Manzanita Band of the Kumeyaa, et al v. Chad Wolf, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: Manzanita Band of the Kumeyaay Nation, Ewiiaapaayp Band of Kumeyaay Indians, Kumeyaay Heritage Preservation Council, Campo Kumeyaay Nation, Sycuan Band of the Kumeyaay Nation, on behalf of themselves and on behalf of their members as parens patriae and John Elliott
Plaintiff / Appellant: Iipay Nation of Santa Ysabel
Defendant / Appellee: United States Department of Homeland Security, Scott A. Spellmon, in his official capacity as Commanding General of the United States Army Corps of Engineers, Mark A. Morgan, in his official capacity as Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Commissioner of United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Army Corps of Engineers, Chad F. Wolf, in his official capacity as Under Secretary of Homeland Security for Strategy, Policy and Plans and United States Customs and Border Protection
Case Number: 20-5335
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 LETTER [1879501] pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities filed by Campo Kumeyaay Nation, John Elliott, Ewiiaapaayp Band of Kumeyaay Indians, Kumeyaay Heritage Preservation Council, Manzanita Band of the Kumeyaay Nation and Sycuan Band of the Kumeyaay Nation in 20-5333, Iipay Nation of Santa Ysabel in 20-5335 [Service Date: 01/11/2021 ] [20-5333, 20-5335] (Hampson, Colin) [Entered: 01/11/2021 09:48 PM]
January 9, 2021 LETTER [1879161] pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities filed by Campo Kumeyaay Nation, John Elliott, Ewiiaapaayp Band of Kumeyaay Indians, Kumeyaay Heritage Preservation Council, Manzanita Band of the Kumeyaay Nation, Sycuan Band of the Kumeyaay Nation and Iipay Nation of Santa Ysabel in 20-5333, 20-5335 [Service Date: 01/09/2021 ] [20-5333, 20-5335] (Hampson, Colin) [Entered: 01/09/2021 12:37 AM]
December 21, 2020 APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1876705] filed by Manzanita Band of the Kumeyaay Nation, Campo Kumeyaay Nation, Ewiiaapaayp Band of Kumeyaay Indians, Sycuan Band of the Kumeyaay Nation, John Elliott and Kumeyaay Heritage Preservation Council in 20-5333, Iipay Nation of Santa Ysabel in 20-5335 [Service Date: 12/21/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6,444 Words. [20-5333, 20-5335] (Hampson, Colin) [Entered: 12/21/2020 11:26 PM]
December 15, 2020 LETTER [1875753] sent to counsel concerning the use of uncommon acronyms and abbreviations in briefs. Nonconforming Briefs: [ # 1875732-2 ]. [20-5333, 20-5335] [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:06 AM]
December 14, 2020 APPELLEE BRIEF [1875732] filed by Mark A. Morgan, Scott A. Spellmon, United States Army Corps of Engineers, Chad F. Wolf and United States Customs and Border Protection in 20-5333, DHS, Mark A. Morgan, Scott A. Spellmon, United States Army Corps of Engineers, Chad F. Wolf and United States Customs and Border Protection in 20-5335 [Service Date: 12/14/2020 ] Length of Brief: 12,687 words. [20-5333, 20-5335] (Murphy, Anne) [Entered: 12/14/2020 11:07 PM]
December 8, 2020 AMENDED APPELLANT BRIEF [1874942] filed by Manzanita Band of the Kumeyaay Nation, Campo Kumeyaay Nation, Ewiiaapaayp Band of Kumeyaay Indians, Sycuan Band of the Kumeyaay Nation, John Elliott, Kumeyaay Heritage Preservation Council and Iipay Nation of Santa Ysabel [Service Date: 12/08/2020 ] Length of Brief: 12,994 words. [20-5333]--[Edited 12/10/2020 by AH--MODIFIED EVENT] (Hampson, Colin) [Entered: 12/08/2020 06:55 PM]
December 2, 2020 LETTER [1873948] sent to counsel concerning the use of uncommon acronyms and abbreviations in briefs. Nonconforming Briefs: [ # 1873688-2 ]. [20-5333, 20-5335] [Entered: 12/02/2020 07:15 AM]
November 30, 2020 JOINT APPENDIX [1873690] filed by Campo Kumeyaay Nation, John Elliott, Ewiiaapaayp Band of Kumeyaay Indians, Kumeyaay Heritage Preservation Council, Manzanita Band of the Kumeyaay Nation and Sycuan Band of the Kumeyaay Nation in 20-5333, Iipay Nation of Santa Ysabel in 20-5335. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 11/30/2020 ] [20-5333, 20-5335] (Hampson, Colin) [Entered: 11/30/2020 11:51 PM]
November 30, 2020 APPELLANT BRIEF [1873688] filed by Campo Kumeyaay Nation, Ewiiaapaayp Band of Kumeyaay Indians, John Elliott, Kumeyaay Heritage Preservation Council, Manzanita Band of the Kumeyaay Nation and Sycuan Band of the Kumeyaay Nation in 20-5333, Iipay Nation of Santa Ysabel in 20-5335 [Service Date: 11/30/2020 ] Length of Brief: 12952 words. [20-5333, 20-5335] (Hampson, Colin) [Entered: 11/30/2020 11:47 PM]
November 23, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER [1872824] filed denying motion for injunction pending appeal [ # 1870961-2 ] in 20-5333. Setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 11/30/2020; APPENDIX due 11/30/2020; APPELLEE Brief due on 12/14/2020; APPELLANT Reply Brief due 12/21/2020. The Clerk is directed to calendar this case for oral argument on the first appropriate date following the completion of briefing. The parties will be informed later of the date of oral argument and the composition of the merits panel. Before Judges: Millett (dissenting in part), Pillard and Rao. [20-5333, 20-5335] [Entered: 11/23/2020 04:52 PM]
