Capital Area Immigrants, et al v. Donald Trump, et al
Defendant / Appellant: Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States Customs and Border Protection, Chad F. Wolf, Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, in his official capacity, Tony H. Pham, in his official capacity as Director of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Donald J. Trump, in his official capacity as President of the United States, William P. Barr, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the United States, James McHenry, in his official capacity as Director of the Executive Office for Immigration Review, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, in his official capacity as Acting Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Mark A. Morgan, in his official capacity as Acting Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security and Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Plaintiff / Appellee: Z.B.M., Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, Refugee and Immigrant Center For Education and Legal Services, Inc., Human Rights First, J.M.M., K.M.V.M., N.G.R.L., D.L.R., Y.G.C., M.Y.R.B., C.C.R.O. and W.M.R.O.
Case Number: 20-5273
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1864698] filed by William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, DHS, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James McHenry, Mark A. Morgan, Tony H. Pham, Donald J. Trump, United States Customs and Border Protection, USCIS and Chad F. Wolf in 20-5273, William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, DHS, DOJ, Executive Office of Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James McHenry, Mark L. Morgan, Pham H. Tony, United States Customs and Border Protection, USCIS and Chad F. Wolf in 20-5271 [Service Date: 10/02/2020 ] [20-5273, 20-5271] (Reuveni, Erez) [Entered: 10/02/2020 07:19 PM]
October 2, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1864697] filed by William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, DHS, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James McHenry, Mark A. Morgan, Tony H. Pham, Donald J. Trump, United States Customs and Border Protection, USCIS and Chad F. Wolf in 20-5273, William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, DHS, DOJ, Executive Office of Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James McHenry, Mark L. Morgan, Pham H. Tony, United States Customs and Border Protection, USCIS and Chad F. Wolf in 20-5271 [Service Date: 10/02/2020 ] [20-5273, 20-5271] (Reuveni, Erez) [Entered: 10/02/2020 07:18 PM]
October 1, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1864467] filed by William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, DHS, DOJ, Executive Office of Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James McHenry, Mark L. Morgan, Pham H. Tony, United States Customs and Border Protection, USCIS and Chad F. Wolf in 20-5271, William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, DHS, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James McHenry, Mark A. Morgan, Tony H. Pham, Donald J. Trump, United States Customs and Border Protection, USCIS and Chad F. Wolf in 20-5273 [Service Date: 10/01/2020 ] [20-5271, 20-5273] (Reuveni, Erez) [Entered: 10/01/2020 07:12 PM]
October 1, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1864466] filed by William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, DHS, DOJ, Executive Office of Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James McHenry, Mark L. Morgan, Pham H. Tony, United States Customs and Border Protection, USCIS and Chad F. Wolf in 20-5271, William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, DHS, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James McHenry, Mark A. Morgan, Tony H. Pham, Donald J. Trump, United States Customs and Border Protection, USCIS and Chad F. Wolf in 20-5273 [Service Date: 10/01/2020 ] [20-5271, 20-5273] (Reuveni, Erez) [Entered: 10/01/2020 07:11 PM]
October 1, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1864468] filed by William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, DHS, DOJ, Executive Office of Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James McHenry, Mark L. Morgan, Pham H. Tony, United States Customs and Border Protection, USCIS and Chad F. Wolf in 20-5271, William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, DHS, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James McHenry, Mark A. Morgan, Tony H. Pham, Donald J. Trump, United States Customs and Border Protection, USCIS and Chad F. Wolf in 20-5273 [Service Date: 10/01/2020 ] [20-5271, 20-5273] (Reuveni, Erez) [Entered: 10/01/2020 07:13 PM]
October 1, 2020 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1864470] filed by William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, DHS, DOJ, Executive Office of Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James McHenry, Mark L. Morgan, Pham H. Tony, United States Customs and Border Protection, USCIS and Chad F. Wolf in 20-5271, William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, DHS, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James McHenry, Mark A. Morgan, Tony H. Pham, Donald J. Trump, United States Customs and Border Protection, USCIS and Chad F. Wolf in 20-5273 [Service Date: 10/01/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [20-5271, 20-5273] (Reuveni, Erez) [Entered: 10/01/2020 07:20 PM]
October 1, 2020 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1864471] submitted by William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, DHS, DOJ, Executive Office of Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James McHenry, Mark L. Morgan, Pham H. Tony, United States Customs and Border Protection, USCIS and Chad F. Wolf in 20-5271, William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, DHS, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James McHenry, Mark A. Morgan, Tony H. Pham, Donald J. Trump, United States Customs and Border Protection, USCIS and Chad F. Wolf in 20-5273 [Service Date: 10/01/2020 ] [20-5271, 20-5273] (Reuveni, Erez) [Entered: 10/01/2020 07:21 PM]
