Lawyers United Inc., et al v. USA, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Randy Smith, Judicial Circuit Judge, James M. Lorenz, District Judge, Mark Walker, Roger T. Benitez, District Judge, K. Michael Moore, Chief Judge, Dale A. Drozd, District Judge, Jeffrey T. Miller, District Judge, Richard S. Martinez, Judicial Circuit Judge, Ed Carnes, Srikanth Srinivasan, Timothy J. Kelly, District Judge, Jay S. Bybee, Judicial Circuit Judge, John A. Houston, District Judge, William Q. Hayes, District Judge, Troy L. Nunley, District Judge, Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, District Judge, Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, District Judge, Anthony J. Battaglia, District Judge, Marilyn L. Huff, District Judge, Steven Merryday, Milan D. Smith, Jr., Judicial Circuit Judge, Kimberly J. Mueller, District Judge, Beryl A. Howell, Chief Judge for the District of Columbia, Michael M. Anello, District Judge, Jill S. Pryor, Gonzalo P. Curiel, District Judge, Larry Alan Burns, Chief Judge of the Southern, District of California, Beverly B. Martin, William Orrick, District Judge, Morgan Christen, Judicial Circuit Judge, Phyllis J. Hamilton, Chief Judge of the District of California, Cynthia A. Bashant, District Judge, William Q. Hayes Enright, District Judge, Edward Davila, District Judge, Amit Priyavadan Mehta, District Judge, Emmet G. Sullivan, Carl J. Nichols, District Judge, William Alsup, District Judge, Christopher Reid Cooper, District Judge, Beth Labson Freeman, District Judge, James E. Boasberg, District Judge, Gregory George Katsas, Amy Berman Jackson, District Judge, Britt C. Grant, Oki Mollway, Judicial Circuit Judge, Adelberto B. Jordan, Trevor Neil McFadden, District Judge, James Donato, District Judge, Patricia Ann Millett, Lawrence J. O'neill, Chief Judge of the Eastern District of California, Charles R. Wilson, Morrison C. England, Jr., District Judge, Thomas J. Sammartino, District Judge, Rudolph Contreras, District Judge, Dabney L. Friedrich, District Judge, Jon S. Tigar, District Judge, Mary H. Murguia, Judicial Circuit Judge, William H. Pryor, Jr., Kevin C. Newsom, Tanya S. Chutkan, District Judge, Richard Seeborg, District Judge, Thomas J. Whelan, District Judge, Jeffrey S. White, District Judge, Ketanji Brown Jackson, District Judge, M. Margaret McKeown, District Judge, Barry Ted Moskowitz, District Judge, Randolph D. Moss, District Judge, Robin S. Rosenbaum, John A. Mendez, District Judge, Lucy H. Koh, District Judge, J. Michael Seabright, Judicial Circuit Judge, Sydney R. Thomas, Ninth Circuit Judicial Council Chief Judge, William P. Barr, Robert Leon Wilkins, Edward Chen, District Judge, Virginia Phillips, Chief Judge of the Central District of California, Dana M. Sabraw, District Judge, Vince Chhabria, District Judge, Larry Alan Burns, Chief Judge of the Southern District of California and United States
Plaintiff / Appellant: Evelyn Aimee DeJesus and Lawyers United Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Allan Wainwright
Case Number: 20-5269
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER [1868724] filed denying motion for leave to intervene [ # 1863539-2 ] Allan Wainwright in 20-5269; denying motion to exceed word limits [ # 1867972-2 ]. See order for details. Before Judges: Henderson, Rogers and Walker. [20-5269] [Entered: 10/28/2020 05:22 PM]
October 23, 2020 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1867972] to exceed brief filed by Lawyers United Inc. and Evelyn Aimee DeJesus [Service Date: 10/23/2020 ] Length Certification: This motion is in compliance with length limitations -- document contains 1172 words. [20-5269] (Giannini, Joseph) [Entered: 10/23/2020 06:01 PM]
October 15, 2020 JOINT APPENDIX [1866485] filed by Evelyn Aimee DeJesus and Lawyers United Inc.. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 10/15/2020 ] [20-5269] (Giannini, Joseph) [Entered: 10/15/2020 01:58 PM]
October 5, 2020 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1864771] to motion for leave to intervene [ # 1863539-2 ] filed by William Alsup, Michael M. Anello, William P. Barr, Cynthia A. Bashant, Anthony J. Battaglia, Roger T. Benitez, James E. Boasberg, Larry Alan Burns, Jay S. Bybee, Ed Carnes, Edward Chen, Vince Chhabria, Morgan Christen, Tanya S. Chutkan, Rudolph Contreras, Christopher Reid Cooper, Gonzalo P. Curiel, Edward Davila, James Donato, Dale A. Drozd, Morrison C. England, Jr., William Q. Hayes Enright, Beth Labson Freeman, Dabney L. Friedrich, Britt C. Grant, Phyllis J. Hamilton, William Q. Hayes, John A. Houston, Beryl A. Howell, Marilyn L. Huff, Amy Berman Jackson, Ketanji Brown Jackson, Adelberto B. Jordan, Gregory George Katsas, Timothy J. Kelly, Lucy H. Koh, Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, James M. Lorenz, Beverly B. Martin, Richard S. Martinez, Trevor Neil McFadden, M. Margaret McKeown, Amit Priyavadan Mehta, John A. Mendez, Steven Merryday, Jeffrey T. Miller, Patricia Ann Millett, Oki Mollway, K. Michael Moore, Barry Ted Moskowitz, Randolph D. Moss, Kimberly J. Mueller, Mary H. Murguia, Kevin C. Newsom, Carl J. Nichols, Troy L. Nunley, Lawrence J. O'Neill, William Orrick, Virginia Phillips, Jill S. Pryor, William H. Pryor, Jr., Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, Robin S. Rosenbaum, Dana M. Sabraw, Thomas J. Sammartino, J. Michael Seabright, Richard Seeborg, Milan D. Smith, Jr., Randy Smith, Srikanth Srinivasan, Emmet G. Sullivan, Sydney R. Thomas, Jon S. Tigar, United States, Mark Walker, Thomas J. Whelan, Jeffrey S. White, Robert Leon Wilkins and Charles R. Wilson [Service Date: 10/05/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 939 words. [20-5269] (Lopez, Caroline) [Entered: 10/05/2020 11:29 AM]
