Theodore Wesby, et al v. DC, et al
Defendant / Appellee: District of Columbia, Andre Parker, Officer - Metropolitan Police Department, in both his official and individual capacities, J. Newman, Officer - Metropolitan Police Department, in both his official and individual capacities, Anthony Campanale, Officer - Metropolitan Police Department, in both his official and individual capacities, Edwin Espinosa, Officer - Metropolitan Police Department, in both his official and individual capacities and Faraz Khan, Officer - Metropolitan Police Department, in both his official and individual capacities
Plaintiff / Appellant: Sidney A. Banks, Jr., Alissa Cole, James Davis, Stanley Richardson, Gary Gordon, Lynn Warwick Taylor, Joseph Mayfield, Jr., Anthony Maurice Hood, Owen Gayle, Theodore Wesby, Natasha Chittams, Shanjah Hunt, Juan C. Willis, Clarence Baldwin and Brittany C. Stribling
Plaintiff / Appellee: Antoinette Colbert, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ethelbert D. Louis
Interested Party: Gregory L. Lattimer
Case Number: 20-7117
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1885921] filed by Stacy L. Anderson on behalf of Appellees DC, Anthony Campanale and Andre Parker. [20-7117] (Anderson, Stacy) [Entered: 02/18/2021 09:53 AM]
February 1, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1883016] filed granting appellants' unopposed motion to establish briefing deadlines [ # 1880980-2 ], setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 03/15/2021. APPENDIX due 03/15/2021. APPELLEE Brief due on 04/14/2021. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 04/28/2021 [20-7117] [Entered: 02/01/2021 11:41 AM]
January 21, 2021 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1881136] filed by Anthony Campanale, DC and Andre Parker [Service Date: 01/21/2021 ] [20-7117] (Schifferle, Carl) [Entered: 01/21/2021 04:46 PM]
January 21, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1881132] filed by Carl J. Schifferle and co-counsel Caroline S. Van Zile, Loren L. AliKhan on behalf of Appellees DC, Anthony Campanale and Andre Parker. [20-7117] (Schifferle, Carl) [Entered: 01/21/2021 04:43 PM]
January 21, 2021 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1880980] to establish briefing schedule filed by Clarence Baldwin, Sidney A. Banks, Jr., Natasha Chittams, Alissa Cole, James Davis, Owen Gayle, Gary Gordon, Anthony Maurice Hood, Shanjah Hunt, Joseph Mayfield, Jr., Stanley Richardson, Brittany C. Stribling, Lynn Warwick Taylor, Theodore Wesby and Juan C. Willis [Service Date: 01/21/2021 ] Length Certification: 209 words. [20-7117] (Francois, Aderson) [Entered: 01/21/2021 12:44 PM]
January 21, 2021 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1880914] filed by Clarence Baldwin, Sidney A. Banks, Jr., Natasha Chittams, Alissa Cole, James Davis, Owen Gayle, Gary Gordon, Anthony Maurice Hood, Shanjah Hunt, Joseph Mayfield, Jr., Stanley Richardson, Brittany C. Stribling, Lynn Warwick Taylor, Theodore Wesby and Juan C. Willis [Service Date: 01/21/2021 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-7117] (Francois, Aderson) [Entered: 01/21/2021 10:59 AM]
January 21, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1880913] filed by Aderson Francois on behalf of Appellants Clarence Baldwin, Sidney A. Banks, Jr., Natasha Chittams, Alissa Cole, James Davis, Owen Gayle, Gary Gordon, Anthony Maurice Hood, Shanjah Hunt, Joseph Mayfield, Jr., Stanley Richardson, Brittany C. Stribling, Lynn Warwick Taylor, Theodore Wesby and Juan C. Willis. [20-7117] (Francois, Aderson) [Entered: 01/21/2021 10:56 AM]
January 21, 2021 CONSENT STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1880912] filed by Clarence Baldwin, Sidney A. Banks, Jr., Natasha Chittams, Alissa Cole, James Davis, Owen Gayle, Gary Gordon, Anthony Maurice Hood, Shanjah Hunt, Joseph Mayfield, Jr., Stanley Richardson, Brittany C. Stribling, Lynn Warwick Taylor, Theodore Wesby and Juan C. Willis [Service Date: 01/21/2021 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [20-7117] (Francois, Aderson) [Entered: 01/21/2021 10:54 AM]
January 21, 2021 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1880910] submitted by Clarence Baldwin, Sidney A. Banks, Jr., Natasha Chittams, Alissa Cole, James Davis, Owen Gayle, Gary Gordon, Anthony Maurice Hood, Shanjah Hunt, Joseph Mayfield, Jr., Stanley Richardson, Brittany C. Stribling, Lynn Warwick Taylor, Theodore Wesby and Juan C. Willis [Service Date: 01/21/2021 ] [20-7117] (Francois, Aderson) [Entered: 01/21/2021 10:47 AM]
January 21, 2021 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1880908] filed by Clarence Baldwin, Sidney A. Banks, Jr., Natasha Chittams, Alissa Cole, James Davis, Owen Gayle, Gary Gordon, Anthony Maurice Hood, Shanjah Hunt, Joseph Mayfield, Jr., Stanley Richardson, Brittany C. Stribling, Lynn Warwick Taylor, Theodore Wesby and Juan C. Willis [Service Date: 01/21/2021 ] [20-7117] (Francois, Aderson) [Entered: 01/21/2021 10:45 AM]
January 21, 2021 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1880907] filed by Clarence Baldwin, Sidney A. Banks, Jr., Natasha Chittams, Alissa Cole, James Davis, Owen Gayle, Gary Gordon, Anthony Maurice Hood, Shanjah Hunt, Joseph Mayfield, Jr., Stanley Richardson, Brittany C. Stribling, Lynn Warwick Taylor, Theodore Wesby and Juan C. Willis [Service Date: 01/21/2021 ] [20-7117] (Francois, Aderson) [Entered: 01/21/2021 10:43 AM]
January 21, 2021 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1880905] filed by Clarence Baldwin, Sidney A. Banks, Jr., Natasha Chittams, Alissa Cole, James Davis, Owen Gayle, Gary Gordon, Anthony Maurice Hood, Shanjah Hunt, Joseph Mayfield, Jr., Stanley Richardson, Brittany C. Stribling, Lynn Warwick Taylor, Theodore Wesby and Juan C. Willis [Service Date: 01/21/2021 ] [20-7117] (Francois, Aderson) [Entered: 01/21/2021 10:39 AM]
