In re: FBOP Execution Protocol Cases
Plaintiff / Appellee: Richard Tipton, Alfred Bourgeois, Brandon Bernard, Christopher Andre Vialva, Chadrick Evan Fulks, Norris G. Holder, Jr., Julius Robinson, James H. Roane, Jr. and Cory Johnson
Defendant / Appellee: Donald W. Washington, Director, U.S. Marshals Service, Stephen M. Hahn, M.D., Commissioner of Food and Drugs, William E. Wilson, M.D., M.D., Clinical Director, U.S. Penitentiary Terre Haute, John Does, I-X, individually and in their official capacities, William P. Barr, Attorney General, T.J. Watson, Complex Warden, U.S. Penitentiary Terre Haute, Timothy J. Shea, Acting Administrator, Drug Enforcement Agency, Jeffrey E. Krueger, Regional Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons, North Central Region, United States Department of Justice, Michael Carvajal, Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons and Nicole C. English, Assistant Director, Health Services, Federal Bureau of Prisons
In Re: In re: In the Matter of the Federal Bureau of Prisons' Execution Protocol Cases
Not Yet Classified: Orlando Hall, Bruce Webster, Anthony Battle and Jeffrey Paul
Plaintiff / Appellant: William Emmett Lecroy
Case Number: 20-5285
Filed: September 20, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [20-5285] [Entered: 10/23/2020 11:45 AM]
October 23, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1867860] filed granting motion to dismiss case as moot [ # 1865346-2 ], issuing mandate [20-5285] [Entered: 10/23/2020 11:36 AM]
October 7, 2020 JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1865346] to dismiss case as moot filed by William P. Barr, Michael Carvajal, John Does, DOJ, Nicole C. English, Stephen M. Hahn, Jeffrey E. Krueger, Timothy J. Shea, Donald W. Washington, T.J. Watson and William E. Wilson, M.D. [Service Date: 10/07/2020 ] Length Certification: 127. [20-5285] (Meisler, Scott) [Entered: 10/07/2020 02:46 PM]
September 23, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1862973] filed directing the parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 10/07/2020. [20-5285] [Entered: 09/23/2020 12:48 PM]
September 21, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER [1862692] filed denying motion for injunction [ # 1862413-2 ] Before Judges: Henderson, Tatel and Katsas. [20-5285] [Entered: 09/21/2020 08:15 PM]
September 21, 2020 REPLY [1862643] filed by William Emmett Lecroy to response [ # 1862520-2 ] [Service Date: 09/21/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2523 words. [20-5285] [Entered: 09/21/2020 05:21 PM]
September 21, 2020 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged response [ # 1862520-2 ] is filed. [20-5285] [Entered: 09/21/2020 03:52 PM]
September 21, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER [1862587] filed granting motion for leave to file [ # 1862525-2 ]; The Clerk is directed to file the lodged response [ # 1862520-2 ]. Before Judges: Henderson, Tatel and Katsas. [20-5285] [Entered: 09/21/2020 03:51 PM]
September 21, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1862578] filed by William P. Barr, William E. Wilson, M.D., T.J. Watson, Donald W. Washington, Timothy J. Shea, Jeffrey E. Krueger, Stephen M. Hahn, Nicole C. English, DOJ, John Does and Michael Carvajal [Service Date: 09/21/2020 ] [20-5285] (Meisler, Scott) [Entered: 09/21/2020 03:30 PM]
September 21, 2020 MOTION [1862525] for leave to file response filed by William P. Barr, Michael Carvajal, John Does, DOJ, Nicole C. English, Donald W. Washington, T.J. Watson, William E. Wilson, M.D., Stephen M. Hahn, Jeffrey E. Krueger and Timothy J. Shea (Service Date: 09/21/2020 by CM/ECF NDA, Email) Length Certification: 204. [20-5285] (Meisler, Scott) [Entered: 09/21/2020 01:15 PM]
September 21, 2020 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1862520] to motion [ # 1862413-2 ] lodged by William P. Barr, Michael Carvajal, John Does, DOJ, Nicole C. English, Stephen M. Hahn, Jeffrey E. Krueger, Timothy J. Shea, Donald W. Washington, T.J. Watson and William E. Wilson, M.D. [Service Date: 09/21/2020 by CM/ECF NDA, Email] Length Certification: 7,984. [20-5285] (Meisler, Scott) [Entered: 09/21/2020 01:07 PM]
September 21, 2020 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged motion for injunction [ # 1862413-2 ] is filed [20-5285]. [Entered: 09/21/2020 10:43 AM]
September 21, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER [1862441] filed granting motion to exceed word limits [ # 1862418-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to file the lodged emergency motion for injunction. [ # 1862413-2 ]. It is FURTHER ORDERED that defendants-appellees file a response to the emergency motion for injunction, not to exceed 10,000 words, by 1:00 p.m. on Monday, September 21, 2020; and that appellant file any reply, not to exceed 4,000 words, by 5:00 p.m. on Monday, September 21, 2020 [ # 1862413-2 ]. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Before Judges: Henderson, Tatel and Katsas. [20-5285] [Entered: 09/21/2020 10:25 AM]