October 1, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1864456] filed considering the motion to establish briefing schedule [ # 1863956-2 ], setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 11/03/2020. APPENDIX due 11/03/2020. Brief(s) for Amicus due on 11/10/20. APPELLEE Brief due on 12/07/2020. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 01/06/2021 [20-5269] [Entered: 10/01/2020 06:02 PM]
September 29, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1864019] filed by William Alsup, Michael M. Anello, William P. Barr, Cynthia A. Bashant, Anthony J. Battaglia, Roger T. Benitez, James E. Boasberg, Larry Alan Burns, Jay S. Bybee, Ed Carnes, Edward Chen, Vince Chhabria, Morgan Christen, Tanya S. Chutkan, Rudolph Contreras, Christopher Reid Cooper, Gonzalo P. Curiel, Edward Davila, James Donato, Dale A. Drozd, Morrison C. England, Jr., William Q. Hayes Enright, Beth Labson Freeman, Dabney L. Friedrich, Britt C. Grant, Phyllis J. Hamilton, William Q. Hayes, John A. Houston, Beryl A. Howell, Marilyn L. Huff, Amy Berman Jackson, Ketanji Brown Jackson, Adelberto B. Jordan, Gregory George Katsas, Timothy J. Kelly, Lucy H. Koh, Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, James M. Lorenz, Beverly B. Martin, Richard S. Martinez, Trevor Neil McFadden, M. Margaret McKeown, Amit Priyavadan Mehta, John A. Mendez, Steven Merryday, Jeffrey T. Miller, Patricia Ann Millett, Oki Mollway, K. Michael Moore, Barry Ted Moskowitz, Randolph D. Moss, Kimberly J. Mueller, Mary H. Murguia, Kevin C. Newsom, Carl J. Nichols, Troy L. Nunley, Lawrence J. O'Neill, William Orrick, Virginia Phillips, Jill S. Pryor, William H. Pryor, Jr., Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, Robin S. Rosenbaum, Dana M. Sabraw, Thomas J. Sammartino, J. Michael Seabright, Richard Seeborg, Milan D. Smith, Jr., Randy Smith, Srikanth Srinivasan, Emmet G. Sullivan, Sydney R. Thomas, Jon S. Tigar, United States, Mark Walker, Thomas J. Whelan, Jeffrey S. White, Robert Leon Wilkins and Charles R. Wilson [Service Date: 09/29/2020 ] [20-5269] (Lopez, Caroline) [Entered: 09/29/2020 08:11 PM]
September 29, 2020 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT [1863956] to motion [ # 1863000-2 ] combined with a MOTION to establish briefing schedule filed by William Alsup, Michael M. Anello, William P. Barr, Cynthia A. Bashant, Anthony J. Battaglia, Roger T. Benitez, James E. Boasberg, Larry Alan Burns, Jay S. Bybee, Ed Carnes, Edward Chen, Vince Chhabria, Morgan Christen, Tanya S. Chutkan, Rudolph Contreras, Christopher Reid Cooper, Gonzalo P. Curiel, Edward Davila, James Donato, Dale A. Drozd, Morrison C. England, Jr., William Q. Hayes Enright, Beth Labson Freeman, Dabney L. Friedrich, Britt C. Grant, Phyllis J. Hamilton, William Q. Hayes, John A. Houston, Beryl A. Howell, Marilyn L. Huff, Amy Berman Jackson, Ketanji Brown Jackson, Adelberto B. Jordan, Gregory George Katsas, Timothy J. Kelly, Lucy H. Koh, Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, James M. Lorenz, Beverly B. Martin, Richard S. Martinez, Trevor Neil McFadden, M. Margaret McKeown, Amit Priyavadan Mehta, John A. Mendez, Steven Merryday, Jeffrey T. Miller, Patricia Ann Millett, Oki Mollway, K. Michael Moore, Barry Ted Moskowitz, Randolph D. Moss, Kimberly J. Mueller, Mary H. Murguia, Kevin C. Newsom, Carl J. Nichols, Troy L. Nunley, Lawrence J. O'Neill, William Orrick, Virginia Phillips, Jill S. Pryor, William H. Pryor, Jr., Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, Robin S. Rosenbaum, Dana M. Sabraw, Thomas J. Sammartino, J. Michael Seabright, Richard Seeborg, Milan D. Smith, Jr., Randy Smith, Srikanth Srinivasan, Emmet G. Sullivan, Sydney R. Thomas, Jon S. Tigar, United States, Mark Walker, Thomas J. Whelan, Jeffrey S. White, Robert Leon Wilkins and Charles R. Wilson [Service Date: 09/29/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 139 words. [20-5269] (Lopez, Caroline) [Entered: 09/29/2020 03:10 PM]
