Las Americas Immigrant Advoca, et al v. Alejandro Mayorkas, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: K.M.V., and their minor child F.B.G.C., B.G.R., and her minor children, D.M.F.G., B.C.F.G., J.M.F.G., and S.F.G., L.E.R.D., minor child, D.M.F.G., minor child, Las Americas Immigrant Advocacy Center, B.C.F.G., minor child, J.M.F.G., minor child, F.B.G.C., minor child, A.S.C.R., and their minor child F.B.G.C., A.R.R.D., and her minor child, L.E.R.D. and S.F.G., minor child
Defendant / Appellee: Gloria Chavez, in her official capacity, Border Patrol Sector Chief, El Paso, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, in his official capacity, Acting Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad F. Wolf, in his official capacity, Acting Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Todd C. Owen, in his official capacity, Executive Assistant Commissioner of the Office of Field Operations for U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Hector A. Mancha, Jr., in his official capacity, U.S. Customs and Border Protection Director of Field Operations, El Paso, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Justice, Mark A. Morgan, in his official capacity, Acting Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Jeffrey Rosen, in his official capacity as Acting Attorney General of the United States, Monty Wilkinson, in his official capacity as Acting Attorney General of the United States and Alejandro N. Mayorkas, in his official capacity, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 20-5386
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1879132] filed holding case in abeyance. Case 20-5386 held in abeyance pending decision in 1:19cv3640-KBJ from U.S. District Court. The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order to the district court. [20-5386] [Entered: 01/08/2021 04:28 PM]
January 8, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1879121] filed vacating Clerk order initial submissions for appellant/petitioner [ # 1878275-2 ]; vacating Clerk order initial submissions for appellee/respondent [ # 1878275-3 ]; vacating Clerk order [ # 1878275-4 ] [20-5386] [Entered: 01/08/2021 03:36 PM]
January 4, 2021 [THIS ORDER VACATED BY ORDER OF 01/08/21]--CLERK'S ORDER [1878275] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 02/03/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 02/03/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 02/03/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 02/03/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 02/03/2021. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 02/03/2021. APPELLANT transcript status report due 02/03/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 02/03/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 02/18/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 02/03/2021. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 02/03/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 02/03/2021. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 02/18/2021 [20-5386]--[Edited 01/08/2021 by LMC] [Entered: 01/04/2021 01:12 PM]
December 30, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1878259] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-03640-KBJ filed by A.R.R.D., A.S.C.R., B.G.R., B.C.F.G. B.c.f.g., D.M.F.G., F.B.G.C., J.M.F.G., K.M.V., L.E.R.D., Las Americas Immigrant Advocacy Center and S.F.G.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5386. [20-5386] [Entered: 01/04/2021 12:50 PM]
December 30, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5386] [Entered: 01/04/2021 12:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Las Americas Immigrant Advoca, et al v. Alejandro Mayorkas, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: K.M.V., and their minor child F.B.G.C.
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: B.G.R., and her minor children, D.M.F.G., B.C.F.G., J.M.F.G., and S.F.G.
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: L.E.R.D., minor child
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: D.M.F.G., minor child
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Las Americas Immigrant Advocacy Center
Represented By: Scott Matthew Michelman
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: B.C.F.G., minor child
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J.M.F.G., minor child
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: F.B.G.C., minor child
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: A.S.C.R., and their minor child F.B.G.C.
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: A.R.R.D., and her minor child, L.E.R.D.
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: S.F.G., minor child
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gloria Chavez, in her official capacity, Border Patrol Sector Chief, El Paso
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kenneth T Cuccinelli, II, in his official capacity, Acting Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chad F. Wolf, in his official capacity, Acting Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Todd C. Owen, in his official capacity, Executive Assistant Commissioner of the Office of Field Operations for U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Hector A. Mancha, Jr., in his official capacity, U.S. Customs and Border Protection Director of Field Operations, El Paso
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mark A. Morgan, in his official capacity, Acting Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeffrey Rosen, in his official capacity as Acting Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Monty Wilkinson, in his official capacity as Acting Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alejandro N. Mayorkas, in his official capacity, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?