Keith Allen, et al v. DC
Plaintiff / Appellant: Keith Allen, Wanda Gertrude Allen, Keith Dominick Allen, a minor by his mother and next friend; in her own behalf and as next friend K.D.A., Lashell Laura Gaskins, in her own behalf and as next friend of T.D.G., Twanna Jones, in her own behalf and as next friend of D.M.J., Marion Janine Mcdowell, in her own behalf and as next friend as D.C.M., Eugene Isaac, Jr., a minor by his mother and next friend, Dorothy James, Dorothy James, in her own behalf and as next friend of of E.I., Jr., Verta Jean Bradley, In here own behalf, and a mother and next friend of Lakesha Nicole Bradley, Kevin Darnell Wingfield, a minor by his mother and next friend, Priscilla Elizabeth Greene, Priscilla Elizabeth Greene, in her own behalf, Lisa Ann Thomas, Next friend and Mother of minor A.T.T., Angela Lajuan Adams, in her own behalf and as next friend of T.R.A, Jr., Gloria Jean Barnes, in her own behalf and as next friend J.L.B., Alberta Bates, in her own behalf and as next friend C.B., J.M.B., and V.A.B., Rachel Lynn Bennett, in her own behalf and as next friend J.T.B., Margaret Boney, in her own behalf and as next friend A.I.B., Terry Ann Perkins, in her own behalf and as next friend R.J.B., Walermonera Calleo, in his own behalf and as next friend K.K.C., Loretta Carswell, in her own behalf and as next friend D.P.C., Deborah Clark, in her own behalf and as next friend A.M.C., Shanticka Anicka Curtis-Walker, in her own behalf and as next friend R.D.C.W., Shante Patrice Nelson, in her own behalf and as next friend N.M.D. and R.L.D., Misha Brenita Jefferson, in her own behalf and as next friend D.A.D., Minnie Lee Elliott, in her own behalf and as next friend of D.P.E. and M.E., Cynthia Tiana Farley-Johnson, in her own behalf and as next friend of M.D.F., Cleo Cherise Jones, in her own behalf and as next friend of M.S.F., Nichelle Regina Green, in her own behalf and as next friend R-S.C.G/M., Sjontelle Grimes, in her behalf and as next friend S.G., Carolyn Anita Hopkins, in her own behalf and as next friend of A.J.H., Robyn Michelle Jamison, in her own behalf and as next friend M.J.J., Carolyn Denise Jenkins, in her own behalf and as next friend of M.L.J., Kendra Louise Jenkins, in her won behalf and as next friend of K.A.J., Roy Delante Johnson, in her own behalf, Lameshea Denise Jordan, in her own behalf and as next friend of J.D.J., Laprea Michelle Lewis, in her own behalf and as next friend of M.R.L., Lashawn Tawanda Logan, in her own behalf and as next friend of D.D.L., Peggy Jean Collins, in her own behalf and as next friend of J.A.L., Felecia Ernestine Marbury, in her own behalf and as next friend as M.A.M., Martina Gabriella Mathis, in her own behalf, Lakieta Niahole Mcrae, in her own behalf and as next friend of D.D.M., Gwendolyn Mitchell, in her own behalf and as next friend of D.A.M., Andrew Markles Moore, in his own behalf, Julian Rashid Smith, in his own behalf, Polly Diana Davis, in her own behalf and as next friend of P.D.N., Erica Latrice Perkins, in her own behalf, Antionette Shaw, in her own behalf and as next friend of S.M.S., Dalonda Marchell Stevens, in her own behalf and as next friend of T.A.S., Geraldine Quander Thompson, in her own behalf and as next friend of R.J.T., Devan Michelle Abraham, by next friend Ruth LaJuene Morgan, Ruth Lajuene Morgan, in her own behalf, Steve Anthony Adams, by next friend Brenda Diane Adams, Brenda Diana Adams, in her own behalf, Lorenzo Turhan Adams, by next friend, Brenda Diane Adams, Jarreau Anthony, Kellie Olga Barnes, by next friend Calvin Wilbert Barnes, Calvin Wilbert Barnes, in his own behalf, Damon Allen Barr, by next friend Geneva Mae Barr, Geneva Mae Barr, in her own behalf, Shawnica Danielle Barr, by next friend Geneva Mae Barr, Emmanuel Jose Benton, Mario Benton, by next friend Joyce Elaine Benton, Joyce Elaine Benton, in her own behalf, Demetrius Lorenzo Best, Dimitri James Boykins, by next friend Priscilla Vanessa Boykins, Priscilla Vanessa Boykins, in her own behalf, Deandre William Brannon, by next friend Shelia Ruth Chambers, Shelia Ruth Chambers, in her own behalf, Paula Annelle Braxton, by next friend Alanda Maria Miles, Alanda Maria Miles, in her own behalf, Delon'ta Lewis Brooks, by next friend Detrica Lynnette Brooks, Detrica Lynnette Brooks, in her own behalf, Larry Donte Brown, by next friend Gracie Christy Brown, Gracie Christy Brown, in her own behalf, Delante Derek Buchanan, by next friend Melvina Eleanora Buchanan, Melvina Eleanora Buchanan, in her own behalf and as mother and next friend of JD, a minor, Khrystina Leslie Buckhanan, by next friend Cherris Esther Buckhanan, Cherris Esther Buckhanan, in her own behalf, Maurice Ulysses Bundy, by next friend Venetta Bundy, Venetta Bundy, in her own behalf, Teairra Tolanda Bundy, by next friend Venetta Bundy, Maurice Cunningham Burden, Ronnie Jamil Burton, Jessica Latisha Butler, by next friend Cheryl Felicia Evans, Cheryl Felicia Evans, in her own behalf, Wesley Aellan Chambers, by next friend Shelia Ruth Chambers, Patricia Howard Chittams, in her own behalf, William Justin Chittams, by next friend Patricia Howard Chittams, Dwight Leon Coleman, by next friend Nevelene Coleman, Nevelene Coleman, in her own behalf, Pearl Ann Coleman, by next friend Nevelene Coleman, Larry Darnell Cooper, Jr., by next friend Angela Marie Braxton, Angela Marie Braxton, in her own behalf, Christopher Brice Cotton, by next friend Debra Elizabeth Muse, Debra Elizabeth Muse, in her own behalf, Bryand Anthony Daniel, by next friend Betty Lou Daniel, Betty Lou Daniel, in her own behalf, Dejohn Andre Daniel, Delonta Daniel, by next friend Betty Lou Daniel, Chontell Janeva Davis, by next friend Kay Williams Davis, Kay Williams Davis, in her own behalf, Shaun Edward Davis, Eric James Ari Douglas, Candice Raichelle Downing, by next friend Mary Delores Downing, Mary Delores Downing, in her own behalf, Juwan Gerald Downing, by next friend Mary Delores Downing, Devon Antonio Felder, by next friend Rhonnetta Theresa Felder, Rhonette Theresa Felder, in her own behalf, Cameron Harrison Gilbert, by next friend Calvin Harold Gilbert, Calvin Harold Gilbert, in his own behalf and as father and next friend of CG, a minor, Morgan Camille Gilbert, by next friend Calvin Harold Gilbert, Kim Donnida Gooden, in her own behalf, Lakeshia Chanel Gooden, by next friend Kim Donnida Gooden, Cynthia Delois Gray, by next friend Cynthia Ann Gray, Cynthia Ann Gray, in her own behalf, Gilbert Michael Gray, by next friend Julia Ann Gray, Gregory Adam Gray, by next friend Julia Ann Gray, Isaac Theodore Gray, by next friend Julia Ann Gray, Julia Ann Gray, in her own behalf, Julia Yvette Gray, by next friend Julia Ann Gray, Paris Ann Gray, by next friend Julia Ann Gray, Phillip Morris Gray, by next friend Cynthia Ann Gray, Shawnta Ltonya Gray, by next friend Julia Ann Gray, Brandyn Terrell Green, by next friend Denise Rosha Green, Denise Rosha Green, in her own behalf, Diamond Ja'nae Green, by next friend Ada Inex Green, Pamela Annette