In re: FBOP Execution Protocol Cases
Plaintiff / Appellee: Richard Tipton, Brandon Bernard, Chadrick Evan Fulks, Norris G. Holder, Jr., Julius Robinson, James H. Roane, Jr., Alfred Bourgeois and Cory Johnson
Not Yet Classified: Jeffrey Paul, Orlando Hall, Bruce Webster, Anthony Battle and Dustin Higgs
Defendant / Appellant: Jeffrey E. Krueger, Regional Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons, North Central Region, Timothy J. Shea, Acting Administrator, Drug Enforcement Agency, Nicole C. English, Assistant Director, Health Services, Federal Bureau of Prisons, United States Department of Justice, Donald W. Washington, Director, U.S. Marshals Service, Michael Carvajal, Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons, John Does, I-X, individually and in their official capacities, William P. Barr, Attorney General, Stephen M. Hahn, M.D., Commissioner of Food and Drugs, William E. Wilson, M.D., M.D., Clinical Director, U.S. Penitentiary Terre Haute and T.J. Watson, Complex Warden, U.S. Penitentiary Terre Haute
In Re: In re: In the Matter of the Federal Bureau of Prisons' Execution Protocol Cases
Case Number: 20-5345
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [20-5345] [Entered: 12/11/2020 08:30 AM]
December 11, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1875335] filed granting motion to dismiss case as moot [ # 1872587-2 ], issuing mandate [20-5345] [Entered: 12/11/2020 08:23 AM]
November 23, 2020 NOTICE [1873287] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court denying emergency motion for an order denied as moot [20-5345] [Entered: 11/25/2020 02:17 PM]
November 20, 2020 MOTION [1872587] to dismiss case as moot (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/30/2020) filed by William P. Barr, Michael Carvajal, John Does, DOJ, Nicole C. English, Stephen M. Hahn, Jeffrey E. Krueger, Timothy J. Shea, Donald W. Washington, T.J. Watson and William E. Wilson, M.D. (Service Date: 11/20/2020 by CM/ECF NDA, Email) Length Certification: 147 words. [20-5345] (Mundell, Amanda) [Entered: 11/20/2020 05:51 PM]
November 19, 2020 EMERGENCY REPLY [1872218] filed by William P. Barr, Michael Carvajal, John Does, DOJ, Nicole C. English, Stephen M. Hahn, Jeffrey E. Krueger, Timothy J. Shea, Donald W. Washington, T.J. Watson and William E. Wilson, M.D. to response [ # 1872214-2 ] [Service Date: 11/19/2020 by CM/ECF NDA, Email] Length Certification: 755 words. [20-5345] (Patterson, Melissa) [Entered: 11/19/2020 09:44 PM]
November 19, 2020 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1872214] to motion to vacate [ # 1872207-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1872207-3 ] filed by Orlando Hall [Service Date: 11/19/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2137 words. [20-5345] (Lentz, Amy) [Entered: 11/19/2020 08:45 PM]
November 19, 2020 EMERGENCY MOTION [1872207] to to stay underlying order in case or vacate filed by William P. Barr, Michael Carvajal, John Does, DOJ, Nicole C. English, Stephen M. Hahn, Jeffrey E. Krueger, Timothy J. Shea, Donald W. Washington, T.J. Watson and William E. Wilson, M.D. (Service Date: 11/19/2020 by CM/ECF NDA, Email) Length Certification: 3,165 words. [20-5345]--[RELIEF ADDED--Edited 11/19/2020 by LMC] (Patterson, Melissa) [Entered: 11/19/2020 06:42 PM]
November 19, 2020 PER CURIAM ORDER [1872196] filed directing appellants file any motion for emergency relief by 6:45 p.m. on Thursday, November 19, 2020, that appellees file a response to the motion by 8:45 p.m. on Thursday, November 19, 2020, and that appellants file any reply by 9:45 p.m. on Thursday, November 19, 2020. Before Judges: Millett, Pillard and Rao. [20-5345] [Entered: 11/19/2020 05:43 PM]
November 19, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1872184] filed by Melissa N. Patterson and co-counsel Amanda L. Mundell on behalf of Appellants William P. Barr, Michael Carvajal, John Does, DOJ, Nicole C. English, Stephen M. Hahn, Jeffrey E. Krueger, Timothy J. Shea, Donald W. Washington, T.J. Watson and William E. Wilson, M.D.. [20-5345] (Mundell, Amanda) [Entered: 11/19/2020 05:01 PM]
November 19, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1872180] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-mc-00145-TSC filed by William P. Barr, Michael Carvajal, John Does, Nicole C. English, Stephen M. Hahn, Jeffrey E. Krueger, Timothy J. Shea, DOJ, Donald W. Washington, T.J. Watson and William E. Wilson, M.D.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5345. [20-5345] [Entered: 11/19/2020 04:53 PM]
November 19, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5345] [Entered: 11/19/2020 04:49 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: FBOP Execution Protocol Cases
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Richard Tipton
Represented By: Jeffrey Lyn Ertel
Represented By: Gerald Wesley King Esquire Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Brandon Bernard
Represented By: Ginger Anders
Represented By: Jonathan Meltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Chadrick Evan Fulks
Represented By: Shawn Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Norris G. Holder, Jr.
Represented By: Scott Matthew Wilson Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Julius Robinson
Represented By: Jonathan Aminoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James H. Roane, Jr.
Represented By: Paul Francis Enzinna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Alfred Bourgeois
Represented By: Shawn Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Cory Johnson
Represented By: Alex Drylewski
Represented By: Jonathan L. Marcus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Jeffrey Paul
Represented By: Shawn Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Orlando Hall
Represented By: Matthew J. Herrington
Represented By: Amy Lentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Bruce Webster
Represented By: Evan Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anthony Battle
Represented By: Joshua Christopher Toll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Dustin Higgs
Represented By: Matthew Christopher Lawry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Jeffrey E. Krueger, Regional Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons, North Central Region
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Timothy J. Shea, Acting Administrator, Drug Enforcement Agency
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Nicole C. English, Assistant Director, Health Services, Federal Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Donald W. Washington, Director, U.S. Marshals Service
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Michael Carvajal, Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: John Does, I-X, individually and in their official capacities
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: William P. Barr, Attorney General
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Stephen M. Hahn, M.D., Commissioner of Food and Drugs
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: William E. Wilson, M.D., M.D., Clinical Director, U.S. Penitentiary Terre Haute
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: T.J. Watson, Complex Warden, U.S. Penitentiary Terre Haute
Represented By: Amanda Mundell
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In re: In the Matter of the Federal Bureau of Prisons' Execution Protocol Cases
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?