October 1, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1864391] filed by Mitchell P. Reich and co-counsel Neal Kumar Katyal, T. Clark Weymouth, Craig A. Hoover, Justin W. Bernick, Heather A. Briggs, Mohan Warusha Hennadige on behalf of Appellees C.C.R.O., Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition, D.L.R., Human Rights First, J.M.M., K.M.V.M., M.Y.R.B., N.G.R.L., Refugee and Immigrant Center For Education and Legal Services, Inc., W.M.R.O., Y.G.C. and Z.B.M. in 20-5273. [20-5273, 20-5271] (Reich, Mitchell) [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:43 PM]
October 1, 2020 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1864469] filed by William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, DHS, DOJ, Executive Office of Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James McHenry, Mark L. Morgan, Pham H. Tony, United States Customs and Border Protection, USCIS and Chad F. Wolf in 20-5271, William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, DHS, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James McHenry, Mark A. Morgan, Tony H. Pham, Donald J. Trump, United States Customs and Border Protection, USCIS and Chad F. Wolf in 20-5273 [Service Date: 10/01/2020 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [20-5271, 20-5273] (Reuveni, Erez) [Entered: 10/01/2020 07:14 PM]
September 30, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1864227] filed by A.C., A.G., A.L.G., C.S., D.C., E.B., I.A., L.A., L.C., M.X., N.B., P.P., Tahirih Justice Center and Y.D. [Service Date: 09/30/2020 ] [20-5271] (Eiland, Katrina) [Entered: 09/30/2020 07:52 PM]
September 30, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1864211] filed by Keren Zwick and co-counsel Gianna Borroto; Charles Roth on behalf of Appellees A.C., A.G., A.L.G., C.S., D.C., I.A., L.A., L.C., M.X., N.B., P.P., Y.D., E.B. and Tahirih Justice Center in 20-5271. [20-5271, 20-5273] (Zwick, Keren) [Entered: 09/30/2020 05:43 PM]
September 29, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1863904] filed by Katrina Eiland and co-counsel Julie Veroff, Morgan Russell on behalf of Appellees A.C., A.G., A.L.G., C.S., D.C., E.B., I.A., L.A., L.C., M.X., N.B., P.P., Tahirih Justice Center and Y.D.. [20-5271] (Eiland, Katrina) [Entered: 09/29/2020 12:57 PM]
September 29, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1863927] filed by Erez Reuveni on behalf of Appellants William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, DHS, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James McHenry, Mark A. Morgan, Tony H. Pham, Donald J. Trump, United States Customs and Border Protection, USCIS and Chad F. Wolf in 20-5273, Appellants William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, DHS, DOJ, Executive Office of Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James McHenry, Mark L. Morgan, Pham H. Tony, United States Customs and Border Protection, USCIS and Chad F. Wolf in 20-5271. [20-5273, 20-5271] (Reuveni, Erez) [Entered: 09/29/2020 01:45 PM]
September 29, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1863979] filed by Cody Wofsy on behalf of Appellees A.C., A.G., A.L.G., C.S., D.C., E.B., I.A., L.A., L.C., M.X., P.P., Tahirih Justice Center, Y.D. and N.B.. [20-5271] (Wofsy, Cody) [Entered: 09/29/2020 03:58 PM]
September 29, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1863982] filed by Omar C. Jadwat and co-counsel Lee Gelernt, Celso Perez, Daniel A. Galindo on behalf of Appellees A.C., A.G., A.L.G., C.S., D.C., E.B., I.A., L.A., L.C., M.X., N.B., P.P., Tahirih Justice Center and Y.D.. [20-5271] (Jadwat, Omar) [Entered: 09/29/2020 04:06 PM]
September 2, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1859551] filed consolidating cases 20-5273 (Consolidation started 09/02/2020) with 20-5271. Directing party to file in 20-5273 initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 10/02/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 10/02/2020 [20-5271, 20-5273] [Entered: 09/02/2020 01:24 PM]
August 31, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1859536] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-02117-TJK filed by William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, James McHenry, Mark A. Morgan, Tony H. Pham, Donald J. Trump, USCIS, United States Customs and Border Protection, DHS, DOJ and Chad F. Wolf. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5273. [20-5273] [Entered: 09/02/2020 12:51 PM]
August 31, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5273] [Entered: 09/02/2020 12:48 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Capital Area Immigrants, et al v. Donald Trump, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Executive Office for Immigration Review
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Chad F. Wolf, Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, in his official capacity
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Tony H. Pham, in his official capacity as Director of Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Donald J. Trump, in his official capacity as President of the United States
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: William P. Barr, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: James McHenry, in his official capacity as Director of the Executive Office for Immigration Review
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, in his official capacity as Acting Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Mark A. Morgan, in his official capacity as Acting Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Z.B.M.
Represented By: Craig A. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition
Represented By: Craig A. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Refugee and Immigrant Center For Education and Legal Services, Inc.
Represented By: Craig A. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Human Rights First
Represented By: Craig A. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: J.M.M.
Represented By: Craig A. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: K.M.V.M.
Represented By: Craig A. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: N.G.R.L.
Represented By: Craig A. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: D.L.R.
Represented By: Craig A. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Y.G.C.
Represented By: Craig A. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: M.Y.R.B.
Represented By: Craig A. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: C.C.R.O.
Represented By: Craig A. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: W.M.R.O.
Represented By: Craig A. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?