Robert Weissman, et al v. Nat'l Railroad Passenger Corp
Plaintiff / Appellant: Robert Weissman and Patrick D. Llewellyn
Defendant / Appellee: National Railroad Passenger Corporation, doing business as Amtrak
Case Number: 20-7081
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 STATEMENT [1864120] with Disclosure Listing filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation [Service Date: 09/30/2020 ] [20-7081] (Amunson, Jessica) [Entered: 09/30/2020 01:31 PM]
September 28, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1863729] filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation [Service Date: 09/28/2020 ] [20-7081] (Amunson, Jessica) [Entered: 09/28/2020 03:08 PM]
September 28, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1863726] filed by Jessica Ring Amunson and co-counsel Noah B. Bokat-Lindell on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation. [20-7081] (Amunson, Jessica) [Entered: 09/28/2020 03:06 PM]
September 28, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1863725] filed by Jessica Ring Amunson and co-counsel Noah B. Bokat-Lindell on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation. [20-7081] (Amunson, Jessica) [Entered: 09/28/2020 03:04 PM]
September 11, 2020 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1861088] filed by Patrick D. Llewellyn and Robert Weissman [Service Date: 09/11/2020 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [20-7081] (Joshi, Nandan) [Entered: 09/11/2020 03:21 PM]
September 11, 2020 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1861087] submitted by Patrick D. Llewellyn and Robert Weissman [20-7081] (Joshi, Nandan) [Entered: 09/11/2020 03:20 PM]
September 11, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1861085] filed by Patrick D. Llewellyn and Robert Weissman [Service Date: 09/11/2020 ] [20-7081] (Joshi, Nandan) [Entered: 09/11/2020 03:20 PM]
September 11, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1861084] filed by Patrick D. Llewellyn and Robert Weissman [Service Date: 09/11/2020 ] [20-7081] (Joshi, Nandan) [Entered: 09/11/2020 03:19 PM]
September 11, 2020 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1861083] filed by Patrick D. Llewellyn and Robert Weissman [Service Date: 09/11/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-7081] (Joshi, Nandan) [Entered: 09/11/2020 03:18 PM]
September 11, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1861082] filed by Patrick D. Llewellyn and Robert Weissman [Service Date: 09/11/2020 ] [20-7081] (Joshi, Nandan) [Entered: 09/11/2020 03:17 PM]
September 11, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1861079] filed by Nandan M. Joshi and co-counsel Allison M. Zieve, Scott L. Nelson on behalf of Appellants Patrick D. Llewellyn and Robert Weissman. [20-7081] (Joshi, Nandan) [Entered: 09/11/2020 03:15 PM]
August 31, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1859080] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 09/30/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 09/30/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 09/30/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 09/30/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 09/30/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 09/30/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 09/30/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 09/30/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 10/15/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 09/30/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 09/30/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 09/30/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 10/15/2020 [20-7081] [Entered: 08/31/2020 02:48 PM]
August 31, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1859078] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-00028-TJK filed by Patrick D. Llewellyn and Robert Weissman. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-7081. [20-7081] [Entered: 08/31/2020 02:46 PM]
August 31, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-7081] [Entered: 08/31/2020 02:45 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Robert Weissman, et al v. Nat'l Railroad Passenger Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robert Weissman
Represented By: Allison M. Zieve
Represented By: Nandan M. Joshi
Represented By: Scott Lawrence Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Patrick D. Llewellyn
Represented By: Allison M. Zieve
Represented By: Nandan M. Joshi
Represented By: Scott Lawrence Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: National Railroad Passenger Corporation, doing business as Amtrak
Represented By: Jessica Ring Amunson
Represented By: Noah Bokat-Lindell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?