September 21, 2020 MOTION [1862418] to exceed motion filed by William Emmett Lecroy (Service Date: 09/21/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 108 Words. [20-5285] (Smith, Gregory) [Entered: 09/21/2020 08:25 AM]
September 21, 2020 EMERGENCY MOTION [1862413] for injunction lodged by William Emmett Lecroy (Service Date: 09/21/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 10,438 Words. [20-5285]--[Edited 09/21/2020 by LMF] (Smith, Gregory) [Entered: 09/21/2020 07:19 AM]
September 20, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1862408] filed by Melissa N. Patterson and co-counsel Amanda L. Mundell, Scott Meisler, Paul Crane on behalf of Appellees William P. Barr, Michael Carvajal, John Does, DOJ, Nicole C. English, Stephen M. Hahn, Jeffrey E. Krueger, Timothy J. Shea, Donald W. Washington, T.J. Watson and William E. Wilson, M.D.. [20-5285] (Mundell, Amanda) [Entered: 09/20/2020 09:30 PM]
September 20, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1862406] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-mc-00145-TSC filed by William Emmett Lecroy. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5285. [20-5285] [Entered: 09/20/2020 08:52 PM]
September 20, 2020 US PRISONER CASE docketed. [20-5285] [Entered: 09/20/2020 08:48 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: FBOP Execution Protocol Cases
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Richard Tipton
Represented By: Charles Anthony Zdebski
Represented By: Gerald Wesley King Esquire Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Alfred Bourgeois
Represented By: Shawn Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Brandon Bernard
Represented By: Ginger Anders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Christopher Andre Vialva
Represented By: Michael F. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Chadrick Evan Fulks
Represented By: Shawn Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Norris G. Holder, Jr.
Represented By: Scott Matthew Wilson Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Julius Robinson
Represented By: Jonathan Aminoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James H. Roane, Jr.
Represented By: Paul Francis Enzinna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Cory Johnson
Represented By: Donald P. Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Donald W. Washington, Director, U.S. Marshals Service
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Represented By: Scott A.C. Meisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stephen M. Hahn, M.D., Commissioner of Food and Drugs
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Represented By: Scott A.C. Meisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William E. Wilson, M.D., M.D., Clinical Director, U.S. Penitentiary Terre Haute
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Represented By: Scott A.C. Meisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Does, I-X, individually and in their official capacities
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William P. Barr, Attorney General
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Represented By: Scott A.C. Meisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: T.J. Watson, Complex Warden, U.S. Penitentiary Terre Haute
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Represented By: Scott A.C. Meisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Timothy J. Shea, Acting Administrator, Drug Enforcement Agency
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Represented By: Scott A.C. Meisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeffrey E. Krueger, Regional Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons, North Central Region
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Represented By: Scott A.C. Meisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Represented By: Scott A.C. Meisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael Carvajal, Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Represented By: Scott A.C. Meisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nicole C. English, Assistant Director, Health Services, Federal Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Represented By: Scott A.C. Meisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In re: In the Matter of the Federal Bureau of Prisons' Execution Protocol Cases
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Orlando Hall
Represented By: Matthew J. Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Bruce Webster
Represented By: Evan Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anthony Battle
Represented By: Joshua Christopher Toll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Jeffrey Paul
Represented By: Shawn Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: William Emmett Lecroy
Represented By: Gregory Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?