In re: FBOP Execution Protocol Cases
Not Yet Classified: Dustin Higgs, Bruce Webster, Anthony Battle, Orlando Hall and Jeffrey Paul
Plaintiff / Appellant: Cory Johnson, Richard Tipton, Norris G. Holder, Jr., Julius Robinson, James H. Roane, Jr., Chadrick Evan Fulks, Alfred Bourgeois and Brandon Bernard
Defendant / Appellee: Stephen M. Hahn, M.D., Commissioner of Food and Drugs, William E. Wilson, M.D., M.D., Clinical Director, U.S. Penitentiary Terre Haute, John Does, I-X, individually and in their official capacities, William P. Barr, Attorney General, T.J. Watson, Complex Warden, U.S. Penitentiary Terre Haute, Timothy J. Shea, Acting Administrator, Drug Enforcement Agency, Jeffrey E. Krueger, Regional Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons, North Central Region, United States Department of Justice, Donald W. Washington, Director, U.S. Marshals Service, Michael Carvajal, Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons and Nicole C. English, Assistant Director, Health Services, Federal Bureau of Prisons
In Re: In re: In the Matter of the Federal Bureau of Prisons' Execution Protocol Cases
Case Number: 20-5329
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 18, 2020 Summary Roane v. Barr

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 FIRST CLASS MAIL RETURNED [1874258] marked "return to sender". Mail had been sent to Attorney Mr. Matthew J. Herrington for Appellant Orlando Hall. [20-5329] [Entered: 12/03/2020 12:53 PM]
November 23, 2020 FIRST CLASS MAIL RETURNED [1873545] marked "return to sender - deceased - unable to forward". Mail had been sent to Attorney Mr. Matthew J. Herrington for Appellant Orlando Hall. [20-5329] [Entered: 11/30/2020 01:54 PM]
November 18, 2020 MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [20-5329] [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:55 PM]
November 18, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER [1871886] filed vacating Clerk order filed November 18, 2020 [ # 1871727-3 ]. The Clerk is directed to issue the mandate forthwith to the district court. Before Judges: Millett, Pillard and Rao. [20-5329] [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:52 PM]
November 18, 2020 [THIS ORDER VACATED BY ORDER OF 11/18/20]--CLERK'S ORDER [1871727] filed withholding issuance of the mandate. [20-5329]--[Edited 11/18/2020 by LMC] [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:30 AM]
November 18, 2020 OPINION [1871726] filed PER CURIAM OPINION (Pages: 27), OPINION CONCURRING IN PART AND DISSENTING IN PART (Pages: 7) by Judge Pillard, OPINION CONCURRING IN PART, CONCURRING IN THE JUDGMENT, AND DISSENTING IN PART (Pages: 11) by Judge Rao. [20-5329] [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:29 AM]
November 18, 2020 PER CURIAM JUDGMENT [1871725] filed that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause be affirmed in part, be reversed in part, and the case be remanded for further proceedings. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the emergency motion for stay of execution be denied [ # 1870637-2 ], for the reasons in the accompanying opinion . Before Judges: Millett, Pillard and Rao. [20-5329] [Entered: 11/18/2020 02:59 AM]
November 17, 2020 LETTER [1871693] pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities filed by William P. Barr, Michael Carvajal, John Does, DOJ, Nicole C. English, Stephen M. Hahn, Jeffrey E. Krueger, Timothy J. Shea, Donald W. Washington, T.J. Watson and William E. Wilson, M.D. [Service Date: 11/17/2020 ] [20-5329] (Patterson, Melissa) [Entered: 11/17/2020 05:08 PM]
November 17, 2020 LETTER [1871601] pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities filed by Brandon Bernard, Alfred Bourgeois, Chadrick Evan Fulks, Norris G. Holder, Jr., Cory Johnson, James H. Roane, Jr., Julius Robinson, Richard Tipton, Anthony Battle, Orlando Hall, Dustin Higgs, Jeffrey Paul and Bruce Webster [Service Date: 11/17/2020 ] [20-5329] (Drylewski, Alex) [Entered: 11/17/2020 12:12 PM]
November 17, 2020 LETTER [1871546] regarding request - Response to Court-Ordered Request for Information filed by William P. Barr, Michael Carvajal, John Does, DOJ, Nicole C. English, Stephen M. Hahn, Jeffrey E. Krueger, Timothy J. Shea, Donald W. Washington, T.J. Watson and William E. Wilson, M.D. [Service Date: 11/17/2020 ] [20-5329] (Patterson, Melissa) [Entered: 11/17/2020 10:00 AM]
November 16, 2020 ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Millett, Pillard and Rao. [20-5329] [Entered: 11/16/2020 04:56 PM]
November 15, 2020 APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1871222] filed by Anthony Battle, Brandon Bernard, Alfred Bourgeois, Chadrick Evan Fulks, Orlando Hall, Dustin Higgs, Norris G. Holder, Jr., Cory Johnson, Jeffrey Paul, James H. Roane, Jr., Julius Robinson, Richard Tipton and Bruce Webster [Service Date: 11/15/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,500 words. [20-5329] (Drylewski, Alex) [Entered: 11/15/2020 03:55 PM]
