Citrus HMA, LLC, et al v. Xavier Becerra
Plaintiff / Appellee: Citrus HMA, LLC, doing business as Seven Rivers Regional Medical Center, Naples HMA, LLC, doing business as Physicians Regional Medical Center, Northwest Hospital, LLC, doing business as Northwest Medical Center, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, doing business as Oro Valley Hospital, Osceola SC, LLC, doing business as St. Cloud Regional Medical Center, Port Charlotte HMA, LLC., doing business as Bayfront Health Port Charlotte, Punta Gorda HMA, LLC., doing business as Bayfront Punta Gorda, Morton Plant Hospital Association Inc., Trustees of Mease Hospital Inc., Leesburg Regional Medical Center Inc., St. Joseph's Hospital, Inc., St. Anthony's Hospital Inc., Hartford Hospital, Trinity Health of New England, Inc., Honorhealth Scottsdale Thompson Peak Medical Center, Winter Haven Hospital Inc., Honorhealth Deer Valley Medical Center, State of Connecticut, South Lake Hospital, Inc., Baptist Medical Center of the Beaches, Inc., South Florida Baptist Hospital Inc., Bartow Regional Medical Center, Inc., Middlesex Hospital, Lakeland Regional Medical Center, Inc., Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation, Honorhealth John C. Lincoln Medical Center, Villages Tri-County Medical Center Inc., Indian River Memorial Hospital, Naples Community Hospital, Inc., Honorhealth Scottsdale Shea Medical Center, Honorhealth Scottsdale Osborn Medical Center and All Plaintiffs
Defendant / Appellant: Xavier Becerra, in his official capacity as Secretary of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 22-5173
Filed: June 14, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Ovrpmnts Under the Medicare Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1958943] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 09/20/2022. APPELLEE Brief due on 10/20/2022. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 11/10/2022. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 11/17/2022. Final Briefs due 12/01/2022. [22-5173] [Entered: 08/11/2022 01:25 PM]
July 22, 2022 STATEMENT [1956099] with Disclosure Listing filed by All Plaintiffs, Baptist Medical Center of the Beaches, Inc., Bartow Regional Medical Center, Inc., Citrus HMA, LLC, Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation, Hartford Hospital, Honorhealth Deer Valley Medical Center, Honorhealth John C. Lincoln Medical Center, Honorhealth Scottsdale Osborn Medical Center, Honorhealth Scottsdale Shea Medical Center, Honorhealth Scottsdale Thompson Peak Medical Center, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lakeland Regional Medical Center, Inc., Leesburg Regional Medical Center Inc., Middlesex Hospital, Morton Plant Hospital Association Inc., Morton Plant Hospital Association Inc., Naples Community Hospital, Inc., Naples HMA, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Osceola SC, LLC, Port Charlotte HMA, LLC., Punta Gorda HMA, LLC., South Florida Baptist Hospital Inc., South Lake Hospital, Inc., St. Anthony's Hospital Inc., St. Joseph's Hospital, Inc., State of Connecticut, Trinity Health of New England, Inc., Trinity Health of New England, Inc., Trustees of Mease Hospital Inc., Trustees of Mease Hospital Inc., Villages Tri-County Medical Center Inc., Winter Haven Hospital Inc. and Xavier Becerra [Service Date: 07/22/2022 ] [22-5173] (Hettich, Daniel) [Entered: 07/22/2022 01:45 PM]
July 14, 2022 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1955058] submitted by Xavier Becerra [22-5173] (Chaifetz, Samantha) [Entered: 07/14/2022 02:15 PM]
July 14, 2022 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1955063] filed by Xavier Becerra [Service Date: 07/14/2022 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [22-5173] (Chaifetz, Samantha) [Entered: 07/14/2022 02:24 PM]
July 14, 2022 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1955077] filed by Xavier Becerra [Service Date: 07/14/2022 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [22-5173] (Chaifetz, Samantha) [Entered: 07/14/2022 02:57 PM]
July 14, 2022 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1955057] filed by Xavier Becerra [Service Date: 07/14/2022 ] [22-5173] (Chaifetz, Samantha) [Entered: 07/14/2022 02:14 PM]
July 14, 2022 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1955071] filed by Xavier Becerra [Service Date: 07/14/2022 ] [22-5173] (Chaifetz, Samantha) [Entered: 07/14/2022 02:39 PM]
July 14, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1955054] filed by Xavier Becerra [Service Date: 07/14/2022 ] [22-5173] (Chaifetz, Samantha) [Entered: 07/14/2022 02:02 PM]
July 14, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1954990] filed by Daniel J. Hettich and co-counsel Mark D. Polston, Christopher P. Kenny, Alek W. Pivec on behalf of Appellees All Plaintiffs, Baptist Medical Center of the Beaches, Inc., Bartow Regional Medical Center, Inc., Citrus HMA, LLC, Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation, Hartford Hospital, Honorhealth Deer Valley Medical Center, Honorhealth John C. Lincoln Medical Center, Honorhealth Scottsdale Osborn Medical Center, Honorhealth Scottsdale Shea Medical Center, Honorhealth Scottsdale Thompson Peak Medical Center, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lakeland Regional Medical Center, Inc., Leesburg Regional Medical Center Inc., Middlesex Hospital, Morton Plant Hospital Association Inc., Morton Plant Hospital Association Inc., Naples Community Hospital, Inc., Naples HMA, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Osceola SC, LLC, Port Charlotte HMA, LLC., Punta Gorda HMA, LLC., South Florida Baptist Hospital Inc., South Lake Hospital, Inc., St. Anthony's Hospital Inc., St. Joseph's Hospital, Inc., State of Connecticut, Trinity Health of New England, Inc., Trinity Health of New England, Inc., Trustees of Mease Hospital Inc., Trustees of Mease Hospital Inc., Villages Tri-County Medical Center Inc. and Winter Haven Hospital Inc.. [22-5173] (Hettich, Daniel) [Entered: 07/14/2022 10:32 AM]
