Richard Arnold, et al v. Secretary of the Navy, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: William C. Blair, James Looby, David S. Wilder, Rafael J. Quiles, John Gordy, Richard Arnold, Furniss Harkness, Tom Klappert, Martha Carson, Joseph E. Dufour, Denise Y. Merritt, Mary Helen Spalding, Michael Lavelle, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Alan Garner, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Armando Torralva, Michael Belt, Daniel E. Roysden, Andrew Calhoun and Timothy J. Demy
Defendant / Appellee: Secretary of the Navy, Navy Chief of Chaplains and Chief of Naval Personnel
Plaintiff / Appellee: George W. Linzey, Jairo Moreno, Rick P. Bradley and David Mitchell
Case Number: 20-5330
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1874515] filed by Richard Arnold, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Timothy J. Demy, Joseph E. Dufour, Alan Garner, John Gordy, Furniss Harkness, Tom Klappert, Michael Lavelle, James Looby, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Mary Helen Spalding, Armando Torralva and David S. Wilder [Service Date: 12/04/2020 ] [20-5330] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 12/04/2020 09:25 PM]
November 23, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1872870] filed by Richard Arnold, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Timothy J. Demy, Joseph E. Dufour, Alan Garner, John Gordy, Furniss Harkness, Tom Klappert, Michael Lavelle, James Looby, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Mary Helen Spalding, Armando Torralva and David S. Wilder [Service Date: 11/23/2020 ] [20-5330] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 11/23/2020 10:25 PM]
November 23, 2020 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1872869] submitted by Richard Arnold, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Timothy J. Demy, Joseph E. Dufour, Alan Garner, John Gordy, Furniss Harkness, Tom Klappert, Michael Lavelle, James Looby, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Mary Helen Spalding, Armando Torralva and David S. Wilder [Service Date: 11/23/2020 ] [20-5330] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 11/23/2020 10:17 PM]
November 20, 2020 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1872535] filed by Richard Arnold, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Timothy J. Demy, Joseph E. Dufour, Alan Garner, John Gordy, Furniss Harkness, Tom Klappert, Michael Lavelle, James Looby, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Mary Helen Spalding, Armando Torralva and David S. Wilder [Service Date: 11/20/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-5330] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:31 PM]
November 20, 2020 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1872521] filed by Richard Arnold, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Timothy J. Demy, Joseph E. Dufour, Alan Garner, John Gordy, Furniss Harkness, Tom Klappert, Michael Lavelle, James Looby, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Mary Helen Spalding, Armando Torralva and David S. Wilder [Service Date: 11/20/2020 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [20-5330] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:10 PM]
November 20, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1872513] filed by Richard Arnold, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Timothy J. Demy, Joseph E. Dufour, Alan Garner, John Gordy, Furniss Harkness, Tom Klappert, Michael Lavelle, James Looby, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Mary Helen Spalding, Armando Torralva and David S. Wilder [Service Date: 11/20/2020 ] [20-5330] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:05 PM]
November 20, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1872507] filed by ARTHUR A SCHULCZ SR on behalf of Appellants Richard Arnold, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Timothy J. Demy, Joseph E. Dufour, Alan Garner, John Gordy, Furniss Harkness, Tom Klappert, Michael Lavelle, James Looby, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Mary Helen Spalding, Armando Torralva and David S. Wilder. [20-5330] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:00 PM]
November 6, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1870120] filed by Chief of Naval Personnel, Navy Chief of Chaplains and Secretary of the Navy [Service Date: 11/06/2020 ] [20-5330] (Soni, Sushma) [Entered: 11/06/2020 03:25 PM]
November 5, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1869928] filed by Sushma Soni and co-counsel Marleigh D. Dover on behalf of Appellees Chief of Naval Personnel, Navy Chief of Chaplains and Secretary of the Navy. [20-5330] (Soni, Sushma) [Entered: 11/05/2020 04:18 PM]
November 5, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1869877] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/07/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 12/07/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/07/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/07/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/07/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 12/07/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 12/07/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/07/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 12/21/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 12/07/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 12/07/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/07/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 12/21/2020 [20-5330] [Entered: 11/05/2020 12:48 PM]
November 5, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1869869] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-02755-JDB filed by Richard Arnold, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Timothy J. Demy, Joseph E. Dufour, Alan Garner, John Gordy, Furniss Harkness, Tom Klappert, Michael Lavelle, James Looby, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Mary Helen Spalding, Armando Torralva and David S. Wilder. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5330. [20-5330] [Entered: 11/05/2020 12:35 PM]
November 5, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5330] [Entered: 11/05/2020 12:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Richard Arnold, et al v. Secretary of the Navy, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: William C. Blair
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James Looby
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David S. Wilder
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Rafael J. Quiles
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John Gordy
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Richard Arnold
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Furniss Harkness
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tom Klappert
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Martha Carson
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joseph E. Dufour
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Denise Y. Merritt
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mary Helen Spalding
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Lavelle
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Edith Rene Porter-Stewart
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alan Garner
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Walker E. Marsh, Jr.
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Armando Torralva
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Belt
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Daniel E. Roysden
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Andrew Calhoun
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Timothy J. Demy
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Secretary of the Navy
Represented By: Marleigh D. Dover
Represented By: Sushma Soni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Navy Chief of Chaplains
Represented By: Marleigh D. Dover
Represented By: Sushma Soni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chief of Naval Personnel
Represented By: Marleigh D. Dover
Represented By: Sushma Soni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: George W. Linzey
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jairo Moreno
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Rick P. Bradley
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: David Mitchell
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?