September 29, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1863941] filed by Caroline D. Lopez and co-counsel Abby Wright on behalf of Appellees William Alsup, Michael M. Anello, William P. Barr, Cynthia A. Bashant, Anthony J. Battaglia, Roger T. Benitez, James E. Boasberg, Larry Alan Burns, Jay S. Bybee, Ed Carnes, Edward Chen, Vince Chhabria, Morgan Christen, Tanya S. Chutkan, Rudolph Contreras, Christopher Reid Cooper, Gonzalo P. Curiel, Edward Davila, James Donato, Dale A. Drozd, Morrison C. England, Jr., William Q. Hayes Enright, Beth Labson Freeman, Dabney L. Friedrich, Britt C. Grant, Phyllis J. Hamilton, William Q. Hayes, John A. Houston, Beryl A. Howell, Marilyn L. Huff, Amy Berman Jackson, Ketanji Brown Jackson, Adelberto B. Jordan, Gregory George Katsas, Timothy J. Kelly, Lucy H. Koh, Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, James M. Lorenz, Beverly B. Martin, Richard S. Martinez, Trevor Neil McFadden, M. Margaret McKeown, Amit Priyavadan Mehta, John A. Mendez, Steven Merryday, Jeffrey T. Miller, Patricia Ann Millett, Oki Mollway, K. Michael Moore, Barry Ted Moskowitz, Randolph D. Moss, Kimberly J. Mueller, Mary H. Murguia, Kevin C. Newsom, Carl J. Nichols, Troy L. Nunley, Lawrence J. O'Neill, William Orrick, Virginia Phillips, Jill S. Pryor, William H. Pryor, Jr., Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, Robin S. Rosenbaum, Dana M. Sabraw, Thomas J. Sammartino, J. Michael Seabright, Richard Seeborg, Milan D. Smith, Jr., Randy Smith, Srikanth Srinivasan, Emmet G. Sullivan, Sydney R. Thomas, Jon S. Tigar, United States, Mark Walker, Thomas J. Whelan, Jeffrey S. White, Robert Leon Wilkins and Charles R. Wilson. [20-5269] (Lopez, Caroline) [Entered: 09/29/2020 02:43 PM]
September 27, 2020 MOTION [1863539] to intervene filed by Allan Wainwright (Service Date: 09/27/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 3 pages. [20-5269]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 09/29/2020 by LMC] (Giannini, Joseph) [Entered: 09/27/2020 01:57 PM]
September 23, 2020 MOTION [1863000] to expedite case filed by Lawyers United Inc. and Evelyn Aimee DeJesus (Service Date: 09/23/2020 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail) Length Certification: This motion contains 3,266 words measured by computer program.. [20-5269] (Giannini, Joseph) [Entered: 09/23/2020 02:03 PM]
September 4, 2020 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1859980] filed by Evelyn Aimee DeJesus and Lawyers United Inc. [Service Date: 09/04/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-5269] (Giannini, Joseph) [Entered: 09/04/2020 01:10 PM]
September 3, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1859878] filed by Joseph R Giannini and co-counsel W. Peyton George on behalf of Appellants Lawyers United Inc. and Evelyn Aimee DeJesus. [20-5269] (Giannini, Joseph) [Entered: 09/03/2020 06:28 PM]
September 3, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1859817] filed by Lawyers United Inc. and Evelyn Aimee DeJesus [Service Date: 09/03/2020 ] [20-5269] (Giannini, Joseph) [Entered: 09/03/2020 02:33 PM]
September 3, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1859815] filed by Lawyers United Inc. and Evelyn Aimee DeJesus [Service Date: 09/03/2020 ] [20-5269] (Giannini, Joseph) [Entered: 09/03/2020 02:29 PM]
September 1, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1859346] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 10/01/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 10/01/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 10/01/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 10/01/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 10/01/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 10/01/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 10/01/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 10/01/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 10/16/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 10/01/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 10/01/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 10/01/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 10/16/2020 [20-5269] [Entered: 09/01/2020 02:35 PM]
August 31, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1859344] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-03222-RCL filed by Evelyn Aimee DeJesus and Lawyers United Inc.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5269. [20-5269] [Entered: 09/01/2020 02:33 PM]
August 31, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5269] [Entered: 09/01/2020 02:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lawyers United Inc., et al v. USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Randy Smith, Judicial Circuit Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James M. Lorenz, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mark Walker
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Roger T. Benitez, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: K. Michael Moore, Chief Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dale A. Drozd, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeffrey T. Miller, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Richard S. Martinez, Judicial Circuit Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ed Carnes
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Srikanth Srinivasan
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Timothy J. Kelly, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jay S. Bybee, Judicial Circuit Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John A. Houston, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William Q. Hayes, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Troy L. Nunley, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anthony J. Battaglia, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Marilyn L. Huff, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Steven Merryday