July 14, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1954995] filed by All Plaintiffs, Baptist Medical Center of the Beaches, Inc., Bartow Regional Medical Center, Inc., Citrus HMA, LLC, Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation, Hartford Hospital, Honorhealth Deer Valley Medical Center, Honorhealth John C. Lincoln Medical Center, Honorhealth Scottsdale Osborn Medical Center, Honorhealth Scottsdale Shea Medical Center, Honorhealth Scottsdale Thompson Peak Medical Center, Indian River Memorial Hospital, Lakeland Regional Medical Center, Inc., Leesburg Regional Medical Center Inc., Middlesex Hospital, Morton Plant Hospital Association Inc., Morton Plant Hospital Association Inc., Naples Community Hospital, Inc., Naples HMA, LLC, Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Osceola SC, LLC, Port Charlotte HMA, LLC., Punta Gorda HMA, LLC., South Florida Baptist Hospital Inc., South Lake Hospital, Inc., St. Anthony's Hospital Inc., St. Joseph's Hospital, Inc., State of Connecticut, Trinity Health of New England, Inc., Trinity Health of New England, Inc., Trustees of Mease Hospital Inc., Trustees of Mease Hospital Inc., Villages Tri-County Medical Center Inc. and Winter Haven Hospital Inc. [Service Date: 07/14/2022 ] [22-5173] (Hettich, Daniel) [Entered: 07/14/2022 10:39 AM]
July 14, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1955039] filed by Samantha L. Chaifetz and co-counsel Alisa B. Klein on behalf of Appellant Xavier Becerra. [22-5173] (Chaifetz, Samantha) [Entered: 07/14/2022 12:34 PM]
June 14, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1950537] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-00707-CKK filed by Xavier Becerra. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5173. [22-5173] [Entered: 06/14/2022 02:34 PM]
June 14, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1950540] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/14/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/14/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/14/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/14/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/14/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 07/14/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/14/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/14/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/29/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/14/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/14/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/14/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/29/2022 [22-5173] [Entered: 06/14/2022 02:37 PM]
June 14, 2022 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-5173] [Entered: 06/14/2022 02:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Citrus HMA, LLC, et al v. Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Citrus HMA, LLC, doing business as Seven Rivers Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Naples HMA, LLC, doing business as Physicians Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Northwest Hospital, LLC, doing business as Northwest Medical Center
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, doing business as Oro Valley Hospital
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Osceola SC, LLC, doing business as St. Cloud Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Port Charlotte HMA, LLC., doing business as Bayfront Health Port Charlotte
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Punta Gorda HMA, LLC., doing business as Bayfront Punta Gorda
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Morton Plant Hospital Association Inc.
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Trustees of Mease Hospital Inc.
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Leesburg Regional Medical Center Inc.
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: St. Joseph's Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: St. Anthony's Hospital Inc.
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Hartford Hospital
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Trinity Health of New England, Inc.
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Honorhealth Scottsdale Thompson Peak Medical Center
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Winter Haven Hospital Inc.
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Honorhealth Deer Valley Medical Center
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: South Lake Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Baptist Medical Center of the Beaches, Inc.
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: South Florida Baptist Hospital Inc.
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Bartow Regional Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Middlesex Hospital
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Lakeland Regional Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Cleveland Clinic Florida Health System Nonprofit Corporation
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Honorhealth John C. Lincoln Medical Center
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Villages Tri-County Medical Center Inc.
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Indian River Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Naples Community Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Honorhealth Scottsdale Shea Medical Center
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Honorhealth Scottsdale Osborn Medical Center
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: Alek Pivec
Represented By: Daniel John Hettich Esquire
Represented By: Christopher Kenny
Represented By: Mark Douglas Polston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Xavier Becerra, in his official capacity as Secretary of Health and Human Services
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Samantha Lee Chaifetz
Represented By: Alisa B. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?