James Bucholz v. Steven Mnuchin, et al
Defendant / Appellee: United States Department of the Treasury, Darryl J. Jenkins, Internal Revenue Service, Tonya Williams-Wallace, United States of America, Steven T. Mnuchin, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of the Treasury and Charles Rettig, in his official capacity as Commissioner of the United States Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff / Appellant: James S. Bucholz
Case Number: 20-5338
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 NOTICE [1876265] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for payment of docketing fee [Case Number 20-5338: Fee Paid] [20-5338] [Entered: 12/18/2020 09:47 AM]
December 14, 2020 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1875586] filed by James S. Bucholz [Service Date: 12/14/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-5338] [Entered: 12/14/2020 11:04 AM]
December 11, 2020 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1875587] submitted by James S. Bucholz [Service Date: 12/14/2020 ] [20-5338] [Entered: 12/14/2020 11:05 AM]
December 11, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES and CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1875584] filed by James S. Bucholz [Service Date: 12/14/2020 ] [20-5338] [Entered: 12/14/2020 11:03 AM]
December 11, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1875583] filed by James S. Bucholz [Service Date: 12/14/2020 ] [20-5338] [Entered: 12/14/2020 11:02 AM]
December 11, 2020 LETTER [1875581] filed by James S. Bucholz [Service Date: 12/14/2020 ] [20-5338] [Entered: 12/14/2020 11:01 AM]
December 11, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1875580] filed by James S. Bucholz. [20-5338] [Entered: 12/14/2020 11:00 AM]
December 2, 2020 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1874320] received from Unreadable [signed for on 11/23/2020] for order [1871465-2] sent to Appellant James S. Bucholz [20-5338] [Entered: 12/03/2020 04:59 PM]
November 20, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1872281] filed by IRS, Darryl J. Jenkins, Steven T. Mnuchin, TREA, USA and Tonya Williams-Wallace [Service Date: 11/20/2020 ] [20-5338] (Lyon, Kathleen) [Entered: 11/20/2020 09:48 AM]
November 20, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1872278] filed by Kathleen E. Lyon on behalf of Appellees IRS, Darryl J. Jenkins, Steven T. Mnuchin, Charles Rettig, TREA, USA and Tonya Williams-Wallace. [20-5338] (Lyon, Kathleen) [Entered: 11/20/2020 09:41 AM]
November 16, 2020 CERTIFIED MAIL and FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1871465] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7017 3040 0001 1261 1703] of order [ # 1871390-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 12/16/2020 from James S. Bucholz. [20-5338] [Entered: 11/16/2020 04:54 PM]
November 16, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1871390] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/16/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 12/16/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/16/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/16/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/16/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 12/16/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 12/16/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/16/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 12/31/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 12/16/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 12/16/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/16/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 12/31/2020. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [20-5338] [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:06 PM]
November 16, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1871377] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 12/16/2020. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [20-5338] [Entered: 11/16/2020 01:37 PM]
November 16, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1871370] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-01730-ABJ filed by James S. Bucholz. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5338. [20-5338] [Entered: 11/16/2020 01:22 PM]
November 16, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5338] [Entered: 11/16/2020 01:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: James Bucholz v. Steven Mnuchin, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of the Treasury
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Kathleen E. Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Darryl J. Jenkins
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Kathleen E. Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Kathleen E. Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tonya Williams-Wallace
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Kathleen E. Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States of America
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Kathleen E. Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Steven T. Mnuchin, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of the Treasury
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Kathleen E. Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Charles Rettig, in his official capacity as Commissioner of the United States Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Kathleen E. Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James S. Bucholz
Represented By: James S. Bucholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?