F. Bauer, et al v. FDIC, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Southern Community Financial Corporation, First Horizon National Corporation, Southern Community Financial, LLC, Capital Bank, N.A., Southern Community Bank And Trust, Capital Bank Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Winston 23 Corporation, Capital Bank Financial Corporation and First Tennessee Bank National Association
Plaintiff / Appellant: Jeffrey T. Clark and F. Scott Bauer
Case Number: 20-5322
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 REPLY [1876729] filed by Capital Bank Corporation, Capital Bank Financial Corporation, Capital Bank, N.A., First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank National Association, Southern Community Bank And Trust, Southern Community Financial Corporation, Southern Community Financial, LLC, Winston 23 Corporation and FDIC in 20-5314, 20-5315, Capital Bank Corporation, Capital Bank Financial Corporation, Capital Bank, N.A., FDIC, First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank National Association, Southern Community Bank And Trust, Southern Community Financial Corporation, Southern Community Financial, LLC and Winston 23 Corporation in 20-5322 to response [ # 1876076-3 ] [Service Date: 12/22/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 738 words. [20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322] (Stevens, Duncan) [Entered: 12/22/2020 09:12 AM]
December 17, 2020 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1876171] for motion to remand case [ # 1876076-2 ], response [ # 1876076-3 ] filed by F. Scott Bauer and Jeffrey T. Clark in 20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322. [20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322] (Graebe, Christopher) [Entered: 12/17/2020 01:20 PM]
December 16, 2020 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT [1876076] to motion [ # 1874675-2 ] combined with a MOTION to remand case filed by F. Scott Bauer and Jeffrey T. Clark in 20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322 [Service Date: 12/16/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 3,243 words. [20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322] (Graebe, Christopher) [Entered: 12/16/2020 06:12 PM]
December 7, 2020 MOTION [1874675] for summary reversal (Response to Motion served by mail due on 12/17/2020) filed by Capital Bank Corporation, Capital Bank Financial Corporation, Capital Bank, N.A., First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank National Association, Southern Community Bank And Trust, Southern Community Financial Corporation, Southern Community Financial, LLC, Winston 23 Corporation and FDIC in 20-5314, 20-5315, Capital Bank Corporation, Capital Bank Financial Corporation, Capital Bank, N.A., FDIC, First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank National Association, Southern Community Bank And Trust, Southern Community Financial Corporation, Southern Community Financial, LLC and Winston 23 Corporation in 20-5322 (Service Date: 12/07/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 4,736 words. [20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322] (Stevens, Duncan) [Entered: 12/07/2020 03:08 PM]
November 20, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1872574] filed by Capital Bank Corporation, Capital Bank Financial Corporation, Capital Bank, N.A., First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank National Association, Southern Community Bank And Trust, Southern Community Financial Corporation, Southern Community Financial, LLC and Winston 23 Corporation in 20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322 [Service Date: 11/20/2020 ] [20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322] (Sun, Paul) [Entered: 11/20/2020 04:44 PM]
November 20, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1872573] filed by Capital Bank Corporation, Capital Bank Financial Corporation, Capital Bank, N.A., First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank National Association, Southern Community Bank And Trust, Southern Community Financial Corporation, Southern Community Financial, LLC and Winston 23 Corporation in 20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322 [Service Date: 11/20/2020 ] [20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322] (Sun, Paul) [Entered: 11/20/2020 04:42 PM]
November 20, 2020 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1872571] filed by Capital Bank Corporation, Capital Bank Financial Corporation, Capital Bank, N.A., First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank National Association, Southern Community Bank And Trust, Southern Community Financial Corporation, Southern Community Financial, LLC and Winston 23 Corporation in 20-5315 [Service Date: 11/20/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322] (Sun, Paul) [Entered: 11/20/2020 04:41 PM]
November 20, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1872569] filed by Capital Bank Corporation, Capital Bank Financial Corporation, Capital Bank, N.A., First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank National Association, Southern Community Bank And Trust, Southern Community Financial, LLC, Winston 23 Corporation and Southern Community Financial Corporation in 20-5314, Capital Bank Corporation, Capital Bank Financial Corporation, Capital Bank, N.A., First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank National Association, Southern Community Bank And Trust, Southern Community Financial Corporation, Southern Community Financial, LLC and Winston 23 Corporation in 20-5315, 20-5322 [Service Date: 11/20/2020 ] [20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322] (Sun, Paul) [Entered: 11/20/2020 04:37 PM]
November 20, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1872565] filed by Paul K. Sun, Jr. and co-counsel Curtis J. Shipley, Kelly Margolis Dagger on behalf of Appellees Capital Bank Corporation, Capital Bank Financial Corporation, Capital Bank, N.A., First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank National Association, Southern Community Bank And Trust, Southern Community Financial Corporation, Southern Community Financial, LLC and Winston 23 Corporation in 20-5314, Appellants Capital Bank Corporation, Capital Bank Financial Corporation, Capital Bank, N.A., First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank National Association, Southern Community Bank And Trust, Southern Community Financial Corporation, Southern Community Financial, LLC and Winston 23 Corporation in 20-5315, 20-5322. [20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322] (Dagger, Kelly) [Entered: 11/20/2020 04:26 PM]
