William Turnbull, et al v. SSA, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: William Tran, David Cohen, Helen Witts, Andrew Pettigrew, Rick Lester, Goretti Dillon, Celia Adams, Alison Barnes, Allan Papworth, Kenneth Griffith, Carole Altman, Richard Posner, Isabel Drew, Janet Turnbull, Paul Wareham, Janet McKennell, David Witts, Carol Gillen, Alan Coates, Andrew Gilmour, Alain Merkel, Anthony Jones, Rodney Martin Lunt, Jean Gonsette, Maureen Pettigrew, Isabella Gilmour, John Adams, Stephen Drew, Inger Simonsen, Evangelos Pezas, William Turnbull, Barbara Legge and Rosemary Papworth
Defendant / Appellee: Andrew Saul, in his official capacity as Commissioner of the Social Security Administration and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 20-5365
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1878860] filed by Celia Adams, John Adams, Carole Altman, Alison Barnes, Alan Coates, David Cohen, Goretti Dillon, Isabel Drew, Stephen Drew, Carol Gillen, Andrew Gilmour, Isabella Gilmour, Jean Gonsette, Kenneth Griffith, Anthony Jones, Barbara Legge, Rick Lester, Rodney Martin Lunt, Janet McKennell, Alain Merkel, Allan Papworth, Rosemary Papworth, Andrew Pettigrew, Maureen Pettigrew, Evangelos Pezas, Richard Posner, Inger Simonsen, William Tran, Janet Turnbull, William Turnbull, Paul Wareham, David Witts and Helen Witts [Service Date: 01/07/2021 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [20-5365] (Bruce, Jonathan) [Entered: 01/07/2021 12:28 PM]
January 7, 2021 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1878859] filed by Celia Adams, John Adams, Carole Altman, Alison Barnes, Alan Coates, David Cohen, Goretti Dillon, Isabel Drew, Stephen Drew, Carol Gillen, Andrew Gilmour, Isabella Gilmour, Jean Gonsette, Kenneth Griffith, Anthony Jones, Barbara Legge, Rick Lester, Rodney Martin Lunt, Janet McKennell, Alain Merkel, Allan Papworth, Rosemary Papworth, Andrew Pettigrew, Maureen Pettigrew, Evangelos Pezas, Richard Posner, Inger Simonsen, William Tran, Janet Turnbull, William Turnbull, Paul Wareham, David Witts and Helen Witts [Service Date: 01/07/2021 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [20-5365] (Bruce, Jonathan) [Entered: 01/07/2021 12:26 PM]
January 7, 2021 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1878858] submitted by Celia Adams, John Adams, Carole Altman, Alison Barnes, Alan Coates, David Cohen, Goretti Dillon, Isabel Drew, Stephen Drew, Carol Gillen, Andrew Gilmour, Isabella Gilmour, Jean Gonsette, Kenneth Griffith, Anthony Jones, Barbara Legge, Rick Lester, Rodney Martin Lunt, Janet McKennell, Alain Merkel, Allan Papworth, Rosemary Papworth, Andrew Pettigrew, Maureen Pettigrew, Evangelos Pezas, Richard Posner, Inger Simonsen, William Tran, Janet Turnbull, William Turnbull, Paul Wareham, David Witts and Helen Witts [Service Date: 01/07/2021 ] [20-5365] (Bruce, Jonathan) [Entered: 01/07/2021 12:25 PM]
January 7, 2021 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1878856] filed by Celia Adams, John Adams, Carole Altman, Alison Barnes, Alan Coates, David Cohen, Goretti Dillon, Isabel Drew, Stephen Drew, Carol Gillen, Andrew Gilmour, Isabella Gilmour, Jean Gonsette, Kenneth Griffith, Anthony Jones, Barbara Legge, Rick Lester, Rodney Martin Lunt, Janet McKennell, Alain Merkel, Allan Papworth, Rosemary Papworth, Andrew Pettigrew, Maureen Pettigrew, Evangelos Pezas, Richard Posner, Inger Simonsen, William Tran, Janet Turnbull, William Turnbull, Paul Wareham, David Witts and Helen Witts [Service Date: 01/07/2021 ] [20-5365] (Bruce, Jonathan) [Entered: 01/07/2021 12:24 PM]
January 7, 2021 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1878855] filed by Celia Adams, John Adams, Carole Altman, Alison Barnes, Alan Coates, David Cohen, Goretti Dillon, Isabel Drew, Stephen Drew, Carol Gillen, Andrew Gilmour, Isabella Gilmour, Jean Gonsette, Kenneth Griffith, Anthony Jones, Barbara Legge, Rick Lester, Rodney Martin Lunt, Janet McKennell, Alain Merkel, Allan Papworth, Rosemary Papworth, Andrew Pettigrew, Maureen Pettigrew, Evangelos Pezas, Richard Posner, Inger Simonsen, William Tran, Janet Turnbull, William Turnbull, Paul Wareham, David Witts and Helen Witts [Service Date: 01/07/2021 ] [20-5365] (Bruce, Jonathan) [Entered: 01/07/2021 12:23 PM]
January 7, 2021 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1878853] filed by Celia Adams, John Adams, Carole Altman, Alison Barnes, Alan Coates, David Cohen, Goretti Dillon, Isabel Drew, Stephen Drew, Carol Gillen, Andrew Gilmour, Isabella Gilmour, Jean Gonsette, Kenneth Griffith, Anthony Jones, Barbara Legge, Rick Lester, Rodney Martin Lunt, Janet McKennell, Alain Merkel, Allan Papworth, Rosemary Papworth, Andrew Pettigrew, Maureen Pettigrew, Evangelos Pezas, Richard Posner, Inger Simonsen, William Tran, Janet Turnbull, William Turnbull, Paul Wareham, David Witts and Helen Witts [Service Date: 01/07/2021 ] [20-5365] (Bruce, Jonathan) [Entered: 01/07/2021 12:22 PM]
January 7, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1878852] filed by Jonathan M. Bruce on behalf of Appellants Celia Adams, John Adams, Carole Altman, Alison Barnes, Alan Coates, David Cohen, Goretti Dillon, Isabel Drew, Stephen Drew, Carol Gillen, Andrew Gilmour, Isabella Gilmour, Jean Gonsette, Kenneth Griffith, Anthony Jones, Barbara Legge, Rick Lester, Rodney Martin Lunt, Janet McKennell, Alain Merkel, Allan Papworth, Rosemary Papworth, Andrew Pettigrew, Maureen Pettigrew, Evangelos Pezas, Richard Posner, Inger Simonsen, William Tran, Janet Turnbull, William Turnbull, Paul Wareham, David Witts and Helen Witts. [20-5365] (Bruce, Jonathan) [Entered: 01/07/2021 12:20 PM]
