Joshua Atchley, et al v. Astrazeneca UK Limited, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Astrazeneca UK Limited, GE Healthcare USA Holding LLC, Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Enterprises Sarl, Janssen Ortho LLC, Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC, Johnson & Johnson, GE Medical Systems Information Technologies GMBH, F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd., Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc., CILAG GMBH International, Ortho Biologics LLC, Genentech, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Middle East) Inc., GE Medical Systems Information Technologies, Inc., Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC, Hoffmann-La Roche Inc., AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Ethicon, Inc. and Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V.
Plaintiff / Appellant: Victoria Capra, Billy Johnson, Leasa Dollar, Esther Tate, Bobby Emory, Rachel Lee, Mark Capra, Brian Beaumont, Michael Adam Emory, Mark Dammann, All Plaintiffs, Joanna Capra, Bridget Juneau, Emily Capra, Robert Kugler, Joshua Atchley, Julia-Anne Capra, Dempsey Bennett, Jacob Harbin, Donielle Edwards, John Aragon, Sr., Sharon Capra, Jimmy Connolly, Sally Chand, Drew Edwards, Brandeaux Campbell, Brenda Chand, Anthony Capra, Sr., Chistina Mahon, Jacob Capra, Kara Connelly, Jean Dammann, Tanya Evrard, A. C., a minor, J. C., a minor, Amy Ritchie, Maria De La Luz Villa, Kathy Kugler, Angie Capra, Joseph Capra, Danielle Capra, S. C., a minor, Elissa Atchley, Ryan Chand, Kevin Connelly, Elijah Harbin, Sarah Johnson, Melissa Doheny, Eugene Delozier, Michael Chand, Jr. and Michael Capra
Case Number: 20-7077
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1866469] filed by Patrick J. Carome and co-counsel David W. Bowker on behalf of Appellees Genentech, Inc. and Hoffmann-La Roche Inc.. [20-7077] (Carome, Patrick) [Entered: 10/15/2020 01:29 PM]
October 2, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1864606] filed by Neil H. MacBride and co-counsel Kenneth L. Wainstein on behalf of Appellees AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP and Astrazeneca UK Limited. [20-7077] (Wainstein, Kenneth) [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:43 PM]
September 21, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1862682] filed by Neil H. MacBride and co-counsel Paul S. Mishkin on behalf of Appellees AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP and Astrazeneca UK Limited. [20-7077] (MacBride, Neil) [Entered: 09/21/2020 06:58 PM]
September 21, 2020 JOINT STATEMENT [1862677] with Disclosure Listing filed by Astrazeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, GE Healthcare USA Holding LLC, GE Medical Systems Information Technologies, Inc., GE Medical Systems Information Technologies GMBH, Johnson & Johnson, CILAG GMBH International, Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., Johnson & Johnson (Middle East) Inc., Ortho Biologics LLC, Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Enterprises Sarl, Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC, Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc., F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd., Genentech, Inc. and Hoffmann-La Roche Inc. [Service Date: 09/21/2020 ] [20-7077] (Shanmugam, Kannon) [Entered: 09/21/2020 06:32 PM]
September 21, 2020 JOINT CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1862675] filed by Astrazeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, GE Healthcare USA Holding LLC, GE Medical Systems Information Technologies, Inc., GE Medical Systems Information Technologies GMBH, Johnson & Johnson, CILAG GMBH International, Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., Johnson & Johnson (Middle East) Inc., Ortho Biologics LLC, Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Enterprises Sarl, Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC, Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc., F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd., Genentech, Inc. and Hoffmann-La Roche Inc. [Service Date: 09/21/2020 ] [20-7077] (Shanmugam, Kannon) [Entered: 09/21/2020 06:29 PM]
September 21, 2020 JOINT ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1862670] filed by Kannon K. Shanmugam and co-counsel Jeh C. Johnson and Stacie M. Fahsel on behalf of Appellees Johnson & Johnson, CILAG GMBH International, Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., Johnson & Johnson (Middle East) Inc. and Ortho Biologics LLC. [20-7077] (Shanmugam, Kannon) [Entered: 09/21/2020 05:55 PM]
September 21, 2020 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1862649] filed by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 09/21/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-7077] (Branson, Joshua) [Entered: 09/21/2020 05:24 PM]
September 21, 2020 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1862642] filed by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 09/21/2020 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [20-7077] (Branson, Joshua) [Entered: 09/21/2020 05:21 PM]
September 21, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1862635] filed by Beth S. Brinkmann and co-counsel John E. Hall, David M. Zionts on behalf of Appellee F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd.. [20-7077] (Brinkmann, Beth) [Entered: 09/21/2020 05:10 PM]
September 21, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1862632] filed by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 09/21/2020 ] [20-7077] (Branson, Joshua) [Entered: 09/21/2020 05:05 PM]
September 21, 2020 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1862628] submitted by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 09/21/2020 ] [20-7077] (Branson, Joshua) [Entered: 09/21/2020 05:02 PM]
September 21, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1862626] filed by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 09/21/2020 ] [20-7077] (Branson, Joshua) [Entered: 09/21/2020 04:59 PM]
September 21, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1862624] filed by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 09/21/2020 ] [20-7077] (Branson, Joshua) [Entered: 09/21/2020 04:55 PM]
September 21, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1862621] filed by Joshua D. Branson and co-counsel David C. Frederick, Andrew E. Goldsmith on behalf of Appellant All Plaintiffs. [20-7077] (Branson, Joshua) [Entered: 09/21/2020 04:51 PM]
September 21, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1862501] filed by John B. Bellinger III and co-counsel David J. Weiner, R. Reeves Anderson on behalf of Appellees GE Healthcare USA Holding LLC, GE Medical Systems Information Technologies GMBH and GE Medical Systems Information Technologies, Inc.. [20-7077] (Bellinger, John) [Entered: 09/21/2020 12:07 PM]
September 21, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1862488] filed by Lisa S. Blatt and co-counsel Christopher N. Manning, Brian T. Gilmore on behalf of Appellees Pfizer Enterprises Sarl, Pfizer Inc., Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC, Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC and Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc.. [20-7077] (Manning, Christopher) [Entered: 09/21/2020 11:37 AM]
August 21, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1857802] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 09/21/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 09/21/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 09/21/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 09/21/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 09/21/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 09/21/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 09/21/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 09/21/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 10/05/2020. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 09/21/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 09/21/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 09/21/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 10/05/2020 [20-7077] [Entered: 08/21/2020 05:44 PM]