November 20, 2020 JOINT STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1872545] filed by F. Scott Bauer, Capital Bank Corporation, Capital Bank Financial Corporation, Capital Bank, N.A., Jeffrey T. Clark, First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank National Association, Southern Community Bank And Trust, Southern Community Financial Corporation, Southern Community Financial, LLC, Winston 23 Corporation and FDIC in 20-5314, F. Scott Bauer, Jeffrey T. Clark, FDIC and Capital Bank Corporation, Capital Bank Financial Corporation, Capital Bank, N.A., First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank National Association, Southern Community Bank And Trust, Southern Community Financial Corporation, Southern Community Financial, LLC and Winston 23 Corporation in 20-5315, F. Scott Bauer, Jeffrey T. Clark and Capital Bank Corporation, Capital Bank Financial Corporation, Capital Bank, N.A., FDIC, First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank National Association, Southern Community Bank And Trust, Southern Community Financial Corporation, Southern Community Financial, LLC and Winston 23 Corporation in 20-5322 [Service Date: 11/20/2020 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322] (Stevens, Duncan) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:46 PM]
November 20, 2020 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1872543] submitted by F. Scott Bauer, Capital Bank Corporation, Capital Bank Financial Corporation, Capital Bank, N.A., Jeffrey T. Clark, First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank National Association, Southern Community Bank And Trust, Southern Community Financial Corporation, Southern Community Financial, LLC, Winston 23 Corporation and FDIC in 20-5314, F. Scott Bauer, Jeffrey T. Clark, FDIC and Capital Bank Corporation, Capital Bank Financial Corporation, Capital Bank, N.A., First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank National Association, Southern Community Bank And Trust, Southern Community Financial Corporation, Southern Community Financial, LLC and Winston 23 Corporation in 20-5315, F. Scott Bauer, Jeffrey T. Clark and Capital Bank Corporation, Capital Bank Financial Corporation, Capital Bank, N.A., FDIC, First Horizon National Corporation, First Tennessee Bank National Association, Southern Community Bank And Trust, Southern Community Financial Corporation, Southern Community Financial, LLC and Winston 23 Corporation in 20-5322 [Service Date: 11/20/2020 ] [20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322] (Stevens, Duncan) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:41 PM]
November 20, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1872539] filed by F. Scott Bauer, Jeffrey T. Clark and FDIC in 20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322 [Service Date: 11/20/2020 ] [20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322] (Stevens, Duncan) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:36 PM]
November 20, 2020 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1872537] filed by FDIC in 20-5314 [Service Date: 11/20/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322] (Stevens, Duncan) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:32 PM]
November 20, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1872534] filed by FDIC in 20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322 [Service Date: 11/20/2020 ] [20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322] (Stevens, Duncan) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:30 PM]
November 20, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1872533] filed by FDIC in 20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322 [Service Date: 11/20/2020 ] [20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322] (Stevens, Duncan) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:29 PM]
November 20, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1872493] filed by F. Scott Bauer and Jeffrey T. Clark in 20-5322, 20-5314, 20-5315 [Service Date: 11/20/2020 ] [20-5322, 20-5314, 20-5315] (Graebe, Christopher) [Entered: 11/20/2020 02:39 PM]
November 20, 2020 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1872491] filed by F. Scott Bauer and Jeffrey T. Clark in 20-5322 [Service Date: 11/20/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-5322, 20-5314, 20-5315] (Graebe, Christopher) [Entered: 11/20/2020 02:37 PM]
November 20, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1872485] filed by F. Scott Bauer and Jeffrey T. Clark in 20-5322, 20-5314, 20-5315 [Service Date: 11/20/2020 ] [20-5322, 20-5314, 20-5315] (Graebe, Christopher) [Entered: 11/20/2020 02:31 PM]
November 20, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1872481] filed by Christopher T. Graebe on behalf of Appellants F. Scott Bauer and Jeffrey T. Clark in 20-5322, Appellees F. Scott Bauer and Jeffrey T. Clark in 20-5314, 20-5315. [20-5322, 20-5314, 20-5315] (Graebe, Christopher) [Entered: 11/20/2020 02:24 PM]
October 29, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1868853] filed consolidating cases 20-5322 (Cross-appeal started 10/29/2020) with 20-5314. Directing party to file in 20-5322 initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 11/30/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 11/30/2020 .[20-5314, 20-5315, 20-5322] [Entered: 10/29/2020 11:59 AM]
October 29, 2020 NOTICE OF CROSS-APPEAL [1868842] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-03047-RJL filed by F. Scott Bauer and Jeffrey T. Clark. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5322. [20-5322] [Entered: 10/29/2020 11:39 AM]
October 29, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5322] [Entered: 10/29/2020 11:37 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: F. Bauer, et al v. FDIC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Southern Community Financial Corporation
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Kelly Dagger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: First Horizon National Corporation
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Kelly Dagger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Southern Community Financial, LLC
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Kelly Dagger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Capital Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Kelly Dagger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Southern Community Bank And Trust
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Kelly Dagger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Capital Bank Corporation
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Kelly Dagger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Duncan Norman Stevens
Represented By: J. Scott Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Winston 23 Corporation
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Kelly Dagger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Capital Bank Financial Corporation
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Kelly Dagger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: First Tennessee Bank National Association
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Kelly Dagger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jeffrey T. Clark
Represented By: Christopher T. Graebe
Represented By: Curtis Shipley
Represented By: Kelly Dagger
Represented By: Paul Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: F. Scott Bauer
Represented By: Christopher T. Graebe
Represented By: Curtis Shipley
Represented By: Paul Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?