Shawnee Tribe v. Steven Mnuchin, et al
Defendant / Appellee: David Longly Bernhardt, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior, Steven T. Mnuchin, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of the Treasury and United States Department of the Treasury
Plaintiff / Appellant: Shawnee Tribe
Amicus Curiae: Miccosukee Tribe of Indians of Florida and Prairie Band Potawatomi Nation
Case Number: 20-5286
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 5, 2021 Summary Shawnee Tribe v. Mnuchin

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1869524] filed by Scott A. McIntosh and co-counsel Luke Cass; Pilar M. Thomas on behalf of Appellant Shawnee Tribe. [20-5286] (Thomas, Pilar) [Entered: 11/03/2020 11:21 AM]
November 2, 2020 APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1869432] filed by Shawnee Tribe [Service Date: 11/02/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6491 Words. [20-5286] (McIntosh, Scott) [Entered: 11/02/2020 08:04 PM]
November 2, 2020 NOTICE [1869431] Appellant's Notice of Errata filed by Shawnee Tribe [Service Date: 11/02/2020 ] [20-5286] (McIntosh, Scott) [Entered: 11/02/2020 08:01 PM]
October 26, 2020 APPELLEE BRIEF [1868194] filed by Mr. David Longly Bernhardt, DOI, Steven T. Mnuchin and TREA [Service Date: 10/26/2020 ] Length of Brief: 11,296 words. [20-5286] (Pulham, Thomas) [Entered: 10/26/2020 08:47 PM]
October 21, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1867629] filed by Mr. David Longly Bernhardt, DOI, Steven T. Mnuchin and TREA [Service Date: 10/21/2020 ] [20-5286] (Pulham, Thomas) [Entered: 10/21/2020 09:08 PM]
October 21, 2020 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1867628] filed by Shawnee Tribe [Service Date: 10/21/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [20-5286] (McIntosh, Scott) [Entered: 10/21/2020 08:21 PM]
October 21, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1867627] filed by Shawnee Tribe [Service Date: 10/21/2020 ] [20-5286] (McIntosh, Scott) [Entered: 10/21/2020 08:19 PM]
October 19, 2020 CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1867019] filed by Miccosukee Tribe of Indians of Florida [Service Date: 10/19/2020 ] Length of Brief: 2,485 Words. [20-5286] (Jarcho, Daniel) [Entered: 10/19/2020 12:52 PM]
October 19, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1866947] filed by Michael G. Rossetti on behalf of Amicus Curiae for Appellant Prairie Band Potawatomi Nation. [20-5286] (Rossetti, Michael) [Entered: 10/19/2020 10:46 AM]
October 18, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1866894] filed by Daniel Jarcho on behalf of Amicus Curiae for Appellant Miccosukee Tribe of Indians of Florida. [20-5286] (Jarcho, Daniel) [Entered: 10/18/2020 07:23 PM]
October 16, 2020 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1866873] lodged by Miccosukee Tribe of Indians of Florida [Service Date: 10/16/2020 ] Length of Brief: 2,485 Words. [20-5286]--[Edited 10/19/2020 by TAM--MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED] (Jarcho, Daniel) [Entered: 10/16/2020 05:43 PM]
October 16, 2020 CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1866825] filed by Prairie Band Potawatomi Nation [Service Date: 10/16/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,273 words. [20-5286] (Rossetti, Michael) [Entered: 10/16/2020 04:16 PM]
October 16, 2020 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1866768] lodged by Prairie Band Potawatomi Nation [Service Date: 10/16/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,273 words. [20-5286]--[Edited 10/16/2020 by TAM--MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED] (Rossetti, Michael) [Entered: 10/16/2020 01:51 PM]
October 16, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1866637] filed scheduling oral argument on Friday, 12/04/2020. [20-5286] [Entered: 10/16/2020 10:48 AM]
October 15, 2020 NOTICE [1866544] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by The Miccosukee Tribe of Indians of Florida [Service Date: 10/15/2020 ] [20-5286]--[Edited 10/16/2020 by TAM] (Jarcho, Daniel) [Entered: 10/15/2020 04:59 PM]
October 15, 2020 NOTICE [1866477] of intention to participate as amicus curiae [Disclosure Listing: Not Attached] filed by Prairie Band Potawatomi Nation [Service Date: 10/15/2020 ] [20-5286]--[Edited 10/16/2020 by TAM] (Rossetti, Michael) [Entered: 10/15/2020 01:47 PM]
October 13, 2020 CORRECTED APPENDIX [1865927] filed by Shawnee Tribe. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 10/13/2020 ] [20-5286] (McIntosh, Scott) [Entered: 10/13/2020 02:14 PM]
October 13, 2020 CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF [1865926] filed by Shawnee Tribe [Service Date: 10/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 12,834 words. [20-5286] (McIntosh, Scott) [Entered: 10/13/2020 02:11 PM]
