Vincent Lucas v. FCC, et al
Petitioner: Vincent Lucas
Respondent: United States of America and Federal Communications Commission
Case Number: 21-1099
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1893512] filed by Matthew J. Dunne and co-counsel Jacob M. Lewis on behalf of Respondent FCC. [21-1099] (Dunne, Matthew) [Entered: 04/07/2021 10:58 AM]
April 6, 2021 CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1893435] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7017 3040 0001 1261 3370] of order [ # 1893434-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 05/06/2021 from Vincent Lucas. [21-1099] [Entered: 04/06/2021 04:53 PM]
April 6, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1893434] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 05/06/2021. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 05/06/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 05/06/2021. PETITIONER underlying decision due 05/06/2021. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 05/06/2021. PETITIONER procedural motions due 05/06/2021. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 05/21/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 05/06/2021. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 05/06/2021. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 05/21/2021. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 05/21/2021. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to petitioner by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [21-1099] [Entered: 04/06/2021 04:32 PM]
April 6, 2021 CERTIFIED COPY [1893429] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1893426-2 ] [21-1099] [Entered: 04/06/2021 04:15 PM]
April 1, 2021 MOTION [1893428] to permit pro se electronic filing status filed by Vincent Lucas [Service Date: 04/06/2021 ] Length Certification: 2 pages. [21-1099] [Entered: 04/06/2021 04:14 PM]
April 1, 2021 PETITION FOR REVIEW [1893426] of a decision by federal agency filed by Vincent Lucas [Service Date: 04/06/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Not Applicable to this Party. [21-1099] [Entered: 04/06/2021 04:12 PM]
April 1, 2021 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [21-1099] [Entered: 04/06/2021 04:09 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Vincent Lucas v. FCC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Communications Commission
Represented By: Matthew Joel Dunne
Represented By: Jacob M. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vincent Lucas
Represented By: Vincent Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?