Deneal, in her own behalf, Ada Inex Green, in her own behalf, Shana Jewan Guy, by next friend Wanda Guy, Wanda Guy, in her own behalf, Tiffany Michelle Hagwood, Crystal Gwendolyn Hailstorks, by next friend Trina Hailstorks, Jamal Anthony Hailstorks, by next friend Shermonta Hailstorks, Shermonta Hailstorks, in her own behalf, Trina Hailstorks, in her own behalf, Asiah Shaumika Brenda Hawkins, by next friend Latisha Maryum Thomas, Chanelle Donise Hodge, by next friend Charnita Delores Hodge, Charnita Delores Hodge, in her own behalf, Jeanette Denise Huston, Michael Berven Huston, Geraldine Ingram, in her own behalf and as mother and next friend of JI, a minor, James Ingram, by next friend Geraldine Ingram, Latissha Isby, Cameron Nashae Jackson, by next friend LaVerne Wiley, Darlene Denise Jackson, in her own behalf, Ericka Monique Jackson, by next friend Darlene Denise Jackson, Jean Robert Jean-Baptiste, by next friend Sandra Jean Morris, Christopher Marcus Johnson, by next friend Pamela Annette DeNeal, Treyvon Marcque Johnson, by next friend Ugenia Mae Johnson, Ugenia Mae Johnson, Kennika Antionette Jones, by next friend Twanna Jones, Sandra Jean Morris, in her own behalf, Latisha Maryum Thomas, in her own behalf, Laverne Wiley, in her own behalf, Janeise Tomika Archie, mother and next friend of ML, a minor, C. B., a minor, by his mother and next friend Alberta Bates, J. L. B., a minor, by his mother and next friend Gloria Jean Barnes, J. B., a minor, by his mother and next friend Alberta Bates, T. B., a minor, by his mother and next friend Roberta Gray Randolph, Helen Louise Brandon, mother and next friend of MR, a minor, A. C., a minor, by his mother and next friend Deborah Clark, J. D., a minor, by his mother and next friend Melvina Eleanora Buchanan, M. E., a minor, by his mother and next friend Minnie Lee Elliott, C. G., a minor, by his father and next friend Calvin Harold Gilbert, R. G., a minor, by his mother and next friend Nichelle Regina Green, Janet Anita Graves, mother and next friend of MW, a minor, Michelle Regina Green, mother and next friend of RG, a minor, A. I., a minor, by his mother and next friend Pamela Michelle Isaacs, J. I., a minor, by his mother and next friend Geraldine Ingram, Pamela Michelle Isaacs, mother and next friend of AI, a minor, C. J., a minor, K. J., a minor, by his mother and next friend Kendra Louise Jenkins, M. J., a minor, by his mother and next friend Crolyn Denise Jenkins, N. J., a minor, by his mother and next friend Jackie Rhames Michell, M. L., a minor, by his mother and next friend Janeise Tomika Archie, Jackie Rhames Michell, mother and next friend of NJ, a minor, P. N., a minor, by his mother and next friend Polly Diana Davis, M. R., a minor, by his mother and next friend Helen Louise Brandon, Ernestine Randolph, mother and next friend of JW and SW, minors, Roberta Gray Randolph, mother and next friend of TB, a minor, C. S., a minor, by his mother and next friend Bernadette Snead, T. S., a minor, by his mother and next friend Dalonda Marchell Stevens, Bernadette Snead, mother and next friend of CS, a minor, J. W., a minor, by his mother and next friend Ernestine Randolph, K. W., a minor, by his mother and next friend Keisah Latoya Wright, M. W., a minor, by his mother and next friend Janet Anita Graves, R. W., a minor, by his mother and next friend Utopia Sherdel Ward, S. W., a minor, by his mother and next friend Ernestine Randolph, Utopia Sherdel Ward, mother and next friend of RW, a minor, Keisha Latoya Wright, mother and next friend of KW, a minor and All Plaintiffs
Defendant / Appellee: District of Columbia, a municipal corporation
Case Number: 21-7142
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1936674] to motion [ # 1935884-2 ] filed by Devan Michelle Abraham, Angela Lajuan Adams, Brenda Diana Adams, Lorenzo Turhan Adams, Steve Anthony Adams, All Plaintiffs, Keith Allen, Wanda Gertrude Allen, Jarreau Anthony, Janeise Tomika Archie, C. B., J. B., J. L. B., T. B., Calvin Wilbert Barnes, Gloria Jean Barnes, Kellie Olga Barnes, Damon Allen Barr, Geneva Mae Barr, Shawnica Danielle Barr, Alberta Bates, Rachel Lynn Bennett, Emmanuel Jose Benton, Joyce Elaine Benton, Mario Benton, Demetrius Lorenzo Best, Margaret Boney, Dimitri James Boykins, Priscilla Vanessa Boykins, Verta Jean Bradley, Helen Louise Brandon, Deandre William Brannon, Angela Marie Braxton, Paula Annelle Braxton, Delon'ta Lewis Brooks, Detrica Lynnette Brooks, Gracie Christy Brown, Larry Donte Brown, Delante Derek Buchanan, Melvina Eleanora Buchanan, Cherris Esther Buckhanan, Khrystina Leslie Buckhanan, Maurice Ulysses Bundy, Teairra Tolanda Bundy, Venetta Bundy, Maurice Cunningham Burden, Ronnie Jamil Burton, Jessica Latisha Butler, A. C., Walermonera Calleo, Loretta Carswell, Shelia Ruth Chambers, Wesley Aellan Chambers, Patricia Howard Chittams, William Justin Chittams, Deborah Clark, Dwight Leon Coleman, Nevelene Coleman, Pearl Ann Coleman, Peggy Jean Collins, Larry Darnell Cooper, Jr., Christopher Brice Cotton, Shanticka Anicka Curtis-Walker, J. D., Betty Lou Daniel, Bryand Anthony Daniel, Dejohn Andre Daniel, Delonta Daniel, Chontell Janeva Davis, Kay Williams Davis, Polly Diana Davis, Shaun Edward Davis, Pamela Annette Deneal, Eric James Ari Douglas, Candice Raichelle Downing, Juwan Gerald Downing, Mary Delores Downing, M. E., Minnie Lee Elliott, Cheryl Felicia Evans, Cynthia Tiana Farley-Johnson, Devon Antonio Felder, Rhonette Theresa Felder, C. G., R. G., Lashell Laura Gaskins, Calvin Harold Gilbert, Cameron Harrison Gilbert, Morgan Camille Gilbert, Kim Donnida Gooden, Lakeshia Chanel Gooden, Janet Anita Graves, Cynthia Ann Gray, Cynthia Delois Gray, Gilbert Michael Gray, Gregory Adam Gray, Isaac Theodore Gray, Julia Ann Gray, Julia Yvette Gray, Paris Ann Gray, Phillip Morris Gray, Shawnta Ltonya Gray, Ada Inex Green, Brandyn Terrell Green, Denise Rosha Green, Diamond Ja'nae Green, Michelle Regina Green, Nichelle Regina Green, Priscilla Elizabeth Greene, Sjontelle Grimes, Shana Jewan Guy, Wanda Guy, Tiffany Michelle Hagwood, Crystal Gwendolyn Hailstorks, Jamal Anthony Hailstorks, Shermonta Hailstorks, Trina Hailstorks, Asiah Shaumika Brenda Hawkins, Chanelle Donise Hodge, Charnita Delores Hodge, Carolyn Anita Hopkins, Jeanette Denise Huston, Michael Berven Huston, A. I., J. I., Geraldine Ingram, James Ingram, Eugene Isaac, Jr., Pamela Michelle Isaacs, Latissha Isby, C. J., K. J., M. J., N. J., Cameron Nashae Jackson, Darlene Denise Jackson, Ericka Monique Jackson, Dorothy James, Robyn Michelle Jamison, Jean Robert Jean-Baptiste, Misha Brenita Jefferson, Carolyn Denise Jenkins, Kendra Louise Jenkins, Christopher Marcus Johnson, Roy Delante Johnson, Treyvon Marcque Johnson, Ugenia Mae Johnson, Cleo Cherise Jones, Kennika Antionette Jones, Twanna Jones, Lameshea Denise Jordan, M. L., Laprea Michelle Lewis, Lashawn Tawanda Logan, Felecia Ernestine Marbury, Martina Gabriella Mathis, Marion Janine Mcdowell, Lakieta Niahole Mcrae, Jackie Rhames Michell, Alanda Maria Miles, Gwendolyn Mitchell, Andrew Markles Moore, Ruth Lajuene Morgan, Sandra Jean Morris, Debra Elizabeth Muse, P. N., Shante Patrice Nelson, Erica Latrice Perkins, Terry Ann Perkins, M. R., Ernestine Randolph, Roberta Gray Randolph, C. S., T. S., Antionette Shaw, Julian Rashid Smith, Bernadette Snead, Dalonda Marchell Stevens, Latisha Maryum Thomas, Lisa Ann Thomas, Geraldine Quander Thompson, J. W., K. W., M. W., R. W., S. W., Utopia Sherdel Ward, Laverne Wiley, Kevin Darnell Wingfield and Keisha Latoya Wright [Service Date: 02/25/2022 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: This motion complies with Fed. R. App. P. 27(d)(2)(A), Fed. R. App. P. 32(a)(5), and Fed. R. App. P. 32(a)(6) because the motion contains 5,182 words prepared in a proportionally spaced typeface using Microsoft Word 2013 in Times New Roman 14 point.. [21-7142] (Drake, Ronald) [Entered: 02/25/2022 10:40 AM]
