James Blassingame, et al v. Donald Trump
Plaintiff / Appellee: James Blassingame and Sidney Hemby
Defendant / Appellant: Donald J. Trump
Case Number: 22-5069
Filed: March 22, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1944072] filed by Joseph M. Sellers and co-counsel Anna Kathryn Barnes on behalf of Appellee All Plaintiffs. [22-7031] (Barnes, Anna) [Entered: 04/22/2022 03:27 PM]
April 21, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1943922] filed by Donald J. Trump in 22-5069, 22-7030, 22-7031 [Service Date: 04/21/2022 ] [22-5069, 22-7030, 22-7031] (Binnall, Jesse) [Entered: 04/21/2022 04:54 PM]
April 21, 2022 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1943921] filed by Donald J. Trump in 22-5069, 22-7030, 22-7031 [Service Date: 04/21/2022 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [22-5069, 22-7030, 22-7031] (Binnall, Jesse) [Entered: 04/21/2022 04:52 PM]
April 21, 2022 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1943923] filed by Donald J. Trump in 22-5069, 22-7030, 22-7031 [Service Date: 04/21/2022 ] [22-5069, 22-7030, 22-7031] (Binnall, Jesse) [Entered: 04/21/2022 04:55 PM]
April 21, 2022 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1943926] submitted by Donald J. Trump in 22-5069, 22-7030, 22-7031 [Service Date: 04/21/2022 ] [22-5069, 22-7030, 22-7031] (Binnall, Jesse) [Entered: 04/21/2022 05:03 PM]
April 21, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1943935] filed by Philip Andonian on behalf of Appellee Eric Swalwell in 22-7030. [22-7030, 22-5069, 22-7031] (Andonian, Philip) [Entered: 04/21/2022 05:48 PM]
April 21, 2022 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1943919] filed by Donald J. Trump in 22-5069, 22-7030, 22-7031 [Service Date: 04/21/2022 ] [22-5069, 22-7030, 22-7031] (Binnall, Jesse) [Entered: 04/21/2022 04:51 PM]
April 21, 2022 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1943924] filed by Donald J. Trump in 22-5069, 22-7030, 22-7031 [Service Date: 04/21/2022 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [22-5069, 22-7030, 22-7031]--[MODIFIED DOCKET TEXT--Edited 04/21/2022 by LMC] (Binnall, Jesse) [Entered: 04/21/2022 04:57 PM]
April 21, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1943918] filed by Jesse R. Binnall and co-counsel Molly McCann on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump in 22-5069, 22-7030, 22-7031. [22-5069, 22-7030, 22-7031] (Binnall, Jesse) [Entered: 04/21/2022 04:49 PM]
April 21, 2022 JOINT CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1943909] filed by All Plaintiffs in 22-7031 [Service Date: 04/21/2022 ] [22-7031, 22-5069, 22-7030] (Sellers, Joseph) [Entered: 04/21/2022 04:20 PM]
April 21, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1943804] filed by Patrick A. Malone and co-counsel Cameron Kistler on behalf of Appellees Sidney Hemby and James Blassingame. [22-5069] (Kistler, Cameron) [Entered: 04/21/2022 09:59 AM]
April 5, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1942001] filed by Joseph Sellers and co-counsel Brian Corman and Alison Deich on behalf of Appellee All Plaintiffs. [22-7031] (Corman, Brian) [Entered: 04/05/2022 05:56 PM]
March 25, 2022 LETTER [1940610] sent regarding attorney membership to Mr. Jonathon Alden Moseley for Oath Keepers in 22-7031. Application for Admission due 04/25/2022. [22-7031, 22-5069, 22-7030] [Entered: 03/25/2022 01:33 PM]
March 25, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1940608] filed consolidating cases 22-7030, 22-7031 (Consolidation started 03/25/2022) with 22-5069 [22-5069, 22-7030, 22-7031] [Entered: 03/25/2022 01:32 PM]
March 22, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1940044] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:21-cv-00858-APM filed by Donald J. Trump. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5069. [22-5069] [Entered: 03/22/2022 11:45 AM]
March 22, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1940052] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 04/21/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 04/21/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 04/21/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 04/21/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 04/21/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 04/21/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 04/21/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 04/21/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 05/06/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 04/21/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 04/21/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 04/21/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 05/06/2022 [22-5069] [Entered: 03/22/2022 12:10 PM]
March 22, 2022 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-5069] [Entered: 03/22/2022 11:44 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: James Blassingame, et al v. Donald Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James Blassingame
Represented By: Benjamin Leon Berwick
Represented By: Cameron Oatman Kistler
Represented By: Patrick Allen Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sidney Hemby
Represented By: Benjamin Leon Berwick
Represented By: Cameron Oatman Kistler
Represented By: Patrick Allen Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Jesse R. Binnall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?