December 21, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1876623] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 01/21/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 01/21/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 01/21/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 01/21/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 01/21/2021. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 01/21/2021. APPELLANT transcript status report due 01/21/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 01/21/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 02/04/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 01/21/2021. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 01/21/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 01/21/2021. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 02/04/2021 [20-7117] [Entered: 12/21/2020 03:20 PM]
December 21, 2020 LETTER [1876604] sent regarding attorney membership to Suvita Melehy for Antoinette Colbert. Application for Admission due 01/21/2021. [20-7117] [Entered: 12/21/2020 01:58 PM]
December 21, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1876600] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:09-cv-00501-RC filed by Clarence Baldwin, Sidney A. Banks, Natasha Chittams, Alissa Cole, James Davis, Owen Gayle, Gary Gordon, Anthony Maurice Hood, Shanjah Hunt, Joseph Mayfield, Stanley Richardson, Brittany C. Stribling, Lynn Warwick Taylor, Theodore Wesby and Juan C. Willis. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-7117. [20-7117] [Entered: 12/21/2020 01:52 PM]
December 21, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-7117] [Entered: 12/21/2020 01:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Theodore Wesby, et al v. DC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: District of Columbia
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Represented By: Stacy Anderson
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Represented By: Carl James Schifferle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andre Parker, Officer - Metropolitan Police Department, in both his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Represented By: Stacy Anderson
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Represented By: Carl James Schifferle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. Newman, Officer - Metropolitan Police Department, in both his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anthony Campanale, Officer - Metropolitan Police Department, in both his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Represented By: Stacy Anderson
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Represented By: Carl James Schifferle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Edwin Espinosa, Officer - Metropolitan Police Department, in both his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Faraz Khan, Officer - Metropolitan Police Department, in both his official and individual capacities
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sidney A. Banks, Jr.
Represented By: Aderson B. Francois Esquire
Represented By: Aderson Francois Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alissa Cole
Represented By: Aderson B. Francois Esquire
Represented By: Aderson Francois Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James Davis
Represented By: Aderson B. Francois Esquire
Represented By: Aderson Francois Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Stanley Richardson
Represented By: Aderson B. Francois Esquire
Represented By: Aderson Francois Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gary Gordon
Represented By: Aderson B. Francois Esquire
Represented By: Aderson Francois Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lynn Warwick Taylor
Represented By: Aderson B. Francois Esquire
Represented By: Aderson Francois Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joseph Mayfield, Jr.
Represented By: Aderson B. Francois Esquire
Represented By: Aderson Francois Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Anthony Maurice Hood
Represented By: Aderson B. Francois Esquire
Represented By: Aderson Francois Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Owen Gayle
Represented By: Aderson B. Francois Esquire
Represented By: Aderson Francois Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Theodore Wesby
Represented By: Aderson B. Francois Esquire
Represented By: Aderson Francois Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Natasha Chittams
Represented By: Aderson B. Francois Esquire
Represented By: Aderson Francois Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shanjah Hunt
Represented By: Aderson B. Francois Esquire
Represented By: Aderson Francois Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Juan C. Willis
Represented By: Aderson B. Francois Esquire
Represented By: Aderson Francois Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Clarence Baldwin
Represented By: Aderson B. Francois Esquire
Represented By: Aderson Francois Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brittany C. Stribling
Represented By: Aderson B. Francois Esquire
Represented By: Aderson Francois Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Antoinette Colbert, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ethelbert D. Louis
Represented By: Suvita Melehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Gregory L. Lattimer
Represented By: Gregory L. Lattimer Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?