December 18, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1876382] filed by SSA and Andrew Saul [Service Date: 12/18/2020 ] [20-5365] (Soni, Sushma) [Entered: 12/18/2020 03:24 PM]
December 15, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1875888] filed by Sushma Soni and co-counsel Alisa B. Klein on behalf of Appellees SSA and Andrew Saul. [20-5365] (Soni, Sushma) [Entered: 12/15/2020 04:21 PM]
December 10, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1875190] filed by Johnny Walker and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of Appellees SSA and Andrew Saul. [20-5365] (Walker, Johnny) [Entered: 12/10/2020 09:50 AM]
December 8, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1874929] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 01/07/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 01/07/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 01/07/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 01/07/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 01/07/2021. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 01/07/2021. APPELLANT transcript status report due 01/07/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 01/07/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 01/22/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 01/07/2021. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 01/07/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 01/07/2021. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 01/22/2021 [20-5365] [Entered: 12/08/2020 04:59 PM]
December 8, 2020 NOTICE [1874927] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for payment of docketing fee [Case Number 20-5365: Fee Paid] [20-5365] [Entered: 12/08/2020 04:58 PM]
December 8, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1874925] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:16-cv-01750-TJK filed by Celia Adams, John Adams, Carole Altman, Alison Barnes, Alan Coates, David Cohen, Goretti Dillon, Isabel Drew, Stephen Drew, Carol Gillen, Andrew Gilmour, Isabella Gilmour, Jean Gonsette, Kenneth Griffith, Anthony Jones, Barbara Legge, Rick Lester, Rodney Martin Lunt, Janet McKennell, Alain Merkel, Allan Papworth, Rosemary Papworth, Andrew Pettigrew, Maureen Pettigrew, Evangelos Pezas, Richard Posner, Inger Simonsen, William Tran, Janet Turnbull, William Turnbull, Paul Wareham, David Witts and Helen Witts. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5365. [20-5365] [Entered: 12/08/2020 04:56 PM]
December 8, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5365] [Entered: 12/08/2020 04:37 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: William Turnbull, et al v. SSA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: William Tran
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Cohen
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Helen Witts
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Andrew Pettigrew
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Rick Lester
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Goretti Dillon
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Celia Adams
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alison Barnes
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Allan Papworth
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kenneth Griffith
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Carole Altman
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Richard Posner
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Isabel Drew
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Janet Turnbull
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Paul Wareham
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Janet McKennell
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Witts
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Carol Gillen
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alan Coates
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Andrew Gilmour
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alain Merkel
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Anthony Jones
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Rodney Martin Lunt
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jean Gonsette
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Maureen Pettigrew
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Isabella Gilmour
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John Adams
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Stephen Drew
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Inger Simonsen
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Evangelos Pezas
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: William Turnbull
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Barbara Legge
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Rosemary Papworth
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andrew Saul, in his official capacity as Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Alisa B. Klein
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker III
Represented By: Sushma Soni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Social Security Administration
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Alisa B. Klein
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker III
Represented By: Sushma Soni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?