November 14, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER [1871220] filed scheduling oral argument on Monday, 11/16/2020 at 2:00 p.m., allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellants - 15 Minutes, Appellees - 15 Minutes. One counsel per side to argue. Before Judges: Millett, Pillard and Rao. [20-5329] [Entered: 11/14/2020 08:49 PM]
November 14, 2020 APPELLEE BRIEF [1871218] filed by William P. Barr, Michael Carvajal, John Does, DOJ, Nicole C. English, Stephen M. Hahn, Jeffrey E. Krueger, Timothy J. Shea, Donald W. Washington, T.J. Watson and William E. Wilson, M.D. [Service Date: 11/14/2020 ] Length of Brief: 12,761 Words. [20-5329] (Patterson, Melissa) [Entered: 11/14/2020 11:55 AM]
November 14, 2020 EMERGENCY REPLY [1871217] filed by Brandon Bernard and Orlando Hall to response [ # 1870997-2 ] [Service Date: 11/14/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2,580. [20-5329] (Anders, Ginger) [Entered: 11/14/2020 09:29 AM]
November 13, 2020 EMERGENCY RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1870997] to motion for other relief [ # 1870637-2 ] filed by William P. Barr, Michael Carvajal, John Does, DOJ, Nicole C. English, Stephen M. Hahn, Jeffrey E. Krueger, Timothy J. Shea, Donald W. Washington, T.J. Watson and William E. Wilson, M.D. [Service Date: 11/13/2020 by CM/ECF NDA, Email] Length Certification: 5,142 Words. [20-5329] (Patterson, Melissa) [Entered: 11/13/2020 09:44 AM]
November 11, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER [1870654] filed upon consideration of the emergency motion for stay of execution pending appeal, it is ORDERED, on the courts own motion, that appellees file a response to the motion by 10:00 a.m. on Friday, November 13, 2020, and that appellants Orlando Hall and Brandon Bernard file any reply by 10:00 a.m. on Saturday, November 14, 2020.Before Judges: Millett, Pillard and Rao. [20-5329] [Entered: 11/11/2020 02:17 PM]
November 11, 2020 JOINT APPENDIX [1870649] filed by William P. Barr, Michael Carvajal, John Does, DOJ, Nicole C. English, Stephen M. Hahn, Jeffrey E. Krueger, Timothy J. Shea, Donald W. Washington, T.J. Watson, William E. Wilson, M.D. and Anthony Battle, Brandon Bernard, Alfred Bourgeois, Chadrick Evan Fulks, Orlando Hall, Dustin Higgs, Norris G. Holder, Jr., Cory Johnson, Jeffrey Paul, James H. Roane, Jr., Julius Robinson, Richard Tipton and Bruce Webster. [Volumes: 5] [Service Date: 11/11/2020 ] [20-5329] (Drylewski, Alex) [Entered: 11/11/2020 12:18 PM]
November 11, 2020 APPELLANT BRIEF [1870648] filed by Anthony Battle, Brandon Bernard, Alfred Bourgeois, Chadrick Evan Fulks, Orlando Hall, Dustin Higgs, Norris G. Holder, Jr., Cory Johnson, Jeffrey Paul, James H. Roane, Jr., Julius Robinson, Richard Tipton and Bruce Webster [Service Date: 11/11/2020 ] Length of Brief: 11,937. [20-5329] (Drylewski, Alex) [Entered: 11/11/2020 11:58 AM]
November 11, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1870645] filed by Amy Lentz on behalf of Appellant Orlando Hall. [20-5329] (Lentz, Amy) [Entered: 11/11/2020 11:26 AM]
November 10, 2020 EMERGENCY MOTION [1870637] Stay of Execution Pending Appeal filed by Brandon Bernard and Orlando Hall (Service Date: 11/10/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 5,185 Words.. [20-5329] (Anders, Ginger) [Entered: 11/10/2020 08:23 PM]
November 9, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1870211] filed by Ginger D. Anders and co-counsel Jonathan S. Meltzer on behalf of Appellant Brandon Bernard. [20-5329] (Anders, Ginger) [Entered: 11/09/2020 09:35 AM]
November 8, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER [1870173] filed considering motion to expedite case [ # 1870105-2 ] response [ # 1870150-2 ], setting following briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 11/11/2020 by 12:00 noon. APPENDIX due 11/11/2020 by 12:00 noon. APPELLEE Brief due on 11/14/2020 by 12:00 noon. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 11/15/2020 by 4:00pm. Before Judges: Millett, Pillard and Rao. [20-5329] [Entered: 11/08/2020 01:21 PM]
November 6, 2020 RESPONSE [1870150] to motion to expedite case [ # 1870105-2 ] filed by William P. Barr, Michael Carvajal, John Does, DOJ, Nicole C. English, Stephen M. Hahn, Jeffrey E. Krueger, Timothy J. Shea, Donald W. Washington, T.J. Watson and William E. Wilson, M.D. [Service Date: 11/06/2020 by CM/ECF NDA, Email] Length Certification: 507 words. [20-5329] (Mundell, Amanda) [Entered: 11/06/2020 04:39 PM]
November 6, 2020 MOTION [1870105] to expedite case filed by Brandon Bernard, Alfred Bourgeois, Chadrick Evan Fulks, Orlando Hall, Dustin Higgs, Norris G. Holder, Jr., Cory Johnson, Jeffrey Paul, James H. Roane, Jr., Julius Robinson, Richard Tipton, Bruce Webster and Anthony Battle (Service Date: 11/06/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1,904 words. [20-5329] (Drylewski, Alex) [Entered: 11/06/2020 02:45 PM]