February 18, 2022 MOTION [1935884] for summary affirmance filed by DC (Service Date: 02/18/2022 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 3,848 words. [21-7142] (Love, Richard) [Entered: 02/18/2022 04:09 PM]
February 10, 2022 NOTICE [1934650] to withdraw attorney Loren L. AliKhan who represented DC in 21-7142 filed by DC [Service Date: 02/10/2022 ] [21-7142] (Love, Richard) [Entered: 02/10/2022 01:36 PM]
February 3, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1933600] filed by Richard S. Love and co-counsel Carl J. Schifferle, Caroline S. Van Zile on behalf of Appellee DC. [21-7142] (Love, Richard) [Entered: 02/03/2022 01:58 PM]
February 3, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1933601] filed by DC [Service Date: 02/03/2022 ] [21-7142] (Love, Richard) [Entered: 02/03/2022 02:00 PM]
February 2, 2022 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1933511] submitted by Shawnta Ltonya Gray Carolyn Denise Jenkins Mary Delores Downing T. B. Lashell Laura Gaskins Dorothy James Pamela Annette Deneal Khrystina Leslie Buckhanan Kay Williams Davis Calvin Wilbert Barnes K. J. Dejohn Andre Daniel Juwan Gerald Downing Andrew Markles Moore Patricia Howard Chittams Ernestine Randolph Chontell Janeva Davis J. W. S. W. Devon Antonio Felder Martina Gabriella Mathis Utopia Sherdel Ward Jessica Latisha Butler Janet Anita Graves Pearl Ann Coleman Robyn Michelle Jamison Julia Yvette Gray Felecia Ernestine Marbury Wanda Gertrude Allen Shawnica Danielle Barr Helen Louise Brandon Dwight Leon Coleman Lashawn Tawanda Logan Priscilla Vanessa Boykins Jean Robert Jean-Baptiste Paula Annelle Braxton Latissha Isby Brenda Diana Adams M. L. Gwendolyn Mitchell Angela Marie Braxton Debra Elizabeth Muse Venetta Bundy Cynthia Delois Gray Damon Allen Barr Maurice Ulysses Bundy Jeanette Denise Huston Cherris Esther Buckhanan Walermonera Calleo Ugenia Mae Johnson Denise Rosha Green Wanda Guy Lisa Ann Thomas Betty Lou Daniel Lakeshia Chanel Gooden Roberta Gray Randolph Joyce Elaine Benton M. R. Charnita Delores Hodge Gilbert Michael Gray Wesley Aellan Chambers A. I. Geneva Mae Barr Julian Rashid Smith Shaun Edward Davis Shanticka Anicka Curtis-Walker Geraldine Quander Thompson Brandyn Terrell Green Nevelene Coleman Eugene Isaac Jr. Detrica Lynnette Brooks Keisha Latoya Wright Bryand Anthony Daniel Gregory Adam Gray Sandra Jean Morris Julia Ann Gray Margaret Boney Ruth Lajuene Morgan P. N. Gloria Jean Barnes Chanelle Donise Hodge Ericka Monique Jackson Ada Inex Green Devan Michelle Abraham Deborah Clark Cynthia Ann Gray Crystal Gwendolyn Hailstorks Cheryl Felicia Evans Michelle Regina Green Diamond Ja'nae Green Mario Benton Janeise Tomika Archie Deandre William Brannon M. J. Isaac Theodore Gray Nichelle Regina Green Marion Janine Mcdowell Laverne Wiley T. S. Verta Jean Bradley Asiah Shaumika Brenda Hawkins Jarreau Anthony C. G. Carolyn Anita Hopkins Terry Ann Perkins Kellie Olga Barnes J. B. Larry Darnell Cooper Jr. K. W. Shelia Ruth Chambers Roy Delante Johnson Priscilla Elizabeth Greene Cleo Cherise Jones Polly Diana Davis Treyvon Marcque Johnson Paris Ann Gray Jamal Anthony Hailstorks Cameron Nashae Jackson Cynthia Tiana Farley-Johnson Minnie Lee Elliott Keith Allen Darlene Denise Jackson Angela Lajuan Adams Kevin Darnell Wingfield Morgan Camille Gilbert Teairra Tolanda Bundy A. C. James Ingram Christopher Marcus Johnson R. W. Erica Latrice Perkins Loretta Carswell Dimitri James Boykins J. I. Geraldine Ingram Larry Donte Brown Alberta Bates Cameron Harrison Gilbert All Plaintiffs Delante Derek Buchanan Candice Raichelle Downing Jackie Rhames Michell Maurice Cunningham Burden Calvin Harold Gilbert Latisha Maryum Thomas Ronnie Jamil Burton Tiffany Michelle Hagwood Kendra Louise Jenkins N. J. Shana Jewan Guy Melvina Eleanora Buchanan Shermonta Hailstorks Lakieta Niahole Mcrae Peggy Jean Collins Shante Patrice Nelson Kim Donnida Gooden Lameshea Denise Jordan J. D. Twanna Jones Pamela Michelle Isaacs William Justin Chittams Eric James Ari Douglas Sjontelle Grimes R. G. Gracie Christy Brown Kennika Antionette Jones Delon'ta Lewis Brooks Demetrius Lorenzo Best M. E. C. J. Alanda Maria Miles Steve Anthony Adams Rachel Lynn Bennett Lorenzo Turhan Adams C. B. M. W. Trina Hailstorks Dalonda Marchell Stevens Christopher Brice Cotton Rhonette Theresa Felder Emmanuel Jose Benton Bernadette Snead Misha Brenita Jefferson C. S. Phillip Morris Gray J. L. B. Delonta Daniel Michael Berven Huston Laprea Michelle Lewis Antionette Shaw, in case 21-7142 [Service Date: 02/02/2022 ] [21-7142]--[Edited 02/03/2022 by AH] (Drake, Ronald) [Entered: 02/02/2022 09:01 PM]
February 2, 2022 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1933510] filed by Shawnta Ltonya Gray Carolyn Denise Jenkins Mary Delores Downing T. B. Lashell Laura Gaskins Dorothy James Pamela Annette Deneal Khrystina Leslie Buckhanan Kay Williams Davis Calvin Wilbert Barnes K. J. Dejohn Andre Daniel Juwan Gerald Downing Andrew Markles Moore Patricia Howard Chittams Ernestine Randolph Chontell Janeva Davis J. W. S. W. Devon Antonio Felder Martina Gabriella Mathis Utopia Sherdel Ward Jessica Latisha Butler Janet Anita Graves Pearl Ann Coleman Robyn Michelle Jamison Julia Yvette Gray Felecia Ernestine Marbury Wanda Gertrude Allen Shawnica Danielle Barr Helen Louise Brandon Dwight Leon Coleman Lashawn Tawanda Logan Priscilla Vanessa Boykins Jean Robert Jean-Baptiste Paula Annelle Braxton Latissha Isby Brenda Diana Adams M. L. Gwendolyn Mitchell Angela Marie Braxton Debra Elizabeth Muse Venetta Bundy Cynthia Delois Gray Damon Allen Barr Maurice Ulysses Bundy Jeanette Denise Huston Cherris Esther Buckhanan Walermonera Calleo Ugenia Mae Johnson Denise Rosha Green Wanda Guy Lisa Ann Thomas Betty Lou Daniel Lakeshia Chanel Gooden Roberta Gray Randolph Joyce Elaine Benton M. R. Charnita Delores Hodge Gilbert Michael Gray Wesley Aellan Chambers A. I. Geneva Mae Barr Julian Rashid Smith Shaun Edward Davis Shanticka Anicka Curtis-Walker Geraldine Quander Thompson Brandyn Terrell Green Nevelene Coleman Eugene Isaac Jr. Detrica Lynnette Brooks Keisha Latoya Wright Bryand Anthony Daniel Gregory Adam Gray Sandra Jean Morris Julia Ann Gray