National Railroad Passenger v. Southeastern Pennsylvania
Plaintiff / Appellee: National Railroad Passenger Corporation, doing business as Amtrak
Defendant / Appellant: Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority
Case Number: 21-7021
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1895939] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 06/07/2021. APPELLEE & CROSS-APPELLANT Brief due 07/07/2021. APPELLANT REPLY & CROSS-APPELLEE Brief due 08/06/2021. CROSS-APPELLANT Reply Brief due 08/27/2021. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 09/03/2021. Final Briefs due 09/17/2021. [21-7021, 21-7024] [Entered: 04/26/2021 10:38 AM]
April 19, 2021 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1895171] filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation in 21-7024, 21-7021 [Service Date: 04/19/2021 ] [21-7024, 21-7021] (Marotta, Sean) [Entered: 04/19/2021 06:58 PM]
April 19, 2021 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1895170] filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation in 21-7024, 21-7021 [Service Date: 04/19/2021 ] [21-7024, 21-7021] (Marotta, Sean) [Entered: 04/19/2021 06:54 PM]
April 6, 2021 CORRECTED UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1893436] submitted by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority in 21-7021, 21-7024 [Service Date: 04/06/2021 ] [21-7021, 21-7024] (Pilsk, W.) [Entered: 04/06/2021 04:58 PM]
April 5, 2021 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1893207] filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation in 21-7021, 21-7024 [Service Date: 04/05/2021 ] [21-7021, 21-7024] (Marotta, Sean) [Entered: 04/05/2021 05:52 PM]
April 5, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1893205] filed by W. Eric Pilsk and co-counsel Charles A. Spitulnik, Paul A. Cunningham, Neill Kling on behalf of Appellant Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority in 21-7021, Appellee Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority in 21-7024. [21-7021, 21-7024] (Pilsk, W.) [Entered: 04/05/2021 05:28 PM]
April 5, 2021 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1893204] submitted by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority in 21-7021, 21-7024 [21-7021, 21-7024] (Pilsk, W.) [Entered: 04/05/2021 05:25 PM]
April 5, 2021 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1893203] filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority [Service Date: 04/05/2021 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [21-7021] (Pilsk, W.) [Entered: 04/05/2021 05:24 PM]
April 5, 2021 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1893202] filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority in 21-7021, 21-7024 [Service Date: 04/05/2021 ] [21-7021, 21-7024] (Pilsk, W.) [Entered: 04/05/2021 05:18 PM]
April 5, 2021 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1893201] filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority in 21-7021, 21-7024 [Service Date: 04/05/2021 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [21-7021, 21-7024] (Pilsk, W.) [Entered: 04/05/2021 05:17 PM]
April 5, 2021 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1893200] filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority in 21-7021, 21-7024 [Service Date: 04/05/2021 ] [21-7021, 21-7024] (Pilsk, W.) [Entered: 04/05/2021 05:16 PM]
April 5, 2021 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1893199] filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority in 21-7021, 21-7024 [Service Date: 04/05/2021 ] [21-7021, 21-7024] (Pilsk, W.) [Entered: 04/05/2021 05:14 PM]
March 25, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1891687] filed by Sean Marotta and co-counsel Catherine E. Stetson on behalf of Appellant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. [21-7024] (Marotta, Sean) [Entered: 03/25/2021 12:24 PM]
March 25, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1891686] filed by Sean Marotta and co-counsel Catherine E. Stetson on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation. [21-7021] (Marotta, Sean) [Entered: 03/25/2021 12:21 PM]
March 18, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1890543] filed consolidating cases 21-7024 (Cross-appeal started 03/18/2021) with 21-7021; directing party to file in 21-7024 initial submissions: CROSS-APPELLANT docketing statement due 04/19/2021. CROSS-APPELLANT statement of issues due 04/19/2021 [21-7021, 21-7024] [Entered: 03/18/2021 03:03 PM]
March 4, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1888428] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 04/05/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 04/05/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 04/05/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 04/05/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 04/05/2021. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 04/05/2021. APPELLANT transcript status report due 04/05/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 04/05/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 04/19/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 04/05/2021. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 04/05/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 04/05/2021. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 04/19/2021 [21-7021] [Entered: 03/04/2021 04:06 PM]
March 4, 2021 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1888425] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-00537-TNM filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-7021. [21-7021] [Entered: 03/04/2021 04:03 PM]
March 4, 2021 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [21-7021] [Entered: 03/04/2021 03:55 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: National Railroad Passenger v. Southeastern Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: National Railroad Passenger Corporation, doing business as Amtrak
Represented By: Neil K. Gilman
Represented By: Sean Marotta
Represented By: Catherine Emily Stetson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority
Represented By: Paul A. Cunningham Esquire
Represented By: W. Eric Pilsk
Represented By: Charles Alan Spitulnik Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?