wright, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Texas 6th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Paul Cook, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the California 8th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Glenn William Thompson, Jr., The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Pennsylvania 15th Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James Michael Johnson, in his official capacity as Ranking Member of the House Subcommittee on the Constitution Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties, Chairman of the Republican Study Committee, and Member of the United States House of Representatives fo
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Theodore Scott Yoho, The Honorable, in his official capacity as Member of the United States House of Representatives for the Florida 3rd Congressional District
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Isabel Albarado Rubio
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Represented By: Harold Smith Reeves
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea
Represented By: Steven Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Individual Rights Foundation
Represented By: John C. Eastman
Represented By: Anthony T. Caso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Reason Foundation
Represented By: John C. Eastman
Represented By: Anthony T. Caso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Represented By: John C. Eastman
Represented By: Anthony T. Caso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?