Margaret Boney Ruth Lajuene Morgan P. N. Gloria Jean Barnes Chanelle Donise Hodge Ericka Monique Jackson Ada Inex Green Devan Michelle Abraham Deborah Clark Cynthia Ann Gray Crystal Gwendolyn Hailstorks Cheryl Felicia Evans Michelle Regina Green Diamond Ja'nae Green Mario Benton Janeise Tomika Archie Deandre William Brannon M. J. Isaac Theodore Gray Nichelle Regina Green Marion Janine Mcdowell Laverne Wiley T. S. Verta Jean Bradley Asiah Shaumika Brenda Hawkins Jarreau Anthony C. G. Carolyn Anita Hopkins Terry Ann Perkins Kellie Olga Barnes J. B. Larry Darnell Cooper Jr. K. W. Shelia Ruth Chambers Roy Delante Johnson Priscilla Elizabeth Greene Cleo Cherise Jones Polly Diana Davis Treyvon Marcque Johnson Paris Ann Gray Jamal Anthony Hailstorks Cameron Nashae Jackson Cynthia Tiana Farley-Johnson Minnie Lee Elliott Keith Allen Darlene Denise Jackson Angela Lajuan Adams Kevin Darnell Wingfield Morgan Camille Gilbert Teairra Tolanda Bundy A. C. James Ingram Christopher Marcus Johnson R. W. Erica Latrice Perkins Loretta Carswell Dimitri James Boykins J. I. Geraldine Ingram Larry Donte Brown Alberta Bates Cameron Harrison Gilbert All Plaintiffs Delante Derek Buchanan Candice Raichelle Downing Jackie Rhames Michell Maurice Cunningham Burden Calvin Harold Gilbert Latisha Maryum Thomas Ronnie Jamil Burton Tiffany Michelle Hagwood Kendra Louise Jenkins N. J. Shana Jewan Guy Melvina Eleanora Buchanan Shermonta Hailstorks Lakieta Niahole Mcrae Peggy Jean Collins Shante Patrice Nelson Kim Donnida Gooden Lameshea Denise Jordan J. D. Twanna Jones Pamela Michelle Isaacs William Justin Chittams Eric James Ari Douglas Sjontelle Grimes R. G. Gracie Christy Brown Kennika Antionette Jones Delon'ta Lewis Brooks Demetrius Lorenzo Best M. E. C. J. Alanda Maria Miles Steve Anthony Adams Rachel Lynn Bennett Lorenzo Turhan Adams C. B. M. W. Trina Hailstorks Dalonda Marchell Stevens Christopher Brice Cotton Rhonette Theresa Felder Emmanuel Jose Benton Bernadette Snead Misha Brenita Jefferson C. S. Phillip Morris Gray J. L. B. Delonta Daniel Michael Berven Huston Laprea Michelle Lewis Antionette Shaw, in case 21-7142 [Service Date: 02/02/2022 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [21-7142]--[Edited 02/03/2022 by AH] (Drake, Ronald) [Entered: 02/02/2022 08:55 PM]
February 2, 2022 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1933509] filed by Shawnta Ltonya Gray Carolyn Denise Jenkins Mary Delores Downing T. B. Lashell Laura Gaskins Dorothy James Pamela Annette Deneal Khrystina Leslie Buckhanan Kay Williams Davis Calvin Wilbert Barnes K. J. Dejohn Andre Daniel Juwan Gerald Downing Andrew Markles Moore Patricia Howard Chittams Ernestine Randolph Chontell Janeva Davis J. W. S. W. Devon Antonio Felder Martina Gabriella Mathis Utopia Sherdel Ward Jessica Latisha Butler Janet Anita Graves Pearl Ann Coleman Robyn Michelle Jamison Julia Yvette Gray Felecia Ernestine Marbury Wanda Gertrude Allen Shawnica Danielle Barr Helen Louise Brandon Dwight Leon Coleman Lashawn Tawanda Logan Priscilla Vanessa Boykins Jean Robert Jean-Baptiste Paula Annelle Braxton Latissha Isby Brenda Diana Adams M. L. Gwendolyn Mitchell Angela Marie Braxton Debra Elizabeth Muse Venetta Bundy Cynthia Delois Gray Damon Allen Barr Maurice Ulysses Bundy Jeanette Denise Huston Cherris Esther Buckhanan Walermonera Calleo Ugenia Mae Johnson Denise Rosha Green Wanda Guy Lisa Ann Thomas Betty Lou Daniel Lakeshia Chanel Gooden Roberta Gray Randolph Joyce Elaine Benton M. R. Charnita Delores Hodge Gilbert Michael Gray Wesley Aellan Chambers A. I. Geneva Mae Barr Julian Rashid Smith Shaun Edward Davis Shanticka Anicka Curtis-Walker Geraldine Quander Thompson Brandyn Terrell Green Nevelene Coleman Eugene Isaac Jr. Detrica Lynnette Brooks Keisha Latoya Wright Bryand Anthony Daniel Gregory Adam Gray Sandra Jean Morris Julia Ann Gray Margaret Boney Ruth Lajuene Morgan P. N. Gloria Jean Barnes Chanelle Donise Hodge Ericka Monique Jackson Ada Inex Green Devan Michelle Abraham Deborah Clark Cynthia Ann Gray Crystal Gwendolyn Hailstorks Cheryl Felicia Evans Michelle Regina Green Diamond Ja'nae Green Mario Benton Janeise Tomika Archie Deandre William Brannon M. J. Isaac Theodore Gray Nichelle Regina Green Marion Janine Mcdowell Laverne Wiley T. S. Verta Jean Bradley Asiah Shaumika Brenda Hawkins Jarreau Anthony C. G. Carolyn Anita Hopkins Terry Ann Perkins Kellie Olga Barnes J. B. Larry Darnell Cooper Jr. K. W. Shelia Ruth Chambers Roy Delante Johnson Priscilla Elizabeth Greene Cleo Cherise Jones Polly Diana Davis Treyvon Marcque Johnson Paris Ann Gray Jamal Anthony Hailstorks Cameron Nashae Jackson Cynthia Tiana Farley-Johnson Minnie Lee Elliott Keith Allen Darlene Denise Jackson Angela Lajuan Adams Kevin Darnell Wingfield Morgan Camille Gilbert Teairra Tolanda Bundy A. C. James Ingram Christopher Marcus Johnson R. W. Erica Latrice Perkins Loretta Carswell Dimitri James Boykins J. I. Geraldine Ingram Larry Donte Brown Alberta Bates Cameron Harrison Gilbert All Plaintiffs Delante Derek Buchanan Candice Raichelle Downing Jackie Rhames Michell Maurice Cunningham Burden Calvin Harold Gilbert Latisha Maryum Thomas Ronnie Jamil Burton Tiffany Michelle Hagwood Kendra Louise Jenkins N. J. Shana Jewan Guy Melvina Eleanora Buchanan Shermonta Hailstorks Lakieta Niahole Mcrae Peggy Jean Collins Shante Patrice Nelson Kim Donnida Gooden Lameshea Denise Jordan J. D. Twanna Jones Pamela Michelle Isaacs William Justin Chittams Eric James Ari Douglas Sjontelle Grimes R. G. Gracie Christy Brown Kennika Antionette Jones Delon'ta Lewis Brooks Demetrius Lorenzo Best M. E. C. J. Alanda Maria Miles Steve Anthony Adams Rachel Lynn Bennett Lorenzo Turhan Adams C. B. M. W. Trina Hailstorks Dalonda Marchell Stevens Christopher Brice Cotton Rhonette Theresa Felder Emmanuel Jose Benton Bernadette Snead Misha Brenita Jefferson C. S. Phillip Morris Gray J. L. B. Delonta Daniel Michael Berven Huston Laprea Michelle Lewis Antionette Shaw, in case 21-7142 [Service Date: 02/02/2022 ] [21-7142]--[Edited 02/03/2022 by AH] (Drake, Ronald) [Entered: 02/02/2022 08:53 PM]