October 9, 2020 APPENDIX [1865851] lodged by Shawnee Tribe. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 10/09/2020 ] [20-5286] [Entered: 10/13/2020 10:13 AM]
October 9, 2020 APPELLANT BRIEF [1865766] lodged by Shawnee Tribe [Service Date: 10/09/2020 ] Length of Brief: 12,834 Words. [20-5286]--[Edited 10/13/2020 by TAM--MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED] (McIntosh, Scott) [Entered: 10/09/2020 11:41 PM]
October 2, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1864695] filed by Thomas Pulham on behalf of Appellees Mr. David Longly Bernhardt, DOI, Steven T. Mnuchin and TREA. [20-5286] (Pulham, Thomas) [Entered: 10/02/2020 06:32 PM]
October 2, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1864531] filed by Scott A. McIntosh and co-counsel Luke V. Cass on behalf of Appellant Shawnee Tribe. [20-5286] (Cass, Luke) [Entered: 10/02/2020 12:18 PM]
September 25, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER [1863416] filed that this appeal be expedited [ # 1862681-2 ]. Setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT'S Brief due 10/09/2020. APPENDIX due 10/09/2020. APPELLEE'S Brief due on 10/26/2020. APPELLANT'S Reply Brief due 11/02/2020. The Clerk is directed to schedule this case for argument on the first appropriate date. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND SUBMISSION REQUIREMENTS.) Before Judges: Henderson, Tatel and Katsas. [20-5286] [Entered: 09/25/2020 12:41 PM]
September 21, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1862698] filed by Adam C. Jed and co-counsel Michael S. Raab, Daniel Tenny on behalf of Appellees Mr. David Longly Bernhardt, DOI, Steven T. Mnuchin and TREA. [20-5286] (Jed, Adam) [Entered: 09/21/2020 10:50 PM]
September 21, 2020 MOTION [1862681] to expedite case filed by Shawnee Tribe (Service Date: 09/21/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2721 Words. [20-5286] (McIntosh, Scott) [Entered: 09/21/2020 06:46 PM]
September 21, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1862673] filed by Scott A. McIntosh on behalf of Appellant Shawnee Tribe. [20-5286] (McIntosh, Scott) [Entered: 09/21/2020 06:06 PM]
September 21, 2020 LETTER [1862602] sent regarding attorney membership to Jonathan Paul Labukas for Shawnee Tribe. Application for Admission due 10/21/2020. [20-5286] [Entered: 09/21/2020 04:27 PM]
September 21, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1862598] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 10/21/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 10/21/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 10/21/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 10/21/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 10/21/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 10/21/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 10/21/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 10/21/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 11/05/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 10/21/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 10/21/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 10/21/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 11/05/2020 [20-5286] [Entered: 09/21/2020 04:22 PM]
September 21, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1862585] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-01999-APM filed by Shawnee Tribe. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5286. [20-5286] [Entered: 09/21/2020 03:47 PM]
September 21, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5286] [Entered: 09/21/2020 03:46 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Shawnee Tribe v. Steven Mnuchin, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Longly Bernhardt, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Adam C. Jed
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Thomas Gary Pulham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Adam C. Jed
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Thomas Gary Pulham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Steven T. Mnuchin, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Adam C. Jed
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Thomas Gary Pulham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Adam C. Jed
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Thomas Gary Pulham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shawnee Tribe
Represented By: Scott Alan McIntosh Esquire
Represented By: Jonathan Paul Labukas
Represented By: Luke Verrill Cass
Represented By: Pilar Thomas Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Miccosukee Tribe of Indians of Florida
Represented By: Daniel G. Jarcho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Prairie Band Potawatomi Nation
Represented By: Michael G. Rossetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?