November 6, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1870102] filed by Alexander C. Drylewski and co-counsel Jonathan L. Marcus on behalf of Appellant Cory Johnson. [20-5329] (Drylewski, Alex) [Entered: 11/06/2020 02:29 PM]
November 6, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1870098] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/07/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 12/07/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/07/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/07/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/07/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 12/07/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 12/07/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/07/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 12/21/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 12/07/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 12/07/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/07/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 12/21/2020 [20-5329] [Entered: 11/06/2020 02:11 PM]
November 5, 2020 LETTER [1869831] sent regarding attorney membership to Joshua Christopher Toll for Anthony Battle. Application for Admission due 12/07/2020. [20-5329] [Entered: 11/05/2020 11:18 AM]
November 5, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1869830] filed by Melissa Patterson and co-counsel Amanda Mundell on behalf of Appellees William P. Barr, Michael Carvajal, John Does, DOJ, Nicole C. English, Stephen M. Hahn, Jeffrey E. Krueger, Timothy J. Shea, Donald W. Washington, T.J. Watson and William E. Wilson, M.D.. [20-5329] (Mundell, Amanda) [Entered: 11/05/2020 11:15 AM]
November 5, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1869821] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-mc-00145-TSC filed by Anthony Battle, Brandon Bernard, Alfred Bourgeois, Chadrick Evan Fulks, Dustin Higgs, Orlando Hall, Norris G. Holder, Jr., Cory Johnson, Jeffrey Paul, James H. Roane, Jr., Julius Robinson, Richard Tipton and Bruce Webster. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5329. [20-5329] [Entered: 11/05/2020 10:30 AM]
November 5, 2020 US PRISONER CASE docketed. [20-5329] [Entered: 11/05/2020 10:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: FBOP Execution Protocol Cases
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Dustin Higgs
Represented By: Matthew Christopher Lawry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Bruce Webster
Represented By: Evan Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anthony Battle
Represented By: Joshua Christopher Toll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Orlando Hall
Represented By: Matthew J. Herrington
Represented By: Amy Lentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Jeffrey Paul
Represented By: Shawn Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cory Johnson
Represented By: Alex Drylewski
Represented By: Jonathan L. Marcus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Richard Tipton
Represented By: Gerald Wesley King Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lyn Ertel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Norris G. Holder, Jr.
Represented By: Scott Matthew Wilson Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Julius Robinson
Represented By: Jonathan Aminoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James H. Roane, Jr.
Represented By: Paul Francis Enzinna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Chadrick Evan Fulks
Represented By: Shawn Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alfred Bourgeois
Represented By: Shawn Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brandon Bernard
Represented By: Ginger Anders
Represented By: Jonathan Meltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stephen M. Hahn, M.D., Commissioner of Food and Drugs
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William E. Wilson, M.D., M.D., Clinical Director, U.S. Penitentiary Terre Haute
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Does, I-X, individually and in their official capacities
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William P. Barr, Attorney General
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: T.J. Watson, Complex Warden, U.S. Penitentiary Terre Haute
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Timothy J. Shea, Acting Administrator, Drug Enforcement Agency
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeffrey E. Krueger, Regional Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons, North Central Region
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Donald W. Washington, Director, U.S. Marshals Service
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael Carvajal, Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nicole C. English, Assistant Director, Health Services, Federal Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In re: In the Matter of the Federal Bureau of Prisons' Execution Protocol Cases
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?