February 2, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1933505] filed by Shawnta Ltonya Gray Carolyn Denise Jenkins Mary Delores Downing T. B. Lashell Laura Gaskins Dorothy James Pamela Annette Deneal Khrystina Leslie Buckhanan Kay Williams Davis Calvin Wilbert Barnes K. J. Dejohn Andre Daniel Juwan Gerald Downing Andrew Markles Moore Patricia Howard Chittams Ernestine Randolph Chontell Janeva Davis J. W. S. W. Devon Antonio Felder Martina Gabriella Mathis Utopia Sherdel Ward Jessica Latisha Butler Janet Anita Graves Pearl Ann Coleman Robyn Michelle Jamison Julia Yvette Gray Felecia Ernestine Marbury Wanda Gertrude Allen Shawnica Danielle Barr Helen Louise Brandon Dwight Leon Coleman Lashawn Tawanda Logan Priscilla Vanessa Boykins Jean Robert Jean-Baptiste Paula Annelle Braxton Latissha Isby Brenda Diana Adams M. L. Gwendolyn Mitchell Angela Marie Braxton Debra Elizabeth Muse Venetta Bundy Cynthia Delois Gray Damon Allen Barr Maurice Ulysses Bundy Jeanette Denise Huston Cherris Esther Buckhanan Walermonera Calleo Ugenia Mae Johnson Denise Rosha Green Wanda Guy Lisa Ann Thomas Betty Lou Daniel Lakeshia Chanel Gooden Roberta Gray Randolph Joyce Elaine Benton M. R. Charnita Delores Hodge Gilbert Michael Gray Wesley Aellan Chambers A. I. Geneva Mae Barr Julian Rashid Smith Shaun Edward Davis Shanticka Anicka Curtis-Walker Geraldine Quander Thompson Brandyn Terrell Green Nevelene Coleman Eugene Isaac Jr. Detrica Lynnette Brooks Keisha Latoya Wright Bryand Anthony Daniel Gregory Adam Gray Sandra Jean Morris Julia Ann Gray Margaret Boney Ruth Lajuene Morgan P. N. Gloria Jean Barnes Chanelle Donise Hodge Ericka Monique Jackson Ada Inex Green Devan Michelle Abraham Deborah Clark Cynthia Ann Gray Crystal Gwendolyn Hailstorks Cheryl Felicia Evans Michelle Regina Green Diamond Ja'nae Green Mario Benton Janeise Tomika Archie Deandre William Brannon M. J. Isaac Theodore Gray Nichelle Regina Green Marion Janine Mcdowell Laverne Wiley T. S. Verta Jean Bradley Asiah Shaumika Brenda Hawkins Jarreau Anthony C. G. Carolyn Anita Hopkins Terry Ann Perkins Kellie Olga Barnes J. B. Larry Darnell Cooper Jr. K. W. Shelia Ruth Chambers Roy Delante Johnson Priscilla Elizabeth Greene Cleo Cherise Jones Polly Diana Davis Treyvon Marcque Johnson Paris Ann Gray Jamal Anthony Hailstorks Cameron Nashae Jackson Cynthia Tiana Farley-Johnson Minnie Lee Elliott Keith Allen Darlene Denise Jackson Angela Lajuan Adams Kevin Darnell Wingfield Morgan Camille Gilbert Teairra Tolanda Bundy A. C. James Ingram Christopher Marcus Johnson R. W. Erica Latrice Perkins Loretta Carswell Dimitri James Boykins J. I. Geraldine Ingram Larry Donte Brown Alberta Bates Cameron Harrison Gilbert All Plaintiffs Delante Derek Buchanan Candice Raichelle Downing Jackie Rhames Michell Maurice Cunningham Burden Calvin Harold Gilbert Latisha Maryum Thomas Ronnie Jamil Burton Tiffany Michelle Hagwood Kendra Louise Jenkins N. J. Shana Jewan Guy Melvina Eleanora Buchanan Shermonta Hailstorks Lakieta Niahole Mcrae Peggy Jean Collins Shante Patrice Nelson Kim Donnida Gooden Lameshea Denise Jordan J. D. Twanna Jones Pamela Michelle Isaacs William Justin Chittams Eric James Ari Douglas Sjontelle Grimes R. G. Gracie Christy Brown Kennika Antionette Jones Delon'ta Lewis Brooks Demetrius Lorenzo Best M. E. C. J. Alanda Maria Miles Steve Anthony Adams Rachel Lynn Bennett Lorenzo Turhan Adams C. B. M. W. Trina Hailstorks Dalonda Marchell Stevens Christopher Brice Cotton Rhonette Theresa Felder Emmanuel Jose Benton Bernadette Snead Misha Brenita Jefferson C. S. Phillip Morris Gray J. L. B. Delonta Daniel Michael Berven Huston Laprea Michelle Lewis Antionette Shaw, in case 21-7142 [Service Date: 02/02/2022 ] [21-7142]--[Edited 02/03/2022 by AH] (Drake, Ronald) [Entered: 02/02/2022 08:35 PM]
February 2, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1933507] filed by Ronald L. Drake, Esq. and co-counsel Michael J. Murali, Esq. on behalf of Shawnta Ltonya Gray Carolyn Denise Jenkins Mary Delores Downing T. B. Lashell Laura Gaskins Dorothy James Pamela Annette Deneal Khrystina Leslie Buckhanan Kay Williams Davis Calvin Wilbert Barnes K. J. Dejohn Andre Daniel Juwan Gerald Downing Andrew Markles Moore Patricia Howard Chittams Ernestine Randolph Chontell Janeva Davis J. W. S. W. Devon Antonio Felder Martina Gabriella Mathis Utopia Sherdel Ward Jessica Latisha Butler Janet Anita Graves Pearl Ann Coleman Robyn Michelle Jamison Julia Yvette Gray Felecia Ernestine Marbury Wanda Gertrude Allen Shawnica Danielle Barr Helen Louise Brandon Dwight Leon Coleman Lashawn Tawanda Logan Priscilla Vanessa Boykins Jean Robert Jean-Baptiste Paula Annelle Braxton Latissha Isby Brenda Diana Adams M. L. Gwendolyn Mitchell Angela Marie Braxton Debra Elizabeth Muse Venetta Bundy Cynthia Delois Gray Damon Allen Barr Maurice Ulysses Bundy Jeanette Denise Huston Cherris Esther Buckhanan Walermonera Calleo Ugenia Mae Johnson Denise Rosha Green Wanda Guy Lisa Ann Thomas Betty Lou Daniel Lakeshia Chanel Gooden Roberta Gray Randolph Joyce Elaine Benton M. R. Charnita Delores Hodge Gilbert Michael Gray Wesley Aellan Chambers A. I. Geneva Mae Barr Julian Rashid Smith Shaun Edward Davis Shanticka Anicka Curtis-Walker Geraldine Quander Thompson Brandyn Terrell Green Nevelene Coleman Eugene Isaac Jr. Detrica Lynnette Brooks Keisha Latoya Wright Bryand Anthony Daniel Gregory Adam Gray Sandra Jean Morris Julia Ann Gray Margaret Boney Ruth Lajuene Morgan P. N. Gloria Jean Barnes Chanelle Donise Hodge Ericka Monique Jackson Ada Inex Green Devan Michelle Abraham Deborah Clark Cynthia Ann Gray Crystal Gwendolyn Hailstorks Cheryl Felicia Evans Michelle Regina Green Diamond Ja'nae Green Mario Benton Janeise Tomika Archie Deandre William Brannon M. J. Isaac Theodore Gray Nichelle Regina Green Marion Janine Mcdowell Laverne Wiley T. S. Verta Jean Bradley Asiah Shaumika Brenda Hawkins Jarreau Anthony C. G. Carolyn Anita Hopkins Terry Ann Perkins Kellie Olga Barnes J. B. Larry Darnell Cooper Jr. K. W. Shelia Ruth Chambers Roy Delante Johnson Priscilla Elizabeth Greene Cleo Cherise Jones Polly Diana Davis Treyvon Marcque Johnson Paris Ann Gray Jamal Anthony Hailstorks Cameron Nashae Jackson Cynthia Tiana Farley-Johnson Minnie Lee Elliott Keith Allen Darlene Denise Jackson Angela Lajuan Adams Kevin Darnell Wingfield Morgan Camille Gilbert Teairra Tolanda Bundy A. C. James Ingram Christopher Marcus Johnson R. W. Erica Latrice Perkins Loretta Carswell Dimitri James Boykins J. I. Geraldine Ingram Larry Donte Brown Alberta Bates Cameron Harrison Gilbert All Plaintiffs Delante Derek Buchanan Candice Raichelle Downing Jackie Rhames Michell Maurice Cunningham Burden Calvin Harold Gilbert Latisha Maryum Thomas Ronnie Jamil Burton Tiffany Michelle Hagwood Kendra Louise Jenkins N. J. Shana Jewan Guy Melvina Eleanora Buchanan Shermonta Hailstorks Lakieta Niahole Mcrae Peggy Jean Collins Shante Patrice Nelson Kim Donnida Gooden Lameshea Denise Jordan J. D. Twanna Jones Pamela Michelle Isaacs William Justin Chittams Eric James Ari Douglas Sjontelle Grimes R. G. Gracie Christy Brown Kennika Antionette Jones Delon'ta Lewis Brooks Demetrius Lorenzo Best M. E. C. J. Alanda Maria Miles Steve Anthony Adams Rachel Lynn Bennett Lorenzo Turhan Adams C. B. M. W. Trina Hailstorks Dalonda Marchell Stevens Christopher Brice Cotton Rhonette Theresa Felder Emmanuel Jose Benton Bernadette Snead Misha Brenita Jefferson C. S. Phillip Morris Gray J. L. B. Delonta Daniel Michael Berven Huston Laprea Michelle Lewis Antionette Shaw, in case 21-7142. [21-7142]--[Edited 02/03/2022 by AH] (Drake, Ronald) [Entered: 02/02/2022 08:49 PM]