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Milan D. Smith, Jr., Judicial Circuit Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kimberly J. Mueller, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Beryl A. Howell, Chief Judge for the District of Columbia
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael M. Anello, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jill S. Pryor
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gonzalo P. Curiel, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Larry Alan Burns, Chief Judge of the Southern, District of California
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Beverly B. Martin
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William Orrick, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Morgan Christen, Judicial Circuit Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Phyllis J. Hamilton, Chief Judge of the District of California
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cynthia A. Bashant, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William Q. Hayes Enright, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Edward Davila, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Amit Priyavadan Mehta, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Emmet G. Sullivan
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Carl J. Nichols, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William Alsup, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Christopher Reid Cooper, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Beth Labson Freeman, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James E. Boasberg, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gregory George Katsas
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Amy Berman Jackson, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Britt C. Grant
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Oki Mollway, Judicial Circuit Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Adelberto B. Jordan
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Trevor Neil McFadden, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James Donato, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Patricia Ann Millett
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lawrence J. O'neill, Chief Judge of the Eastern District of California
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Charles R. Wilson
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Morrison C. England, Jr., District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Thomas J. Sammartino, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rudolph Contreras, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dabney L. Friedrich, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jon S. Tigar, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mary H. Murguia, Judicial Circuit Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William H. Pryor, Jr.
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kevin C. Newsom
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tanya S. Chutkan, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Richard Seeborg, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Thomas J. Whelan, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeffrey S. White, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ketanji Brown Jackson, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. Margaret McKeown, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Barry Ted Moskowitz, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Randolph D. Moss, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robin S. Rosenbaum
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John A. Mendez, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lucy H. Koh, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. Michael Seabright, Judicial Circuit Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sydney R. Thomas, Ninth Circuit Judicial Council Chief Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William P. Barr
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert Leon Wilkins
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Edward Chen, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Virginia Phillips, Chief Judge of the Central District of California
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dana M. Sabraw, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vince Chhabria, District Judge
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Larry Alan Burns, Chief Judge of the Southern District of California
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Caroline Dao Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Evelyn Aimee DeJesus
Represented By: Joseph R. Giannini
Represented By: William Peyton George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lawyers United Inc.
Represented By: Joseph R. Giannini
Represented By: William Peyton George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Allan Wainwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?