November 18, 2020 REPLY [1871943] filed by Campo Kumeyaay Nation, John Elliott, Ewiiaapaayp Band of Kumeyaay Indians, Kumeyaay Heritage Preservation Council, Manzanita Band of the Kumeyaay Nation and Sycuan Band of the Kumeyaay Nation in 20-5333, Iipay Nation of Santa Ysabel in 20-5335 to response [ # 1871717-2 ] [Service Date: 11/18/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2,598 Words. [20-5333, 20-5335] (Hampson, Colin) [Entered: 11/18/2020 07:45 PM]
November 17, 2020 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1871717] to motion [ # 1870961-2 ] filed by DHS, Mark A. Morgan, Scott A. Spellmon and United States Army Corps of Engineers in 20-5333, DHS, Mark A. Morgan, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Customs and Border Protection and Chad F. Wolf in 20-5335 [Service Date: 11/17/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 5099 words. [20-5333, 20-5335] (Murphy, Anne) [Entered: 11/17/2020 07:58 PM]
November 13, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER [1871195] filed upon consideration of the emergency motion for injunction pending appeal and for expedited appeal, it is ORDERED that the government file a response to the emergency motion, not to exceed 5,200 words, by 8:00 PM on Tuesday, November 17, 2020. Any reply, not to exceed 2,600 words, is due by 8:00 PM on Wednesday, November 18, 2020. Before Judges: Millett, Pillard and Rao. [20-5333, 20-5335] [Entered: 11/13/2020 05:02 PM]
November 13, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1871167] filed consolidating cases 20-5335 (Consolidation started 11/13/2020) with 20-5333 [20-5333, 20-5335] [Entered: 11/13/2020 03:52 PM]
November 13, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1871164] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-02712-TNM filed by Iipay Nation of Santa Ysabel. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5335. [20-5335] [Entered: 11/13/2020 03:51 PM]
November 13, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5335] [Entered: 11/13/2020 03:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Manzanita Band of the Kumeyaa, et al v. Chad Wolf, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Manzanita Band of the Kumeyaay Nation
Represented By: Colin Cloud Hampson
Represented By: Whitney A. Leonard
Represented By: Frank Sharp Holleman IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ewiiaapaayp Band of Kumeyaay Indians
Represented By: Colin Cloud Hampson
Represented By: Whitney A. Leonard
Represented By: Frank Sharp Holleman IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kumeyaay Heritage Preservation Council
Represented By: Colin Cloud Hampson
Represented By: Whitney A. Leonard
Represented By: Frank Sharp Holleman IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Campo Kumeyaay Nation
Represented By: Colin Cloud Hampson
Represented By: Whitney A. Leonard
Represented By: Frank Sharp Holleman IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sycuan Band of the Kumeyaay Nation, on behalf of themselves and on behalf of their members as parens patriae
Represented By: Colin Cloud Hampson
Represented By: Whitney A. Leonard
Represented By: Frank Sharp Holleman IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: John Elliott
Represented By: Colin Cloud Hampson
Represented By: Whitney A. Leonard
Represented By: Frank Sharp Holleman IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Iipay Nation of Santa Ysabel
Represented By: Colin Cloud Hampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: Anne M. Murphy
Represented By: Katherine Twomey Allen
Represented By: Scott R. McIntosh
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark Esquire Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scott A. Spellmon, in his official capacity as Commanding General of the United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: Anne M. Murphy
Represented By: Katherine Twomey Allen
Represented By: Scott R. McIntosh
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark Esquire Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mark A. Morgan, in his official capacity as Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Commissioner of United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: Anne M. Murphy
Represented By: Katherine Twomey Allen
Represented By: Scott R. McIntosh
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark Esquire Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: Anne M. Murphy
Represented By: Katherine Twomey Allen
Represented By: Scott R. McIntosh
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark Esquire Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chad F. Wolf, in his official capacity as Under Secretary of Homeland Security for Strategy, Policy and Plans
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: Anne M. Murphy
Represented By: Katherine Twomey Allen
Represented By: Scott R. McIntosh
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark Esquire Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: Anne M. Murphy
Represented By: Katherine Twomey Allen
Represented By: Scott R. McIntosh
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark Esquire Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?