February 2, 2022 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1933506] filed by Shawnta Ltonya Gray Carolyn Denise Jenkins Mary Delores Downing T. B. Lashell Laura Gaskins Dorothy James Pamela Annette Deneal Khrystina Leslie Buckhanan Kay Williams Davis Calvin Wilbert Barnes K. J. Dejohn Andre Daniel Juwan Gerald Downing Andrew Markles Moore Patricia Howard Chittams Ernestine Randolph Chontell Janeva Davis J. W. S. W. Devon Antonio Felder Martina Gabriella Mathis Utopia Sherdel Ward Jessica Latisha Butler Janet Anita Graves Pearl Ann Coleman Robyn Michelle Jamison Julia Yvette Gray Felecia Ernestine Marbury Wanda Gertrude Allen Shawnica Danielle Barr Helen Louise Brandon Dwight Leon Coleman Lashawn Tawanda Logan Priscilla Vanessa Boykins Jean Robert Jean-Baptiste Paula Annelle Braxton Latissha Isby Brenda Diana Adams M. L. Gwendolyn Mitchell Angela Marie Braxton Debra Elizabeth Muse Venetta Bundy Cynthia Delois Gray Damon Allen Barr Maurice Ulysses Bundy Jeanette Denise Huston Cherris Esther Buckhanan Walermonera Calleo Ugenia Mae Johnson Denise Rosha Green Wanda Guy Lisa Ann Thomas Betty Lou Daniel Lakeshia Chanel Gooden Roberta Gray Randolph Joyce Elaine Benton M. R. Charnita Delores Hodge Gilbert Michael Gray Wesley Aellan Chambers A. I. Geneva Mae Barr Julian Rashid Smith Shaun Edward Davis Shanticka Anicka Curtis-Walker Geraldine Quander Thompson Brandyn Terrell Green Nevelene Coleman Eugene Isaac Jr. Detrica Lynnette Brooks Keisha Latoya Wright Bryand Anthony Daniel Gregory Adam Gray Sandra Jean Morris Julia Ann Gray Margaret Boney Ruth Lajuene Morgan P. N. Gloria Jean Barnes Chanelle Donise Hodge Ericka Monique Jackson Ada Inex Green Devan Michelle Abraham Deborah Clark Cynthia Ann Gray Crystal Gwendolyn Hailstorks Cheryl Felicia Evans Michelle Regina Green Diamond Ja'nae Green Mario Benton Janeise Tomika Archie Deandre William Brannon M. J. Isaac Theodore Gray Nichelle Regina Green Marion Janine Mcdowell Laverne Wiley T. S. Verta Jean Bradley Asiah Shaumika Brenda Hawkins Jarreau Anthony C. G. Carolyn Anita Hopkins Terry Ann Perkins Kellie Olga Barnes J. B. Larry Darnell Cooper Jr. K. W. Shelia Ruth Chambers Roy Delante Johnson Priscilla Elizabeth Greene Cleo Cherise Jones Polly Diana Davis Treyvon Marcque Johnson Paris Ann Gray Jamal Anthony Hailstorks Cameron Nashae Jackson Cynthia Tiana Farley-Johnson Minnie Lee Elliott Keith Allen Darlene Denise Jackson Angela Lajuan Adams Kevin Darnell Wingfield Morgan Camille Gilbert Teairra Tolanda Bundy A. C. James Ingram Christopher Marcus Johnson R. W. Erica Latrice Perkins Loretta Carswell Dimitri James Boykins J. I. Geraldine Ingram Larry Donte Brown Alberta Bates Cameron Harrison Gilbert All Plaintiffs Delante Derek Buchanan Candice Raichelle Downing Jackie Rhames Michell Maurice Cunningham Burden Calvin Harold Gilbert Latisha Maryum Thomas Ronnie Jamil Burton Tiffany Michelle Hagwood Kendra Louise Jenkins N. J. Shana Jewan Guy Melvina Eleanora Buchanan Shermonta Hailstorks Lakieta Niahole Mcrae Peggy Jean Collins Shante Patrice Nelson Kim Donnida Gooden Lameshea Denise Jordan J. D. Twanna Jones Pamela Michelle Isaacs William Justin Chittams Eric James Ari Douglas Sjontelle Grimes R. G. Gracie Christy Brown Kennika Antionette Jones Delon'ta Lewis Brooks Demetrius Lorenzo Best M. E. C. J. Alanda Maria Miles Steve Anthony Adams Rachel Lynn Bennett Lorenzo Turhan Adams C. B. M. W. Trina Hailstorks Dalonda Marchell Stevens Christopher Brice Cotton Rhonette Theresa Felder Emmanuel Jose Benton Bernadette Snead Misha Brenita Jefferson C. S. Phillip Morris Gray J. L. B. Delonta Daniel Michael Berven Huston Laprea Michelle Lewis Antionette Shaw, in case 21-7142 [Service Date: 02/02/2022 ] [21-7142]--[Edited 02/03/2022 by AH] (Drake, Ronald) [Entered: 02/02/2022 08:42 PM]
February 2, 2022 CONSENT STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1933508] filed by Shawnta Ltonya Gray Carolyn Denise Jenkins Mary Delores Downing T. B. Lashell Laura Gaskins Dorothy James Pamela Annette Deneal Khrystina Leslie Buckhanan Kay Williams Davis Calvin Wilbert Barnes K. J. Dejohn Andre Daniel Juwan Gerald Downing Andrew Markles Moore Patricia Howard Chittams Ernestine Randolph Chontell Janeva Davis J. W. S. W. Devon Antonio Felder Martina Gabriella Mathis Utopia Sherdel Ward Jessica Latisha Butler Janet Anita Graves Pearl Ann Coleman Robyn Michelle Jamison Julia Yvette Gray Felecia Ernestine Marbury Wanda Gertrude Allen Shawnica Danielle Barr Helen Louise Brandon Dwight Leon Coleman Lashawn Tawanda Logan Priscilla Vanessa Boykins Jean Robert Jean-Baptiste Paula Annelle Braxton Latissha Isby Brenda Diana Adams M. L. Gwendolyn Mitchell Angela Marie Braxton Debra Elizabeth Muse Venetta Bundy Cynthia Delois Gray Damon Allen Barr Maurice Ulysses Bundy Jeanette Denise Huston Cherris Esther Buckhanan Walermonera Calleo Ugenia Mae Johnson Denise Rosha Green Wanda Guy Lisa Ann Thomas Betty Lou Daniel Lakeshia Chanel Gooden Roberta Gray Randolph Joyce Elaine Benton M. R. Charnita Delores Hodge Gilbert Michael Gray Wesley Aellan Chambers A. I. Geneva Mae Barr Julian Rashid Smith Shaun Edward Davis Shanticka Anicka Curtis-Walker Geraldine Quander Thompson Brandyn Terrell Green Nevelene Coleman Eugene Isaac Jr. Detrica Lynnette Brooks Keisha Latoya Wright Bryand Anthony Daniel Gregory Adam Gray Sandra Jean Morris Julia Ann Gray Margaret Boney Ruth Lajuene Morgan P. N. Gloria Jean Barnes Chanelle Donise Hodge Ericka Monique Jackson Ada Inex Green Devan Michelle Abraham Deborah Clark Cynthia Ann Gray Crystal Gwendolyn Hailstorks Cheryl Felicia Evans Michelle Regina Green Diamond Ja'nae Green Mario Benton Janeise Tomika Archie Deandre William Brannon M. J. Isaac Theodore Gray Nichelle Regina Green Marion Janine Mcdowell Laverne Wiley T. S. Verta Jean Bradley Asiah Shaumika Brenda Hawkins Jarreau Anthony C. G. Carolyn Anita Hopkins Terry Ann Perkins Kellie Olga Barnes J. B. Larry Darnell Cooper Jr. K. W. Shelia Ruth Chambers Roy Delante Johnson Priscilla Elizabeth Greene Cleo Cherise Jones Polly Diana Davis Treyvon Marcque Johnson Paris Ann Gray Jamal Anthony Hailstorks Cameron Nashae Jackson Cynthia Tiana Farley-Johnson Minnie Lee Elliott Keith Allen Darlene Denise Jackson Angela Lajuan Adams Kevin Darnell Wingfield Morgan Camille Gilbert Teairra Tolanda Bundy A. C. James Ingram Christopher Marcus Johnson R. W. Erica Latrice Perkins Loretta Carswell Dimitri James Boykins J. I. Geraldine Ingram Larry Donte Brown Alberta Bates Cameron Harrison Gilbert All Plaintiffs Delante Derek Buchanan Candice Raichelle Downing Jackie Rhames Michell Maurice Cunningham Burden Calvin Harold Gilbert Latisha Maryum Thomas Ronnie Jamil Burton Tiffany Michelle Hagwood Kendra Louise Jenkins N. J. Shana Jewan Guy Melvina Eleanora Buchanan Shermonta Hailstorks Lakieta Niahole Mcrae Peggy Jean Collins Shante Patrice Nelson Kim Donnida Gooden Lameshea Denise Jordan J. D. Twanna Jones Pamela Michelle Isaacs William Justin Chittams Eric James Ari Douglas Sjontelle Grimes R. G. Gracie Christy Brown Kennika Antionette Jones Delon'ta Lewis Brooks Demetrius Lorenzo Best M. E. C. J. Alanda Maria Miles Steve Anthony Adams Rachel Lynn Bennett Lorenzo Turhan Adams C. B. M. W. Trina Hailstorks Dalonda Marchell Stevens Christopher Brice Cotton Rhonette Theresa Felder Emmanuel Jose Benton Bernadette Snead Misha Brenita Jefferson C. S. Phillip Morris Gray J. L. B. Delonta Daniel Michael Berven Huston Laprea Michelle Lewis Antionette Shaw, in case 21-7142 [Service Date: 02/02/2022 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [21-7142]--[Edited 02/03/2022 by AH] (Drake, Ronald) [Entered: 02/02/2022 08:51 PM]