August 21, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1857797] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-02136-RJL filed by All Plaintiffs. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-7077. [20-7077] [Entered: 08/21/2020 05:33 PM]
August 21, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-7077] [Entered: 08/21/2020 05:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Joshua Atchley, et al v. Astrazeneca UK Limited, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Astrazeneca UK Limited
Represented By: Neil Harvey MacBride
Represented By: Paul Mishkin
Represented By: Kenneth L. Wainstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GE Healthcare USA Holding LLC
Represented By: John B. Bellinger III
Represented By: Robert Reeves Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC
Represented By: Christopher Nicholas Manning Esquire
Represented By: Brian T. Gilmore
Represented By: Lisa Schiavo Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Nicholas Manning Esquire
Represented By: Brian T. Gilmore
Represented By: Lisa Schiavo Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Pfizer Enterprises Sarl
Represented By: Christopher Nicholas Manning Esquire
Represented By: Brian T. Gilmore
Represented By: Lisa Schiavo Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Janssen Ortho LLC
Represented By: Alex Young Kyong Oh
Represented By: Stacie Marion Fahsel Esquire
Represented By: Jeh Charles Johnson
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Christopher Nicholas Manning Esquire
Represented By: Brian T. Gilmore
Represented By: Lisa Schiavo Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Alex Young Kyong Oh
Represented By: Stacie Marion Fahsel Esquire
Represented By: Jeh Charles Johnson
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GE Medical Systems Information Technologies GMBH
Represented By: John B. Bellinger III
Represented By: Robert Reeves Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd.
Represented By: Beth S. Brinkmann
Represented By: David Meir Zionts
Represented By: John Edward Hall Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Nicholas Manning Esquire
Represented By: Brian T. Gilmore
Represented By: Lisa Schiavo Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CILAG GMBH International
Represented By: Alex Young Kyong Oh
Represented By: Stacie Marion Fahsel Esquire
Represented By: Jeh Charles Johnson
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ortho Biologics LLC
Represented By: Alex Young Kyong Oh
Represented By: Stacie Marion Fahsel Esquire
Represented By: Jeh Charles Johnson
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Genentech, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J. Carome
Represented By: David William Bowker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Johnson & Johnson (Middle East) Inc.
Represented By: Alex Young Kyong Oh
Represented By: Stacie Marion Fahsel Esquire
Represented By: Jeh Charles Johnson
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GE Medical Systems Information Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: John B. Bellinger III
Represented By: Robert Reeves Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC
Represented By: Alex Young Kyong Oh
Represented By: Stacie Marion Fahsel Esquire
Represented By: Jeh Charles Johnson
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Hoffmann-La Roche Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J. Carome
Represented By: David William Bowker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP
Represented By: Neil Harvey MacBride
Represented By: Paul Mishkin
Represented By: Kenneth L. Wainstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Alex Young Kyong Oh
Represented By: Stacie Marion Fahsel Esquire
Represented By: Jeh Charles Johnson
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V.
Represented By: Alex Young Kyong Oh
Represented By: Stacie Marion Fahsel Esquire
Represented By: Jeh Charles Johnson
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Victoria Capra
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Billy Johnson
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Leasa Dollar
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Esther Tate
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bobby Emory
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Rachel Lee
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mark Capra
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brian Beaumont
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Adam Emory
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mark Dammann
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joanna Capra
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bridget Juneau
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Emily Capra
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robert Kugler
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joshua Atchley
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Julia-Anne Capra
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Dempsey Bennett
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jacob Harbin
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Donielle Edwards
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John Aragon, Sr.
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sharon Capra
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jimmy Connolly
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sally Chand
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Drew Edwards
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brandeaux Campbell
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brenda Chand
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Anthony Capra, Sr.
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Chistina Mahon
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jacob Capra
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kara Connelly
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jean Dammann
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tanya Evrard
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: A. C., a minor
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J. C., a minor
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Amy Ritchie
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Maria De La Luz Villa
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kathy Kugler
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Angie Capra
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joseph Capra
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Danielle Capra
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: S. C., a minor
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Elissa Atchley
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ryan Chand
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kevin Connelly
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Elijah Harbin
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sarah Johnson
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Melissa Doheny
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Eugene Delozier
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Chand, Jr.
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Capra
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Joshua D. Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?