Federal Express Corporation v. COMM, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Nazak Nikakhtar, in her official capacity as Assistant Secretary for Industry and Analysis, as well as her successors and assigns, Bureau of Industry and Security, United States Department of Commerce, Bureau of Industry and Security and Wilbur Ross, in his official capacity as Secretary of Commerce, as well as his successors and assigns, U.S. Department of Commerce
Plaintiff / Appellant: Federal Express Corporation
Case Number: 20-5337
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1879733] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 02/22/2021. APPENDIX due 02/22/2021. APPELLEE Brief due on 03/24/2021. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 04/14/2021 [20-5337] [Entered: 01/12/2021 05:27 PM]
December 16, 2020 STATEMENT [1876078] with Disclosure Listing filed by Federal Express Corporation [Service Date: 12/16/2020 ] [20-5337] (Bellan, Maurice) [Entered: 12/16/2020 06:30 PM]
December 16, 2020 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1876075] submitted by Federal Express Corporation [Service Date: 12/16/2020 ] [20-5337] (Bellan, Maurice) [Entered: 12/16/2020 06:07 PM]
December 16, 2020 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1876073] filed by Federal Express Corporation [Service Date: 12/16/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-5337] (Bellan, Maurice) [Entered: 12/16/2020 05:31 PM]
December 16, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1876072] filed by Federal Express Corporation [Service Date: 12/16/2020 ] [20-5337] (Bellan, Maurice) [Entered: 12/16/2020 05:23 PM]
December 16, 2020 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1876071] filed by Federal Express Corporation [Service Date: 12/16/2020 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [20-5337] (Bellan, Maurice) [Entered: 12/16/2020 05:13 PM]
December 16, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1876070] filed by Federal Express Corporation [Service Date: 12/16/2020 ] [20-5337] (Bellan, Maurice) [Entered: 12/16/2020 05:03 PM]
December 16, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1876069] filed by Federal Express Corporation [Service Date: 12/16/2020 ] [20-5337] (Bellan, Maurice) [Entered: 12/16/2020 05:01 PM]
December 16, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1876068] filed by Maurice Bellan and co-counsel Michael Pollard, Graham Cronogue on behalf of Appellant Federal Express Corporation. [20-5337] (Bellan, Maurice) [Entered: 12/16/2020 04:58 PM]
December 16, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1876043] filed by COMM, Wilbur Ross, Bureau of Industry and Security and Nazak Nikakhtar [Service Date: 12/16/2020 ] [20-5337] (Aguilar, Daniel) [Entered: 12/16/2020 03:58 PM]
December 1, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1873884] filed by Daniel Aguilar and co-counsel Sharon Swingle on behalf of Appellees COMM, Wilbur Ross, Bureau of Industry and Security and Nazak Nikakhtar. [20-5337] (Aguilar, Daniel) [Entered: 12/01/2020 04:10 PM]
November 19, 2020 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1872166] filed by Federal Express Corporation [Service Date: 11/19/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-5337] (Cronogue, Graham) [Entered: 11/19/2020 04:13 PM]
November 19, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1872163] filed by Graham R. Cronogue and co-counsel Graham R. Cronogue on behalf of Appellant Federal Express Corporation. [20-5337] (Cronogue, Graham) [Entered: 11/19/2020 04:10 PM]
November 16, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1871346] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/16/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 12/16/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/16/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/16/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/16/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 12/16/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 12/16/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/16/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 12/31/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 12/16/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 12/16/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/16/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 12/31/2020 [20-5337] [Entered: 11/16/2020 12:40 PM]
November 16, 2020 LETTER [1871345] sent regarding attorney membership to Maurice Albert Bellan for Federal Express Corporation. Application for Admission due 12/16/2020. [20-5337] [Entered: 11/16/2020 12:39 PM]
November 16, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1871342] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-01840-JDB filed by Federal Express Corporation. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5337. [20-5337] [Entered: 11/16/2020 12:38 PM]
November 16, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5337] [Entered: 11/16/2020 12:37 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Federal Express Corporation v. COMM, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nazak Nikakhtar, in her official capacity as Assistant Secretary for Industry and Analysis, as well as her successors and assigns, Bureau of Industry and Security
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Daniel J. Aguilar
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Commerce
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Daniel J. Aguilar
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bureau of Industry and Security
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Daniel J. Aguilar
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Wilbur Ross, in his official capacity as Secretary of Commerce, as well as his successors and assigns, U.S. Department of Commerce
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Daniel J. Aguilar
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: Maurice Albert Bellan
Represented By: Michael A. Pollard
Represented By: Maurice Bellan
Represented By: Graham Robert Cronogue Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?