January 4, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1929180] filed directing the parties to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 02/03/2022; APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 02/03/2022; APPELLANT statement of issues due 02/03/2022; APPELLANT underlying decision due 02/03/2022; APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 02/03/2022; APPELLANT entry of appearance due 02/03/2022; APPELLANT transcript status report due 02/03/2022; APPELLANT procedural motions due 02/03/2022; APPELLANT dispositive motions due 02/18/2022; APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 02/03/2022; APPELLEE entry of appearance due 02/03/2022; APPELLEE procedural motions due 02/03/2022; APPELLEE dispositive motions due 02/18/2022. [21-7142] [Entered: 01/04/2022 04:14 PM]
December 30, 2021 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1929025] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:00-cv-00591-RCL filed by Keith Allen, et al. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-7142. [21-7142] [Entered: 01/04/2022 08:59 AM]
December 30, 2021 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [21-7142] [Entered: 01/03/2022 11:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Keith Allen, et al v. DC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Keith Allen
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Wanda Gertrude Allen, Keith Dominick Allen, a minor by his mother and next friend; in her own behalf and as next friend K.D.A.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lashell Laura Gaskins, in her own behalf and as next friend of T.D.G.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Twanna Jones, in her own behalf and as next friend of D.M.J.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Marion Janine Mcdowell, in her own behalf and as next friend as D.C.M.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Eugene Isaac, Jr., a minor by his mother and next friend, Dorothy James
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Dorothy James, in her own behalf and as next friend of of E.I., Jr.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Verta Jean Bradley, In here own behalf, and a mother and next friend of Lakesha Nicole Bradley
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kevin Darnell Wingfield, a minor by his mother and next friend, Priscilla Elizabeth Greene
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Priscilla Elizabeth Greene, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lisa Ann Thomas, Next friend and Mother of minor A.T.T.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Angela Lajuan Adams, in her own behalf and as next friend of T.R.A, Jr.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gloria Jean Barnes, in her own behalf and as next friend J.L.B.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alberta Bates, in her own behalf and as next friend C.B., J.M.B., and V.A.B.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Rachel Lynn Bennett, in her own behalf and as next friend J.T.B.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Margaret Boney, in her own behalf and as next friend A.I.B.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Terry Ann Perkins, in her own behalf and as next friend R.J.B.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Walermonera Calleo, in his own behalf and as next friend K.K.C.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Loretta Carswell, in her own behalf and as next friend D.P.C.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Deborah Clark, in her own behalf and as next friend A.M.C.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shanticka Anicka Curtis-Walker, in her own behalf and as next friend R.D.C.W.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shante Patrice Nelson, in her own behalf and as next friend N.M.D. and R.L.D.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Misha Brenita Jefferson, in her own behalf and as next friend D.A.D.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Minnie Lee Elliott, in her own behalf and as next friend of D.P.E. and M.E.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cynthia Tiana Farley-Johnson, in her own behalf and as next friend of M.D.F.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cleo Cherise Jones, in her own behalf and as next friend of M.S.F.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Nichelle Regina Green, in her own behalf and as next friend R-S.C.G/M.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sjontelle Grimes, in her behalf and as next friend S.G.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Carolyn Anita Hopkins, in her own behalf and as next friend of A.J.H.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robyn Michelle Jamison, in her own behalf and as next friend M.J.J.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Carolyn Denise Jenkins, in her own behalf and as next friend of M.L.J.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kendra Louise Jenkins, in her won behalf and as next friend of K.A.J.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Roy Delante Johnson, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lameshea Denise Jordan, in her own behalf and as next friend of J.D.J.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Laprea Michelle Lewis, in her own behalf and as next friend of M.R.L.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lashawn Tawanda Logan, in her own behalf and as next friend of D.D.L.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Peggy Jean Collins, in her own behalf and as next friend of J.A.L.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Felecia Ernestine Marbury, in her own behalf and as next friend as M.A.M.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Martina Gabriella Mathis, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lakieta Niahole Mcrae, in her own behalf and as next friend of D.D.M.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gwendolyn Mitchell, in her own behalf and as next friend of D.A.M.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Andrew Markles Moore, in his own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Julian Rashid Smith, in his own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Polly Diana Davis, in her own behalf and as next friend of P.D.N.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Erica Latrice Perkins, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Antionette Shaw, in her own behalf and as next friend of S.M.S.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Dalonda Marchell Stevens, in her own behalf and as next friend of T.A.S.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Geraldine Quander Thompson, in her own behalf and as next friend of R.J.T.
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Devan Michelle Abraham, by next friend Ruth LaJuene Morgan
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ruth Lajuene Morgan, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Steve Anthony Adams, by next friend Brenda Diane Adams
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brenda Diana Adams, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lorenzo Turhan Adams, by next friend, Brenda Diane Adams
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jarreau Anthony
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kellie Olga Barnes, by next friend Calvin Wilbert Barnes
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Calvin Wilbert Barnes, in his own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Damon Allen Barr, by next friend Geneva Mae Barr
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Geneva Mae Barr, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shawnica Danielle Barr, by next friend Geneva Mae Barr
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Emmanuel Jose Benton
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mario Benton, by next friend Joyce Elaine Benton
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Joyce Elaine Benton, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Demetrius Lorenzo Best
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Dimitri James Boykins, by next friend Priscilla Vanessa Boykins
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Priscilla Vanessa Boykins, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Deandre William Brannon, by next friend Shelia Ruth Chambers
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shelia Ruth Chambers, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Paula Annelle Braxton, by next friend Alanda Maria Miles
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alanda Maria Miles, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Delon'ta Lewis Brooks, by next friend Detrica Lynnette Brooks
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Detrica Lynnette Brooks, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Larry Donte Brown, by next friend Gracie Christy Brown
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gracie Christy Brown, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Delante Derek Buchanan, by next friend Melvina Eleanora Buchanan
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Melvina Eleanora Buchanan, in her own behalf and as mother and next friend of JD, a minor
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Khrystina Leslie Buckhanan, by next friend Cherris Esther Buckhanan
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cherris Esther Buckhanan, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Maurice Ulysses Bundy, by next friend Venetta Bundy
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Venetta Bundy, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Teairra Tolanda Bundy, by next friend Venetta Bundy
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Maurice Cunningham Burden
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ronnie Jamil Burton
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jessica Latisha Butler, by next friend Cheryl Felicia Evans
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cheryl Felicia Evans, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Wesley Aellan Chambers, by next friend Shelia Ruth Chambers
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Patricia Howard Chittams, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: William Justin Chittams, by next friend Patricia Howard Chittams
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Dwight Leon Coleman, by next friend Nevelene Coleman
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Nevelene Coleman, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Pearl Ann Coleman, by next friend Nevelene Coleman
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Larry Darnell Cooper, Jr., by next friend Angela Marie Braxton
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Angela Marie Braxton, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Christopher Brice Cotton, by next friend Debra Elizabeth Muse
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Debra Elizabeth Muse, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bryand Anthony Daniel, by next friend Betty Lou Daniel
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Betty Lou Daniel, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Dejohn Andre Daniel
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Delonta Daniel, by next friend Betty Lou Daniel
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Chontell Janeva Davis, by next friend Kay Williams Davis
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kay Williams Davis, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shaun Edward Davis
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Eric James Ari Douglas
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Candice Raichelle Downing, by next friend Mary Delores Downing
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mary Delores Downing, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Juwan Gerald Downing, by next friend Mary Delores Downing
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Devon Antonio Felder, by next friend Rhonnetta Theresa Felder
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Rhonette Theresa Felder, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cameron Harrison Gilbert, by next friend Calvin Harold Gilbert
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Calvin Harold Gilbert, in his own behalf and as father and next friend of CG, a minor
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Morgan Camille Gilbert, by next friend Calvin Harold Gilbert
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kim Donnida Gooden, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lakeshia Chanel Gooden, by next friend Kim Donnida Gooden
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cynthia Delois Gray, by next friend Cynthia Ann Gray
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cynthia Ann Gray, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gilbert Michael Gray, by next friend Julia Ann Gray
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gregory Adam Gray, by next friend Julia Ann Gray
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Isaac Theodore Gray, by next friend Julia Ann Gray
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Julia Ann Gray, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Julia Yvette Gray, by next friend Julia Ann Gray
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Paris Ann Gray, by next friend Julia Ann Gray
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Phillip Morris Gray, by next friend Cynthia Ann Gray
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shawnta Ltonya Gray, by next friend Julia Ann Gray
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brandyn Terrell Green, by next friend Denise Rosha Green
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Denise Rosha Green, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Diamond Ja'nae Green, by next friend Ada Inex Green
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Pamela Annette Deneal, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ada Inex Green, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shana Jewan Guy, by next friend Wanda Guy
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Wanda Guy, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tiffany Michelle Hagwood
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Crystal Gwendolyn Hailstorks, by next friend Trina Hailstorks
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jamal Anthony Hailstorks, by next friend Shermonta Hailstorks
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shermonta Hailstorks, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Trina Hailstorks, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Asiah Shaumika Brenda Hawkins, by next friend Latisha Maryum Thomas
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Chanelle Donise Hodge, by next friend Charnita Delores Hodge
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Charnita Delores Hodge, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jeanette Denise Huston
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Berven Huston
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Geraldine Ingram, in her own behalf and as mother and next friend of JI, a minor
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James Ingram, by next friend Geraldine Ingram
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Latissha Isby
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cameron Nashae Jackson, by next friend LaVerne Wiley
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Darlene Denise Jackson, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ericka Monique Jackson, by next friend Darlene Denise Jackson
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jean Robert Jean-Baptiste, by next friend Sandra Jean Morris
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Christopher Marcus Johnson, by next friend Pamela Annette DeNeal
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Treyvon Marcque Johnson, by next friend Ugenia Mae Johnson
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ugenia Mae Johnson
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kennika Antionette Jones, by next friend Twanna Jones
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sandra Jean Morris, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Latisha Maryum Thomas, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Laverne Wiley, in her own behalf
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Janeise Tomika Archie, mother and next friend of ML, a minor
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: C. B., a minor, by his mother and next friend Alberta Bates
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J. L. B., a minor, by his mother and next friend Gloria Jean Barnes
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J. B., a minor, by his mother and next friend Alberta Bates
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: T. B., a minor, by his mother and next friend Roberta Gray Randolph
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Helen Louise Brandon, mother and next friend of MR, a minor
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: A. C., a minor, by his mother and next friend Deborah Clark
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J. D., a minor, by his mother and next friend Melvina Eleanora Buchanan
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: M. E., a minor, by his mother and next friend Minnie Lee Elliott
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: C. G., a minor, by his father and next friend Calvin Harold Gilbert
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: R. G., a minor, by his mother and next friend Nichelle Regina Green
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Janet Anita Graves, mother and next friend of MW, a minor
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michelle Regina Green, mother and next friend of RG, a minor
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: A. I., a minor, by his mother and next friend Pamela Michelle Isaacs
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J. I., a minor, by his mother and next friend Geraldine Ingram
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Pamela Michelle Isaacs, mother and next friend of AI, a minor
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: C. J., a minor
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: K. J., a minor, by his mother and next friend Kendra Louise Jenkins
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: M. J., a minor, by his mother and next friend Crolyn Denise Jenkins
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: N. J., a minor, by his mother and next friend Jackie Rhames Michell
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: M. L., a minor, by his mother and next friend Janeise Tomika Archie
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jackie Rhames Michell, mother and next friend of NJ, a minor
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: P. N., a minor, by his mother and next friend Polly Diana Davis
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: M. R., a minor, by his mother and next friend Helen Louise Brandon
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ernestine Randolph, mother and next friend of JW and SW, minors
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Roberta Gray Randolph, mother and next friend of TB, a minor
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: C. S., a minor, by his mother and next friend Bernadette Snead
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: T. S., a minor, by his mother and next friend Dalonda Marchell Stevens
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bernadette Snead, mother and next friend of CS, a minor
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J. W., a minor, by his mother and next friend Ernestine Randolph
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: K. W., a minor, by his mother and next friend Keisah Latoya Wright
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: M. W., a minor, by his mother and next friend Janet Anita Graves
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: R. W., a minor, by his mother and next friend Utopia Sherdel Ward
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: S. W., a minor, by his mother and next friend Ernestine Randolph
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Utopia Sherdel Ward, mother and next friend of RW, a minor
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Keisha Latoya Wright, mother and next friend of KW, a minor
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: Ronald Lee Drake
Represented By: Michael Murali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: District of Columbia, a municipal corporation
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Represented By: Richard Stuart Love
Represented By: Carl James Schifferle
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?